In re: 650 Fifth Avenue and Re
Plaintiff: Renay Frym, Abraham Mendelson and Stuart E. Hersh
Defendant: All Right, Title And Interest In 4836 Marconi Avenue, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4836 Marconi Avenue, Carmichael, California 95608, with all improvements and attachments thereon, All Right Title And Interest In 55-11 Queens Boulevard, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 55-11 Queens Boulevard, Queens, New York 11377, Block 1325 Lots 1,6,7 and 8 with all improvements and attachments, Bank Melli Iran in 650 Fifth Avenue Company, including but not limited to the Real Estate Property and Appurtenances located at 650 Fifth Avenue, New York, New York, with all improvements and attachments thereon, All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 725700280, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto, All Right Title And Interest of Assa Corporation, All right title and interest of Assa Corporation, Assa Company Limited, Bank Melli Iran, and the Alavi Foundation in 650 Fifth Avenue Company, including but not limited to the real property and appurt, All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 2724409590, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto, All Funds On Deposit At Sterling National Bank, All funds on deposit at Sterling National Bank in account number 3802032216 held in the name of Alavi Foundation and all funds traceable thereto, All Right, Title, and Interest of ASSA Corporation, All Right Titile And Interest In 2313 South Voss Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 2313 South Voss Road, Houston, Texas 77057, with all improvements and attachments thereon, All Funds On Deposit At Sterling National Bank, All funds on deposit at Sterling National Bank in account number 3852524414 held in the name of Alavi Foundation and all funds traceable thereto, All Right, Title, And Interest In 4300 Aldie Road, All right, title, and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4300 Aldie Road, Catharpin, Virginia 20143-1133, All Funds On Deposit At Sterling National Bank, All funds on deposit at Sterling National Bank in account number 3802032201 held in the name of Alavi Foundation and all funds traceable thereto, All Right Title And Interest In 650 Fifth Avenue, All right title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 650 Fifth Avenue, New York, New York with all improvements and attachments thereon, Alavi Foundation of New York, All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A., New York, New York, in Account Number 78429712, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto, All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A., 888165552, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto, All Right, Title And Interest In 8100 Jeb Stuart Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 8100 Jeb Stuart Road, Rockville Maryland 20854, with all improvements and attachments thereon, All Right, Title And Interest In 4204 Aldie Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4204 Aldie Road, Catharpin, Virginia 20143-1133 with all improvements and attachments thereon, All Funds On Deposit At JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., ank, N.A. in account number 230484476 held in the name of 650 Fifth Avenue Company and all funds traceable theretoAll funds on deposit at JPMorgan Chase B, All Right, Title And Interest In 7917 Montrose Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 7917 Montrose Road, Rockville, Maryland 20854, with all improvements and attachments thereon and All Funds On Deposit At JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., All funds on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in account number 230484468, held in the name of 650 Fifth Avenue Company, and all funds traceable thereto
Claimant: Estate of Laura E. Johnson, Estate of Brian McVeigh, Jonica L. Woody, Babak Bayani, Devon Marie Rodak, Ibis S. Haun, Michele Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Borcyczewski,, FuMei Chien, Ellen L. Saracini, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Victor Saracini, Bridget Brooks, Stephen L. Cartledge, Alice Carpeneto, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Hui-Chuan Jian, Paul D. Fennig, Estate of Nancy R. Kitson, Mark Fenning, Russa Steiner, individually and on behalf of the Estate of William R. Steiner, Joanne M. Renzi, on behalf of the Estate of Anne C. Saracini, Joanne Lovett, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Brian Nunez, Brianna L. Gomes, on behalf of the Estate of Doyle Raymond Ward, Estate of Millard D. Campbell, Haomin Jian, Martin Panik, Christine Barton-Pence, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Dolores Caproni, Rodney Ratchford, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Marsha Dianah Ratchford, Daniel D. Coffey, M.D., Shyrl L. Johnson, Estate of Kenneth V. Welch, Steven M. Greenbaum, on his own behalf and as Administrator of the Estate of Judith (Shoshana) Lilian Greenbaum, George Stergiopoulos, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Andrew Stergiopoulos, Corazon Fernandez, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Judy Fernandez,, Joslin Zeplin, Linda Sammut, on behalf of the Estate of Stephen Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Morris Dorf,, Keith A. Bradkowski, on behalf of the Estate of Jeffrey Collman,, Paul Blais, Craig M. Hegna, Charles Collman, Teresanne Lostrangio, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Joseph Lostrangio,, Leona Zeplin, Alan D. Hayman, Diane Ognibene, on behalf of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Thaddeus C. Fennig, Diane Ognibene, on behalf of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene,, Michael Caproni, Leonard Zeplin, Rodney Ratchford, for the benefit of Maranda C.Ratchford, Hui-Zhon Jian, Marie Ann Paprocki, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Dennis Lavelle,, Expedito Santillian, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Maria Theresa Santillian, Elizabeth Rich, as Executrix of the Estate of Irving Franklin, and as Executrix of the Estate of Irma Franklin, David Kirschenbaum, Hui-Chien Jian, Judith Reiss, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Joshua Scott Reiss, Ralph S. Maerz, Christopher Welch, Edwena R. Hegna, Executrix of the Estate of Charles Hegna, Angela Stergiopoulos, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Andrew Stergiopoulos, Loisanne Diehl, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Diehl, Thomas Morgera, Jessica F. Lester, Lewis W. Cartrette, Patricia Milano, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Peter T. Milano, Maria Regina Merwin, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Ronald Gamboa,, Tara Bane, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael A. Bane, Senator Haun, Frances M. Coffey, individually and on behalf of the Estates of Daniel M. Coffey and Jason Coffey,, William Adams, Patricia J. Perry, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John William Perry, Paul B. Hegna, Carlos Acosta, on his own behalf and as Fiduciary of the Estate of Maria Acosta),, Curtis Taylor, Christine Papasso, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Salvatore T. Papasso,, Michael Paige, on behalf of the Estate of Timothy Raymond Ward, Krystyna Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Martin Boryczewski,, Estate of Brent E. Marthaler, Martin Panik, on behalf of the Estate of Linda Ellen Panik, Diane Romero, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Elvin Romero, Milagritos Perez-Dalis, Ivy Moreno, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Yvette Nichole Moreno,, Estate of Michael Heiser, Betty Welch, Francis Heiser, Huichun Jian, Katie L. Marthaler, Estate of Kendall K. Kitson, Sr., Livia Chirchirillo, Christina Bane-Hayes, Shirlee Hayman, Helen Rosenthal, Lynn Marie Hegna Moore, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Fiona Havlish, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Donald G. Havlish, Jr.,, Matthew Marthaler, James R. Rimkus, Estate of Gary Heiser, Kathleen M. Wood, Steven A. Hegna, Diana Campuzano, Michael T. Adams, Raymond A. Smith, Jr., on behalf of the Estate of George Eric Smith, Ronald S. Sloan, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Paul K. Sloan, Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus, Stephanie Giglio, on behalf of the Estate of Roni Levine, Susan Conklin, on behalf of the Estate of Donald Havlish, Sr., Ed Russin, Alexander Rowe, Joyce Louis Leydet, Timothy Woody, Alan Gu, Ethel J. Griffin, as Administratrix of the Estate of Binyamin Kahane, Harry Beer, on his own behalf and as administrator of the Estate of Alan Beer and as Administrator of the Estate of Anna Beer, Lawrence E. Taylor, Joan E. Tino, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Jennifer Tino, Christopher Caproni, Anne M. Rimkus, Estate of Justin R. Wood, Clara