In Re: 650 Fifth Avenue
Plaintiff: Noam Rozenman, Daniel Miller, Maria Acosta, Renay Frym, Elena Rozenman, Abraham Mendelson, Tzvi Rozenman, Irving Franklin, Jenny Rubin, Deborah Rubin and Stuart E. Hersh
Defendant: All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 2724409590, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto, All Right Title And Interest In 55-11 Queens Boulevard, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 55-11 Queens Boulevard, Queens, New York 11377, Block 1325 Lots 1,6,7 and 8 with all improvements and attachments, All Funds On Deposit At Sterling National Bank, All funds on deposit at Sterling National Bank in account number 3852524414 held in the name of Alavi Foundation and all funds traceable thereto, Bank Melli Iran in 650 Fifth Avenue Company, including but not limited to the Real Estate Property and Appurtenances located at 650 Fifth Avenue, New York, New York, with all improvements and attachments thereon, All Right Title And Interest of Assa Corporation, All right title and interest of Assa Corporation, Assa Company Limited, Bank Melli Iran, and the Alavi Foundation in 650 Fifth Avenue Company, including but not limited to the real property and appurt, All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A., New York, New York, in Account Number 78429712, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto, All Right, Title And Interest In 7917 Montrose Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 7917 Montrose Road, Rockville, Maryland 20854, with all improvements and attachments thereon, All Right, Title, and Interest of ASSA Corporation, All Funds On Deposit At Sterling National Bank, All funds on deposit at Sterling National Bank in account number 3802032216 held in the name of Alavi Foundation and all funds traceable thereto, All Right Titile And Interest In 2313 South Voss Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 2313 South Voss Road, Houston, Texas 77057, with all improvements and attachments thereon, All Right, Title And Interest In 4836 Marconi Avenue, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4836 Marconi Avenue, Carmichael, California 95608, with all improvements and attachments thereon, All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 725700280, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto, All Funds On Deposit At Sterling National Bank, All funds on deposit at Sterling National Bank in account number 3802032201 held in the name of Alavi Foundation and all funds traceable thereto, All Right, Title, And Interest In 4300 Aldie Road, All right, title, and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4300 Aldie Road, Catharpin, Virginia 20143-1133, All Right Title And Interest In 650 Fifth Avenue, All right title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 650 Fifth Avenue, New York, New York with all improvements and attachments thereon, Alavi Foundation of New York, All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A., 888165552, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto, All Right, Title And Interest In 8100 Jeb Stuart Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 8100 Jeb Stuart Road, Rockville Maryland 20854, with all improvements and attachments thereon, All Right, Title And Interest In 4204 Aldie Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4204 Aldie Road, Catharpin, Virginia 20143-1133 with all improvements and attachments thereon, All Funds On Deposit At JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., ank, N.A. in account number 230484476 held in the name of 650 Fifth Avenue Company and all funds traceable theretoAll funds on deposit at JPMorgan Chase B and All Funds On Deposit At JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., All funds on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in account number 230484468, held in the name of 650 Fifth Avenue Company, and all funds traceable thereto
Claimant: Patricia Milano, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Peter T. Milano, Babak Bayani, Raymond Smith, Sr., Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Michael Caproni, Bruce Johnson, Denise M. Eichstaedt, Cecil H. Lester, Hui-Zhon Jian, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, on her own behalf and as Executrix of the Estate of Martin Kirschenbaum,, Alavi Foundation, Dwayne W. Collman, Katherine Soulas, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Timothy P. Soulas, Joanne M. Renzi, on behalf of the Estate of Anne C. Saracini, Hui-Chien Jian, Jin Liu, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Liming Gu, Patrick D. Adams, Dolores Caproni, Estate of Brian McVeigh, Ivy Moreno, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Yvette Nichole Moreno,, Ellen L. Saracini, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Victor Saracini, Katie L. Marthaler, Joanne Rodak Gori, Michele Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Borcyczewski,, Thomas Morgera, Estate of Joshua E. Woody, Livia Chirchirillo, Joslin Zeplin, Bridget Brooks, Linda Sammut, on behalf of the Estate of Stephen Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Morris Dorf,, Margaret Mauro, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Dorothy Mauro, Chad Holland, Corazon Fernandez, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Judy Fernandez,, William Adams, Leland Timothy Haun, Paul D. Fennig, Harry Beer, on his own behalf and as administrator of the Estate of Alan Beer and as Administrator of the Estate of Anna Beer, Michael Paige, on behalf of the Estate of Timothy Raymond Ward, Danielle Teitlebaum, Marie R. Campbell, Brenda Sorenson, Estate of Kenneth V. Welch, Deborah D. Peterson, as the Personal Representative for the Estate of James C. Knipple, Rodney Ratchford, for the benefit of Maranda C.Ratchford, Haomin Jian, Brian Welch, Estate of Kevin J. Johnson, Susan Conklin, on behalf of the Estate of Donald Havlish, Sr., Thaddeus C. Fennig, Joseph Dorf, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Anne Marie Dorf, Alexander Rowe, Christine Barton-Pence, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf, Gerald W. Bingham, David Kirschenbaum, Libby Kahane, on her own behalf and as Administratrix of the Estate of Meir Kahane, Marie Ann Paprocki, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Dennis Lavelle,, Craig M. Hegna, Lynn Marie Hegna Moore, Ibis S. Haun, Fiona Havlish, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Donald G. Havlish, Jr.,, James Holland, Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr., Diane Romero, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Elvin Romero, Alan D. Hayman, Leonard Zeplin, Paul B. Hegna, Diane Ognibene, on behalf of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Christine Papasso, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Salvatore