In Re: London Silver Fixing
Petitioner: Robert Ceru, Norman Bailey, Laurence Hughes, Modern Settings LLC, a Florida limited liability company, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, American Precious Metals Ltd, Modern Settings LLC, a New York limited liability company, Rebecca Barrett, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Kevin Maher, individually, Eric Nalven, Christopher Depaoli, Jerry Barrett, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, John Hayes, Don Tran, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Class Plaintiffs, J. Scott Nicholson, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Steven E. Summer, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated and KPFF Investment, Inc.
Respondent: Deutsche Bank AG New York, HSBC USA Inc., Scotiabanc Inc., HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, The Bank of Nova Scotia Trust Company of New York, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., The London Silver Market Fixing, Ltd., Jane Does 1-100, John Does 1-50, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Scotia Holdings (US) Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank PLC, The Bank of Nova Scotia, AKA Scotiabank, AKA Scotiamocatta, Deutsche Bank and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Case Number: 19-815
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Robert G. Eisler for Norman Bailey Christopher Depaoli John Hayes Laurence Hughes Don Tran KPFF Investment, Inc. Robert Ceru, in case 19-815, [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2547488] [19-815] [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:57 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner Norman Bailey, Robert Ceru, Christopher Depaoli, John Hayes, Laurence Hughes, KPFF Investment, Inc. and Don Tran, FILED. Service date 04/24/2019 by CM/ECF. [2547233] [19-815] [Entered: 04/24/2019 12:18 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Virginia Ruth Hildreth for Scotia Holdings (US) Inc. The Bank of Nova Scotia Scotiabanc Inc. The Bank of Nova Scotia Trust Company of New York Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., in case 19-815, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2538429] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 05:24 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Kenneth Mark Raisler for Scotia Holdings (US) Inc. The Bank of Nova Scotia Scotiabanc Inc. The Bank of Nova Scotia Trust Company of New York Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., in case 19-815, [ # 23 ], ADDED.[2538426] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 05:22 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, William Henry Wagener for Scotia Holdings (US) Inc. The Bank of Nova Scotia Scotiabanc Inc. The Bank of Nova Scotia Trust Company of New York Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., in case 19-815, [ # 22 ], ADDED.[2538423] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 05:21 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Laura Harris for HSBC USA Inc. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC North America Holdings Inc., in case 19-815, [ # 20 ], ADDED.[2538420] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 05:18 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Leigh Nathanson for HSBC USA Inc. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC North America Holdings Inc., in case 19-815, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2538419] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 05:16 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Holdings (US) Inc., Scotiabanc Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia and The Bank of Nova Scotia Trust Company of New York, FILED. Service date 04/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2537795] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:55 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Holdings (US) Inc., Scotiabanc Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia and The Bank of Nova Scotia Trust Company of New York, FILED. Service date 04/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2537787] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:53 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Holdings (US) Inc., Scotiabanc Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia and The Bank of Nova Scotia Trust Company of New York, FILED. Service date 04/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2537782] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:50 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Scotia Holdings (US) Inc., Scotiabanc Inc., The Bank of Nova Scotia and The Bank of Nova Scotia Trust Company of New York, FILED. Service date 04/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2537773] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:46 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc. and HSBC USA Inc., FILED. Service date 04/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2537766] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:42 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc. and HSBC USA Inc., FILED. Service date 04/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2537755] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:38 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc. and HSBC USA Inc., FILED. Service date 04/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2537747] [19-815] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:32 AM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Deborah Elman for J. Scott Nicholson Kevin Maher Norman Bailey Eric Nalven Christopher Depaoli John Hayes Laurence Hughes Don Tran KPFF Investment, Inc. Robert Ceru, in case 19-815, [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2537337] [19-815] [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:12 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner Norman Bailey, Robert Ceru, Christopher Depaoli, John Hayes, Laurence Hughes, KPFF Investment, Inc., J. Scott Nicholson, Don Tran, Kevin Maher and Eric Nalven, FILED. Service date 04/10/2019 by CM/ECF. [2537184] [19-815] [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:02 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 CAPTION, terminating parties, AMENDED.[2536832] [19-815] [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:47 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 Petitioner Modern Settings LLC, a New York limited liability company, Petitioner Modern Settings LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Petritioner American Precious Metals Ltd, Petitioner Steven E. Summer, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Petititoner Jerry Barrett, Petitioner Rebecca Barrett, Respondent HSBC Bank PLC, Respondent The London Silver Market Fixing, Ltd., Respondent Deutsche Bank, Respondent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Respondent Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Respondent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Respondent Deutsche Bank AG New York, TERMINATED.