Chirchirillo, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Peter Chirchirillo, Stephanie Giglio, on behalf of the Estate of Robert Levine, Mary Young, Phyllis Maisel, Robert Dorf, Loren Rosenthal, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Richard Rosenthal, Fatemeh Bayani, Herman C. Marthaler, III, 650 Fifth Avenue Company, Alavi Foundation, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Nicholas A. Johnson, Estate of William R. Higgins, Ramon Melendez, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Mary Melendez, Margaret Mauro, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Dorothy Mauro, James V. Wetmore, Steve K. Kitson, Baruch Kahane, Estate of Sharon Marthaler, Tracy M. Smith, Marshee R. Ratchford, Avi Elishis, Estelle Carroll, Che G. Colson, Starlina D. Taylor, Michelle Dorf, Individually, and on behalf of the Estate of Stephen Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Morris Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Anne Marie Dorf, Maureen R. Halvorson, individually and on behalf of the Estate of James D. Halvorson, Cielito Valencia, George Beekman, Grace M. Parkinson-Godshalk, individually and on behalf of the Estate of William R. Godshalk,, Maria Taylor, Brian Welch, Catherine Fennig, Cecil H. Lester, Jason Kirschenbaum, Paul Schertzer, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Scott Schertzer, Bernadine R. Beekman, Dawn Woody, Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen, Chrislan Fuller Manuel, on behalf of the Estate of Meta Waller,, Shawn M. Wood, Daniel Adams, Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor, Linda Welch, Judy Lester, Brian Collman, Brenda Sorenson, Raymond Smith, Sr., Kevin Johnson, Jr., Bessie A. Campbell, Denise M. Eichstaedt, Pamela Schiele, ASSA Co., Ltd., Grace Kneski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Steven Cafiero,, Barry Russin, Katherine Soulas, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, John Rodak, The Estate of Cipporah Kaplan, Elizabeth Wolf, Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,, Banafsheh Bayani, Bruce Johnson, Mary Lynn-Anna Panik Stanley, Kevin M. Coffey, Estate of Peter J. Morgera, Julia Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Borcyczewski,, Regina Rodak, Joanne Rodak Gori, Arline Peabody Bane, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Martin Boryczewski,, Rodney M. Ratchford, Gloria Russin, Chad Holland, Joyce Ann Rodak, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John M. Rodak, Kirk Marthaler, William Havlish, Catherine Adams, Leland Timothy Haun, Leslie Coale Brown, on behalf of the Estate of Jeffrey Coale, Gregg Salzman, Christopher R. Nguyen, Estate of Donna Holland, Richard A. Caproni, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Richard M. Caproni, Marie R. Campbell, Robin L. Higgins, Jin Liu, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Liming Gu, Tova Ettinger, Sandra Straub, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Edward W. Straub, Nancy A. Kitson, Joseph Dorf, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Anne Marie Dorf, Islamic Education Center of Maryland, Gerald W. Bingham, Michael Morgera, Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore, Ester Santillian, James Holland, Tina Grazioso, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John Grazioso,, Norman Kahane, on his own behalf and as Executor of the Estate of Sonia Kahane, Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr., Deborah D. Peterson, as the Personal Representative for the Estate of James C. Knipple, Michael Welch, Estate of Joshua E. Woody, Anthony W. Cartrette, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, on her own behalf and as Executrix of the Estate of Martin Kirschenbaum,, Vicki L. Taylor, Dwayne W. Collman, Richard Brewer, Joanne M. Renzi, ASSA Corporation, Patrick D. Adams, John E. Adams, Catherine Deblieck, Estate of Kevin J. Johnson, Gerard Welch, Estate of Christopher Adams, Michael Loguidice, Lisa Caproni-Brown, Cecil H. Lester, Jr., Estate of Christopher Lester, Libby Kahane, on her own behalf and as Administratrix of the Estate of Meir Kahane, Danielle Teitlebaum, Bonnie Bayani-Christopher, Personal Representative of the Estate of Siavish Bayani and Deborah D. Peterson, as the Personal Representative for the Estate of James C. Knipple, and all parties listed below as Plaintiff Judgment Creditors
Plaintiff / Appellee: Tzvi Rozenman, Jenny Rubin, United States of America, Deborah Rubin, Noam Rozenman, Elena Rozenman, Daniel Miller, Irving Franklin and Maria Acosta
Appellee: Richard W. Wood
Trustee: Kathleen A. Roberts
Case Number: 20-1212
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 9, 2021 Summary In Re: 650 Fifth Avenue Co. & Related Properties

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 202 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2977778] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 11/19/2020 09:17 AM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 198 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 11/18/2020, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2977499] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:53 PM]
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER, reinstating appeal, FILED.[2977485] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:51 PM]
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER, to recall mandate, FILED.[2977476] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:47 PM]
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER, dated 11/18/2020, reinstating the appeal to this panel, by BDP, DC, J. RESTANI, FILED.[2977470] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:44 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 191 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, re: restoring jurisdiction, RECEIVED. Service date 10/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2965043] [20-1212] [Entered: 10/30/2020 06:05 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 190 ATTORNEY, Pamela S. Takefman, for Appellees Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum, TERMINATED.[2948935] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:20 AM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 189 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum, re: attorney withdrawal, RECEIVED. Service date 10/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2948601] [20-1212]--[Edited 10/09/2020 by AJ] [Entered: 10/08/2020 08:43 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 186 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 10/07/2020, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2947263] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:56 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 185 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 10/07/2020, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2947255] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:54 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 184 APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 10/07/2020, REMANDED.[2947250] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:51 PM]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER, dated 10/07/2020, remanding this matter to the district court for further proceedings, by BDP, DC, J. RESTANI FILED.[2947243] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:48 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 182 NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2947222] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:33 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 180 CASE, before BDP, DC, J. RESTANI, HEARD.[2944872] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:34 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 179 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/21/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2935221] [20-1212] [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:44 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 09/21/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2935134] [20-1212] [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:59 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 177 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum, FILED. Service date 09/16/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2932536] [20-1212] [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:38 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 176 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 09/16/2020, to SDNY (New York City), ISSUED.[2932221] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 09/16/2020 01:14 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 175 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant-cross-Appellees motion for stay pending appeal is GRANTED until October 5, 2020, when the matter will be further discussed at oral argument., FILED.