Strauss v. Credit Lyonnais S.A.
Plaintiff: Gloria Kushner, Netanel Miller and Tehila Topporowitch
Plaintiff / Appellant: Steven Averbach, Maida Averbach, for the Estate of David Averbach, Phyllis Maisel, Steven Greenbaum, for the Estate of Judith Greenbaum, Chaya Miller, David Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Aaron Strauss, Alexander Rozenstein, Hezekial Toporowitch, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Blumy Rom, Jason Kirschenbaum, Neil Danzig, for the Estate of Rebecca Danzig, Bruce Mazer, Altea Steinherz, Ora Cohen, Anna Beer, Eric M. Singer, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Yehezkel Agababa, Orit Steinmetz, Joseph Strauss, Menache Agababa, Richard Blutstein, Julie Averbach, for the Estate of Steven Averbach, Nava Steinmetz, Mina Dora Green, for the Estate of Howard Green, David Averbach, Jacob Steinmetz, for the Estate of Amic Steinmetz, Greta Geler, as the Administrator of the Estate of Hannah Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Julie Averbach, Arie Miller, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill, E.N.C., a minor, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Natanel Steinmetz, Michael Goldstein, David Kirshenbaum, Neta Nechama Cohen, Howard M. Green, Amichai Steinmetz, Judith Singer, Bennett Finer, Yitzchk Weiss, Roisie Engelman, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, Orly Rom, Esther Deutsch, Maida Averbach, Daniel Rozenstein, Shoshana Nathansen, Moses Strauss, Adam Averbach, Yeruchaim Weiss, Pearl Herskovitz, Sara Nachenberg, Joshua Faudem, Einat Noked, for the Estate of Eyal Noked, Shaina Chava Nadel, Eli Cohen, T.Y.G., a minor, Jonathan Steinherz, Chana Freedman, Shirlee Hayman, Robert L. Coulter, Sr., for the Estate of Janis Ruth Coulter, Gila Aluf, Martin Herskovitz, Blumy Strauss, Temima Spetner Gould, Akiva Anachovich, Tzvi Weiss, Eileen Sapadin, Leib Weiss, Martin Kirschenbaum, Deborah Steinmetz, Nilly Choman, Deborah Steinmetz, for the Estate of Amic Steinmetz, Richard Coffey, Sean Averbach, Michal Honickman, Yehudit Nathansen, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Levana Cohen Harooch, Sarah Danzig, Yehuda Agababa, A.N., a minor, Orly Cohen, Yitzhak Goldberg, Daniel Cohen, Esther Goldberg, Jacob Steinmetz, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Einat Noked, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Dianne Coulter Miller, Michael Averbach, Paula Finer, Jacqueline Chambers, as the Administrator of the Estate of Esther Bablar, Chana Nathansen, for the Estate of Theilla Nathansen, David Nachenberg, Merav Cohen, Eugene Goldstein, Shaun Coffel, Alan Hayman, Sarri Anne Singer, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Burgett, Richard Goldstein, Matanya Nathansen, for the Estate of Theilla Nathansen, Nevenka Gritz, for the Estate of David Gritz, Avishag Noked, Chana Weiss, Harry Leonard Beer, as Executor of the Estate of Alan Beer, Devir Averbach, Nevenka Gritz, for the Estate of Norman Gritz, Rebekah Blutstein, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Katherine Baker, for the Estate of Benjamin Blutstein, Malka Weiss, David Danzig, Zohar Fater, Gal Ganzman, Bennett Finer, as Legal guardian for Chana Nachenberg, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Sarah Elyakim, David Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, for the Estate of Martin Kirschenbaum, Philip Strauss, Estelle Carroll, Tamir Averbach, Esther Rozenstein, Zev Finer, Greta Geler, Mina Dora Green, Eyal Noked, Chaya Beili, Yehuda Toporowitch, Michal Honickman, for the Estate of Howard Goldstein, Robert Singer, Netanel Herskovitz, Eliezer Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Shira Cohen, Paula Finer, as Legal guardian for Chana Nachenberg, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Danielle Teitelbaum, T.N., a minor, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Hayyim Danzig, Yaakov Herskovitz, Larry Carter, as the Administrator of the Estate of Diane Leslie Carter, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Y.M.G., a minor, Hannah Litle, Obadiah Waxler, Abraham Zarkowsky, Chaya Rosenberg, Ezekial Waxler, Joseph Zarkowksy, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Tovi Horovitz, David Horovitz, Estate of Foruk Naimi, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Yitzchok Richter, Tvi Horovitz, Geela Applebaum Gordon, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Shoshana Tita, Breina Richter, Arthur Waxler, Shlomo Tratner, Bracha Milstein, Bryan Wolf, Menachem Freirmack, Perl Brailofsky, Avrohom D. Richter, Dina Waxler, Shrage Zarkowsky, Moshe Horovitz, Ariela Freirmark, Yaakov Waxler, Ezra Tita, Trany Zarkowsky, Bernice Wolf, for the Estate of Debra Ruth Horovitz and the Estate of Eli Natan Horovitz, Shifra Miller, Erik Schecter, Miriam Leah Richter, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gedalia Waxler, Yehudis Richter, Leah Horovitz, Yisroel Richter, Noah Litle, Yakov Yosef Richter, Gittle Cohen, Batsheva Horovitz, Joseph Leifer, Ari Horovitz, Michael Schwartz, Estate of Tiferet Tratner, Mendel Zarkowsky, individually and for the Estate of Eli Zarkowsky and for the Estate of Goldie Zarkowsky, Natan Applebaum, for the Estate of David Applebaum and for the Estate of Naava Applebaum, Uri Horovitz, Rachel Potolski, Moshe Richter, Yitzchok Reinitz, Rivka Reena Pam, Haggi Waxler, Chaya Freisel, Aron Zarkowsky, Malky Breuer, Abraham Waxler, Yakov Reinitz, Phillip Schwartz, Philip Litle, for the Estate of Abigail Litle, Ovadia Topporowitch, Nethaniel Bluth, Nachum Waxler, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, Nechama Richter, Seymour Gottlieb, Yoel Waxler, Josiah Litle, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Rivka Reinitz, Jacob Schwartz, Yisrael Topporowitch, Gittel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Elishua Litle, Rachel Rosner, Averham Grossman, Yitzchak Applebaum, Yechiel Richter, Stanley Wolf, Helen Weider, Phyllis Pam, Elizabeth Schwartz, Zacharia Waxler, Fran Strauss Baxter, Sara Malka Richter, Shulamite Horovitz, Chana Waxler, Ester Buxbaum, Heidi Litle, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, Shayna Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, William J. Baxter, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, Bshava Zarkowsky, Hadassah Freimark, Debra Applebaum, Yehuda Zarkowsky, Chaya Tziporah Cohen, Faye Chana Benjaminson, Miriam Reinitz, Mendy Reinitz, Tranne Richter, Ephraim Tita, for the Estate of Bertin Tita, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Samuel Reinitz, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Nechama Horovitz, Sheila Gottlieb, Max Schwartz, Shmuel Reinitz, Baruch Waxler and Moshe Naimi
