Uzamere v. The State of New York
Defendant: Sharon Kelly Seyers, Eric A. Tepper, Hemalee J. Patel, Michael A. Mosberg, Harriet Weinberger, Michael Moseberg, Florence Richardson, Yesenia Riverga, Matthew D'Emic, Yesenia Rivers and Zenith T. Taylor
Defendant / Appellee: Kathleen Donelli, Honorable Carl J. Landicino, John and Jane Doe, Office Manager Social Security, Honorable Michelle Weston, John Doe, AKA Ms. Flores, Honorable Donald Kurtz, Honorable Sondra Miller, Honorary Chair, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee for the New York State Unified Court System, Honorable Lissette Colon, Honorable Cheryl A. Joseph, Honorable Loren Baily-Schiffman, Honorable Pamela L. Fisher, Jacqueline Silberman, Honorary chair, matrimonial practice advisory and rule commitee for the New York State Unified Court System, HOnorable Wayne P. Saitta, Marsha L. Steinhardt, Donna England, Honorable Debra Silber, Honorable Jeffrey Sunshine, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee, Statewide Coordinating Judge for Matrimonial cases for the New York State Unifeid Court System, Honorable Hope Zimmerman, Richard Zahnuleuter, Honorable Ellen Gesmer, Honorable Wavny Toussaint, Honorable Leon Ruchelsman, Honorable Edgar G. Walker, Stephen J. Gassman, Honorable Richard J. Montelione, The Honorable Letitia James, Attorney General for the State of New York, Monica Chyn, Elena Karabatos, Honorable Lisa S. Ottley, Gail Ennis, Emily Ruben, Honorable Lawrence S. Knipel, Administrative Judge, Kings County Supreme Court, New York State Unified Court System, Susan L. Bener, Esq., Honorable Lara J. Genovesi, The Honorable Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York, John and Jane Doe, In his/her official capacity, Social Security Administration, Honorable Genine Edwards, Honorable Carolyne E. Wade, Honorable Reginald A. Boddie, Honorable Rachel A. Adams, John Doe, AKA Mr. McGowan, Honorable Andrew Crecca, Honorable Kathey J. King, Honorable Laura A. Drager, Andrew M. Saul, Honorable Jeffrey D. Lebowitz, Honorable Robin S. Garson, State of New York, Honorable Lawrence K. Marks, Chief Administrative Judge for the New York State Unified Court System, Royce B. Min, Christopher Mattingly, Honorable Richard Velazquez, Honorable Janet DiFiore, As Chief Judge of the New York State Unified Court System, Honorable Dawn Jimenez-Salta, Susan Kaufman, Esq., Matrimonial practice advisory and rules committee for the New York State Unified Court System Office of Court Administration, Honorable Peter P. Sweeney, David B. Vaughan, Ellen E. Sovern, Howard A. Zucker, M.D., Honorable Teresa Ciccotto, HOnorable Johnny Lee Baynes, Honorable Ellen M. Spodek, Honorable Lina Christopher, The New York State Unified Court System of the State of New York, Bernard J. Graham, RoseAnn C. Branda, Honorable Betty Weinberg Ellerin, Honorary Chair, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee for the New York State Unified Court System and Honorable Eric I. Prus
Plaintiff / Appellant: Cheryl D. Uzamere, individually and as the Sole Proprietor of Uzamere Word Processing and more
Case Number: 19-3825
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Barbara D. Underwood, for Rachel A. Adams, Loren Baily-Schiffman, Johnny Lee Baynes, Reginald A. Boddie, Lina Christopher, Teresa Ciccotto, Lissette Colon, Andrew Crecca, Andrew M. Cuomo, Janet DiFiore, Laura A. Drager, Genine Edwards, Betty Weinberg Ellerin, Pamela L. Fisher, Robin S. Garson, Lara J. Genovesi, Ellen Gesmer, Bernard J. Graham, Letitia James, Dawn Jimenez-Salta, Cheryl A. Joseph, Susan Kaufman, Esq., Kathey J. King, Lawrence S. Knipel, Donald Kurtz, Carl J. Landicino, Jeffrey D. Lebowitz, Lawrence K. Marks, Sondra Miller, Richard J. Montelione, Lisa S. Ottley, Eric I. Prus, Emily Ruben, Leon Ruchelsman, Wayne P. Saitta, Debra Silber, Jacqueline Silberman, Ellen M. Spodek, State of New York, Marsha L. Steinhardt, Jeffrey Sunshine, Peter P. Sweeney, The New York State Unified Court System of the State of New York, Wavny Toussaint, David B. Vaughan, Richard Velazquez, Carolyne E. Wade, Edgar G. Walker, Michelle Weston, Richard Zahnuleuter, Hope Zimmerman and Howard A. Zucker, TERMINATED.[2745454] [19-3825] [Entered: 01/07/2020 11:17 AM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 33 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Rachel A. Adams, Loren Baily-Schiffman, Johnny Lee Baynes, Reginald A. Boddie, Lina Christopher, Teresa Ciccotto, Lissette Colon, Andrew Crecca, Andrew M. Cuomo, Janet DiFiore, Laura A. Drager, Genine Edwards, Betty Weinberg Ellerin, Pamela L. Fisher, Robin S. Garson, Lara J. Genovesi, Ellen Gesmer, Bernard J. Graham, Letitia James, Dawn Jimenez-Salta, Cheryl A. Joseph, Susan Kaufman, Esq., Kathey J. King, Lawrence S. Knipel, Donald Kurtz, Carl J. Landicino, Jeffrey D. Lebowitz, Lawrence K. Marks, Sondra Miller, Richard J. Montelione, Lisa S. Ottley, Eric I. Prus, Emily Ruben, Leon Ruchelsman, Wayne P. Saitta, Debra Silber, Jacqueline Silberman, Ellen M. Spodek, State of New York, Marsha L. Steinhardt, Jeffrey Sunshine, Peter P. Sweeney, The New York State Unified Court System of the State of New York, Wavny Toussaint, David B. Vaughan, Richard Velazquez, Carolyne E. Wade, Edgar G. Walker, Michelle Weston, Richard Zahnuleuter, Hope Zimmerman and Howard A. Zucker, informing the Court that the New York State Attorney General's Office will not representing the state defendants in this appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 01/01/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2744342] [19-3825] [Entered: 01/06/2020 12:43 PM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION, for Declaratory Relief, Temporary and Permanent Injunction of the Enforcement of New York States Sessions Law, on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 12/13/2019 by US mail.[2733196] [19-3825] [Entered: 12/18/2019 03:11 PM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 24 CURED DEFECTIVE Brief and Appendix, [ # 23 ], on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED.[2733105] [19-3825] [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:35 PM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by US mail. [2733101] [19-3825] [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:34 PM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by US mail. [2733089] [19-3825] [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:31 PM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Monica Chyn, John Doe, John and Jane Doe, Gail Ennis, Royce B. Min, Andrew M. Saul and Ellen E. Sovern, FILED. Service date 12/02/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2718809] [19-3825] [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:37 PM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Monica Chyn, John Doe, John and Jane Doe, Gail Ennis, Royce B. Min, Andrew M. Saul and Ellen E. Sovern, informing the Court that the United States Attorney's office has limited capacity to represent the Appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 12/02/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2718773] [19-3825] [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:15 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 CURED DEFECTIVE Form D-P, [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED.[2716773] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/26/2019 02:40 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 11/26/2019 by US mail.[2716769] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/26/2019 02:39 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 11/25/2019 by US mail.[2716766] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/26/2019 02:39 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [13], on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2715360] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:39 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief and Appendix, [11], [12], on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2715321] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:24 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 11/21/2019 by US mail.