T. Papasso,, Gerard Welch, Senator Haun, Frances M. Coffey, individually and on behalf of the Estates of Daniel M. Coffey and Jason Coffey,, Michael Loguidice, Joanne Lovett, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Brian Nunez, Estate of Christopher Lester, Krystyna Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Martin Boryczewski,, Estate of Laura E. Johnson, Tara Bane, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael A. Bane, Christopher Caproni, Edwena R. Hegna, Executrix of the Estate of Charles Hegna, Martin Panik, Estate of Justin R. Wood, Nicholas A. Johnson, Estelle Carroll, Shyrl L. Johnson, Betty Welch, Loisanne Diehl, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Diehl, Estate of Millard D. Campbell, Loren Rosenthal, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Richard Rosenthal, Chrislan Fuller Manuel, on behalf of the Estate of Meta Waller,, Shirlee Hayman, Kirk Marthaler, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Kathleen M. Wood, Carlos Acosta, on his own behalf and as Fiduciary of the Estate of Maria Acosta),, Curtis Taylor, Starlina D. Taylor, Bernadine R. Beekman, Leona Zeplin, Mark Fenning, Alice Carpeneto, Estate of Michael Heiser, Jason Kirschenbaum, Daniel Adams, Christopher Welch, Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,, Estate of Kendall K. Kitson, Sr., Maria Regina Merwin, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Ronald Gamboa,, George Stergiopoulos, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Andrew Stergiopoulos, Joan E. Tino, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Jennifer Tino, Shawn M. Wood, Diana Campuzano, Stephanie Giglio, on behalf of the Estate of Robert Levine, Keith A. Bradkowski, on behalf of the Estate of Jeffrey Collman,, Paul Blais, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Patricia J. Perry, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John William Perry, Joyce Louis Leydet, Fatemeh Bayani, Rodney Ratchford, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Marsha Dianah Ratchford, Raymond A. Smith, Jr., on behalf of the Estate of George Eric Smith, The Estate of Cipporah Kaplan, Ronald S. Sloan, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Paul K. Sloan, Arline Peabody Bane, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Martin Boryczewski,, Lawrence E. Taylor, Ralph S. Maerz, Linda Welch, Elizabeth Rich, as Executrix of the Estate of Irving Franklin, and as Executrix of the Estate of Irma Franklin, Baruch Kahane, Alan Gu, Tracy M. Smith, Martin Panik, on behalf of the Estate of Linda Ellen Panik, Catherine Adams, Herman C. Marthaler, III, Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor, John Rodak, Huichun Jian, Estate of William R. Higgins, Clara Chirchirillo, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Peter Chirchirillo, Helen Rosenthal, Brianna L. Gomes, on behalf of the Estate of Doyle Raymond Ward, Kevin Johnson, Jr., George Beekman, Mary Lynn-Anna Panik Stanley, Avi Elishis, Diane Ognibene, on behalf of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene,, John E. Adams, Judith Reiss, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Joshua Scott Reiss, Steven M. Greenbaum, on his own behalf and as Administrator of the Estate of Judith (Shoshana) Lilian Greenbaum, Ramon Melendez, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Mary Melendez, Paul Schertzer, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Scott Schertzer, Michael T. Adams, Norman Kahane, on his own behalf and as Executor of the Estate of Sonia Kahane, Michael Welch, Ethel J. Griffin, as Administratrix of the Estate of Binyamin Kahane, Ed Russin, James V. Wetmore, Judy Lester, Milagritos Perez-Dalis, Vicki L. Taylor, Maureen R. Halvorson, individually and on behalf of the Estate of James D. Halvorson, Mary Young, Christina Bane-Hayes, Cielito Valencia, Anne M. Rimkus, Sandra Straub, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Edward W. Straub, Francis Heiser, James R. Rimkus, Lisa Caproni-Brown, Estate of Gary Heiser, Pamela Schiele, Dawn Woody, Phyllis Maisel, Matthew Marthaler, Steven A. Hegna, Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore, Estate of Christopher Adams, Devon Marie Rodak, Stephanie Giglio, on behalf of the Estate of Roni Levine, Bessie A. Campbell, Robin L. Higgins, ASSA Co., Ltd., Michael Morgera, Estate of Brent E. Marthaler, Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen, Stephen L. Cartledge, Rodney M. Ratchford, Christopher R. Nguyen, Gloria Russin, Elizabeth Wolf, Banafsheh Bayani, Jonica L. Woody, Richard A. Caproni, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Richard M. Caproni, Julia Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Borcyczewski,, William Havlish, Leslie Coale Brown, on behalf of the Estate of Jeffrey Coale, Tova Ettinger, Michelle Dorf, Individually, and on behalf of the Estate of Stephen Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Morris Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Anne Marie Dorf, Estate of Peter J. Morgera, Regina Rodak, Lewis W. Cartrette, Catherine Deblieck, Gregg Salzman, FuMei Chien, Maria Taylor, Estate of Sharon Marthaler, Robert Dorf, Hui-Chuan Jian, Steve K. Kitson, Joyce Ann Rodak, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John M. Rodak, Expedito Santillian, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Maria Theresa Santillian, Jessica F. Lester, Ester Santillian, Marshee R. Ratchford, Tina Grazioso, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John Grazioso,, Cecil H. Lester, Jr., Charles Collman, Estate of Donna Holland, 650 Fifth Avenue Company, Brian Collman, Angela Stergiopoulos, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Andrew Stergiopoulos, Nancy A. Kitson, Daniel D. Coffey, M.D., Grace Kneski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Steven Cafiero,, Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus, Catherine Fennig, Che G. Colson, Richard Brewer, ASSA Corporation, Russa Steiner, individually and on behalf of the Estate of William R. Steiner, Barry Russin, Grace M. Parkinson-Godshalk, individually and on behalf of the Estate of William R. Godshalk,, Kevin M. Coffey, Anthony W. Cartrette, Estate of Nancy R. Kitson, Islamic Education Center of Maryland, Joanne M. Renzi, Timothy Woody, Teresanne Lostrangio, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Joseph Lostrangio, and Bonnie Bayani-Christopher, Personal Representative of the Estate of Siavish Bayani
Not Classified By Court: Richard W. Wood
Plaintiff / Appellant: United States of America
Trustee: Kathleen A. Roberts
Case Number: 20-1265