Defendant / Appellee: Credit Lyonnais S.A.
Case Number: 19-865
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 69 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Debra Applebaum, et al., in 19-865 Brief due date as 06/19/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 06/19/2019, FILED.[2578542] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 06/03/2019 04:47 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 68 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee A.N., et al., in 19-865 Brief due date as 06/19/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 06/19/2019, FILED.[2578422] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 06/03/2019 04:32 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 65 NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[2577565] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 06/03/2019 11:13 AM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 60 ATTORNEY, Michael Radine for Appellant-Cross-Appellee A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Doctor Larry Carter, Estelle Carroll, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Mina Dora Green, Mina Dora Green, Howard M. Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Leib Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G., Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill and Netanel Miller in 19-865 in case and 19-1285. [ # 59 ], ADDED.[2570619] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 05/22/2019 03:55 PM]
May 20, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Doctor Larry Carter, Estelle Carroll, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Mina Dora Green, Mina Dora Green, Howard M. Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Leib Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G., Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill and Netanel Miller in 19-865, Appellee A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G., Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill and Netanel Miller in 19-1285, FILED. Service date 05/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2567852] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:03 PM]
May 20, 2019 Filing 58 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as additional counsel, [57], on behalf of Appellants-Cross-Appellees A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Esther Rozenstein, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G., Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill and Netanel Miller in 19-865 and 19-1285, FILED.[2567110] [19-865, 19-1285]--[Edited 05/20/2019 by TT] [Entered: 05/20/2019 09:17 AM]
May 17, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Esther Rozenstein, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G., Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill and Netanel Miller in 19-865, Appellee A.N., Menache Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Nevenka Gritz, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Michal Honickman, Levana Cohen Harooch, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G., Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill and Netanel Miller in 19-1285, FILED. Service date 05/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2566912] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 05/17/2019 04:26 PM]
May 16, 2019 Filing 53 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 52 ], on behalf of Appellant Credit Lyonnais S.A. in 19-1285, FILED.[2565631] [19-1285, 19-865] [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:31 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 52 FORM C, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Credit Lyonnais S.A. in 19-865, Appellant Credit Lyonnais S.A. in 19-1285, FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2561175] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 05/10/2019 12:11 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 51 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [43], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Credit Lyonnais S.A. in 19-865, Appellant Credit Lyonnais S.A. in 19-1285, FILED.[2560891] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:17 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 50 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 2559832-2 ], on behalf of Appellees Bernice Wolf, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Averham Grossman, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Bracha Milstein, Shifra Miller, Chaya Rosenberg, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Nethaniel Bluth, Moshe Naimi, Faye Chana Benjaminson, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Philip Litle, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Noah Litle, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Ariela Freirmark, Menachem Freirmack, Hadassah Freimark, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Shoshana Tita, Ezra Tita, Ephraim Tita, Rachel Potolski, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, Helen Weider, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Chaya Freisel, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Bshava Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Joseph Zarkowksy, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky, Debra Applebaum, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Geela Applebaum Gordon, Chaya Tziporah Cohen, Erik Schecter, Shlomo Tratner and Estate of Tiferet Tratner, FILED.[2560855] [19-1285] [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:03 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 49 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 2559784-2 ], on behalf of Appellees Bernice Wolf, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Averham Grossman, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Bracha Milstein, Shifra Miller, Chaya Rosenberg, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Nethaniel Bluth, Moshe Naimi, Faye Chana Benjaminson, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Philip Litle, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Noah Litle, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Ariela Freirmark, Menachem Freirmack, Hadassah Freimark, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Shoshana Tita, Ezra Tita, Ephraim Tita, Rachel Potolski, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, Helen Weider, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Chaya Freisel, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Bshava Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Joseph Zarkowksy, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky, Debra Applebaum, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Geela Applebaum Gordon, Erik Schecter, Shlomo Tratner and Estate of Tiferet Tratner, FILED.