Saada v. Golan
Not Yet Classified: Narkis Aliza Golan and Isacco Jacky Saada
Amicus Curiae: Steven Marans, New York Legal Assistance Group, Her Justice Inc., Jacquelyn Campbell, National Program Director, Robert Wood Johnson Foundation Nurse Faculty Scholars, Safe Horizon, Inc., Legal Momentum, Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project, Battered Mothers Custody Conference, Luz Towns-Miranda, Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York, Stephanie Davidson, Clinical Instructor, Family and Domestic Violence Law Clinic at Harvard Law School's Legal Services Center, The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, Leigh Goodmark, Professor of Law, University of Maryland Francis King Carey School of Law, Lansner & Kubitschek, Marie Rudden, University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic, Sanctuary for Families, Inc., Jeffrey L. Edleson, Urban Resource Institute, Merle Weiner, Day One New York Inc., The National Association of Social Workers, Pathways to Safety International, Evan Stark, Deborah Epstein, Co-Director, Georgetown University Law Center Domestic Violence Clinic and The Safe Center LI, Inc.
Case Number: 19-820
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 19, 2019 Summary Saada v. Golan

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 123 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 07/19/2019, to EDNY (BROOKLYN) receipt, RETURNED.[2613163] [19-820] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:04 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 122 JUDGMENT, FILED.[2612793] [19-820] [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:28 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 117 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 07/19/2019, to EDNY (BROOKLYN), ISSUED.[2612409] [19-820] [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:18 AM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 115 OPINION, the district court's 03/22/2019 order is affirmed in part and vacated in part, and the cause is remanded for further proceedings, by RKW, JAC, RR, FILED.[2612400] [19-820] [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:15 AM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 114 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[2612394] [19-820] [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:11 AM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 111 POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Isacco Jacky Saada, FILED. Service date 06/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2592560] [19-820] [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:18 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 109 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, [ # 107 ], FILED.[2591847] [19-820] [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:10 AM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 108 POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 06/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2591745] [19-820] [Entered: 06/21/2019 09:14 AM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 107 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, dated 06/20/2019, [106], on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED.[2591710] [19-820] [Entered: 06/21/2019 08:50 AM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 106 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, as per order dated 06/19/2019, to file a supplemental letter brief. RECEIVED. Service date 06/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2591615] [19-820]--[Edited 06/21/2019 by WD] [Entered: 06/20/2019 05:12 PM]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER, dated 06/19/2019, directing Appellant to submit a supplemental letter brief by 5PM on 06/20/2019, and directing Appellee to submit a response by 5PM on 6/21/2019 if necessary, by RKW, JAC, RR, FILED.[2590691] [19-820] [Entered: 06/19/2019 04:56 PM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 103 CASE, before RKW, JAC, RR, HEARD.[2589684] [19-820] [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:21 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 101 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 05/24/2019 by CM/ECF. [2572630] [19-820] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:28 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 100 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT[ # 97 ], on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED.[2569717] [19-820] [Entered: 05/22/2019 08:29 AM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 99 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, oral argument statement[96], on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED.[2569716] [19-820] [Entered: 05/22/2019 08:29 AM]
May 20, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 05/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2567525] [19-820] [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:51 PM]
May 20, 2019 Filing 96 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Marissa Doran, Esq. for Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 05/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2567488] [19-820] [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:36 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Isacco Jacky Saada, FILED. Service date 05/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2564648] [19-820] [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:50 PM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 92 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Isacco Jacky Saada, FILED. Service date 05/14/2019 by CM/ECF. [2563887] [19-820] [Entered: 05/14/2019 05:09 PM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 91 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2563332] [19-820] [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:56 AM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 88 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF[ # 85 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, FILED.[2562990] [19-820] [Entered: 05/14/2019 09:20 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 87 University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic, replaced by Merle Weiner, SUBSTITUTED.[2561719] [19-820] [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:42 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 85 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, FILED. Service date 05/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2561576] [19-820] [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:56 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 83 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, amicus brief[79], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, FILED.[2561501] [19-820] [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:27 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 82 ATTORNEY, Harry Black, for Amicus Curiae Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, TERMINATED.