Ross v. Berryhill
Defendant / Appellee: Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff / Appellant: Daisy Worrell Ross, For Ernell E. Worrell
Case Number: 19-72
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 22 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Daisy Worrell Ross Brief due date as 04/30/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 04/30/2019, copy to pro se Appellant, FILED.[2507483] [19-72] [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:02 AM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Daisy Worrell Ross, informing Court of proposed due date 04/30/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/05/2019 by US mail.[2507075] [19-72] [Entered: 02/27/2019 05:01 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, copy to Pro Se Appellant, ASSIGNED.[2486936] [19-72] [Entered: 01/31/2019 05:38 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Candace Scott Appleton, [ # 12 ], in place of attorney Varuni Nelson, SUBSTITUTED.[2484882] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:56 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill, FILED. Service date 01/29/2019 by US mail. [2484866] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:47 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE, to Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2484233] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:39 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Daisy Worrell Ross, FILED. Service date 01/19/2019 by US mail.[2484228] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:37 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Daisy Worrell Ross, FILED. Service date 01/19/2019 by US mail.[2484224] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:36 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 CAPTION, updated party text, AMENDED.[2476199] [19-72] [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:28 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2471106] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:59 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2471105] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:58 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/29/2018, RECEIVED.[2471102] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:57 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 11/28/2018, RECEIVED.[2471100] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:55 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Daisy Worrell Ross, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2471053] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Candace Scott Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Daisy Worrell Ross, For Ernell E. Worrell
Represented By: Daisy Worrell Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?