[2560848] [19-1285] [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:01 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 48 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 2559749-2 ], on behalf of Appellees Debra Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Faye Chana Benjaminson, Nethaniel Bluth, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Estate of Foruk Naimi, Estate of Tiferet Tratner, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Hadassah Freimark, Menachem Freirmack, Ariela Freirmark, Chaya Freisel, Geela Applebaum Gordon, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Averham Grossman, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Philip Litle, Shifra Miller, Bracha Milstein, Moshe Naimi, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Rachel Potolski, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Chaya Rosenberg, Rachel Rosner, Erik Schecter, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Ephraim Tita, Ezra Tita, Shoshana Tita, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Shlomo Tratner, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Helen Weider, Bernice Wolf, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Joseph Zarkowksy, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Bshava Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky and Tehila Topporowitch, FILED.[2560815] [19-1285] [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:44 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 47 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as additional counsel, [ # 2559546-2 ], on behalf of Appellees Bernice Wolf, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Averham Grossman, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Bracha Milstein, Shifra Miller, Chaya Rosenberg, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Nethaniel Bluth, Moshe Naimi, Faye Chana Benjaminson, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Philip Litle, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Noah Litle, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Ariela Freirmark, Menachem Freirmack, Hadassah Freimark, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Shoshana Tita, Ezra Tita, Ephraim Tita, Rachel Potolski, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, Helen Weider, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Chaya Freisel, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Bshava Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Joseph Zarkowksy, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, Debra Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Geela Applebaum Gordon, Chaya Tziporah Cohen, Erik Schecter, Shlomo Tratner and Estate of Tiferet Tratner, FILED.[2560804] [19-1285] [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:40 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 46 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Apperance, [ # 2559545-2 ], on behalf of Appellees Debra Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Faye Chana Benjaminson, Nethaniel Bluth, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Estate of Foruk Naimi, Estate of Tiferet Tratner, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Hadassah Freimark, Menachem Freirmack, Ariela Freirmark, Chaya Freisel, Geela Applebaum Gordon, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Averham Grossman, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Philip Litle, Shifra Miller, Bracha Milstein, Moshe Naimi, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Rachel Potolski, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Chaya Rosenberg, Rachel Rosner, Erik Schecter, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Ephraim Tita, Ezra Tita, Shoshana Tita, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Shlomo Tratner, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Helen Weider, Bernice Wolf, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Joseph Zarkowksy, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Bshava Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky and Tehila Topporowitch, FILED.[2560790] [19-1285] [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:35 AM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 45 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,notice of appearance as additional counsel, [ # 2559549-2 ], on behalf of Appellees Bernice Wolf, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Averham Grossman, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Noah Litle, Philip Litle, Bracha Milstein, Shifra Miller, Chaya Rosenberg, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Nethaniel Bluth, Moshe Naimi, Faye Chana Benjaminson, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, Fran Strauss Baxter, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, William J. Baxter, Ariela Freirmark, Menachem Freirmack, Hadassah Freimark, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Shoshana Tita, Ezra Tita, Ephraim Tita, Rachel Potolski, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, Helen Weider, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Chaya Freisel, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Bshava Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Joseph Zarkowksy, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky, Debra Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Geela Applebaum Gordon, Chaya Tziporah Cohen, Erik Schecter, Shlomo Tratner and Estate of Tiferet Tratne, FILED.[2559619] [19-1285] [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:07 AM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 44 FORM D, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Credit Lyonnais S.A. in 19-865, 19-1285, FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2559538] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 05/08/2019 06:45 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 43 FORM C, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Credit Lyonnais S.A. in 19-865, 19-1285, FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2559537] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 05/08/2019 06:43 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 42 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Credit Lyonnais S.A. in 19-865, 19-1285, FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2559536] [19-865, 19-1285] [Entered: 05/08/2019 06:40 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 39 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2556256] [19-865] [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:40 