Williams v. Epic Security Corp
Plaintiff: Aronalph Henriques, Avinaash Takdari, Elizabeth Cruz, Joseph Lewis, Benjamin Rosario, Kimbline Hunter, Jonathan Segora, Owen Burgess, Todd Cunningham, Jacqueline Ortiz, Justin Olmeda, Natasha Hollis, Pindewinde Sawadogo, Anthony Barnes and Starlyn Montan
Defendant: Selwyn Falk
Defendant / Appellant: Epic Security Corp
Plaintiff / Appellee: Warren Richardson, Sharon Carr, Jose Vicent, Deniece Martin, Junior Etienne, Michael Moulton, Saul Velez, Shakiema Cadora, Michael A. Mitchell, Winston E. Synaker, Roger David, Michael Howie, Samuel Wright, Taquesha M. Lawyer, Jimmy Butler, Adrian D. Brown, Princess J. Logan-Williams, James Foster, David Williams, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Israel Rivera, Jonathan Reece, Michael Hurst and Hilburn Walker
Case Number: 19-652
Filed: March 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 63 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, informing Court of proposed due date 08/01/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 05/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2562732] [19-652] [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:27 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 62 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 42.1 Stipulations, [40], [47], on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED.[2559130] [19-652] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:31 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 60 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2559112] [19-652] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:20 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 57 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 05/08/2019, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2558950] [19-652] [Entered: 05/08/2019 12:35 PM]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER, vacating dismissal order dated 05/07/2019, FILED.[2558948] [19-652] [Entered: 05/08/2019 12:34 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 55 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 05/07/2019, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2557841] [19-652] [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:27 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 54 LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, without prejudice to reinstatement by 08/01/2019, FILED.[2557830] [19-652] [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:23 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 53 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[2557811] [19-652] [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:16 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 52 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/13/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2557525] [19-652] [Entered: 05/07/2019 11:45 AM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 49 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/13/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2556924] [19-652] [Entered: 05/06/2019 04:39 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 47 LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 05/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2555634] [19-652] [Entered: 05/03/2019 04:06 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 46 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 44 ], [ # 45 ], on behalf of Appellee Adrian D. Brown, Jimmy Butler, Shakiema Cadora, Sharon Carr, Roger David, Junior Etienne, James Foster, Michael Howie, Michael Hurst, Taquesha M. Lawyer, Princess J. Logan-Williams, Deniece Martin, Michael A. Mitchell, Michael Moulton, Jonathan Reece, Warren Richardson, Israel Rivera, Winston E. Synaker, Saul Velez, Jose Vicent, Hilburn Walker, David Williams and Samuel Wright, FILED.[2555580] [19-652] [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:44 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adrian D. Brown, Jimmy Butler, Shakiema Cadora, Sharon Carr, Roger David, Junior Etienne, James Foster, Michael Howie, Michael Hurst, Taquesha M. Lawyer, Princess J. Logan-Williams, Deniece Martin, Michael A. Mitchell, Michael Moulton, Jonathan Reece, Warren Richardson, Israel Rivera, Winston E. Synaker, Saul Velez, Jose Vicent and Hilburn Walker, FILED. Service date 05/03/2019 by CM/ECF. [2555540] [19-652] [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:29 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 44 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [42], on behalf of Appellees Adrian D. Brown, Jimmy Butler, Shakiema Cadora, Sharon Carr, Roger David, Junior Etienne, James Foster, Michael Howie, Michael Hurst, Taquesha M. Lawyer, Princess J. Logan-Williams, Deniece Martin, Michael A. Mitchell, Michael Moulton, Jonathan Reece, Warren Richardson, Israel Rivera, Winston E. Synaker, Saul Velez, Jose Vicent, Hilburn Walker, David Williams and Samuel Wright, FILED.[2555506] [19-652] [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:15 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, Jason J. Rozger for Michael Moulton Sharon Carr Jose Vicent David Williams Jonathan Reece Samuel Wright Shakiema Cadora James Foster Adrian D. Brown Michael Howie Junior Etienne Roger David Deniece Martin Warren Richardson Taquesha M. Lawyer Jimmy Butler Israel Rivera Hilburn Walker Michael A. Mitchell Michael Hurst Saul Velez Princess J. Logan-Williams Winston E. Synaker, in case 19-652, [42], ADDED.[2555496] [19-652] [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:10 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adrian D. Brown, Jimmy Butler, Shakiema Cadora, Sharon Carr, Roger David and -- Anthony Barnes, Owen Burgess, Elizabeth Cruz and Todd Cunningham, FILED. Service date 05/03/2019 by CM/ECF. [2555422] [19-652] [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:29 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 40 LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 05/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2555172] [19-652] [Entered: 05/03/2019 12:15 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 36 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/13/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2551463] [19-652] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:52 AM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 35 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2546398] [19-652] [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:41 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE, to Appellee Adrian D. Brown, Jimmy Butler, Shakiema Cadora, Sharon Carr, Roger David, Junior Etienne, James Foster, Michael Howie, Michael Hurst, Taquesha M. Lawyer, Princess J. Logan-Williams, Deniece Martin, Michael A. Mitchell, Michael Moulton, Jonathan Reece, Warren Richardson, Israel Rivera, Winston E. Synaker, Saul Velez, Jose Vicent, Hilburn Walker, David Williams and Samuel Wright, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2545938] [19-652] [Entered: 04/23/2019 12:01 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 29 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED. Service date 04/23/2019 by CM/ECF.