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 82 ATTORNEY, Thomas McKay for United States of America, in case 20-1212 Thomas McKay for United States of America, in case 20-1265 , [ # 81 ], ADDED.[2856822] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:25 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 06/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2856643] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 06/08/2020 01:50 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 75 ATTORNEY, Diana Marie Conner, Melissa Ginsberg for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1212 Diana Marie Conner, Melissa Ginsberg for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1265, [ # 2839657-2 ], [ # 73 ], [ # 2839661-2 ], [ # 74 ], ADDED.[2839746] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/14/2020 04:07 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 05/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2839667] [20-1265] [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:28 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 05/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2839659] [20-1265] [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:24 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 66 CURED DEFECTIVE Brief and Appendix [ # 2823005-2 ], [ # 60 ], [ # 61 ], [ # 62 ], [ # 63 ], on behalf of Appellants 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED.[2838857] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:01 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 63 APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 301-466), on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836482] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:22 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 62 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836477] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:21 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 61 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836473] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:18 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 60 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836472] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:17 PM]
May 5, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE, to Appellees Arline Peabody Bane, Christina Bane-Hayes, Christine Barton-Pence, Gerald W. Bingham, Paul Blais, Julia Boryczewski, Krystyna Boryczewski, Michele Boryczewski, Keith A. Bradkowski, Leslie Coale Brown, Christopher Caproni, Dolores Caproni, Michael Caproni, Richard A. Caproni, Lisa Caproni-Brown, Alice Carpeneto, Stephen L. Cartledge, FuMei Chien, Clara Chirchirillo, Livia Chirchirillo, Doctor Daniel D. Coffey, Frances M. Coffey, Kevin M. Coffey, Brian Collman, Charles Collman, Dwayne W. Collman, Susan Conklin, Catherine Deblieck, Loisanne Diehl, Joseph Dorf, Michelle Dorf, Robert Dorf, Estate of Donna Holland, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Estate of Kenneth V. Welch, Estate of William R. Higgins, Corazon Fernandez, Stephanie Giglio, Stephanie Giglio, Brianna L. Gomes, Joanne Rodak Gori, Tina Grazioso, Alan Gu, Maureen R. Halvorson, Fiona Havlish, William Havlish, Craig M. Hegna, Edwena R. Hegna, Paul B. Hegna, Steven A. Hegna, Lynn Marie Hegna Moore, Robin L. Higgins, Chad Holland, James Holland, Haomin Jian, Hui-Chien Jian, Hui-Chuan Jian, Hui-Zhon Jian, Huichun Jian, Grace Kneski, Jin Liu, Michael Loguidice, Teresanne Lostrangio, Joanne Lovett, Ralph S. Maerz, Chrislan Fuller Manuel, Margaret Mauro, Ramon Melendez, Maria Regina Merwin, Patricia Milano, Ivy Moreno, Diane Ognibene, Diane Ognibene, Michael Paige, Martin Panik, Martin Panik, Mary Lynn-Anna Panik Stanley, Christine Papasso, Marie Ann Paprocki, Grace M. Parkinson-Godshalk, Patricia J. Perry, Marshee R. Ratchford, Rodney Ratchford, Rodney Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Judith Reiss, Joanne M. Renzi, Joanne M. Renzi, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, John Rodak, Joyce Ann Rodak, Regina Rodak, Diane Romero, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal, Alexander Rowe, Barry Russin, Ed Russin, Gloria Russin, Linda Sammut, Ester Santillian, Expedito Santillian, Ellen L. Saracini, Paul Schertzer, Pamela Schiele, Ronald S. Sloan, Raymond Smith, Sr., Raymond A. Smith, Jr., Brenda Sorenson, Katherine Soulas, Russa Steiner, Angela Stergiopoulos, George Stergiopoulos, Sandra Straub, Curtis Taylor, Maria Taylor, Joan E. Tino, Cielito Valencia, Betty Welch, Brian Welch, Christopher Welch, Gerard Welch, Linda Welch, Michael Welch, Joslin Zeplin, Leona Zeplin and Leonard Zeplin in 20-1212, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2831854] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 05/05/2020 09:30 AM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 57 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/06/2020, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2828637] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/29/2020 11:32 AM]
April 28, 2020 Filing 54 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, in docket no. 20-1265, ASSIGNED.[2828010] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:02 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 43 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant United States of America, FILED. Service date 04/27/2020 by CM/ECF.[2827240] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:26 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 42 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant United States of America, FILED. Service date 04/27/2020 by CM/ECF.[2827239] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:24 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 41 CAPTION, to conform with Court's order dated 04/27/2020 [ # 40 ], AMENDED.[2827074] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:30 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend caption [ # 2825378-2 ] filed by Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, by RSP, FILED. [2827063][40] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:25 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 36 EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER, see Order dated 04/27/2020, entry # 56, FILED.