[2561376] [19-820] [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:30 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 81 LETTER, on behalf of Movant Jeffrey L. Edleson, in re: advising Court of withdrawing counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 05/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2561129] [19-820]--[Edited 05/10/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:54 AM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 79 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Jeffrey L. Edleson, FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2559543] [19-820] [Entered: 05/08/2019 07:12 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 78 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Battered Mothers Custody Conference, Jacquelyn Campbell, Stephanie Davidson, Day One New York Inc., Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project, Deborah Epstein, Leigh Goodmark, Her Justice Inc., Lansner & Kubitschek, Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York, Legal Momentum, New York Legal Assistance Group, Pathways to Safety International, Safe Horizon, Inc., Sanctuary for Families, Inc., The Safe Center LI, Inc. and Urban Resource Institute, FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2559444] [19-820] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:45 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Jeffrey L. Edleson, et al [ # 62 ], FILED. [2558909][77] [19-820] [Entered: 05/08/2019 12:18 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Sanctuary for Families, Inc., et al [ # 61 ], FILED. [2558893][76] [19-820] [Entered: 05/08/2019 12:11 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 73 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 61 ], on behalf of Movant Battered Mothers Custody Conference, Jacquelyn Campbell, Stephanie Davidson, Day One New York Inc., Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project, Deborah Epstein, Leigh Goodmark, Her Justice Inc., Lansner & Kubitschek, Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York, Legal Momentum, New York Legal Assistance Group, Pathways to Safety International, Safe Horizon, Inc., Sanctuary for Families, Inc., The Safe Center LI, Inc., University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic and Urban Resource Institute, FILED. Service date 05/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2555821][73] [19-820] [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:58 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 72 ATTORNEY, Anita Stork for Stephanie Davidson Day One New York Inc. University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic Lansner & Kubitschek Deborah Epstein The Safe Center LI, Inc. Her Justice Inc. Pathways to Safety International Leigh Goodmark Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project New York Legal Assistance Group Legal Momentum Urban Resource Institute Battered Mothers Custody Conference Safe Horizon, Inc. Sanctuary for Families, Inc. Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York Jacquelyn Campbell, in case 19-820 , [ # 71 ], ADDED.[2554806] [19-820] [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:35 AM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Sanctuary for Families, Inc., Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project, Her Justice Inc., Legal Momentum, New York Legal Assistance Group, Safe Horizon, Inc., Pathways to Safety International, Day One New York Inc., Jacquelyn Campbell, The Safe Center LI, Inc., Urban Resource Institute, University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic, Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York, Lansner & Kubitschek, Battered Mothers Custody Conference, Deborah Epstein, Leigh Goodmark and Stephanie Davidson, FILED. Service date 05/03/2019 by CM/ECF. [2554634] [19-820]--[Edited 05/03/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/03/2019 08:32 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 68 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 06/18/2019, SET.[2553547] [19-820] [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:29 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 66 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE[ # 58 ], [ # 57 ], [ # 56 ], on behalf of Movant Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, FILED.[2553535] [19-820] [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:27 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 65 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance[55], [54], [53], on behalf of Movant Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, FILED.[2553532] [19-820] [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:26 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 64 NEW PARTY, Movant Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, ADDED.[2553522] [19-820] [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:23 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 63 NEW PARTY, Movant Sanctuary for Families, Inc., Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project, Her Justice Inc., Legal Momentum, New York Legal Assistance Group, Safe Horizon, Inc., Pathways to Safety International, Day One New York Inc., Jacquelyn Campbell, The Safe Center LI, Inc., Urban Resource Institute, University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic, Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York, Lansner & Kubitschek, Battered Mothers Custody Conference, Deborah Epstein, Leigh Goodmark and Stephanie Davidson, ADDED.[2553486] [19-820] [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:04 AM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, FILED. Service date05/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2553440] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:51 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Sanctuary for Families, Inc., Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project, Her Justice Inc., Legal Momentum, New York Legal Assistance Group, Safe Horizon, Inc., Pathways to Safety International, Day One New York Inc., Jacquelyn Campbell, The Safe Center LI, Inc., Urban Resource Institute, University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic, Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York, Lansner & Kubitschek, Battered Mothers Custody Conference, Deborah Epstein, Leigh Goodmark and Stephanie Davidson, FILED. Service date05/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2553439] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:59 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Sanctuary for Families, Inc., Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project, Her Justice Inc., Legal Momentum, New York Legal Assistance Group, Safe Horizon, Inc., Pathways to Safety International, Day One New York Inc., Jacquelyn Campbell, The Safe Center LI, Inc., Urban Resource Institute, University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic, Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York, Lansner & Kubitschek, Battered Mothers Custody Conference, Deborah Epstein, Leigh Goodmark and Stephanie Davidson, FILED. Service date 05/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2553437] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:32 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Sanctuary for Families, Inc., Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project, Her Justice Inc., Legal Momentum, New York Legal Assistance Group, Safe Horizon, Inc., Pathways to Safety International, Day One New York Inc., Jacquelyn Campbell, The Safe Center LI, Inc., Urban Resource Institute, University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic, Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York, Lansner & Kubitschek, Battered Mothers Custody Conference, Deborah Epstein, Leigh Goodmark and Stephanie Davidson, FILED. Service date 05/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2553436] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:25 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, FILED. Service date 05/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2553400] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 06:07 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, FILED. Service date 05/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2553395] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 06:01 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Jeffrey L. Edleson, Steven Marans, Evan Stark, Luz Towns-Miranda, Marie Rudden, NASW and The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence, FILED. Service date 05/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2553389] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 05:52 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 05/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2553092] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:20 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 05/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2553082] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:14 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 05/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2553059] [19-820]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JW] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:03 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 46 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 296-485), on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/24/2019 by CM/ECF.