Barnett, Jr. v. National Railroad Passenger Co
Defendant / Appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: Anthony J. Barnett, Jr.
Case Number: 19-96
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 30 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2513505] [19-96] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:05 AM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 27 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 26 ], on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED.[2506639] [19-96] [Entered: 02/27/2019 01:33 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by US mail.[2506405] [19-96] [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:44 AM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 25 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [24], on behalf of Appellant Anthony J. Barnett, Jr., FILED.[2505989] [19-96] [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:57 AM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by US mail.[2505333] [19-96] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:11 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 23 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [16] from the docket, FILED.[2504198] [19-96] [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:49 AM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Anthony J. Barnett, Jr., FILED. Service date 02/15/2019 by US mail.[2501836] [19-96] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:50 AM]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, dated 02/08/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/01/2019, unless Appellant Anthony J. Barnett, Jr., submits Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2492273] [19-96] [Entered: 02/08/2019 09:08 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 ADDRESS CHANGE REQUEST, dated 02/05/2019, COMPLETED.[2491059] [19-96] [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:09 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [16], on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED.[2491044] [19-96] [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:03 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED. Service date 01/29/2019 by US mail.[2490683] [19-96] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:38 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Anthony J. Barnett, Jr., FILED. Service date 02/04/2019 by US mail.[2490513] [19-96] [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:21 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, William H. Ng for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, in case 19-96, [ # 12 ], ADDED.[2484576] [19-96] [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:05 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED. Service date 01/29/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2484466] [19-96] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:06 PM]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 01/28/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/11/2019, unless Appellant Anthony Barnett, Jr., submits the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2483160] [19-96] [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:27 AM]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 01/28/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/11/2019, unless Appellant Anthony J. Barnett, Jr., submits Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2483147] [19-96] [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:21 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE, to Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2482468] [19-96] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:10 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Anthony J. Barnett, Jr., district court receipt # 465401226014, FILED.[2472245] [19-96] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:43 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2476279] [19-96] [Entered: 01/16/2019 11:01 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2472240] [19-96] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:40 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2472230] [19-96] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:35 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/10/2018, RECEIVED.[2472229] [19-96] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:34 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Anthony Barnett, Jr., FILED. [2472225] [19-96] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett, Jr. v. National Railroad Passenger Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: William H. Ng Esq.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anthony J. Barnett, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony J. Barnett Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?