Myers v. Bucca
Defendant: Donna Baeckmann, Charles Bucca, Michael Spitz, Greg Seeley, Alan Frisbee, Terry Willhelm and Bobby Haines
Plaintiff / Appellant: Scott Myers
Defendant / Appellee: Patrolman Rowell
Case Number: 19-69
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 28 ], [ # 28 ], [ # 28 ], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 02/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2498554][49] [19-69] [Entered: 02/18/2019 04:49 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 45 CURED DEFECTIVE SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION, [ # 44 ], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED.[2486060] [19-69] [Entered: 01/31/2019 08:46 AM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 28 ], [ # 28 ], [ # 28 ], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2486022][44] [19-69] [Entered: 01/30/2019 08:13 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 43 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Addendum, [41], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED.[2485971] [19-69] [Entered: 01/30/2019 05:00 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 41 ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2483946] [19-69] [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:03 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 39 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Exhibits, [37], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED.[2483709] [19-69] [Entered: 01/28/2019 04:10 PM]
January 26, 2019 Filing 37 EXHIBITS, volume(s) 1 of 1, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2482924] [19-69] [Entered: 01/26/2019 12:33 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Rowell, FILED. Service date 01/24/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2481391] [19-69] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:14 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE, to Appellee Rowell, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2481209] [19-69] [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:52 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 29 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to certifiy named defendants, to amend caption, to remand appeal, [ # 28 ],[ # 28 ],[ # 28 ], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED.[2481195] [19-69] [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:47 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION, to certify named defendants, to amend caption, to remand appeal, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/24/2019 by CM/ECF. [2481023] [19-69]--[Edited 01/24/2019 by RW] [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:36 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 25 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to amend the caption, to remand the appeal, Exhibits, [21], [20], [19],[19], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED.[2479242] [19-69] [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:40 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Exhibits, [18], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED.[2479235] [19-69] [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:31 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to amend the caption, to remand appeal, [17],[17], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED.[2479209] [19-69] [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:16 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to amend the caption, [9], on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED.[2479187] [19-69] [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:06 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 EXHIBITS, volume(s) 1 of 1, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/22/2019 by CM/ECF.[2478812] [19-69] [Entered: 01/22/2019 08:43 AM]
January 21, 2019 Filing 20 EXHIBITS, volume(s) 1 of 1, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2478785] [19-69] [Entered: 01/21/2019 08:51 PM]
January 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION, to amend the caption, to remand appeal, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2478780] [19-69] [Entered: 01/21/2019 06:43 PM]
January 21, 2019 Filing 18 EXHIBITS, volume(s) 1 of 1, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2478778] [19-69] [Entered: 01/21/2019 06:32 PM]
January 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION, to amend the caption, to remand appeal, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2478777] [19-69] [Entered: 01/21/2019 06:23 PM]
January 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION, to obtain 4 dockets from district court, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2478773] [19-69] [Entered: 01/21/2019 05:35 PM]
January 21, 2019 Filing 15 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2478772] [19-69] [Entered: 01/21/2019 05:23 PM]
January 21, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2478771] [19-69] [Entered: 01/21/2019 05:20 PM]
January 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION, to amend the caption, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, FILED. Service date 01/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2473836] [19-69] [Entered: 01/13/2019 09:55 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, dated 01/10/2019, granting IFP, RECEIVED.[2472364] [19-69] [Entered: 01/10/2019 03:01 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2472298] [19-69] [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:27 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE, re: pending district court IFP motion, to district court, SENT.[2470981] [19-69] [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:57 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2470975] [19-69] [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:53 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, dated 01/03/2019, RECEIVED.[2470973] [19-69] [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:53 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Scott Myers, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2470941] [19-69] [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Bucca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Baeckmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Bucca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Seeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Frisbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Willhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Scott Myers
Represented By: Scott Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patrolman Rowell
Represented By: Crystal R. Peck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?