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 37 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Debra Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Faye Chana Benjaminson, Nethaniel Bluth, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Estate of Foruk Naimi, Estate of Tiferet Tratner, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Hadassah Freimark, Menachem Freirmack, Ariela Freirmark, Chaya Freisel, Geela Applebaum Gordon, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Averham Grossman, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Philip Litle, Shifra Miller, Bracha Milstein, Moshe Naimi, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Rachel Potolski, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Chaya Rosenberg, Rachel Rosner, Erik Schecter, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Ephraim Tita, Ezra Tita, Shoshana Tita, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Shlomo Tratner, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Helen Weider, Bernice Wolf, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Joseph Zarkowksy, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Bshava Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky and Yehuda Zarkowsky, informing Court of proposed due date 06/19/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 04/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2551854] [19-865] [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:05 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 36 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G. and Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill, informing Court of proposed due date 06/19/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 04/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2551034] [19-865] [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:52 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, Susan Marlene Davies for Appellants Appellant Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, Shoshana Tita, Ezra Tita, Ephraim Tita, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, Natan Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Debra Applebaum, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Bernice Wolf, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Averham Grossman, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Bracha Milstein, Shifra Miller, Chaya Rosenberg, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Nethaniel Bluth, Faye Chana Benjaminson, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Moshe Naimi, Philip Litle, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Noah Litle, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Ariela Freirmark, Menachem Freirmack, Hadassah Freimark, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Rachel Potolski, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Helen Weider, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Chaya Freisel, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Shira Cohen and Chaya Tziporah Cohen, in case 19-865 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[2546508] [19-865] [Entered: 04/23/2019 04:31 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Patrick Rocco for Appellants Bernice Wolf, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Averham Grossman, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Bracha Milstein, Shifra Miller, Chaya Rosenberg, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Nethaniel Bluth, Moshe Naimi, Faye Chana Benjaminson, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Philip Litle, Rebecca Danzig, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Noah Litle, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Ariela Freirmark, Menachem Freirmack, Hadassah Freimark, Rivka Reena Pam, Shoshana Tita, Ezra Tita, Ephraim Tita, Rachel Potolski, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Martin Kirschenbaum, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, Helen Weider, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Chaya Freisel, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Bshava Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Debra Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Geela Applebaum Gordon and Chaya Tziporah Cohen, in case 19-865 , [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2545282] [19-865] [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:17 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, Shoshana Tita, Ezra Tita, Ephraim Tita, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, Natan Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Tovi Belle Applebaum, Debra Applebaum, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Bernice Wolf, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Averham Grossman, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Bracha Milstein, Shifra Miller, Chaya Rosenberg, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Nethaniel Bluth, Faye Chana Benjaminson, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Moshe Naimi, Philip Litle, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Noah Litle, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Ariela Freirmark, Menachem Freirmack, Hadassah Freimark, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Rachel Potolski, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Helen Weider, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Chaya Freisel, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Shira Cohen and Chaya Tziporah Cohen, FILED. Service date 04/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2545037] [19-865] [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:08 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bernice Wolf, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Averham Grossman, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Bracha Milstein, Shifra Miller, Chaya Rosenberg, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Nethaniel Bluth, Moshe Naimi, Faye Chana Benjaminson, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Philip Litle, Rebecca Danzig, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Noah Litle, Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Ariela Freirmark, Menachem Freirmack, Hadassah Freimark, Rivka Reena Pam, Shoshana Tita, Ezra Tita, Ephraim Tita, Rachel Potolski, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Martin Kirschenbaum, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, Helen Weider, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Chaya Freisel, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky, Bshava Zarkowsky, Ezriel Zarkowsky, Gittel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Mendel