[2547796] [19-820] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:20 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 45 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-295), on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/24/2019 by CM/ECF.[2547795] [19-820] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:18 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 44 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/24/2019 by CM/ECF.[2547794] [19-820] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:12 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 43 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/24/2019 by CM/ECF.[2547793] [19-820] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:10 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 42 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 06/17/2019, PROPOSED.[2545626] [19-820] [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:55 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 37 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 06/10/2019, PROPOSED.[2538175] [19-820] [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:22 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Claudia Hammerman for Narkis Aliza Golan, in case 19-820 , [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2535870] [19-820] [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:54 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2535797] [19-820] [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:28 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 31 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/15/2019, Start Time: 4:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2534654] [19-820] [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:42 AM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 29 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/28/2019, PROPOSED.[2533968] [19-820] [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:07 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 28 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/22/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2533453] [19-820] [Entered: 04/05/2019 09:50 AM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Isacco Jacky Saada, FILED. Service date 04/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2533258] [19-820] [Entered: 04/04/2019 05:11 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite appeal [ # 7 ] filed by Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, by SLC, FILED. [2533180][23] [19-820] [Entered: 04/04/2019 04:20 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEYS, Daniel H. Levi, Marissa Doran for Narkis Aliza Golan, in case 19-820 , [ # 20 ], [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2533170] [19-820] [Entered: 04/04/2019 04:18 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/04/2019 by CM/ECF. [2532847] [19-820] [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:02 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/04/2019 by CM/ECF. [2532845] [19-820] [Entered: 04/04/2019 01:59 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 18 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2532405] [19-820] [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:01 AM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2532324] [19-820] [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:59 PM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2532323] [19-820] [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:58 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2531009] [19-820] [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:08 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2530269] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 07:26 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, pursuant to Local Rule 4.3, this case includes a claim under the 1980 Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction and the International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22 U.S.C. 9001 et seq., RECEIVED. Service date 04/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2530267] [19-820]--[Edited 04/02/2019 by TT] [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:36 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. Service date 04/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2530266] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 06:34 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2530189] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:44 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, district court receipt # ANYEDC-11337990, FILED.[2530188] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:44 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. [2530185] [19-820] [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Saada v. Golan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Narkis Aliza Golan
Represented By: Karen King Esq.
Represented By: Claudia Hammerman
Represented By: Daniel H. Levi
Represented By: Marissa Doran Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Isacco Jacky Saada
Represented By: Robert D. Arenstein Esq.
Represented By: Richard Min
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steven Marans
Represented By: Amal El-Bakhar Esq.
Represented By: Rachel G. Skaistis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York Legal Assistance Group
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Her Justice Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jacquelyn Campbell, National Program Director, Robert Wood Johnson Foundation Nurse Faculty Scholars
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Safe Horizon, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Momentum
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment And Appeals Project
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Battered Mothers Custody Conference
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Luz Towns-Miranda
Represented By: Amal El-Bakhar Esq.
Represented By: Rachel G. Skaistis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawyers Committee Against Domestic Violence New York
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stephanie Davidson, Clinical Instructor, Family and Domestic Violence Law Clinic at Harvard Law School's Legal Services Center
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Leadership Council on Child Abuse and Interpersonal Violence
Represented By: Amal El-Bakhar Esq.
Represented By: Rachel G. Skaistis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Leigh Goodmark, Professor of Law, University of Maryland Francis King Carey School of Law
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lansner & Kubitschek
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marie Rudden
Represented By: Amal El-Bakhar Esq.
Represented By: Rachel G. Skaistis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Oregon Domestic Violence Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sanctuary for Families, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeffrey L. Edleson
Represented By: Amal El-Bakhar Esq.
Represented By: Rachel G. Skaistis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Urban Resource Institute
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Merle Weiner
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Day One New York Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Association of Social Workers
Represented By: Amal El-Bakhar Esq.
Represented By: Rachel G. Skaistis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pathways to Safety International
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Evan Stark
Represented By: Amal El-Bakhar Esq.
Represented By: Rachel G. Skaistis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Deborah Epstein, Co-Director, Georgetown University Law Center Domestic Violence Clinic
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Safe Center LI, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Roberts Esq.
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma Esq.
Represented By: Anita Stork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?