Kearns v. Cuomo
Defendant: New York State Conservative Party
Defendant / Appellee: Mark J.F. Schroeder, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the New York State Department of Motor Vehicles, Letitia James, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of New York and Andrew M. Cuomo, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Michael P. Kearns, in his official capacity as Clerk of the County of Erie, New York and Michael P. Kearns, in his individual capacity and official capacity as Clerk of the County of Erie, New York
Case Number: 19-3769
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 26 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Michael P. Kearns, FILED. Service date 01/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2747380] [19-3769] [Entered: 01/08/2020 05:41 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 25 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 192-391), on behalf of Appellant Michael P. Kearns, FILED. Service date 01/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2747379] [19-3769] [Entered: 01/08/2020 05:39 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 24 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-191), on behalf of Appellant Michael P. Kearns, FILED. Service date 01/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2747377] [19-3769] [Entered: 01/08/2020 05:37 PM]
December 30, 2019 Filing 23 CAPTION, docked text "in his individual capacity" added to Plaintiff-Appellant Michael P. Kearns, AMENDED.[2740094] [19-3769] [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:08 AM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2736225] [19-3769]--[Edited 12/23/2019 by JB] [Entered: 12/20/2019 04:00 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2727103] [19-3769] [Entered: 12/11/2019 04:44 PM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 01/08/2020, appellee's brief due date as 02/12/2020,TRANSMITTED.[2720459] [19-3769] [Entered: 12/04/2019 09:10 AM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[2720449] [19-3769] [Entered: 12/04/2019 09:06 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Michael P. Kearns, informing Court of proposed due date 02/25/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 12/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2720144] [19-3769] [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:00 PM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Linda Fang, [ # 12 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2718566] [19-3769] [Entered: 12/02/2019 11:13 AM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Cuomo, Letitia James and Mark J.F. Schroeder, FILED. Service date 12/02/2019 by CM/ECF. [2718527] [19-3769] [Entered: 12/02/2019 10:56 AM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Michael P. Kearns, FILED. Service date 11/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2716684] [19-3769] [Entered: 11/26/2019 01:57 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Michael P. Kearns, FILED. Service date 11/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2716682] [19-3769] [Entered: 11/26/2019 01:56 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Michael P. Kearns, FILED. Service date 11/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2716677] [19-3769] [Entered: 11/26/2019 01:54 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/12/2019, RECEIVED.[2706338] [19-3769] [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:35 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2706336] [19-3769] [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:34 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Michael P. Kearns, district court receipt # 0209-3649853, FILED.[2706335] [19-3769] [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:34 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael P. Kearns, FILED. [2706329] [19-3769] [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearns v. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark J.F. Schroeder, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the New York State Department of Motor Vehicles
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Linda Fang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Letitia James, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Linda Fang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew M. Cuomo, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Linda Fang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael P. Kearns, in his official capacity as Clerk of the County of Erie, New York
Represented By: Kenneth Ralph Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael P. Kearns, in his individual capacity and official capacity as Clerk of the County of Erie, New York
Represented By: Kenneth Ralph Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Conservative Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?