In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Inves
Appellant: Securities Investor Protection Corporation
Defendant / Appellee: Citibank North America, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff
Amicus Curiae: George W. Kuney, Ronald Mann, David Hague, National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, Peter V. Marchetti, Esq., Jagdeep S. Bhandari, Christoph Henkel, Stephen McJohn, Bruce Markell, Adam Steinman, Robin Effrom, Andrew Bradt, ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, ABN AMRO Bank N.V., The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd. and American Bankers Association
Case Number: 20-1333
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 175 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 03/12/2021, A Panel, SET.[3010926] [20-1333] [Entered: 01/11/2021 04:30 PM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 169 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc., informing the Court of availability for oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 12/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2995193] [20-1333]--[Edited 12/17/2020 by EM] [Entered: 12/16/2020 04:26 PM]
December 15, 2020 Filing 168 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 03/08/2021, PANEL A, PROPOSED.[2994328] [20-1333] [Entered: 12/15/2020 05:09 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 167 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 11/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2981991] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/25/2020 11:56 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 166 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 11/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2981681] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:18 AM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 163 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Nathanael Kelley, Esq. for Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 11/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2978308] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:20 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 161 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Carmine D Boccuzzi, Jr., Esq. for Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2978061] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/19/2020 12:15 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 159 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Roy T. Englert, Jr., Esq. for Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 11/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2977938] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/19/2020 11:13 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 155 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [ # 150 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae ABN AMRO Bank N.V., FILED.[2974863] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:29 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 154 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [138], on behalf of Amicus Curiae ABN AMRO Bank N.V., FILED.[2974844] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:16 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, ABN AMRO Bank N.V., FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2974784] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/16/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/16/2020 09:54 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 149 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Bankers Association, ADDED.[2974642] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/14/2020 11:35 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 148 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, ADDED.[2974641] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/14/2020 11:28 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 147 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., ADDED.[2974640] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/14/2020 11:06 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 146 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, ADDED.[2974639] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/14/2020 10:52 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 145 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae ABN AMRO Bank N.V., ADDED.[2974638] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/14/2020 10:36 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amici Curiae ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973376] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/14/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/12/2020 05:06 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amici Curiae ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973365] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/14/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/12/2020 05:01 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amici Curiae ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973362] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/14/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/12/2020 04:58 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 141 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amici Curiae ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973353] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/14/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/12/2020 04:52 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 140 AMICUS BRIEF, Amici Curiae ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973221] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/14/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:44 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 139 AMICUS BRIEF, ABN AMRO Bank N. V., FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973206] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/14/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:37 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, < , FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973200] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:34 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, ABN AMRO Bank N. V., FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973198] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/14/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:33 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 136 AMICUS BRIEF, The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association and American Bankers Association, FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973137] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/14/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:08 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association and American Bankers Association, FILED. Service date 11/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2973111] [20-1333]--[Edited 11/14/2020 by EM] [Entered: 11/12/2020 02:51 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 134 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/05/2020 by CM/ECF. [2969153] [20-1333] [Entered: 11/05/2020 11:51 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 133 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [ # 129 ] filed by Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc., by WJN, FILED. [2959315][133] [20-1333] [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:58 PM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 129 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2957075] [20-1333] [Entered: 10/21/2020 11:06 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 128 ATTORNEY, Ariel Mestel Fox for Citibank, N.A. Citicorp North America, Inc., in case 20-1333 , [ # 127 ], ADDED.[2955118] [20-1333] [Entered: 10/19/2020 01:39 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2955058] [20-1333] [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:57 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 125 CURED DEFECTIVE: AMICUS BRIEF, [ # 124 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED.[2939192] [20-1333] [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:50 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 124 AMICUS BRIEF, National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2939189] [20-1333] [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:46 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 123 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [ # 91 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED.[2939183] [20-1333] [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:28 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 120 CURED DEFECTIVE: AMICUS BRIEF, [ # 116 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Andrew Bradt, Robin Effrom and Adam Steinman, FILED.[2924245] [20-1333] [Entered: 09/04/2020 12:34 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 119 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Adam Steinman, ADDED.[2924191] [20-1333] [Entered: 09/04/2020 12:09 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 118 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Robin Effrom, ADDED.[2924185] [20-1333] [Entered: 09/04/2020 12:06 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 117 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Andrew Bradt, ADDED.[2924149] [20-1333] [Entered: 09/04/2020 11:41 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 116 AMICUS BRIEF, Andrew Bradt, Robin Effron, Adam Steinman, FILED. Service date 09/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2921729] [20-1333]--[Edited 09/04/2020 by EM] [Entered: 09/01/2020 06:03 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amici Curiae Professors Andrew Bradt, Robin Effron, and Adam Steinman, FILED. Service date 09/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2921726] [20-1333]--[Edited 09/04/2020 by EM] [Entered: 09/01/2020 05:57 PM]
