Strunk v. State of New York
Defendant: Democratic National Committee, (DNC) by its Chairman Tom Perez
Defendant / Appellee: Warren Wilhelm, Jr., Bill De Blasio, individually and as Mayor of New York City, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Carl E. Heastie, New York Assembly Speaker, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Voice for Choice Planned Parenthoold of New York City Action Fund, Inc., Andrea Stewart-Cousins, New York Senate Majority Leader, United States Department of Homeland Security, (DHS), Andrew M. Cuomo, individually and as Governor, City of New York and State of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Christopher Earl Strunk
Case Number: 19-3991
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 25 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[2766534] [19-3991] [Entered: 01/31/2020 10:51 AM]
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, [ # 13 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Christopher Earl Strunk failure to pay fee, EFFECTIVE.[2766532] [19-3991] [Entered: 01/31/2020 10:50 AM]
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, dated 01/02/2020, dismissing appeal by 01/23/2020, unless Appellant Christopher Earl Stunk, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2741557] [19-3991] [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:28 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Susan Paulson, [ # 19 ], in place of attorney Zachary Carter, SUBSTITUTED.[2741366] [19-3991] [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:08 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York and Warren Wilhelm, Jr., FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2741051] [19-3991] [Entered: 01/02/2020 09:28 AM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Cuomo, Carl E. Heastie, State of New York and Andrea Stewart-Cousins, FILED. Service date 12/17/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2731784] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/17/2019 02:22 PM]
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, dated 12/17/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/07/2020, unless Appellant Christopher Earl Stunk, submits Form D-P, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2731702] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:47 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Samantha Jill Katze for Appellees Planned Parenthoold of New York City Action Fund, Inc. and Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., in case 19-3991 , [ # 12 ], ADDED.[2731693] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:43 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Laura Etlinger, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2731691] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:41 PM]
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, dated 12/17/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/07/2020, unless Appellant Christopher Earl Stunk, submits fee or moves to proceed in forma pauperis, FILED.[2731684] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:37 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc. and Planned Parenthoold of New York City Action Fund, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/17/2019 by US mail. [2731539] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/17/2019 12:28 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc. and Planned Parenthoold of New York City Action Fund, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/17/2019 by US mail.[2731535] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/17/2019 12:26 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Cuomo, Carl E. Heastie, State of New York and Andrea Stewart-Cousins, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2730869] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/16/2019 05:23 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services and United States Department of Homeland Security, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by US mail.[2730343] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/16/2019 01:35 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Karen Folster Lesperance for Appellees United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Homeland Security, in case 19-3991 , [ # 7 ], ADDED.[2730206] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:03 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services and United States Department of Homeland Security, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by US mail. [2729837] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/16/2019 09:52 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2719336] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:47 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2719331] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:45 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2719329] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:44 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2719327] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:43 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Christopher Earl Strunk, FILED. [2719315] [19-3991] [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strunk v. State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Warren Wilhelm, Jr., Bill De Blasio, individually and as Mayor of New York City
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Susan Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Steven David Clymer
Represented By: John David Hoggan Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carl E. Heastie, New York Assembly Speaker
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Laura Etlinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth David Friedman Esq.
Represented By: Samantha Jill Katze Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Voice for Choice Planned Parenthoold of New York City Action Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth David Friedman Esq.
Represented By: Samantha Jill Katze Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrea Stewart-Cousins, New York Senate Majority Leader
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Laura Etlinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Homeland Security, (DHS)
Represented By: Steven David Clymer
Represented By: John David Hoggan Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew M. Cuomo, individually and as Governor
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Laura Etlinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Susan Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Laura Etlinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic National Committee, (DNC) by its Chairman Tom Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christopher Earl Strunk
Represented By: Christopher Earl Strunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?