Linda A. Lacewell v. Office of the Comptroller of
Plaintiff: Maria T. Vullo, in her official capacity as Superintendent of the New York State Department of Financial Services
Defendant / Appellant: Joseph M. Otting, in his official capacity as U.S. Comptroller of the Currency and Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency
Plaintiff / Appellee: Linda A. Lacewell, in her official capacity as Superintendent of the New York State Department of Financial Services
Case Number: 19-4271
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 27 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency and Joseph M. Otting Brief due date as 04/02/2020 FILED.[2758637] [19-4271] [Entered: 01/22/2020 05:04 PM]
January 15, 2020 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Benjamin H. Torrance for Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency and Joseph M. Otting, in case 19-4271, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2753049] [19-4271]--[Edited 01/17/2020 by ST] [Entered: 01/15/2020 12:19 PM]
January 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency and Joseph M. Otting, FILED. Service date 01/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2752452] [19-4271] [Entered: 01/14/2020 05:13 PM]
January 14, 2020 Filing 22 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency and Joseph M. Otting, informing Court of proposed due date 04/02/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 01/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2751427] [19-4271] [Entered: 01/14/2020 09:52 AM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 21 NEW CASE MANAGER, Sarah Thermora, ASSIGNED.[2746716] [19-4271] [Entered: 01/08/2020 12:07 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 CAPTION, Plaintiff Maria T. Vullo removed from docket, AMENDED.[2741224] [19-4271] [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:03 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency and Joseph M. Otting, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2741166] [19-4271] [Entered: 01/02/2020 10:23 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency and Joseph M. Otting, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2741163] [19-4271] [Entered: 01/02/2020 10:22 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency and Joseph M. Otting, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2741160] [19-4271] [Entered: 01/02/2020 10:21 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Linda A. Lacewell, FILED. Service date 12/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2738275] [19-4271] [Entered: 12/26/2019 01:29 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Matthew W. Grieco, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2738259] [19-4271] [Entered: 12/26/2019 01:19 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Linda A. Lacewell, FILED. Service date 12/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2738180] [19-4271] [Entered: 12/26/2019 11:56 AM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2736442] [19-4271] [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:40 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 DISTRICT COURT FINAL AMENDED JUDGMENT, dated 10/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2736441] [19-4271] [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:39 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 10/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2736440] [19-4271] [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:38 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 10/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2736439] [19-4271] [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:38 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 05/02/2019, RECEIVED.[2736437] [19-4271] [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:37 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency and Joseph M. Otting, FILED. [2736436] [19-4271] [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Linda A. Lacewell v. Office of the Comptroller of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Joseph M. Otting, in his official capacity as U.S. Comptroller of the Currency
Represented By: Christopher Kendrick Connolly
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Office of The Comptroller Of The Currency
Represented By: Christopher Kendrick Connolly
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Linda A. Lacewell, in her official capacity as Superintendent of the New York State Department of Financial Services
Represented By: Matthew William Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria T. Vullo, in her official capacity as Superintendent of the New York State Department of Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?