[2931984] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 09/16/2020 10:37 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 174 ATTORNEY, Noelle E. Lyle for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1212 Noelle E. Lyle for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1265, [ # 173 ], ADDED.[2929178] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:00 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2929137] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 09/11/2020 02:36 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 172 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2928871] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 09/11/2020 12:26 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 169 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 166 ], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 09/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2926002][169] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 09/08/2020 08:55 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 166 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to stay [ # 162 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 08/31/2020 by CM/ECF. [2920413] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:10 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 162 MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 08/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2913238] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 08/20/2020 03:12 PM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 161 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 10/05/2020, SET.[2908157] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 08/14/2020 10:52 AM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 157 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2894937] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:04 AM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 153 ATTORNEY, Tara Norris for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1212 Tara Norris for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1265 , [ # 152 ], [ # 2888292-2 ], ADDED.[2888627] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 07/21/2020 09:15 AM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 07/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2888286] [20-1212] [Entered: 07/20/2020 03:33 PM]
July 16, 2020 Filing 149 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 10/05/2020, PROPOSED.[2886631] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 07/16/2020 04:56 PM]
July 16, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental appendix [ # 143 ] filed by Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. [2885916][148] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 07/16/2020 10:23 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 145 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 07/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2885361] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:58 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 144 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 07/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2885360] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:57 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 143 MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 07/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2885355] [20-1265, 20-1212] [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:54 PM]
July 2, 2020 Filing 138 LETTER, on behalf of Appellees Lynn Marie Hegna Moore, Craig M. Hegna, Edwena R. Hegna, Paul B. Hegna and Steven A. Hegna, informing Court that they will not be filing a brief or joining in on another brief, RECEIVED. Service date 07/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2876979] [20-1212] [Entered: 07/02/2020 06:51 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 137 ATTORNEYS, Dale K. Cathell, Kristy N. Grace, and Richard M. Kremen, for Estate of Donna Holland, Estate of William R. Higgins, Robin L. Higgins, Chad Holland, and James Holland [ # 125 ], TERMINATED.[2875668] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 07/01/2020 02:57 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 136 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lynn Marie Hegna Moore, Craig M. Hegna, Edwena R. Hegna, Paul B. Hegna and Steven A. Hegna, FILED. Service date 07/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2875611] [20-1212] [Entered: 07/01/2020 02:21 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 134 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Daniel S. Ruzumna for Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 06/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2873388] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:50 PM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 132 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Patrick Petrocelli, Esq. for Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF. [2871738] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/26/2020 10:49 AM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 130 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Daniel Marc Tracer, Esq. for Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, Attorney Mr. Daniel Marc Tracer, Esq. for Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2871429] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/25/2020 08:49 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental appendix [ # 105 ] filed by Appellees David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, Steven M. Greenbaum, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Ethel J. Griffin, Norman Kahane, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Danielle Teitlebaum and Joshua J. Kirschenbaum in 20-1212, FILED. [2870477][127] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/25/2020 08:42 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 125 LETTER, on behalf of Appellees Catherine Adams, Daniel Adams, John E. Adams, Michael T. Adams, Patrick D. Adams, William Adams, Bernadine R. Beekman, George Beekman, Bridget Brooks, Bessie A. Campbell, Marie R. Campbell, Anthony W. Cartrette, Lewis W. Cartrette, Che G. Colson, Denise M. Eichstaedt, Estate of Brent E. Marthaler, Estate of Brian McVeigh, Estate of Christopher Adams, Estate of Christopher Lester, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Estate of Gary Heiser, Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor, Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus, Estate of Joshua E. Woody, Estate of Justin R. Wood, Estate of Kendall K. Kitson, Sr., Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr., Estate of Kevin J. Johnson, Estate of Laura E. Johnson, Estate of Michael Heiser, Estate of Millard D. Campbell, Estate of Nancy R. Kitson, Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,, Estate of Peter J. Morgera, Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore, Estate of Sharon Marthaler, Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen, Catherine Fennig, Paul D. Fennig, Thaddeus C. Fennig, Mark Fenning, Ibis S. Haun, Leland Timothy Haun, Senator Haun, Francis Heiser, Bruce Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Jr., Nicholas A. Johnson, Shyrl L. Johnson, Nancy A. Kitson, Steve K. Kitson, Cecil H. Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Jr., Jessica F. Lester, Judy Lester, Herman C. Marthaler, III, Katie L. Marthaler, Kirk Marthaler, Matthew Marthaler, Michael Morgera, Thomas Morgera, Christopher R. Nguyen, Milagritos Perez-Dalis, Anne M. Rimkus, James R. Rimkus, Tracy M. Smith, Lawrence E. Taylor, Starlina D. Taylor, Vicki L. Taylor, James V. Wetmore, Elizabeth Wolf, Kathleen M. Wood, Shawn M. Wood, Dawn Woody, Jonica L. Woody, Timothy Woody and Mary Young, informing Court that law firm does not represent Estate of Donna Holland, Estate of William R. Higgins, Robin L. Higgins, Chad Holland, and James Holland, RECEIVED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2870206] [20-1212] [Entered: 06/24/2020 03:55 PM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE, to Appellees Paul Blais, Estate of Kenneth V. Welch, Craig M. Hegna, Edwena R. Hegna, Paul B. Hegna, Steven A. Hegna, Lynn Marie Hegna Moore, Curtis Taylor, Maria Taylor, Cielito Valencia, Betty Welch, Brian Welch, Christopher Welch, Gerard Welch, Linda Welch and Michael Welch in 20-1212, for failure to file a brief, SENT.