Zarkowsky, Miriam Zarkowsky, Shrage Zarkowsky, Trany Zarkowsky, Yehuda Zarkowsky, The Estate of Jacqueline Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Natan Applebaum, Debra Applebaum, Shira Applebaum, Yitzchak Applebaum, Shayna Applebaum, Geela Applebaum Gordon and Chaya Tziporah Cohen, FILED. Service date 04/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2544986] [19-865] [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:39 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 25 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Faye Chana Benjaminson, Nethaniel Bluth, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Estate of Foruk Naimi, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Hadassah Freimark, Menachem Freirmack, Ariela Freirmark, Chaya Freisel, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Averham Grossman, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Philip Litle, Shifra Miller, Bracha Milstein, Moshe Naimi, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Rachel Potolski, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Chaya Rosenberg, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Ephraim Tita, Ezra Tita, Shoshana Tita, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Helen Weider, Bernice Wolf, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Abraham Zarkowsky, Aron Zarkowsky and Bshava Zarkowsky, FILED. Service date 04/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2543550] [19-865] [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:24 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 24 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Faye Chana Benjaminson, Nethaniel Bluth, Perl Brailofsky, Malky Breuer, Ester Buxbaum, Gittle Cohen, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Estate of Foruk Naimi, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Hadassah Freimark, Menachem Freirmack, Ariela Freirmark, Chaya Freisel, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Averham Grossman, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Philip Litle, Shifra Miller, Bracha Milstein, Moshe Naimi, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Rachel Potolski, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Shlomo Chaim Richter, Tranne Richter, Yakov Yosef Richter, Yechiel Richter, Yehudis Richter, Yisroel Richter, Yitzchok Richter, Chaya Rosenberg, Rachel Rosner, Elizabeth Schwartz, Jacob Schwartz, Max Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Phillip Schwartz, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, The Estate of Mordechai Reinitz, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Ephraim Tita, Ezra Tita, Shoshana Tita, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Helen Weider, Bernice Wolf, Bryan Wolf, Stanley Wolf, Abraham Zarkowsky and Aron Zarkowsky, FILED. Service date 04/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2543545] [19-865] [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:22 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Fran Strauss Baxter, William J. Baxter, Faye Chana Benjaminson, Nethaniel Bluth, Miriam Ehrenfeld, Estate of Foruk Naimi, Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz, Hadassah Freimark, Menachem Freirmack, Ariela Freirmark, Seymour Gottlieb, Sheila Gottlieb, Averham Grossman, Ari Horovitz, Batsheva Horovitz, David Horovitz, Leah Horovitz, Moshe Horovitz, Nechama Horovitz, Shulamite Horovitz, Tovi Horovitz, Tvi Horovitz, Uri Horovitz, Devorah Chechanow Leifer, Joseph Leifer, Elishua Litle, Hannah Litle, Heidi Litle, Josiah Litle, Philip Litle, Shifra Miller, Bracha Milstein, Moshe Naimi, Phyllis Pam, Rivka Reena Pam, Rachel Potolski, Mendy Reinitz, Miriam Reinitz, Rivka Reinitz, Samuel Reinitz, Shmuel Reinitz, Yakov Reinitz, Yitzchok Reinitz, Avrohom D. Richter, Breina Richter, Miriam Leah Richter, Moshe Richter, Nechama Richter, Sara Malka Richter, Chaya Rosenberg, Raizel Shimon Leah Tauber, The Estate of Moshe Gottlieb, Ephraim Tita, Ezra Tita, Shoshana Tita, Ovadia Topporowitch, Yisrael Topporowitch, Yitzchak Topporowitch, Abraham Waxler, Arthur Waxler, Baruch Waxler, Chana Waxler, Dina Waxler, Ezekial Waxler, Gedalia Waxler, Haggi Waxler, Nachum Waxler, Obadiah Waxler, Yaakov Waxler, Yoel Waxler, Zacharia Waxler, Helen Weider, Bernice Wolf, Bryan Wolf and Stanley Wolf, FILED. Service date 04/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2543537] [19-865] [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:20 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 22 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G. and Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill, FILED. Service date 04/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2543379] [19-865] [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:08 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 21 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G. and Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill, FILED. Service date 04/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2543376] [19-865] [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:07 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Lyonnais S.A., FILED. Service date 04/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2540501] [19-865] [Entered: 04/15/2019 05:16 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Peter Raven-Hansen for Appellants Appellants Yehuda Toporowitch, David Kirshenbaum, Nevenka Gritz,Tamir Averbach, Shoshana Finer Ohana, et al., in case 19-865 , [ # 13 ], ADDED.[2540334] [19-865] [Entered: 04/15/2019 03:38 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Aaron A. Schlanger for Appellants Yehuda Toporowitch, David Kirshenbaum, Nevenka Gritz,Tamir Averbach, Shoshana Finer Ohana, et al., in case 19-865 , [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2540000] [19-865] [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:55 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Ari Ungar for Appellants Yehuda Toporowitch David Kirshenbaum Nevenka Gritz Tamir Averbach Shoshana Finer Ohana, et al., case 19-865 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2539972] [19-865] [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:50 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G., Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill, Appellee Credit Lyonnais S.A. and -- Gloria Kushner and Netanel Miller, FILED. Service date 04/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2539807] [19-865] [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:42 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G., Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill, Appellee Credit Lyonnais S.A. and -- Gloria