[2545822] [19-652] [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:17 AM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 28 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Epic Security Corp Form C [19] from the docket, FILED.[2545383] [19-652] [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:57 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 24 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2541566] [19-652] [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:13 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 23 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED.[2541561] [19-652] [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:13 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 22 DISTRICT COURT AMENDED JUDGMENT, dated 04/10/2019, RECEIVED.[2541558] [19-652] [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:12 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [19], on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED.[2541541] [19-652] [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:05 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 20 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED. Service date 04/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2541538] [19-652] [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:05 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 19 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED. Service date 04/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2541530] [19-652] [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:02 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 15 ], [ # 16 ], on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED.[2532719] [19-652] [Entered: 04/04/2019 12:07 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED. Service date 04/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2532606] [19-652] [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:50 AM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED.[2532245] [19-652] [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:12 PM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED. Service date 04/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2532155] [19-652] [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:33 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE, to Appellee Adrian D. Brown, Jimmy Butler, Shakiema Cadora, Sharon Carr, Roger David, Junior Etienne, James Foster, Michael Howie, Michael Hurst, Taquesha M. Lawyer, Princess J. Logan-Williams, Deniece Martin, Michael A. Mitchell, Michael Moulton, Jonathan Reece, Warren Richardson, Israel Rivera, Winston E. Synaker, Saul Velez, Jose Vicent, Hilburn Walker, David Williams and Samuel Wright, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2530352] [19-652] [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:09 AM]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, dated 04/02/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/16/2019 unless Appellant Epic Security Corp submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, FILED.[2530341] [19-652] [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:05 AM]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 04/02/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/16/2019 unless Appellant Epic Security Corp submits Form D, FILED.[2530334] [19-652] [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:02 AM]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 04/02/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/16/2019 unless Appellant Epic Security Corp submits Form C, FILED.[2530330] [19-652] [Entered: 04/02/2019 08:58 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2528624] [19-652] [Entered: 03/29/2019 11:27 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2528622] [19-652] [Entered: 03/29/2019 11:27 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED.[2528619] [19-652] [Entered: 03/29/2019 11:26 AM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2520125] [19-652] [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:12 PM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16503795, FILED.[2520124] [19-652] [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:11 PM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 02/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2520120] [19-652] [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:10 PM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Epic Security Corp, FILED. [2520113] [19-652] [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Williams v. Epic Security Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aronalph Henriques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avinaash Takdari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimbline Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Segora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Olmeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pindewinde Sawadogo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starlyn Montan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Epic Security Corp
Represented By: Brian K. Condon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selwyn Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Warren Richardson
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sharon Carr
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jose Vicent
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Deniece Martin
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Junior Etienne
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Moulton
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Saul Velez
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shakiema Cadora
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael A. Mitchell
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Winston E. Synaker
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Roger David
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Howie
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Samuel Wright
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Taquesha M. Lawyer
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jimmy Butler
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Adrian D. Brown
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Princess J. Logan-Williams
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Foster
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Williams, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Israel Rivera
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jonathan Reece
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Hurst
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Hilburn Walker
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken Esq.
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?