[2867131] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/22/2020 10:26 AM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 121 ATTORNEY, Richard Marc Kremen for Milagritos Perez-Dalis Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore Estate of Christopher Lester Estate of Michael Heiser Shyrl L. Johnson Kevin Johnson Jr. Estate of Kendall Kitson Jr. Nicholas A. Johnson Steve K. Kitson Thaddeus C. Fennig Elizabeth Wolf Catherine Fennig Lewis W. Cartrette James V. Wetmore Paul D. Fennig Leland Timothy Haun Francis Heiser Tracy M. Smith Marie R. Campbell Timothy Woody Nancy A. Kitson Anne M. Rimkus Anthony W. Cartrette Estate of Sharon Marthaler Christopher R. Nguyen Cecil H. Lester Jr. Estate of Kevin J. Johnson Richard W. Wood Che G. Colson Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus Estate of Justin R. Wood Bridget Brooks Thomas Morgera Mary Young Dawn Woody William Adams Michael T. Adams Patrick D. Adams Estate of Nancy R. Kitson Estate of Kendall K. Kitson Sr. Estate of Gary Heiser James R. Rimkus Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor Estate of Brent E. Marthaler Estate of Joshua E. Woody Matthew Marthaler Daniel Adams Kathleen M. Wood Katie L. Marthaler Bernadine R. Beekman Catherine Adams Jonica L. Woody Cecil H. Lester Judy Lester Estate of Millard D. Campbell Bruce Johnson Denise M. Eichstaedt Senator Haun Estate of Brian McVeigh Jessica F. Lester Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr. Shawn M. Wood Vicki L. Taylor Estate of Laura E. Johnson Estate of Christopher Adams Mark Fenning George Beekman Estate of Peter J. Morgera Estate of Patrick P. Fennig, Starlina D. Taylor Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen Herman C. Marthaler III Michael Morgera John E. Adams Lawrence E. Taylor Bessie A. Campbell Kirk Marthaler, in case 20-1212 , [ # 118 ], ADDED.[2867003] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/22/2020 09:04 AM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 120 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Catherine Adams, Daniel Adams, John E. Adams, Michael T. Adams, Patrick D. Adams, William Adams, Bernadine R. Beekman, George Beekman, Bridget Brooks, Bessie A. Campbell, Marie R. Campbell, Anthony W. Cartrette, Lewis W. Cartrette, Che G. Colson, Denise M. Eichstaedt, Estate of Brent E. Marthaler, Estate of Brian McVeigh, Estate of Christopher Adams, Estate of Christopher Lester, Estate of Donna Holland, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Estate of Gary Heiser, Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor, Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus, Estate of Joshua E. Woody, Estate of Justin R. Wood, Estate of Kendall K. Kitson, Sr., Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr., Estate of Kevin J. Johnson, Estate of Laura E. Johnson, Estate of Michael Heiser, Estate of Millard D. Campbell, Estate of Nancy R. Kitson, Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,, Estate of Peter J. Morgera, Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore, Estate of Sharon Marthaler, Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen, Estate of William R. Higgins, Catherine Fennig, Paul D. Fennig, Thaddeus C. Fennig, Mark Fenning, Ibis S. Haun, Leland Timothy Haun, Senator Haun, Francis Heiser, Robin L. Higgins, Chad Holland, James Holland, Bruce Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Jr., Nicholas A. Johnson, Shyrl L. Johnson, Nancy A. Kitson, Steve K. Kitson, Cecil H. Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Jr., Judy Lester, Herman C. Marthaler, III, Katie L. Marthaler, Kirk Marthaler, Matthew Marthaler, Michael Morgera, Thomas Morgera, Christopher R. Nguyen, Milagritos Perez-Dalis, Anne M. Rimkus, James R. Rimkus, Tracy M. Smith, Lawrence E. Taylor, Starlina D. Taylor, Vicki L. Taylor, James V. Wetmore, Elizabeth Wolf, Kathleen M. Wood, Richard W. Wood, Shawn M. Wood, Dawn Woody, Jonica L. Woody, Timothy Woody and Mary Young, joining Appellee's brief filed at entry no. 109, RECEIVED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2866806] [20-1212] [Entered: 06/19/2020 05:47 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 119 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Estate of Donna Holland, Estate of William R. Higgins, Catherine Fennig, Paul D. Fennig, Thaddeus C. Fennig, Mark Fenning, Robin L. Higgins, Chad Holland, James Holland, Kirk Marthaler, Starlina D. Taylor and Jonica L. Woody, joining Appellee's brief filed at entry no. 109, RECEIVED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2866805] [20-1212] [Entered: 06/19/2020 05:35 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Estate of Michael Heiser, Estate of Gary Heiser, Francis Heiser, Leland Timothy Haun, Ibis S. Haun, Senator Haun, Estate of Justin R. Wood, Milagritos Perez-Dalis, Richard W. Wood, Kathleen M. Wood, Shawn M. Wood, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Denise M. Eichstaedt, Anthony W. Cartrette, Lewis W. Cartrette, Estate of Brian McVeigh, Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore, James V. Wetmore, Estate of Millard D. Campbell, Marie R. Campbell, Bessie A. Campbell, Estate of Kevin J. Johnson, Shyrl L. Johnson, Che G. Colson, Kevin Johnson, Jr., Nicholas A. Johnson, Estate of Laura E. Johnson, Bruce Johnson, Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus, Bridget Brooks, James R. Rimkus, Anne M. Rimkus, Estate of Brent E. Marthaler, Katie L. Marthaler, Estate of Sharon Marthaler, Herman C. Marthaler, III, Matthew Marthaler, Kirk Marthaler, Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen, Christopher R. Nguyen, Estate of Joshua E. Woody, Dawn Woody, Bernadine R. Beekman, George Beekman, Tracy M. Smith, Jonica L. Woody, Timothy Woody, Michael Morgera, Thomas Morgera, Estate of Kendall K. Kitson, Sr., Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr., Estate of Nancy R. Kitson, Estate of Peter J. Morgera, Steve K. Kitson, Nancy A. Kitson, Estate of Christopher Adams, Catherine Adams, John E. Adams, Patrick D. Adams, Michael T. Adams, Daniel Adams, Mary Young, Elizabeth Wolf, William Adams, Estate of Christopher Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Jr., Judy Lester, Jessica F. Lester, Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor, Lawrence E. Taylor, Vicki L. Taylor, Starlina D. Taylor, Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,, Thaddeus C. Fennig, Catherine Fennig, Paul D. Fennig and Mark Fenning, FILED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2866800] [20-1212] [Entered: 06/19/2020 05:28 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 117 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Arline Peabody Bane, Christina Bane-Hayes, Christine Barton-Pence, Gerald W. Bingham, Julia Boryczewski, Krystyna Boryczewski, Michele Boryczewski, Keith A. Bradkowski, Leslie Coale Brown, Christopher Caproni, Dolores Caproni, Michael Caproni, Richard A. Caproni, Lisa Caproni-Brown, Alice Carpeneto, Stephen L. Cartledge, FuMei Chien, Clara Chirchirillo, Livia Chirchirillo, Doctor Daniel D. Coffey, Frances M. Coffey, Kevin M. Coffey, Brian Collman, Charles Collman, Dwayne W. Collman, Susan Conklin, Catherine Deblieck, Loisanne Diehl, Joseph Dorf, Michelle Dorf, Robert Dorf, Corazon Fernandez, Stephanie Giglio, Stephanie Giglio, Brianna L. Gomes, Joanne Rodak Gori, Tina Grazioso, Alan Gu, Maureen R. Halvorson, Fiona Havlish, William Havlish, Haomin Jian, Hui-Chien Jian, Hui-Chuan Jian, Hui-Zhon Jian, Huichun Jian, Grace Kneski, Jin Liu, Michael Loguidice, Teresanne Lostrangio, Joanne Lovett, Ralph S. Maerz, Chrislan Fuller Manuel, Margaret Mauro, Ramon Melendez, Maria Regina Merwin, Patricia Milano, Ivy Moreno, Diane Ognibene, Diane Ognibene, Michael Paige, Mary Lynn-Anna Panik Stanley, Martin Panik, Martin Panik, Christine Papasso, Marie Ann Paprocki, Grace M. Parkinson-Godshalk, Patricia J. Perry, Marshee R. Ratchford, Rodney Ratchford, Rodney Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Judith Reiss, Joanne M. Renzi, Joanne M. Renzi, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, John Rodak, Joyce Ann Rodak, Regina Rodak, Diane Romero, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal, Alexander Rowe, Barry Russin, Ed Russin, Gloria Russin, Linda Sammut, Ester Santillian, Expedito Santillian, Ellen L. Saracini, Paul Schertzer, Pamela Schiele, Ronald S. Sloan, Raymond A. Smith, Jr., Raymond Smith, Sr., Brenda Sorenson, Katherine Soulas, Russa Steiner, Angela Stergiopoulos, George Stergiopoulos, Sandra Straub, Joan E. Tino, Joslin Zeplin, Leona Zeplin and Leonard Zeplin, joining Appellee's brief filed at entry no. 109, RECEIVED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2866586] [20-1212] [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:53 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 116 LETTER, on behalf of Appellees Deborah D. Peterson, et al., joining Appellee's brief filed at entry no. 109, RECEIVED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2866525] [20-1212] [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:13 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 115 LETTER, on behalf of Appellees Renay Frym, Stuart E. Hersh, Abraham Mendelson, Daniel Miller, Daniel Miller, Elena Rozenman, Noam Rozenman, Tzvi Rozenman, Deborah Rubin and Jenny Rubin, joining Appellee's brief filed at entry