August 28, 2020 Filing 114 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [94], on behalf of Amici Andrew Bradt, Robin Effron, Adam Steinman, FILED.[2919599] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/28/2020 04:23 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 110 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc. Brief due date as 11/05/2020, FILED.[2914498] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:44 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 107 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Stephen McJohn, ADDED.[2914439] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:20 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 106 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Bruce Markell, ADDED.[2914436] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:18 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 105 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Ronald Mann, ADDED.[2914433] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:16 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 104 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae George W. Kuney, ADDED.[2914431] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:14 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 103 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae David Hague, ADDED.[2914426] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:12 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 102 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Christoph Henkel, ADDED.[2914423] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:10 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 101 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Jagdeep S. Bhandari, ADDED.[2914420] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:08 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 100 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, ADDED.[2914386] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:54 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 96 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 11/05/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2911070] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:50 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 109 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF, [ # 93 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Jagdeep S. Bhandari, David Hague, Christoph Henkel, George W. Kuney, Ronald Mann, Peter V. Marchetti, Bruce A. Markell, Stephen Michael McJohn, FILED.[2914491] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:39 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 108 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance, [ # 92 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae, Jagdeep S. Bhandari, David Hague, Christoph Henkel, George W. Kuney, Ronald Mann, Peter V. Marchetti, Bruce A. Markell, Stephen Michael McJohn, Esq., FILED.[2914486] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:37 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 94 AMICUS BRIEF, <, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907854] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/13/2020 09:20 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 93 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amici Jagdeep S. Bhandari, David Hague, Christoph Henkel, George W. Kuney, Ronald Mann, Peter V. Marchetti, Bruce A. Markell, Stephen Michael McJohn, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907683] [20-1333]--[Edited 08/21/2020 by EM] [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:31 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of,Jagdeep S. Bhandari, David Hague, Christoph Henkel, George W. Kuney, Ronald Mann, Peter V. Marchetti, Bruce A. Markell, Stephen Michael McJohn, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907678] [20-1333]--[Edited 08/21/2020 by EM] [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:29 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 91 AMICUS BRIEF, Amicus National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907567] [20-1333]--[Edited 08/21/2020 by EM] [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:50 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amicus National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907561] [20-1333]--[Edited 08/21/2020 by EM] [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:49 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 89 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [86], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Peter V. Marchetti, Esq., FILED.[2907125] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:19 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 88 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance, [85], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Peter V. Marchetti, Esq., FILED.[2907114] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:14 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 87 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Peter V. Marchetti, ADDED.[2907111] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:13 PM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 86 AMICUS BRIEF, <, FILED. Service date 08/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2906667] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/12/2020 06:18 PM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, < , FILED. Service date 08/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2906665] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/12/2020 06:12 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 78 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2902221] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:30 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 77 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1501-1529), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902213] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:27 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 76 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902208] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:25 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 75 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902207] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:23 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 74 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902203] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:19 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 73 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902197] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:16 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 72 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902192] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:14 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 71 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902095] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:23 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 70 ATTORNEY, Leslie Esbrook for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1333 , [ # 67 ], ADDED.[2901325] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:27 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 69 ATTORNEY, Matthew M. Madden for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1333 , [ # 66 ], ADDED.[2901308] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:16 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 68 ATTORNEY, Roy T. Englert Jr. for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1333 , [ # 65 ], ADDED.[2901303] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:13 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF. [2900829] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/05/2020 11:13 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF. [2900826] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/05/2020 11:11 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF. [2900820] [20-1333] [Entered: 08/05/2020 11:10 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 62 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation Brief due date as 08/06/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 08/06/2020, FILED.[2873582] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/29/2020 05:26 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 61 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Irving H. Picard Brief due date as 08/06/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 08/06/2020, FILED.[2873578] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/29/2020 05:20 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 55 ATTORNEY, Chardaie Charlemagne for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1333 , [ # 52 ], ADDED.[2871445] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:22 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Matthew David Feil for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1333 , [ # 51 ], ADDED.[2871444] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:19 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 53 ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Securities Investor Protection Corporation Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1333 , [ # 50 ], ADDED.