Liranzo de la Cruz v. Decker
Not Yet Classified: Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, New York City Field Office, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Alejandro Liranzo de la Cruz, William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice and Chad F. Wolf, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 19-3831
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Joshua Kahane for Kevin K. McAleenan William P. Barr Thomas Decker, in case 19-3831, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2712770] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:28 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 6 ], [ # 9 ], on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Kevin K. McAleenan, FILED.[2712769] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:27 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Kevin K. McAleenan, FILED. Service date 11/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2712763] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:24 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Benjamin H. Torrance, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Sarah K. Eddy, SUBSTITUTED.[2712744] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:18 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Kevin K. McAleenan, FILED. Service date 11/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2712709] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:03 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [5], on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Kevin K. McAleenan, FILED.[2712518] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:49 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Kevin K. McAleenan, FILED. Service date 11/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2712469] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:23 PM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2709618] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/19/2019 09:38 AM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2709615] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/19/2019 09:37 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2709614] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/19/2019 09:37 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellee Alejandro Liranzo de la Cruz, FILED. [2709591] [19-3831] [Entered: 11/19/2019 09:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liranzo de la Cruz v. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, New York City Field Office, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Joshua Kahane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Kevin K. McAleenan, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Joshua Kahane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alejandro Liranzo de la Cruz
Represented By: Alexandra Lampert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Joshua Kahane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Chad F. Wolf, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Joshua Kahane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?