no. 109, RECEIVED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2866165] [20-1212] [Entered: 06/19/2020 10:29 AM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 110 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2862616] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/15/2020 07:56 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 109 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Danielle Teitlebaum, Phyllis Maisel, and Elizabeth Rich in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2862615] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/15/2020 07:54 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 108 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2861917] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:36 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 107 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2861906] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:31 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Harry Beer, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum and Danielle Teitlebaum, FILED. Service date 06/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2860567] [20-1212] [Entered: 06/12/2020 11:09 AM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 104 ATTORNEY, Thomas McKay for United States of America, in case 20-1212 Thomas McKay for United States of America, in case 20-1265 , [ # 103 ], ADDED.[2856822] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:25 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 06/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2856643] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/08/2020 01:50 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 97 ATTORNEY, Diana Marie Conner, Melissa Ginsberg for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1212 Diana Marie Conner, Melissa Ginsberg for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1265, [ # 95 ], [ # 2839659-2 ], [ # 96 ], [ # 2839667-2 ], ADDED.[2839746] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/14/2020 04:07 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 05/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2839661] [20-1212] [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:26 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 05/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2839657] [20-1212] [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:23 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 88 CURED DEFECTIVE Brief and Appendix [ # 28 ], [ # 82 ], [ # 83 ], [ # 84 ], [ # 85 ], on behalf of Appellants 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED.[2838857] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:01 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 85 APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 301-466), on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836482] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:22 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 84 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836477] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:21 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 83 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836473] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:18 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 82 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836472] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:17 PM]
May 5, 2020 Filing 80 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Arline Peabody Bane, Christina Bane-Hayes, Christine Barton-Pence, Gerald W. Bingham, Julia Boryczewski, Krystyna Boryczewski, Michele Boryczewski, Keith A. Bradkowski, Leslie Coale Brown, Christopher Caproni, Dolores Caproni, Michael Caproni, Richard A. Caproni, Lisa Caproni-Brown, Alice Carpeneto, Stephen L. Cartledge, FuMei Chien, Clara Chirchirillo, Livia Chirchirillo, Doctor Daniel D. Coffey, Frances M. Coffey, Kevin M. Coffey, Brian Collman, Charles Collman, Dwayne W. Collman, Susan Conklin, Catherine Deblieck, Loisanne Diehl, Joseph Dorf, Michelle Dorf, Robert Dorf, Corazon Fernandez, Stephanie Giglio, Stephanie Giglio, Brianna L. Gomes, Joanne Rodak Gori, Tina Grazioso, Alan Gu, Maureen R. Halvorson, Fiona Havlish, William Havlish, Haomin Jian, Hui-Chien Jian, Hui-Chuan Jian, Hui-Zhon Jian, Huichun Jian, Grace Kneski, Jin Liu, Michael Loguidice, Teresanne Lostrangio, Joanne Lovett, Ralph S. Maerz, Chrislan Fuller Manuel, Margaret Mauro, Ramon Melendez, Maria Regina Merwin, Patricia Milano, Ivy Moreno, Diane Ognibene, Diane Ognibene, Michael Paige, Mary Lynn-Anna Panik Stanley, Martin Panik, Martin Panik, Christine Papasso, Marie Ann Paprocki, Grace M. Parkinson-Godshalk, Patricia J. Perry, Marshee R. Ratchford, Rodney Ratchford, Rodney Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Judith Reiss, Joanne M. Renzi, Joanne M. Renzi, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, John Rodak, Joyce Ann Rodak, Regina Rodak, Diane Romero, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal, Alexander Rowe, Barry Russin, Ed Russin, Gloria Russin, Linda Sammut, Ester Santillian, Expedito Santillian, Ellen L. Saracini, Paul Schertzer, Pamela Schiele, Ronald S. Sloan, Raymond A. Smith, Jr., Raymond Smith, Sr., Brenda Sorenson, Katherine Soulas, Russa Steiner, Angela Stergiopoulos, George Stergiopoulos, Sandra Straub, Joan E. Tino, Joslin Zeplin, Leona Zeplin and Leonard Zeplin, FILED. Service date 05/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2832499] [20-1212] [Entered: 05/05/2020 04:10 PM]
May 5, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE, to Appellees Arline Peabody Bane, Christina Bane-Hayes, Christine Barton-Pence, Gerald W. Bingham, Paul Blais, Julia Boryczewski, Krystyna Boryczewski, Michele Boryczewski, Keith A. Bradkowski, Leslie Coale Brown, Christopher Caproni, Dolores Caproni, Michael Caproni, Richard A. Caproni, Lisa Caproni-Brown, Alice Carpeneto, Stephen L. Cartledge, FuMei Chien, Clara Chirchirillo, Livia Chirchirillo, Doctor Daniel D. Coffey, Frances M. Coffey, Kevin M. Coffey, Brian Collman, Charles Collman, Dwayne W. Collman, Susan Conklin, Catherine Deblieck, Loisanne Diehl, Joseph Dorf, Michelle Dorf, Robert Dorf, Estate of Donna Holland, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Estate of Kenneth V. Welch, Estate of William R. Higgins, Corazon Fernandez, Stephanie Giglio, Stephanie Giglio, Brianna L. Gomes, Joanne Rodak Gori, Tina Grazioso, Alan Gu, Maureen R. Halvorson, Fiona Havlish, William Havlish, Craig M. Hegna, Edwena R. Hegna, Paul B. Hegna, Steven A. Hegna, Lynn Marie Hegna Moore, Robin L. Higgins, Chad Holland, James Holland, Haomin Jian, Hui-Chien Jian, Hui-Chuan Jian, Hui-Zhon Jian, Huichun Jian, Grace Kneski, Jin Liu, Michael Loguidice, Teresanne Lostrangio, Joanne Lovett, Ralph S. Maerz, Chrislan Fuller Manuel, Margaret Mauro, Ramon Melendez, Maria Regina Merwin, Patricia Milano, Ivy Moreno, Diane Ognibene, Diane Ognibene, Michael Paige, Martin Panik, Martin Panik, Mary Lynn-Anna Panik Stanley, Christine Papasso, Marie Ann Paprocki, Grace M. Parkinson-Godshalk, Patricia J. Perry, Marshee R. Ratchford, Rodney Ratchford, Rodney Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Judith Reiss, Joanne M. Renzi, Joanne M. Renzi, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, John Rodak, Joyce Ann Rodak, Regina Rodak, Diane Romero, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal, Alexander Rowe, Barry Russin, Ed Russin, Gloria Russin, Linda Sammut, Ester Santillian, Expedito Santillian, Ellen L. Saracini, Paul Schertzer, Pamela Schiele, Ronald S. Sloan, Raymond Smith, Sr., Raymond A. Smith, Jr., Brenda Sorenson, Katherine Soulas, Russa Steiner, Angela Stergiopoulos, George Stergiopoulos, Sandra Straub, Curtis Taylor, Maria Taylor, Joan E. Tino, Cielito Valencia, Betty Welch, Brian Welch, Christopher Welch, Gerard Welch, Linda Welch, Michael Welch, Joslin Zeplin, Leona Zeplin and Leonard Zeplin in 20-1212, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2831854] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/05/2020 09:30 AM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 78 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deborah D. Peterson, FILED. Service date 05/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2831659] [20-1212] [Entered: 05/04/2020 05:51 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 77 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/06/2020, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2828637] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/29/2020 11:32 AM]
April 28, 2020 Filing 75 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deborah D. Peterson, FILED. Service date 04/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2828295] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/28/2020 07:58 PM]