[2826660] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:59 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite appeal to the following extent: all Appellees briefs, including the Governments principal and responsive brief, must be filed by 06/15/2020; Appellants-Cross-Appellees response and reply brief must be filed by 07/15/2020; the Governments reply brief, if any, must he filed by 07/29/2020; the appeal shall be heard as soon as practicable after briefing is completed [ # 2820991-2 ] filed by Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, by JFB, FILED. [2826635][34] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:39 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 32 ATTORNEY, Kristy Naomi Grace for Milagritos Perez-Dalis Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore Estate of Christopher Lester Estate of Michael Heiser Shyrl L. Johnson Kevin Johnson Jr. Estate of Kendall Kitson Jr. Nicholas A. Johnson Steve K. Kitson Thaddeus C. Fennig Elizabeth Wolf Catherine Fennig Lewis W. Cartrette James V. Wetmore Paul D. Fennig Leland Timothy Haun Francis Heiser Tracy M. Smith Marie R. Campbell Timothy Woody Nancy A. Kitson Anne M. Rimkus Anthony W. Cartrette Estate of Sharon Marthaler Christopher R. Nguyen Cecil H. Lester Jr. Estate of Kevin J. Johnson Che G. Colson Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus Estate of Justin R. Wood Bridget Brooks Thomas Morgera Mary Young Dawn Woody William Adams Michael T. Adams Patrick D. Adams Estate of Nancy R. Kitson Estate of Kendall K. Kitson Sr. Estate of Gary Heiser James R. Rimkus Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor Estate of Brent E. Marthaler Estate of Joshua E. Woody Matthew Marthaler Daniel Adams Kathleen M. Wood Katie L. Marthaler Bernadine R. Beekman Catherine Adams Jonica L. Woody Cecil H. Lester Judy Lester Estate of Millard D. Campbell Bruce Johnson Denise M. Eichstaedt Senator Haun Estate of Brian McVeigh Jessica F. Lester Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr. Shawn M. Wood Vicki L. Taylor Estate of Laura E. Johnson Estate of Christopher Adams Mark Fenning George Beekman Estate of Peter J. Morgera Estate of Patrick P. Fennig, Starlina D. Taylor Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen Herman C. Marthaler III Michael Morgera Ibis S. Haun John E. Adams Lawrence E. Taylor Bessie A. Campbell Kirk Marthaler, in case 20-1212 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[2826457] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 10:06 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 30 CURED DEFECTIVE LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification [ # 22 ], [ # 29 ], on behalf of Appellants 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, FILED.[2826335] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:43 AM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2826169][29] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 06:17 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Estate of Michael Heiser, Estate of Gary Heiser, Francis Heiser, Leland Timothy Haun, Ibis S. Haun, Milagritos Perez-Dalis, Senator Haun, Estate of Justin R. Wood, Richard W. Wood, Kathleen M. Wood, Shawn M. Wood, Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr., Denise M. Eichstaedt, Anthony W. Cartrette, Lewis W. Cartrette, Estate of Brian McVeigh, Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore, James V. Wetmore, Estate of Millard D. Campbell, Marie R. Campbell, Bessie A. Campbell, Estate of Kevin J. Johnson, Shyrl L. Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Jr., Nicholas A. Johnson, Bruce Johnson, Che G. Colson, Estate of Laura E. Johnson, Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus, Bridget Brooks, James R. Rimkus, Anne M. Rimkus, Estate of Brent E. Marthaler, Estate of Sharon Marthaler, Katie L. Marthaler, Matthew Marthaler, Kirk Marthaler, Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen, Christopher R. Nguyen, Estate of Joshua E. Woody, Dawn Woody, Jonica L. Woody, Timothy Woody, Bernadine R. Beekman, George Beekman, Estate of Peter J. Morgera, Michael Morgera, Thomas Morgera, Estate of Kendall K. Kitson, Sr., Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr., Estate of Nancy R. Kitson, Steve K. Kitson, Nancy A. Kitson, Estate of Christopher Adams, Catherine Adams, John E. Adams, Patrick D. Adams, Michael T. Adams, Daniel Adams, Mary Young, William Adams, Estate of Christopher Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Judy Lester, Cecil H. Lester, Jr., Jessica F. Lester, Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor, Lawrence E. Taylor, Vicki L. Taylor, Starlina D. Taylor, Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,, Thaddeus C. Fennig, Catherine Fennig, Paul D. Fennig, Mark Fenning and -- Herman C. Marthaler, III and Elizabeth Wolf in 20-1212, Appellee Bessie A. Campbell and -- Herman C. Marthaler, III and Elizabeth Wolf in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2826127] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:06 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Curtis Campbell Mechling, Patrick Petrocelli, Pamela Takefman for Baruch Kahane Elizabeth Rich Tova Ettinger David Kirschenbaum Joshua J. Kirschenbaum Cipporah Kaplan Danielle Teitlebaum Carlos Acosta Estelle Carroll Harry Beer Isabelle Kirschenbaum Ethel J. Griffin Shirlee Hayman Norman Kahane Maria Acosta Jason Kirschenbaum Libby Kahane Steven M. Greenbaum Alan D. Hayman Irving Franklin Phyllis Maisel, in case 20-1212 , [ # 23 ], [ # 24 ], [ # 25 ], ADDED.[2825951] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:26 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825734] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:51 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825725] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:43 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan D. Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel, Elizabeth Rich and Danielle Teitlebaum in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825694] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:23 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [18], on behalf of Appellants 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED.[2825436] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/24/2020 08:57 AM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 19 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to expedite appeal [ # 2820991-2 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 04/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825380] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:25 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 18 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1212, Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation in 20-1265, informing Court of proposed due date 05/07/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 04/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2825359] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/23/2020 06:27 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Daniel S. Ruzumna for 650 Fifth Avenue Company Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1265 , [ # 16 ], ADDED.[2825004] [20-1265, 20-1212] [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:08 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2825000] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:00 PM]
