Simon v. Manhattan Mini Storage LLC
Defendant: McKinney's Shelter, AKA McGuinness Shelter, BRC
Defendant / Appellee: John Doe 2, N.Y.P.D. ex-cop, AKA Hector, One City Mission Inc., Robert McPhillips, Urban Pathways, Inc., Director Nancy Olecki, Urban Pathways, Inc., Municipal State of New York, State of New York, Nancy Crystal, Director Human Resources, Urban Pathways, Inc., New York City Department of Homeless Services, Missionaries of Charity, Queen of Peace Home, UHaul of Chelsea Truck Rental Agency, New York, N.Y., Shel McGuinness Shelter, BRC, Goddard Riverside Community Center, John Doe 1, N.Y.P.D. ex-cop, AKA Jose, Scott Stringer, New York City Comptroller, Frederick Shack, Urban Pathways, Inc., Warren Wilhelm, Jr., New York City Mayor, AKA Bill DeBlasio, Deputy Director Lisa Lombardi, Urban Pathways, Inc., Jerry Gottesman, or successor, Carolyn Walker-Diallo, Director Salvatore Snaiderbaur, One City Mission, Judy Secon, New York Common Pantry, Stephen Grimaldi, New York Common Pantry, Project Renewal, Fort Washington Men's Homeless Shelter, New York Legal Assistance Group, Jane Doe, case number 101190-15, James P. O'Neill, New York City Police Commissioner, United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, New York Supreme Court, Bowery Residents Committee, Inc., Carolyn Hamrak, New York Common Pantry, Nicole Bramstedt, Urban Pathways, Inc., Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC, John Does, 6 to10, N.Y.P.D. Officers, Andrew Brodsky, Urban Pathways, Inc., Kenmore Associates LP, AKA Kenmore Hall, Civil Court of the City of New York, Does, 121 thru 2,500, Louis L. Stanton, Andrew Cuomo, New York State Governor, John Doe, Urban Pathways, Inc., Coalition for the Homeless, Neil Bogan, New York Common Pantry, New York State Commissioner of Department of Homeless Services, Andy Gottesman, or successor of Gottesman Real Estate Partners, New York Adult Protective Service, John Does, 1 to 4, N.Y.P.D. Officers, Joan B. Lobis, John Doe, Cafeteria Manager of New York Common Pantry, AKA Mohammed, Edison Properties, LLC, Manhattan Mini Storage LLC, New York Common Pantry, John Doe, New York Common Pantry, AKA Mr. Welch, Ronald Abad, Urban Pathways, Inc., Ariana Saunders, Urban Pathways, Inc., U-Haul, AKA Amerco, Andrea Harnett-Robinson, Urban Pathways, Inc., New York State Office of Temporary and Disability Assistance and Sirio Flores, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Robert Simon
Case Number: 19-3809
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, [ # 16 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Robert Simon failure to pay fee, EFFECTIVE.[2745100] [19-3809] [Entered: 01/07/2020 08:36 AM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 30 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[2745098] [19-3809] [Entered: 01/07/2020 08:34 AM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 26 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, for Appellee Missionaries of Charity, RECEIVED.[2739313] [19-3809] [Entered: 12/27/2019 01:24 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Louis L. Stanton and United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2730886] [19-3809] [Entered: 12/16/2019 05:34 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Louis L. Stanton and United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, informing the Court that for the limited purpose of complying with this Court's Local Rule 12.3, the Attorney is filing a Notice of Appearance, RECEIVED. Service date 12/16/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2730882] [19-3809] [Entered: 12/16/2019 05:32 PM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 21 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, for the Appellee Shel McGuinness Shelter, BRC, RECEIVED.[2724110] [19-3809] [Entered: 12/09/2019 11:01 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, for Appellee Andy Gottesman, RECEIVED.[2721910] [19-3809] [Entered: 12/05/2019 11:02 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, for Appellee Salvatore Snaiderbaur, RECEIVED.[2721904] [19-3809] [Entered: 12/05/2019 10:59 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, for Appellee UHaul of Chelsea Truck Rental Agency, New York, N.Y., RECEIVED.[2721805] [19-3809] [Entered: 12/05/2019 10:14 AM]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, dated 12/02/2019,dismissing appeal by 12/23/2019, unless Appellant Robert Simon, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2718584] [19-3809] [Entered: 12/02/2019 11:22 AM]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, dated 12/02/2019, dismissing appeal by 12/23/2019, unless Appellant Robert Simon, submits fee or moves in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2718572] [19-3809] [Entered: 12/02/2019 11:16 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Edison Properties, LLC, Andy Gottesman, Jerry Gottesman, Manhattan Mini Storage LLC and Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC, FILED. Service date 11/27/2019 by US mail.[2717661] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:41 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Marc I. Kunkin for Manhattan Mini Storage LLC Andy Gottesman Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC Jerry Gottesman Edison Properties, LLC, in case 19-3809, [ # 12 ], ADDED.[2715607] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/25/2019 04:12 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 11 ], [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellee Edison Properties, LLC, Andy Gottesman, Jerry Gottesman, Manhattan Mini Storage LLC and Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC, FILED.[2715598] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/25/2019 04:11 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Edison Properties, LLC, Andy Gottesman, Jerry Gottesman, Manhattan Mini Storage LLC and Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC, FILED. Service date 11/25/2019 by US mail. [2715537] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:51 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Apearance as Additional Counsel, [10], on behalf of Appellee Edison Properties, LLC, Andy Gottesman, Jerry Gottesman, Manhattan Mini Storage LLC and Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2715220] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/25/2019 01:28 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Edison Properties, LLC, Andy Gottesman, Jerry Gottesman, Manhattan Mini Storage LLC and Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC, FILED. Service date 11/25/2019 by CM/ECF. [2715007] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/25/2019 12:02 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE, to Appellees Bowery Residents Committee, Inc., Coalition for the Homeless, Edison Properties, LLC, Goddard Riverside Community Center, Kenmore Associates LP, Manhattan Mini Storage LLC, Missionaries of Charity, New York Common Pantry, New York Legal Assistance Group, One City Mission Inc., Project Renewal, Shel McGuinness Shelter, BRC, Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC, U-Haul, UHaul of Chelsea Truck Rental Agency and Urban Pathways, Inc., regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2708302] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:41 AM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2708284] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:34 AM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2708324] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:47 AM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2708271] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:31 AM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 09/11/2019, RECEIVED.[2708270] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:30 AM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert Simon, FILED. [2708260] [19-3809] [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Manhattan Mini Storage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 2, N.Y.P.D. ex-cop, AKA Hector
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: One City Mission Inc.
Represented By: One City Mission Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert McPhillips, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Robert McPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Director Nancy Olecki, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Olecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Municipal State of New York, State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy Crystal, Director Human Resources, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Crystal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York City Department of Homeless Services
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Missionaries of Charity, Queen of Peace Home
Represented By: Missionaries of Charity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UHaul of Chelsea Truck Rental Agency, New York, N.Y.
Represented By: UHaul of Chelsea Truck Rental Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shel McGuinness Shelter, BRC
Represented By: Shel McGuinness Shelter, BRC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Goddard Riverside Community Center
Represented By: Goddard Riverside Community Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 1, N.Y.P.D. ex-cop, AKA Jose
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Stringer, New York City Comptroller
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Frederick Shack, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Shack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Warren Wilhelm, Jr., New York City Mayor, AKA Bill DeBlasio
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Director Lisa Lombardi, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jerry Gottesman, or successor
Represented By: Jerry Gottesman
Represented By: Marc I. Kunkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carolyn Walker-Diallo
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Director Salvatore Snaiderbaur, One City Mission
Represented By: Salvatore Snaiderbaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Judy Secon, New York Common Pantry
Represented By: Judy Secon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen Grimaldi, New York Common Pantry
Represented By: Stephen Grimaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Project Renewal, Fort Washington Men's Homeless Shelter
Represented By: Project Renewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York Legal Assistance Group
Represented By: New York Legal Assistance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe, case number 101190-15
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James P. O'Neill, New York City Police Commissioner
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States District Court for the Southern District of New York
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York Supreme Court
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bowery Residents Committee, Inc.
Represented By: Bowery Residents Committee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carolyn Hamrak, New York Common Pantry
Represented By: Carolyn Hamrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nicole Bramstedt, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Bramstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC
Represented By: Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC
Represented By: Marc I. Kunkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does, 6 to10, N.Y.P.D. Officers
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Brodsky, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kenmore Associates LP, AKA Kenmore Hall
Represented By: Kenmore Associates LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Civil Court of the City of New York
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does, 121 thru 2,500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Louis L. Stanton
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Cuomo, New York State Governor
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Urban Pathways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Coalition for the Homeless
Represented By: Coalition for the Homeless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Neil Bogan, New York Common Pantry
Represented By: Neil Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York State Commissioner of Department of Homeless Services
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andy Gottesman, or successor of Gottesman Real Estate Partners
Represented By: Andy Gottesman
Represented By: Marc I. Kunkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York Adult Protective Service
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does, 1 to 4, N.Y.P.D. Officers
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joan B. Lobis
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, Cafeteria Manager of New York Common Pantry, AKA Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edison Properties, LLC
Represented By: Edison Properties, LLC
Represented By: Marc I. Kunkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Manhattan Mini Storage LLC
Represented By: Manhattan Mini Storage LLC
Represented By: Marc I. Kunkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York Common Pantry
Represented By: New York Common Pantry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, New York Common Pantry, AKA Mr. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ronald Abad, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Abad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ariana Saunders, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Ariana Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U-Haul, AKA Amerco
Represented By: U-Haul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrea Harnett-Robinson, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Harnett-Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York State Office of Temporary and Disability Assistance
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sirio Flores, Urban Pathways, Inc.
Represented By: Sirio Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinney's Shelter, AKA McGuinness Shelter, BRC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Simon
Represented By: Robert Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?