April 28, 2020 Filing 73 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Daniel Miller, Elena Rozenman, Noam Rozenman, Tzvi Rozenman, Deborah Rubin, Jenny Rubin, Renay Frym, Stuart E. Hersh, and Abraham Mendelson, FILED. Service date 04/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2828044] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:30 PM]
April 28, 2020 Filing 72 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, in docket no. 20-1265, ASSIGNED.[2828010] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:02 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 63 CAPTION, to conform with Court's order dated 04/27/2020 [ # 62 ], AMENDED.[2827074] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:30 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend caption [ # 38 ] filed by Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, by RSP, FILED. [2827063][62] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:25 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 58 EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER, see Order dated 04/27/2020, entry # 56, FILED.[2826660] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:59 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite appeal to the following extent: all Appellees briefs, including the Governments principal and responsive brief, must be filed by 06/15/2020; Appellants-Cross-Appellees response and reply brief must be filed by 07/15/2020; the Governments reply brief, if any, must he filed by 07/29/2020; the appeal shall be heard as soon as practicable after briefing is completed [ # 14 ] filed by Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, by JFB, FILED. [2826635][56] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:39 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Kristy Naomi Grace for Milagritos Perez-Dalis Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore Estate of Christopher Lester Estate of Michael Heiser Shyrl L. Johnson Kevin Johnson Jr. Estate of Kendall Kitson Jr. Nicholas A. Johnson Steve K. Kitson Thaddeus C. Fennig Elizabeth Wolf Catherine Fennig Lewis W. Cartrette James V. Wetmore Paul D. Fennig Leland Timothy Haun Francis Heiser Tracy M. Smith Marie R. Campbell Timothy Woody Nancy A. Kitson Anne M. Rimkus Anthony W. Cartrette Estate of Sharon Marthaler Christopher R. Nguyen Cecil H. Lester Jr. Estate of Kevin J. Johnson Che G. Colson Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus Estate of Justin R. Wood Bridget Brooks Thomas Morgera Mary Young Dawn Woody William Adams Michael T. Adams Patrick D. Adams Estate of Nancy R. Kitson Estate of Kendall K. Kitson Sr. Estate of Gary Heiser James R. Rimkus Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor Estate of Brent E. Marthaler Estate of Joshua E. Woody Matthew Marthaler Daniel Adams Kathleen M. Wood Katie L. Marthaler Bernadine R. Beekman Catherine Adams Jonica L. Woody Cecil H. Lester Judy Lester Estate of Millard D. Campbell Bruce Johnson Denise M. Eichstaedt Senator Haun Estate of Brian McVeigh Jessica F. Lester Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr. Shawn M. Wood Vicki L. Taylor Estate of Laura E. Johnson Estate of Christopher Adams Mark Fenning George Beekman Estate of Peter J. Morgera Estate of Patrick P. Fennig, Starlina D. Taylor Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen Herman C. Marthaler III Michael Morgera Ibis S. Haun John E. Adams Lawrence E. Taylor Bessie A. Campbell Kirk Marthaler, in case 20-1212 , [ # 49 ], ADDED.[2826457] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 10:06 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 52 CURED DEFECTIVE LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification [ # 42 ], [ # 51 ], on behalf of Appellants 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED.[2826335] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:43 AM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 39 ], on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2826169][51] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 06:17 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Estate of Michael Heiser, Estate of Gary Heiser, Francis Heiser, Leland Timothy Haun, Ibis S. Haun, Milagritos Perez-Dalis, Senator Haun, Estate of Justin R. Wood, Richard W. Wood, Kathleen M. Wood, Shawn M. Wood, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Denise M. Eichstaedt, Anthony W. Cartrette, Lewis W. Cartrette, Estate of Brian McVeigh, Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore, James V. Wetmore, Estate of Millard D. Campbell, Marie R. Campbell, Bessie A. Campbell, Estate of Kevin J. Johnson, Shyrl L. Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Jr., Nicholas A. Johnson, Bruce Johnson, Che G. Colson, Estate of Laura E. Johnson, Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus, Bridget Brooks, James R. Rimkus, Anne M. Rimkus, Estate of Brent E. Marthaler, Estate of Sharon Marthaler, Katie L. Marthaler, Matthew Marthaler, Kirk Marthaler, Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen, Christopher R. Nguyen, Estate of Joshua E. Woody, Dawn Woody, Jonica L. Woody, Timothy Woody, Bernadine R. Beekman, George Beekman, Estate of Peter J. Morgera, Michael Morgera, Thomas Morgera, Estate of Kendall K. Kitson, Sr., Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr., Estate of Nancy R. Kitson, Steve K. Kitson, Nancy A. Kitson, Estate of Christopher Adams, Catherine Adams, John E. Adams, Patrick D. Adams, Michael T. Adams, Daniel Adams, Mary Young, William Adams, Estate of Christopher Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Judy Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Jr., Jessica F. Lester, Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor, Lawrence E. Taylor, Vicki L. Taylor, Starlina D. Taylor, Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,, Thaddeus C. Fennig, Catherine Fennig, Paul D. Fennig, Mark Fenning and -- Herman C. Marthaler, III and Elizabeth Wolf in 20-1212, Appellee Bessie A. Campbell and -- Herman C. Marthaler, III and Elizabeth Wolf in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2826127] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:06 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 48 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellees Estate of Michael Heiser, Estate of Gary Heiser, Francis Heiser, Leland Timothy Haun, Ibis S. Haun, Milagritos Perez-Dalis, Senator Haun, Estate of Justin R. Wood, Richard W. Wood, Kathleen M. Wood, Shawn M. Wood, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Denise M. Eichstaedt, Anthony W. Cartrette, Lewis W. Cartrette, Estate of Brian McVeigh, Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore, James V. Wetmore, Estate of Millard D. Campbell, Marie R. Campbell, Bessie A. Campbell, Estate of Kevin J. Johnson, Shyrl L. Johnson, Che G. Colson, Kevin Johnson, Jr., Nicholas A. Johnson, Estate of Laura E. Johnson, Bruce Johnson, Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus, Bridget Brooks, James R. Rimkus, Anne M. Rimkus, Estate of Brent E. Marthaler, Katie L. Marthaler, Estate of Sharon Marthaler, Matthew Marthaler, Kirk Marthaler, Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen, Christopher R. Nguyen, Estate of Joshua E. Woody, Dawn Woody, Bernadine R. Beekman, George Beekman, Tracy M. Smith, Jonica L. Woody, Timothy Woody, Estate of Peter J. Morgera, Thomas Morgera, Michael Morgera, Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr., Nancy A. Kitson, Steve K. Kitson, Estate of Nancy R. Kitson, Estate of Christopher Adams, Catherine Adams, John E. Adams, Patrick D. Adams, Michael T. Adams, Daniel Adams, Mary Young, William Adams, Estate of Christopher Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Judy Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Jr., Jessica F. Lester, Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor, Lawrence E. Taylor, Vicki L. Taylor, Starlina D. Taylor, Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,, Thaddeus C. Fennig, Catherine Fennig, Paul D. Fennig and Mark Fenning, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2826080] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/24/2020 04:40 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 47 ATTORNEY, Curtis Campbell Mechling, Patrick Petrocelli, Pamela Takefman for Baruch Kahane Elizabeth Rich Tova Ettinger David Kirschenbaum Joshua J. Kirschenbaum Cipporah Kaplan Danielle Teitlebaum Carlos Acosta Estelle Carroll Harry Beer Isabelle Kirschenbaum Ethel J. Griffin Shirlee Hayman Norman Kahane Maria Acosta Jason Kirschenbaum Libby Kahane Steven M. Greenbaum Alan D. Hayman Irving Franklin Phyllis Maisel, in case 20-1212 , [ # 44 ], [ # 45 ], [ # 46 ], ADDED.