In Re: Ja Qure Al-Bukhari
Petitioner: Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FKA Jerome Riddick
Respondent: Guimond, Lieutanant, Sandone, Correctional Officer, Jeremie St. Pierre, Daniel Phillips, Bogan, Individual and Official Capacities, Scott Erfe, Anne Cournoyer, Individual and Official Capacities, Kristin Carabine, Individual and Official Capacities, Rossini, Correctional Officer, William Mulligan, Warden, Individual and Official Capacities, Ryan Baron, Nancy Hill, Individual and Official Capacities, Jesse Johnson, Marc Congelos, Lieutanant and Scott Semple, Commissioner, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Case Number: 19-894
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 11 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Petitioner Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FILED.[2575513] [19-894] [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:10 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Petitioner Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FILED. Service date 05/08/2019 by US mail.[2575454] [19-894] [Entered: 05/30/2019 11:47 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent Ryan Baron, Bogan, Kristin Carabine, Marc Congelos, Anne Cournoyer, Scott Erfe, Guimond, Nancy Hill, Jesse Johnson, William Mulligan, Daniel Phillips, Rossini, Sandone, Scott Semple and Jeremie St. Pierre, FILED. Service date 05/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2554313] [19-894] [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:00 PM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [10], on behalf of Petitioner Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, copy to pro-se petitioner, FILED.[2554310] [19-894] [Entered: 05/02/2019 03:59 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE, to Respondents Ryan Baron, Bogan, Kristin Carabine, Marc Congelos, Anne Cournoyer, Scott Erfe, Guimond, Nancy Hill, Jesse Johnson, William Mulligan, Daniel Phillips, Rossini, Sandone, Scott Semple and Jeremie St. Pierre , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2552577] [19-894] [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:45 AM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Petitioner Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FILED. Service date 04/16/2019 by US mail.[2554306] [19-894] [Entered: 05/02/2019 03:58 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [2], on behalf of Petitioner Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, copy to pro-se petitioner, FILED.[2536025] [19-894] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:10 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR WRIT, SERVED. Service date 03/13/2019 by US mail.[2536014] [19-894] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:06 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2536006] [19-894] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:00 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Petitioner Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FILED. No Service date by US mail.[2536002] [19-894] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:00 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL PROCEEDING, PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, on behalf of Petitioner Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FILED.[2535992] [19-894] [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Ja Qure Al-Bukhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Guimond, Lieutanant
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sandone, Correctional Officer
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeremie St. Pierre
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Phillips
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bogan, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Erfe
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anne Cournoyer, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kristin Carabine, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rossini, Correctional Officer
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Mulligan, Warden, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ryan Baron
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nancy Hill, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jesse Johnson
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marc Congelos, Lieutanant
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Semple, Commissioner, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Represented By: James W. Caley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FKA Jerome Riddick
Represented By: Ja Qure Al-Bukhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?