Kushner and Netanel Miller, FILED. Service date 04/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2539801] [19-865] [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:40 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G., Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill, Appellee Credit Lyonnais S.A. and -- Gloria Kushner and Netanel Miller, FILED. Service date 04/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2539795] [19-865] [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:38 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach, Devir Averbach, Julie Averbach, Maida Averbach, Michael Averbach, Sean Averbach, Steven Averbach, Tamir Averbach, Doctor Katherine Baker, Anna Beer, Harry Leonard Beer, Chaya Beili, Clara Ben-Zaken Laser, Rebekah Blutstein, Doctor Richard Blutstein, Judith Buchman-Ziv, Shoshana Burgett, Estelle Carroll, Doctor Larry Carter, Jacqueline Chambers, Nilly Choman, Shaun Coffel, Richard Coffey, Daniel Cohen, Eli Cohen, Merav Cohen, Neta Nechama Cohen, Ora Cohen, Orly Cohen, Shira Cohen, Robert L Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., David Danzig, Hayyim Danzig, Neil Danzig, Rebecca Danzig, Sarah Danzig, Esther Deutsch, Ilana Eropa Dorfman, E.N.C., Sarah Elyakim, Roisie Engelman, Zohar Fater, Joshua Faudem, Bennett Finer, Paula Finer, Zev Finer, Chana Freedman, Gal Ganzman, Greta Geler, Eliezer Goldberg, Esther Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Goldberg, Yitzhak Goldberg, David Goldstein, Eugene Goldstein, Lorraine Goldstein, Michael Goldstein, Richard Goldstein, Temima Spetner Gould, Howard M. Green, Mina Dora Green, Steven Greenbaum, Nevenka Gritz, Levana Cohen Harooch, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Martin Herskovitz, Netanel Herskovitz, Pearl Herskovitz, Yaakov Herskovitz, Michal Honickman, Barbara Goldstein Ingardia, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum, David Kirshenbaum, Refael Kitsis an Rogen, Faiga Zvia Lieberman, Phyllis Maisel, Bruce Mazer, Arie Miller, Chaya Miller, Dianne Coulter Miller, David Nachenberg, Sara Nachenberg, Shaina Chava Nadel, Chana Nathansen, Matanya Nathansen, Shoshana Nathansen, Yehudit Nathansen, Avishag Noked, Baruch Zuri Noked, Binyamin Elkana Noked, Einat Noked, Eyal Noked, Shoshana Finer Ohana, Blumy Rom, Orly Rom, Alexander Rozenstein, Daniel Rozenstein, Esther Rozenstein, Eileen Sapadin, Julia Rozenstein Schon, Eric M. Singer, Judith Singer, Robert Singer, Sarri Anne Singer, Altea Steinherz, Jonathan Steinherz, Amichai Steinmetz, Deborah Steinmetz, Jacob Steinmetz, Natanel Steinmetz, Nava Steinmetz, Orit Steinmetz, Aaron Strauss, Blumy Strauss, Joseph Strauss, Moses Strauss, Philip Strauss, T.N., T.Y.G., Danielle Teitelbaum, David Toporowitch, Hezekial Toporowitch, Pearl B. Toporowitch, Rivka Toporowitch, Yehuda Toporowitch, Chana Weiss, Leib Weiss, Malka Weiss, Tzvi Weiss, Yeruchaim Weiss, Yitzchk Weiss, Y.M.G. and Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill, FILED. Service date 04/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2539792] [19-865] [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:36 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Gary M. Osen for Appellants Yehuda Toporowitch, David Kirshenbaum, Nevenka Gritz,Tamir Averbach, Shoshana Finer Ohana, et al., in case 19-865 , [ # 1 ], ADDED.[2539763] [19-865] [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:24 AM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2534207] [19-865] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:33 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2019, RECEIVED.[2534181] [19-865] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:26 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/31/2019, RECEIVED.[2534176] [19-865] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:25 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach Devir Averbach, et al, district court receipt # NYEDC11354511, FILED.[2534170] [19-865] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:23 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants A.N., Menache Agababa, Yehezkel Agababa, Yehuda Agababa, Gila Aluf, Akiva Anachovich, Adam Averbach, David Averbach Devir Averbach, et al., FILED. [2534157] [19-865] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Strauss v. Credit Lyonnais S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maida Averbach, for the Estate of David Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Phyllis Maisel
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven Greenbaum, for the Estate of Judith Greenbaum
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chaya Miller
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Goldstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lorraine Goldstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Aaron Strauss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alexander Rozenstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hezekial Toporowitch
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Refael Kitsis an Rogen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Blumy Rom
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jason Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Neil Danzig, for the Estate of Rebecca Danzig
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bruce Mazer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Altea Steinherz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ora Cohen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anna Beer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eric M. Singer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Julia Rozenstein Schon
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yehezkel Agababa
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Orit Steinmetz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph Strauss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Menache Agababa
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Blutstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Julie Averbach, for the Estate of Steven Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nava Steinmetz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mina Dora Green, for the Estate of Howard Green
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jacob Steinmetz, for the Estate of Amic Steinmetz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Greta Geler, as the Administrator of the Estate of Hannah Rogen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Faiga Zvia Lieberman
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Julie Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Arie Miller
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pearl B. Toporowitch