[2825951] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:26 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825734] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:51 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825725] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:43 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825694] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:23 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 43 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Danielle Teitlebaum, Harry Beer and Elizabeth Rich, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2825659] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:00 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 42 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [37], on behalf of Appellants 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED.[2825436] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 08:57 AM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 39 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to expedite appeal [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 04/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825380] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:25 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825378] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/23/2020 08:34 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 37 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, informing Court of proposed due date 05/07/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 04/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2825359] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/23/2020 06:27 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Daniel S. Ruzumna for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1265 , [ # 2825000-2 ], ADDED.[2825004] [20-1265, 20-1212] [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:08 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 35 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, in docket # 20-1212, ASSIGNED.[2824680] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/23/2020 08:29 AM]
April 22, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Winston M. Paes for 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1265 , [ # 2824492-2 ], ADDED.[2824542] [20-1265, 20-1212] [Entered: 04/22/2020 04:20 PM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 31 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/06/2020, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2823764] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/21/2020 04:42 PM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Daniel S. Ruzumna for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1212 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[2823032] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/21/2020 10:53 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 28 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief and Appendix, [ # 15 ], on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED.[2823005] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/21/2020 10:34 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2822981] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/21/2020 10:19 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Winston M. Paes for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1212 , [ # 22 ], ADDED.[2822814] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/21/2020 06:25 AM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 24 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2822809] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:54 PM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 23 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2822808] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:52 PM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alavi Foundation and 650 Fifth Avenue Company, FILED. Service date 04/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2822791] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/20/2020 09:32 PM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2822789] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/20/2020 09:19 PM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Samuel Raymond for United States of America, in case 20-1212 , [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2821459] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:11 PM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 04/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2821450] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:03 PM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 18 CAPTION, reflecting cross-appeal designations, AMENDED.[2821085] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:11 AM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Daniel Marc Tracer for United States of America, in case 20-1212 Daniel and in case 20-1265 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[2821000] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/17/2020 06:24 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2820993] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/16/2020 11:00 PM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2820991] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/16/2020 10:49 PM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTE: See lead case, 20-1212, containing complete set of docket entries.[2820989] [20-1265, 20-1212] [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:53 PM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 04/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2820985] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:28 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. [2820986] [20-1265, 20-1212] [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:41 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY, Won Shin, , in place of attorney Benjamin Torrance, SUBSTITUTED.[2820163] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/15/2020 05:41 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2820156] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/15/2020 05:15 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, USCA receipt # ANYSDC19402990, FILED.[2820097] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/15/2020 04:29 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/02/2020, RECEIVED.[2820093] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/15/2020 04:26 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2820089] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/15/2020 04:23 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. [2820072] [20-1212] [Entered: 04/15/2020 04:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: 650 Fifth Avenue and Re
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Laura E. Johnson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Brian McVeigh
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jonica L. Woody
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Babak Bayani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Devon Marie Rodak
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ibis S. Haun
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michele Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Borcyczewski,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: FuMei Chien
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ellen L. Saracini, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Victor Saracini
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bridget Brooks
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephen L. Cartledge
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alice Carpeneto
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr.
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hui-Chuan Jian
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul D. Fennig
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Nancy R. Kitson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mark Fenning
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Russa Steiner, individually and on behalf of the Estate of William R. Steiner
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joanne M. Renzi, on behalf of the Estate of Anne C. Saracini
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joanne Lovett, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Brian Nunez
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brianna L. Gomes, on behalf of the Estate of Doyle Raymond Ward
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Millard D. Campbell
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Haomin Jian
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Martin Panik
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christine Barton-Pence, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dolores Caproni
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rodney Ratchford, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Marsha Dianah Ratchford
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daniel D. Coffey, M.D.
