Shaheed v. City of New York
Defendant: Police Officer William Morris, James Doe, New York City Police Detective (fictitious name); in an individual and official capacity, Police Officer Edward Birmingham, in an individual and official capacity, New York City Police Officer Awilda Melhado, Police Commissioner James O'Neill, Police Officer Antonio Rivera, Police Officer Fausto Pichardo, Police Officer Rodney Harrison, Police Officer Edward Saltman, Police Officer Alex Perez, Police Officer Robert Lukach, Police Officer Daniel Troyer, Police Officer John Essig, Police Officer Christopher Mitchell, Police Officer Timothy Wilson, Wilson Aramboles, New York City Police Deputy Inspector, in an individual and official capacity, Police Officer Kishon Hickman, Police Officer Hugh Mackenzie, John Doe, New York City Police Detective (fictitious name); in an individual and official capacity, Police Officer Ethan Erlich, Police Officer Charles Ewings, Police Officer Anthony Selvaggi, Police Officer Eric Pagan, Police Officer Andrew Capul, Police Officer Clifford Parks, Police Sergeant Medina, Police Officer Darren McNamara, Police Officer Henry Medina, Police Officer Marlon Larin, Jane Doe, New York City Police Officer (fictitious name); in an individual and official capacity and Police Officer Brian Franklin
Defendant / Appellee: Paul Bliss, New York City Police Officer; in an individual and official capacity, Jonathan Rodriguez, New York City Police Officer; in an individual and official capacity, Lydia Figueroa, New York City Police Officer; in an individual and official capacity, Stephan Kroski, New York City Police Officer; in an individual and official capacity and City of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Waheedah Shaheed
Case Number: 19-94
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Waheedah Shaheed, FILED. Service date 02/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2493221] [19-94] [Entered: 02/08/2019 04:48 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 CAPTION, John Doe, James Doe and Jane Doe designations have been changed to defendants only, AMENDED.[2486785] [19-94] [Entered: 01/31/2019 03:57 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Paul Bliss, City of New York, Lydia Figueroa, Stephan Kroski and Jonathan Rodriguez, informing the Court that Atty. Garman from NYC Law Department does not represent defendants John Doe, James Doe and Jane Doe. RECEIVED. Service date 01/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2485885] [19-94] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:23 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM C, [ # 8 ], [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellant Waheedah Shaheed, FILED.[2485809] [19-94] [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:55 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Waheedah Shaheed, FILED. Service date 01/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2483882] [19-94] [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:11 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Ashley R. Garman, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Zachary W. Carter, SUBSTITUTED.[2483138] [19-94] [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:16 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Paul Bliss, City of New York, Lydia Figueroa, Stephan Kroski and Jonathan Rodriguez, FILED. Service date 01/28/2019 by CM/ECF. [2483084] [19-94] [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:55 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 DISTRICT COURT ORDER denying IFP, dated 01/09/2019, RECEIVED.[2486769] [19-94] [Entered: 01/31/2019 03:51 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2483143] [19-94] [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:19 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE, to Appellee Paul Bliss, City of New York, James Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe, Lydia Figueroa, Stephan Kroski and Jonathan Rodriguez , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2482523] [19-94] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:55 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM C, [7], on behalf of Appellant Waheedah Shaheed, FILED.[2482517] [19-94] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:51 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Waheedah Shaheed, FILED. Service date 01/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2482130] [19-94] [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:12 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Waheedah Shaheed, FILED. Service date 01/24/2019 by CM/ECF.[2482046] [19-94] [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:46 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Waheedah Shaheed, FILED. Service date 01/24/2019 by CM/ECF.[2482038] [19-94] [Entered: 01/24/2019 07:23 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2472207] [19-94] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:15 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/29/2018, RECEIVED.[2472203] [19-94] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:13 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Waheedah Shaheed, FILED. [2472200] [19-94] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaheed v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer William Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Doe, New York City Police Detective (fictitious name); in an individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Edward Birmingham, in an individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Officer Awilda Melhado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Commissioner James O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Antonio Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Fausto Pichardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Rodney Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Edward Saltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Alex Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Robert Lukach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Daniel Troyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Christopher Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Timothy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Aramboles, New York City Police Deputy Inspector, in an individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Kishon Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Hugh Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, New York City Police Detective (fictitious name); in an individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Ethan Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Charles Ewings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Anthony Selvaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Eric Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Andrew Capul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Clifford Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Sergeant Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Darren McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Henry Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Marlon Larin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, New York City Police Officer (fictitious name); in an individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Brian Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul Bliss, New York City Police Officer; in an individual and official capacity
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jonathan Rodriguez, New York City Police Officer; in an individual and official capacity
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lydia Figueroa, New York City Police Officer; in an individual and official capacity
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephan Kroski, New York City Police Officer; in an individual and official capacity
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Waheedah Shaheed
Represented By: Lawrence P. LaBrew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?