Jacobson v. Capital One Financial Corporat
Plaintiff / Appellant: Carol S. Jacobson
Defendant / Appellee: Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 19-80
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/22/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2478866] [19-80] [Entered: 01/22/2019 09:23 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Carol S. Jacobson Brief due date as 04/10/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 04/10/2019, FILED.[2474671] [19-80] [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:42 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Carol S. Jacobson, informing Court of proposed due date 04/10/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 01/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2474192] [19-80] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:37 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2474131] [19-80] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:08 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/15/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2473959] [19-80] [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:42 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Carol S. Jacobson, FILED. Service date 01/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2472556] [19-80] [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:27 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Carol S. Jacobson, FILED. Service date 01/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2472553] [19-80] [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:24 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Carol S. Jacobson, FILED. Service date 01/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2472536] [19-80] [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:15 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation, FILED. Service date 01/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2472493] [19-80] [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:01 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2471264] [19-80] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:39 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Carol S. Jacobson, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16152331, FILED.[2471261] [19-80] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:39 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2471259] [19-80] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:38 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Carol S. Jacobson, FILED. [2471243] [19-80] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobson v. Capital One Financial Corporat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carol S. Jacobson
Represented By: Anne L. Clark Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Aaron Warshaw Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?