[2871442] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:14 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870835] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:04 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870817] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:58 AM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870799] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:50 AM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 49 NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[2863508] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:21 PM]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER, directing appeals 20-1333 and 20-1334 to be heard in tandem, FILED.[2856637] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/08/2020 01:47 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to have appeals 20-1333 and 20-1334 heard in tandem, directing parties to not seek extensions to file their briefs [ # 28 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard, by MHP, FILED. [2856618][44] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/08/2020 01:36 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 31 ], on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2856323][41] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/08/2020 11:37 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 36 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2854891] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:08 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 35 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2854879] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:05 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 31 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 28 ], on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citicorp North America, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/02/2020 by CM/ECF. [2852892] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/02/2020 05:57 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 30 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, district court receipt # A13561442 and 51471, FILED.[2852320] [20-1333] [Entered: 06/02/2020 11:18 AM]
May 28, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION, for appeals to be heard in tandem, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/28/2020 by CM/ECF. [2849714] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:52 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 27 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, informing Court of proposed due date 08/06/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2841691] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/18/2020 04:02 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 26 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, informing Court of proposed due date 08/06/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2841228] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/18/2020 12:14 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 23 CAPTION, edited the name of Citicorp North America, Inc. and terminated Citigroup Global Markets Limited as a party on the appeal, AMENDED.[2835357] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/08/2020 01:00 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 22 Citigroup Global Markets Limited, TERMINATED.[2835354] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/08/2020 12:57 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 20 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED.[2835037] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:09 AM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY, Eva Pascale Smith Bibi for Citibank, N.A. Citicorp North America, Inc., in case 20-1333, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2835033] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:08 AM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2834898] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/07/2020 06:46 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citibank North America, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2834795] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/07/2020 04:48 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank North America, Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2834785] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/07/2020 04:45 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [12], on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED.[2834694] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/07/2020 03:49 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2834553] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:39 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2834548] [20-1333] [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:36 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Nathanael Kelley for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 20-1333, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2829453] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:27 AM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Kevin H. Bell for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 20-1333, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[2829447] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:25 AM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 04/30/2020 by CM/ECF. [2829362] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/30/2020 10:44 AM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 04/30/2020 by CM/ECF. [2829353] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/30/2020 10:39 AM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 04/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2829339] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/30/2020 10:33 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY, David J. Sheehan for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1333, [ # 5 ], ADDED.[2827041] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:14 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 04/27/2020 by CM/ECF. [2826787] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/27/2020 01:29 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 04/27/2020 by CM/ECF.[2826782] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/27/2020 01:21 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/19/2019, RECEIVED.[2825005] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:09 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard and Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. [2824995] [20-1333] [Entered: 04/23/2020 12:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Inves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Securities Investor Protection Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Caputo Esq.
Represented By: Kevin H. Bell Esq.
Represented By: Nathanael Kelley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citibank North America, Inc.
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citigroup Global Markets Limited
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Eva Pascale Smith Bibi Esq.
Represented By: Ariel Mestel Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citicorp North America, Inc.
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Eva Pascale Smith Bibi Esq.
Represented By: Ariel Mestel Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff
Represented By: Seanna R. Brown Esq.
Represented By: David J. Sheehan Esq.
Represented By: Chardaie Charlemagne Esq.
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.
Represented By: Matthew David Feil Esq.
Represented By: Roy T. Englert Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Leslie Esbrook Esq.
Represented By: Matthew M. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: George W. Kuney
Represented By: Peter V. Marchetti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ronald Mann
Represented By: Peter V. Marchetti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Hague
Represented By: Peter V. Marchetti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter V. Marchetti, Esq.
Represented By: Peter V. Marchetti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jagdeep S. Bhandari
Represented By: Peter V. Marchetti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Christoph Henkel
Represented By: Peter V. Marchetti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stephen McJohn
Represented By: Peter V. Marchetti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bruce Markell
Represented By: Peter V. Marchetti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adam Steinman
Represented By: Kenneth J. Halpern Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robin Effrom
Represented By: Kenneth J. Halpern Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andrew Bradt
Represented By: Kenneth J. Halpern Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited
Represented By: Eric Konopka Esq.
Represented By: Christopher R. Harris Esq.
Represented By: Melissa Sherry Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Giblin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ABN AMRO Bank N.V.
Represented By: Michael Feldberg Esq.
Represented By: David King Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd.
Represented By: Eric Konopka Esq.
Represented By: Christopher R. Harris Esq.
Represented By: Melissa Sherry Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Giblin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Bankers Association
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?