Does v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Does, 1-3
Defendant / Appellee: United States of America and John Does, 1-8
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jane Doe
Case Number: 19-67
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John Does and United States of America in 19-312, 19-67, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by US mail.[2502678] [19-312, 19-67] [Entered: 02/22/2019 09:08 AM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE, to Appellee John Does and United States of America , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2502070] [19-312] [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:31 PM]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER, dated 02/21/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/14/2019, unless Appellant Jane Doe and Jane Doe submit Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2502057] [19-312] [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:26 PM]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, dated 02/21/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/14/2019, unless Appellant Jane Doe and Jane Doe submit Form D-P, FILED.[2502046] [19-312] [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:21 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER, dated 02/04/2019, on behalf of Appellant Jane Doe, in regards to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson, RECEIVED. Service date 02/04/2019 by US mail.[2493693] [19-67] [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:35 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 24 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jane Doe, informing Court of proposed due date 04/04/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/04/2019 by US mail.[2493683] [19-67] [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:30 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 23 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 02/04/2019 by US mail.[2493682] [19-67] [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:29 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 02/04/2019 by US mail.[2493679] [19-67] [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:28 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2490035] [19-312] [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:45 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2490030] [19-312] [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:44 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 DISTRICT COURT RECOMMENDED RULING, dated 01/10/2019, RECEIVED.[2490028] [19-312] [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:44 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jane Doe and Jane Doe, FILED. [2490023] [19-312] [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:42 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee John Does and United States of America, United States does not intend to participate in the appeal unless requested to do so by the Court, RECEIVED. Service date 01/28/2019 by US mail.[2483289] [19-67]--[Edited 01/28/2019 by KR] [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:31 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John Does and United States of America, FILED. Service date 01/28/2019 by US mail.[2483286] [19-67] [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:30 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE, to Appellee United States of America , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2482620] [19-67] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:49 PM]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, dated 01/25/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/15/2019, unless Appellant Jane Doe and Jane Doe submit Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2482406] [19-67] [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:37 AM]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, dated 01/25/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/15/2019, unless Appellant Jane Doe and Jane Doe submit Form D-P, FILED.[2482391] [19-67] [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:32 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2470859] [19-67] [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:07 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2470856] [19-67] [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:06 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #16, dated 10/19/2018, RECEIVED.[2470853] [19-67] [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:05 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jane Doe and Jane Doe, FILED. [2470847] [19-67] [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Does v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Sandra Slack Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does, 1-8
Represented By: Sandra Slack Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Does, 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?