[2536533] [19-815] [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:03 AM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, Christian Levis for J. Scott Nicholson Kevin Maher Norman Bailey Eric Nalven Christopher Depaoli John Hayes Laurence Hughes Don Tran KPFF Investment, Inc. Robert Ceru, in case 19-815, [ # 11 ], ADDED.[2536456] [19-815] [Entered: 04/10/2019 09:25 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner Norman Bailey, Robert Ceru, Christopher Depaoli, John Hayes, Laurence Hughes, KPFF Investment, Inc., Kevin Maher, Eric Nalven, J. Scott Nicholson and Don Tran, FILED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2535631] [19-815] [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:47 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Petitioner Norman Bailey, Robert Ceru, Christopher Depaoli, John Hayes, Laurence Hughes, KPFF Investment, Inc., Kevin Maher, Eric Nalven, J. Scott Nicholson and Don Tran, FILED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535628] [19-815] [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:44 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER, on behalf of Petitioner Norman Bailey, Robert Ceru, Christopher Depaoli, John Hayes, Laurence Hughes, KPFF Investment, Inc., J. Scott Nicholson, Kevin Maher, Don Tran and Eric Nalven, clarifying party designations, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535359] [19-815]--[Edited 04/10/2019 by ST] [Entered: 04/08/2019 07:30 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR WRIT, SERVED. Service date 03/29/2019 by email.[2530583] [19-815] [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:51 AM]
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO WRIT OF MANDAMUS [ # 1 ], on behalf of Petitioner Norman Bailey, Robert Ceru, Christopher Depaoli, John Hayes, Laurence Hughes, KPFF Investment, Inc., Kevin Maher, Eric Nalven, J. Scott Nicholson and Don Tran, FILED. Service date 03/29/2019 by email.[2530568][3] [19-815] [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:46 AM]
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Petitioner Norman Bailey, Robert Ceru, Christopher Depaoli, John Hayes, Laurence Hughes, KPFF Investment, Inc., Kevin Maher, Eric Nalven, J. Scott Nicholson and Don Tran, district court receipt #A02-73255-955, FILED.[2530561] [19-815] [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:43 AM]
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL PROCEEDING, PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, on behalf of Petitioner Norman Bailey, Robert Ceru, Christopher Depaoli, John Hayes, Laurence Hughes, KPFF Investment, Inc., Kevin Maher, Eric Nalven, J. Scott Nicholson and Don Tran, FILED.[2530549] [19-815] [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: London Silver Fixing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deutsche Bank AG New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC USA Inc.
Represented By: Damien J. Marshall Esq.
Represented By: Laura Harris
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scotiabanc Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Ehrenberg
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Raisler Esq.
Represented By: William Henry Wagener Esq.
Represented By: Virginia Ruth Hildreth Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Damien J. Marshall Esq.
Represented By: Laura Harris
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Bank of Nova Scotia Trust Company of New York
Represented By: Stephen Ehrenberg
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Raisler Esq.
Represented By: William Henry Wagener Esq.
Represented By: Virginia Ruth Hildreth Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scotia Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Ehrenberg
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Raisler Esq.
Represented By: William Henry Wagener Esq.
Represented By: Virginia Ruth Hildreth Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The London Silver Market Fixing, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC Holdings PLC
Represented By: Damien J. Marshall Esq.
Represented By: Laura Harris
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Damien J. Marshall Esq.
Represented By: Laura Harris
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scotia Holdings (US) Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Ehrenberg
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Raisler Esq.
Represented By: William Henry Wagener Esq.
Represented By: Virginia Ruth Hildreth Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deutsche Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC Bank PLC
Represented By: Damien J. Marshall Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Bank of Nova Scotia, AKA Scotiabank, AKA Scotiamocatta
Represented By: Stephen Ehrenberg
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Raisler Esq.
Represented By: William Henry Wagener Esq.
Represented By: Virginia Ruth Hildreth Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deutsche Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Ceru
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norman Bailey
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Laurence Hughes
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Modern Settings LLC, a Florida limited liability company, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Precious Metals Ltd
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Modern Settings LLC, a New York limited liability company
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rebecca Barrett, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Maher, individually
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Nalven
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Depaoli
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerry Barrett, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Hayes
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Don Tran, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Class Plaintiffs
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J. Scott Nicholson, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven E. Summer, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KPFF Investment, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Deborah Elman Esq.
Represented By: Christian Levis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?