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shyrl L. Johnson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Kenneth V. Welch
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven M. Greenbaum, on his own behalf and as Administrator of the Estate of Judith (Shoshana) Lilian Greenbaum
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George Stergiopoulos, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Andrew Stergiopoulos
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Corazon Fernandez, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Judy Fernandez,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joslin Zeplin
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Linda Sammut, on behalf of the Estate of Stephen Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Morris Dorf,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Keith A. Bradkowski, on behalf of the Estate of Jeffrey Collman,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul Blais
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Craig M. Hegna
Represented By: Ralph Paul Dupont Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Charles Collman
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Teresanne Lostrangio, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Joseph Lostrangio,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leona Zeplin
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alan D. Hayman
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Diane Ognibene, on behalf of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Thaddeus C. Fennig
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Diane Ognibene, on behalf of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Caproni
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leonard Zeplin
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rodney Ratchford, for the benefit of Maranda C.Ratchford
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hui-Zhon Jian
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marie Ann Paprocki, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Dennis Lavelle,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Expedito Santillian, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Maria Theresa Santillian
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elizabeth Rich, as Executrix of the Estate of Irving Franklin, and as Executrix of the Estate of Irma Franklin
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: David Kirschenbaum
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hui-Chien Jian
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Judith Reiss, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Joshua Scott Reiss
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ralph S. Maerz
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christopher Welch
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Edwena R. Hegna, Executrix of the Estate of Charles Hegna
Represented By: Ralph Paul Dupont Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Angela Stergiopoulos, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Andrew Stergiopoulos
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Loisanne Diehl, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Diehl
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Thomas Morgera
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jessica F. Lester
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lewis W. Cartrette
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patricia Milano, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Peter T. Milano
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maria Regina Merwin, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Ronald Gamboa,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tara Bane, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael A. Bane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Senator Haun
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frances M. Coffey, individually and on behalf of the Estates of Daniel M. Coffey and Jason Coffey,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William Adams
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patricia J. Perry, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John William Perry
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul B. Hegna
Represented By: Ralph Paul Dupont Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carlos Acosta, on his own behalf and as Fiduciary of the Estate of Maria Acosta),
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Curtis Taylor
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christine Papasso, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Salvatore T. Papasso,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Paige, on behalf of the Estate of Timothy Raymond Ward
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Krystyna Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Martin Boryczewski,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Brent E. Marthaler
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Martin Panik, on behalf of the Estate of Linda Ellen Panik
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Diane Romero, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Elvin Romero
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Milagritos Perez-Dalis
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ivy Moreno, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Yvette Nichole Moreno,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Michael Heiser
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Betty Welch
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Francis Heiser
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Huichun Jian
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Katie L. Marthaler
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Kendall K. Kitson, Sr.
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Livia Chirchirillo
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christina Bane-Hayes
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shirlee Hayman
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Helen Rosenthal
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lynn Marie Hegna Moore
Represented By: Ralph Paul Dupont Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joshua J. Kirschenbaum
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fiona Havlish, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Donald G. Havlish, Jr.,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Matthew Marthaler
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James R. Rimkus
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Gary Heiser
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kathleen M. Wood
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven A. Hegna
Represented By: Ralph Paul Dupont Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Diana Campuzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael T. Adams
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raymond A. Smith, Jr., on behalf of the Estate of George Eric Smith
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ronald S. Sloan, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Paul K. Sloan
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephanie Giglio, on behalf of the Estate of Roni Levine
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Susan Conklin, on behalf of the Estate of Donald Havlish, Sr.
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ed Russin
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alexander Rowe
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joyce Louis Leydet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Timothy Woody
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alan Gu
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ethel J. Griffin, as Administratrix of the Estate of Binyamin Kahane
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Harry Beer, on his own behalf and as administrator of the Estate of Alan Beer and as Administrator of the Estate of Anna Beer
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lawrence E. Taylor
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joan E. Tino, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Jennifer Tino
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christopher Caproni
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anne M. Rimkus
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Justin R. Wood
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Clara Chirchirillo, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Peter Chirchirillo
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephanie Giglio, on behalf of the Estate of Robert Levine
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mary Young
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Phyllis Maisel
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Dorf
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Loren Rosenthal, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Richard Rosenthal
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fatemeh Bayani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Herman C. Marthaler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 650 Fifth Avenue Company
Represented By: John Gleeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alavi Foundation
Represented By: John Gleeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Chelsea Nicole Rodak
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nicholas A. Johnson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of William R. Higgins
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ramon Melendez, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Mary Melendez
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Margaret Mauro, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Dorothy Mauro
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James V. Wetmore
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steve K. Kitson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Baruch Kahane
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Sharon Marthaler
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tracy M. Smith
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marshee R. Ratchford
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Avi Elishis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estelle Carroll
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Che G. Colson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Starlina D. Taylor
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michelle Dorf, Individually, and on behalf of the Estate of Stephen Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Morris Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Anne Marie Dorf
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maureen R. Halvorson, individually and on behalf of the Estate of James D. Halvorson
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cielito Valencia
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George Beekman
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Grace M. Parkinson-Godshalk, individually and on behalf of the Estate of William R. Godshalk,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maria Taylor
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brian Welch
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Catherine Fennig
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cecil H. Lester
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jason Kirschenbaum
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul Schertzer, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Scott Schertzer
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bernadine R. Beekman
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dawn Woody
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Chrislan Fuller Manuel, on behalf of the Estate of Meta Waller,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shawn M. Wood
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daniel Adams
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Linda Welch
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Judy Lester
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brian Collman
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brenda Sorenson
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raymond Smith, Sr.
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kevin Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bessie A. Campbell
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Denise M. Eichstaedt
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pamela Schiele
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ASSA Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Grace Kneski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Steven Cafiero,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Barry Russin
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Katherine Soulas, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Timothy P. Soulas
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John Rodak
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: The Estate of Cipporah Kaplan
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elizabeth Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Banafsheh Bayani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mary Lynn-Anna Panik Stanley
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kevin M. Coffey
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Peter J. Morgera
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Julia Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Borcyczewski,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Regina Rodak
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joanne Rodak Gori
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Arline Peabody Bane, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Martin Boryczewski,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rodney M. Ratchford
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gloria Russin
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Chad Holland
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joyce Ann Rodak, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John M. Rodak
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kirk Marthaler
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William Havlish
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Catherine Adams
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leland Timothy Haun
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leslie Coale Brown, on behalf of the Estate of Jeffrey Coale
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gregg Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christopher R. Nguyen
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Donna Holland
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Richard A. Caproni, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Richard M. Caproni
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marie R. Campbell
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robin L. Higgins
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jin Liu, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Liming Gu
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tova Ettinger
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sandra Straub, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Edward W. Straub
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nancy A. Kitson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joseph Dorf, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Anne Marie Dorf
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Islamic Education Center of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gerald W. Bingham
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Morgera
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ester Santillian
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Holland
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen Esq.
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tina Grazioso, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John Grazioso,
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Norman Kahane, on his own behalf and as Executor of the Estate of Sonia Kahane
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr.
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deborah D. Peterson, as the Personal Representative for the Estate of James C. Knipple
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Welch
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Joshua E. Woody
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony W. Cartrette
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Isabelle Kirschenbaum, on her own behalf and as Executrix of the Estate of Martin Kirschenbaum,
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Vicki L. Taylor
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dwayne W. Collman
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Richard Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joanne M. Renzi
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ASSA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patrick D. Adams
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John E. Adams
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Catherine Deblieck
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Kevin J. Johnson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gerard Welch
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Christopher Adams
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Loguidice
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lisa Caproni-Brown
Represented By: Timothy Brian Fleming Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cecil H. Lester, Jr.
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Christopher Lester
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Kristy Naomi Grace Esq.
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Libby Kahane, on her own behalf and as Administratrix of the Estate of Meir Kahane
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Danielle Teitlebaum
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bonnie Bayani-Christopher, Personal Representative of the Estate of Siavish Bayani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deborah D. Peterson, as the Personal Representative for the Estate of James C. Knipple, and all parties listed below as Plaintiff Judgment Creditors
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right, Title And Interest In 4836 Marconi Avenue, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4836 Marconi Avenue, Carmichael, California 95608, with all improvements and attachments thereon
Search News [