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Baruch Yehuda Ziv Brill
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: E.N.C., a minor
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shoshana Finer Ohana
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Natanel Steinmetz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Goldstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Kirshenbaum
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Neta Nechama Cohen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Howard M. Green
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Amichai Steinmetz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Judith Singer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bennett Finer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yitzchk Weiss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Roisie Engelman
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ilana Eropa Dorfman
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Orly Rom
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Esther Deutsch
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maida Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Daniel Rozenstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shoshana Nathansen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Moses Strauss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Adam Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yeruchaim Weiss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pearl Herskovitz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sara Nachenberg
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joshua Faudem
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Einat Noked, for the Estate of Eyal Noked
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shaina Chava Nadel
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eli Cohen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: T.Y.G., a minor
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jonathan Steinherz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chana Freedman
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shirlee Hayman
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert L. Coulter, Sr., for the Estate of Janis Ruth Coulter
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gila Aluf
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Martin Herskovitz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Blumy Strauss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Temima Spetner Gould
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Akiva Anachovich
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tzvi Weiss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eileen Sapadin
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Leib Weiss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Martin Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Deborah Steinmetz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nilly Choman
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Deborah Steinmetz, for the Estate of Amic Steinmetz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Coffey
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sean Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michal Honickman
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yehudit Nathansen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Judith Buchman-Ziv
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Levana Cohen Harooch
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sarah Danzig
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yehuda Agababa
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A.N., a minor
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Orly Cohen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yitzhak Goldberg
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Daniel Cohen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Esther Goldberg
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jacob Steinmetz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joshua Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Einat Noked
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Neil Danzig
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rebecca Danzig
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dianne Coulter Miller
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paula Finer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jacqueline Chambers, as the Administrator of the Estate of Esther Bablar
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chana Nathansen, for the Estate of Theilla Nathansen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Nachenberg
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Merav Cohen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eugene Goldstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shaun Coffel
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alan Hayman
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sarri Anne Singer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Karen Goldberg
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shoshana Burgett
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Goldstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Matanya Nathansen, for the Estate of Theilla Nathansen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nevenka Gritz, for the Estate of David Gritz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Avishag Noked
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chana Weiss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Harry Leonard Beer, as Executor of the Estate of Alan Beer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Devir Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nevenka Gritz, for the Estate of Norman Gritz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rebekah Blutstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Clara Ben-Zaken Laser
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Katherine Baker, for the Estate of Benjamin Blutstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Malka Weiss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Danzig
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Zohar Fater
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gal Ganzman
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bennett Finer, as Legal guardian for Chana Nachenberg
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Isabelle Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sarah Elyakim
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Toporowitch
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rivka Toporowitch
