United States of America v. Romano (Joseph Romano)
Defendant: Thomas Arnold, AKA Tom Olsen, AKA Phil Kennedy, AKA Bill Regan, Kevin Wells, Russell Barnes, AKA Rusty, AKA Russ, Salvatore Romano, AKA Steven Anderson, AKA Scott Miller, Michael Dibari, AKA Bob Atwell, AKA Bill Grayson, AKA Mark Vaith and Vincent Romano
Not Yet Classified: United States of America
Defendant / Appellant: Joseph Romano
Case Number: 19-3815
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2709470] [19-3815] [Entered: 11/19/2019 07:33 AM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Lauren H. Elbert, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney David C. James, SUBSTITUTED.[2709386] [19-3815] [Entered: 11/18/2019 05:29 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2708567] [19-3815] [Entered: 11/18/2019 12:35 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTE: See lead case, 19-3507, containing complete set of docket entries.[2708808] [19-3815] [Entered: 11/18/2019 02:23 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2707750] [19-3815] [Entered: 11/15/2019 04:05 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT AMENDED JUDGMENT, dated 10/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2707742] [19-3815] [Entered: 11/15/2019 04:02 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Joseph Romano in 19-3815, FILED. [2707729] [19-3815, 19-3507] [Entered: 11/15/2019 03:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Romano (Joseph Romano)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United States of America
Represented By: Lauren Howard Elbert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Joseph Romano
Represented By: Andrew H. Freifeld Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Arnold, AKA Tom Olsen, AKA Phil Kennedy, AKA Bill Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Barnes, AKA Rusty, AKA Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Romano, AKA Steven Anderson, AKA Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dibari, AKA Bob Atwell, AKA Bill Grayson, AKA Mark Vaith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?