[2715314] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:22 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-115), on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 11/21/2019 by US mail.[2715312] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:21 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. Service date 11/21/2019 by US mail. [2715307] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:20 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2709421] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:27 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2709419] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:25 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, district court receipt # 465401248327, FILED.[2709416] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:23 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2709415] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:23 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2709414] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:22 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Cheryl D. Uzamere, FILED. [2709412] [19-3825] [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uzamere v. The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kathleen Donelli
Represented By: Kathleen Donelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Carl J. Landicino
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John and Jane Doe, Office Manager Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Michelle Weston
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, AKA Ms. Flores
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Donald Kurtz
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Sondra Miller, Honorary Chair, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee for the New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Lissette Colon
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Cheryl A. Joseph
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Loren Baily-Schiffman
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Pamela L. Fisher
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jacqueline Silberman, Honorary chair, matrimonial practice advisory and rule commitee for the New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOnorable Wayne P. Saitta
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marsha L. Steinhardt
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donna England
Represented By: Donna England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Debra Silber
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Jeffrey Sunshine, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee, Statewide Coordinating Judge for Matrimonial cases for the New York State Unifeid Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Hope Zimmerman
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard Zahnuleuter
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Ellen Gesmer
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Wavny Toussaint
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Leon Ruchelsman
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Edgar G. Walker
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen J. Gassman
Represented By: Stephen J. Gassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Richard J. Montelione
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Honorable Letitia James, Attorney General for the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Monica Chyn
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elena Karabatos
Represented By: Elena Karabatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Lisa S. Ottley
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gail Ennis
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Emily Ruben
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Lawrence S. Knipel, Administrative Judge, Kings County Supreme Court, New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan L. Bener, Esq.
Represented By: Susan L. Bener Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Lara J. Genovesi
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Honorable Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John and Jane Doe, In his/her official capacity, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Genine Edwards
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Carolyne E. Wade
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Reginald A. Boddie
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Rachel A. Adams
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, AKA Mr. McGowan
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Andrew Crecca
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Kathey J. King
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Laura A. Drager
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Jeffrey D. Lebowitz
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Robin S. Garson
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Lawrence K. Marks, Chief Administrative Judge for the New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Royce B. Min
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christopher Mattingly
Represented By: Christopher Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Richard Velazquez
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Janet DiFiore, As Chief Judge of the New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Dawn Jimenez-Salta
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Kaufman, Esq., Matrimonial practice advisory and rules committee for the New York State Unified Court System Office of Court Administration
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Peter P. Sweeney
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David B. Vaughan
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ellen E. Sovern
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Howard A. Zucker, M.D.
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Teresa Ciccotto
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOnorable Johnny Lee Baynes
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Ellen M. Spodek
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Lina Christopher
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The New York State Unified Court System of the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bernard J. Graham
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RoseAnn C. Branda
Represented By: RoseAnn C. Branda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Betty Weinberg Ellerin, Honorary Chair, Matrimonial Practice Advisory and Rules Committee for the New York State Unified Court System
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Honorable Eric I. Prus
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Kelly Seyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A. Tepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hemalee J. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Mosberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harriet Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moseberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yesenia Riverga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D'Emic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yesenia Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith T. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cheryl D. Uzamere, individually and as the Sole Proprietor of Uzamere Word Processing and more
Represented By: Cheryl D. Uzamere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?