April 22, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Winston M. Paes for 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, in case 20-1265 , [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2824542] [20-1265, 20-1212] [Entered: 04/22/2020 04:20 PM]
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2824492] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:47 PM]
April 22, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee 650 Fifth Avenue Company and Alavi Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2824471] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:37 PM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Samuel Raymond for United States of America, in case 20-1212 , [ # 10 ], ADDED.[2821459] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:11 PM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 20-1212, Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. Service date 04/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2821450] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:03 PM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 CAPTION, reflecting cross-appeal designations, AMENDED.[2821085] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:11 AM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY, Daniel Marc Tracer for United States of America, in case 20-1212 Daniel and in case 20-1265 , [ # 5 ], ADDED.[2821000] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/17/2020 06:24 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTE: See lead case, 20-1212, containing complete set of docket entries.[2820989] [20-1265, 20-1212] [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:53 PM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 20-1212, FILED. Service date 04/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2820985] [20-1212, 20-1265] [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:28 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2821502] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:55 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/02/2020, RECEIVED.[2820988] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:48 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2820987] [20-1265] [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:46 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 20-1265, FILED. [2820986] [20-1265, 20-1212] [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: 650 Fifth Avenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patricia Milano, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Peter T. Milano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Babak Bayani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raymond Smith, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joshua J. Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Caproni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bruce Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Denise M. Eichstaedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cecil H. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hui-Zhon Jian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Isabelle Kirschenbaum, on her own behalf and as Executrix of the Estate of Martin Kirschenbaum,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alavi Foundation
Represented By: John Gleeson
Represented By: Daniel S. Ruzumna
Represented By: Diana Marie Conner Esq.
Represented By: Winston M. Paes Esq.
Represented By: Melissa Ginsberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dwayne W. Collman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Katherine Soulas, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Timothy P. Soulas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joanne M. Renzi, on behalf of the Estate of Anne C. Saracini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hui-Chien Jian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jin Liu, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Liming Gu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patrick D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dolores Caproni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Brian McVeigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ivy Moreno, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Yvette Nichole Moreno,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ellen L. Saracini, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Victor Saracini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Katie L. Marthaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joanne Rodak Gori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michele Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Borcyczewski,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Thomas Morgera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Joshua E. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Livia Chirchirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joslin Zeplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bridget Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Linda Sammut, on behalf of the Estate of Stephen Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Morris Dorf,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Margaret Mauro, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Dorothy Mauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Chad Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Corazon Fernandez, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Judy Fernandez,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leland Timothy Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul D. Fennig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Harry Beer, on his own behalf and as administrator of the Estate of Alan Beer and as Administrator of the Estate of Anna Beer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Paige, on behalf of the Estate of Timothy Raymond Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Danielle Teitlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marie R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brenda Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Kenneth V. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deborah D. Peterson, as the Personal Representative for the Estate of James C. Knipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rodney Ratchford, for the benefit of Maranda C.Ratchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Haomin Jian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brian Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Kevin J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Susan Conklin, on behalf of the Estate of Donald Havlish, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Thaddeus C. Fennig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joseph Dorf, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Anne Marie Dorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alexander Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christine Barton-Pence, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gerald W. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: David Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Libby Kahane, on her own behalf and as Administratrix of the Estate of Meir Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marie Ann Paprocki, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Dennis Lavelle,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Craig M. Hegna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lynn Marie Hegna Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ibis S. Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fiona Havlish, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Donald G. Havlish, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Kendall Kitson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Diane Romero, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Elvin Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alan D. Hayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leonard Zeplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul B. Hegna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Diane Ognibene, on behalf of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christine Papasso, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Salvatore T. Papasso,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gerard Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Senator Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frances M. Coffey, individually and on behalf of the Estates of Daniel M. Coffey and Jason Coffey,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Loguidice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joanne Lovett, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Brian Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Christopher Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Krystyna Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Martin Boryczewski,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Laura E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tara Bane, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael A. Bane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christopher Caproni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Edwena R. Hegna, Executrix of the Estate of Charles Hegna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Martin Panik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Justin R. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nicholas A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estelle Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shyrl L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Betty Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Loisanne Diehl, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Millard D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Loren Rosenthal, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Richard Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Chrislan Fuller Manuel, on behalf of the Estate of Meta Waller,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shirlee Hayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kirk Marthaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Chelsea Nicole Rodak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kathleen M. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carlos Acosta, on his own behalf and as Fiduciary of the Estate of Maria Acosta),
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Curtis Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Starlina D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bernadine R. Beekman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leona Zeplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mark Fenning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alice Carpeneto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Michael Heiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jason Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daniel Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christopher Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Patrick P. Fennig,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Kendall K. Kitson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maria Regina Merwin, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Ronald Gamboa,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George Stergiopoulos, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Andrew Stergiopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joan E. Tino, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Jennifer Tino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shawn M. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Diana Campuzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephanie Giglio, on behalf of the Estate of Robert Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Keith A. Bradkowski, on behalf of the Estate of Jeffrey Collman,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul Blais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Earl F. Cartrette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patricia J. Perry, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joyce Louis Leydet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fatemeh Bayani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rodney Ratchford, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Marsha Dianah Ratchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raymond A. Smith, Jr., on behalf of the Estate of George Eric Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: The Estate of Cipporah Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ronald S. Sloan, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Paul K. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Arline Peabody Bane, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Martin Boryczewski,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lawrence E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ralph S. Maerz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Linda Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elizabeth Rich, as Executrix of the Estate of Irving Franklin, and as Executrix of the Estate of Irma Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Baruch Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alan Gu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tracy M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Martin Panik, on behalf of the Estate of Linda Ellen Panik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Catherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Herman C. Marthaler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Jeremy A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John Rodak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Huichun Jian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of William R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Clara Chirchirillo, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Peter Chirchirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Helen Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brianna L. Gomes, on behalf of the Estate of Doyle Raymond Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kevin Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George Beekman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mary Lynn-Anna Panik Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Avi Elishis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Diane Ognibene, on behalf of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John E. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Judith Reiss, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Joshua Scott Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven M. Greenbaum, on his own behalf and as Administrator of the Estate of Judith (Shoshana) Lilian Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ramon Melendez, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Mary Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paul Schertzer, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Scott Schertzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Norman Kahane, on his own behalf and as Executor of the Estate of Sonia Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ethel J. Griffin, as Administratrix of the Estate of Binyamin Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ed Russin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James V. Wetmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Judy Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Milagritos Perez-Dalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Vicki L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maureen R. Halvorson, individually and on behalf of the Estate of James D. Halvorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christina Bane-Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cielito Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anne M. Rimkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sandra Straub, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Edward W. Straub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Francis Heiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James R. Rimkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lisa Caproni-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Gary Heiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pamela Schiele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dawn Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Phyllis Maisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Matthew Marthaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven A. Hegna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Sandra M. Wetmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Christopher Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Devon Marie Rodak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephanie Giglio, on behalf of the Estate of Roni Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bessie A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robin L. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ASSA Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Morgera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Brent E. Marthaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Thanh Van Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephen L. Cartledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rodney M. Ratchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christopher R. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gloria Russin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elizabeth Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Banafsheh Bayani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jonica L. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Richard A. Caproni, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Richard M. Caproni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Julia Boryczewski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael Borcyczewski,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William Havlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leslie Coale Brown, on behalf of the Estate of Jeffrey Coale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tova Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michelle Dorf, Individually, and on behalf of the Estate of Stephen Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Morris Dorf, and on behalf of the Estate of Anne Marie Dorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Peter J. Morgera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Regina Rodak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lewis W. Cartrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Catherine Deblieck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gregg Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: FuMei Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maria Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Sharon Marthaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Dorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hui-Chuan Jian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steve K. Kitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joyce Ann Rodak, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John M. Rodak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Expedito Santillian, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Maria Theresa Santillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jessica F. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ester Santillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marshee R. Ratchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tina Grazioso, individually and on behalf of the Estate of John Grazioso,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cecil H. Lester, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Charles Collman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Donna Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 650 Fifth Avenue Company
Represented By: John Gleeson
Represented By: Daniel S. Ruzumna
Represented By: Diana Marie Conner Esq.
Represented By: Winston M. Paes Esq.
Represented By: Melissa Ginsberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brian Collman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Angela Stergiopoulos, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Andrew Stergiopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nancy A. Kitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daniel D. Coffey, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Grace Kneski, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Steven Cafiero,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Joseph E. Rimkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Catherine Fennig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Che G. Colson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Richard Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ASSA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Russa Steiner, individually and on behalf of the Estate of William R. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Barry Russin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Grace M. Parkinson-Godshalk, individually and on behalf of the Estate of William R. Godshalk,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kevin M. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony W. Cartrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Nancy R. Kitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Islamic Education Center of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joanne M. Renzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Timothy Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Teresanne Lostrangio, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Joseph Lostrangio,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bonnie Bayani-Christopher, Personal Representative of the Estate of Siavish Bayani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noam Rozenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renay Frym
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Rozenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tzvi Rozenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart E. Hersh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Richard W. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 2724409590, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right Title And Interest In 55-11 Queens Boulevard, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 55-11 Queens Boulevard, Queens, New York 11377, Block 1325 Lots 1,6,7 and 8 with all improvements and attachments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds On Deposit At Sterling National Bank, All funds on deposit at Sterling National Bank in account number 3852524414 held in the name of Alavi Foundation and all funds traceable thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Melli Iran in 650 Fifth Avenue Company, including but not limited to the Real Estate Property and Appurtenances located at 650 Fifth Avenue, New York, New York, with all improvements and attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right Title And Interest of Assa Corporation, All right title and interest of Assa Corporation, Assa Company Limited, Bank Melli Iran, and the Alavi Foundation in 650 Fifth Avenue Company, including but not limited to the real property and appurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A., New York, New York, in Account Number 78429712, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right, Title And Interest In 7917 Montrose Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 7917 Montrose Road, Rockville, Maryland 20854, with all improvements and attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right, Title, and Interest of ASSA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds On Deposit At Sterling National Bank, All funds on deposit at Sterling National Bank in account number 3802032216 held in the name of Alavi Foundation and all funds traceable thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right Titile And Interest In 2313 South Voss Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 2313 South Voss Road, Houston, Texas 77057, with all improvements and attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right, Title And Interest In 4836 Marconi Avenue, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4836 Marconi Avenue, Carmichael, California 95608, with all improvements and attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 725700280, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds On Deposit At Sterling National Bank, All funds on deposit at Sterling National Bank in account number 3802032201 held in the name of Alavi Foundation and all funds traceable thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right, Title, And Interest In 4300 Aldie Road, All right, title, and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4300 Aldie Road, Catharpin, Virginia 20143-1133
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right Title And Interest In 650 Fifth Avenue, All right title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 650 Fifth Avenue, New York, New York with all improvements and attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alavi Foundation of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A., 888165552, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right, Title And Interest In 8100 Jeb Stuart Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 8100 Jeb Stuart Road, Rockville Maryland 20854, with all improvements and attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right, Title And Interest In 4204 Aldie Road, All right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances located at 4204 Aldie Road, Catharpin, Virginia 20143-1133 with all improvements and attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds On Deposit At JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., ank, N.A. in account number 230484476 held in the name of 650 Fifth Avenue Company and all funds traceable theretoAll funds on deposit at JPMorgan Chase B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds On Deposit At JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., All funds on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in account number 230484468, held in the name of 650 Fifth Avenue Company, and all funds traceable thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael D. Lockard
Represented By: Daniel Marc Tracer Esq.
Represented By: Won S. Shin
Represented By: Thomas McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Kathleen A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?