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Isabelle Kirschenbaum, for the Estate of Martin Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Philip Strauss
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Estelle Carroll
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tamir Averbach
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Esther Rozenstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Zev Finer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Greta Geler
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mina Dora Green
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eyal Noked
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chaya Beili
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yehuda Toporowitch
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michal Honickman, for the Estate of Howard Goldstein
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Singer
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Netanel Herskovitz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eliezer Goldberg
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shoshana Goldberg
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shira Cohen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paula Finer, as Legal guardian for Chana Nachenberg
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Baruch Zuri Noked
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Binyamin Elkana Noked
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Danielle Teitelbaum
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: T.N., a minor
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert L Coulter, Jr.
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hayyim Danzig
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yaakov Herskovitz
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Larry Carter, as the Administrator of the Estate of Diane Leslie Carter
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Barbara Goldstein Ingardia
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Y.M.G., a minor
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Michael Radine Esq.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen Esq.
Represented By: Aaron A. Schlanger Esq.
Represented By: Ari Ungar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hannah Litle
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Obadiah Waxler
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Abraham Zarkowsky
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chaya Rosenberg
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ezekial Waxler
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph Zarkowksy
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Estate of Yissocher Dov Reinitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tovi Horovitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Horovitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Estate of Foruk Naimi
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tovi Belle Applebaum
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Miriam Ehrenfeld
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yitzchok Richter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tvi Horovitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Geela Applebaum Gordon
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shlomo Chaim Richter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shoshana Tita
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Breina Richter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Arthur Waxler
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shlomo Tratner
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bracha Milstein
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bryan Wolf
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Menachem Freirmack
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Perl Brailofsky
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Avrohom D. Richter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dina Waxler
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shrage Zarkowsky
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Moshe Horovitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ariela Freirmark
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yaakov Waxler
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ezra Tita
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Trany Zarkowsky
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bernice Wolf, for the Estate of Debra Ruth Horovitz and the Estate of Eli Natan Horovitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shifra Miller
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Erik Schecter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Miriam Leah Richter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ezriel Zarkowsky
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gedalia Waxler
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yehudis Richter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Leah Horovitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yisroel Richter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Noah Litle
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yakov Yosef Richter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gittle Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Batsheva Horovitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph Leifer
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ari Horovitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Estate of Tiferet Tratner
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mendel Zarkowsky, individually and for the Estate of Eli Zarkowsky and for the Estate of Goldie Zarkowsky
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Natan Applebaum, for the Estate of David Applebaum and for the Estate of Naava Applebaum
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Uri Horovitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rachel Potolski
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Moshe Richter
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yitzchok Reinitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rivka Reena Pam
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Haggi Waxler
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chaya Freisel
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Aron Zarkowsky
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Malky Breuer
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Abraham Waxler
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yakov Reinitz
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [