Dorce v. City of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Cecilia Jones, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and McConnell Dorce, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: Neighborhood Restore Housing Development Fund Co. Inc., John Doe 1 to 10, Jane Doe 1 to 10, Maria Torres-Springer, Commissioner of the New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, City of New York and BSDC Kings Covenant Housing Development Fund Company, Inc.
Case Number: 20-1809
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 47 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 08/27/2020, appellee's brief due date as 10/01/2020,TRANSMITTED.[2890737] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/23/2020 10:56 AM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 46 NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[2890687] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/23/2020 10:29 AM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 43 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Cecilia Jones, FILED. Service date 07/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2888298] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/20/2020 03:40 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 42 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Cecilia Jones, FILED. Service date 07/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2888295] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/20/2020 03:38 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 41 ATTORNEY, Alexander B. Simkin for Appellants Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison and McConnell Dorce, in case 20-1809, [ # 40 ], ADDED.[2888030] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/20/2020 12:47 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant McConnell Dorce and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED. Service date 07/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2887914] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/20/2020 11:17 AM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 39 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Cecilia Jones, FILED. Service date 07/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2883319] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:12 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 38 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [ # 36 ], on behalf of Appellants McConnell Dorce, Cecilia Jones and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED.[2883270] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:47 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Matthew Berman for Appellants Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, McConnell Dorce and Cecilia Jones, in case 20-1809, [ # 36 ], ADDED.[2883263] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:44 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant McConnell Dorce, Cecilia Jones and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED. Service date 07/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2883222] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:25 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 35 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [33], on behalf of Appellants McConnell Dorce, Cecilia Jones and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED.[2883158] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:46 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant McConnell Dorce and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED. Service date 07/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2883049] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/13/2020 01:43 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 31 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellees BSDC Kings Covenant Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. and Neighborhood Restore Housing Development Fund Co. Inc., FILED.[2880562] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/09/2020 01:05 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee BSDC Kings Covenant Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. and Neighborhood Restore Housing Development Fund Co. Inc., FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2879512] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/08/2020 02:16 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 29 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [28], on behalf of Appellees BSDC Kings Covenant Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. and Neighborhood Restore Housing Development Fund Co. Inc., FILED.[2879463] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/08/2020 01:52 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee BSDC Kings Covenant Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. and Neighborhood Restore Housing Development Fund Co. Inc., FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2879428] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/08/2020 01:32 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE, to Appellees BSDC Kings Covenant Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. and Neighborhood Restore Housing Development Fund Co. Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2877731] [20-1809] [Entered: 07/07/2020 11:19 AM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee City of New York and Maria Torres-Springer, FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2870456] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/25/2020 08:29 AM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Gregg Lewis Weiner for Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison and McConnell Dorce, in case 20-1809, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2870411] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:48 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant McConnell Dorce and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870362] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/24/2020 07:22 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant McConnell Dorce and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2870360] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/24/2020 07:13 PM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 20 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant McConnell Dorce and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2868112] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/22/2020 08:30 PM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 19 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant McConnell Dorce and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2868111] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/22/2020 08:25 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Richard Paul Dearing for City of New York and Maria Torres-Springer, in case 20-1809, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2865706] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/18/2020 03:10 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York and Maria Torres-Springer, FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2865481] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/18/2020 12:50 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellees City of New York and Maria Torres-Springer, FILED.[2865228] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/18/2020 10:15 AM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Kate Fletcher, [ # 14 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2865226] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/18/2020 10:14 AM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York and Maria Torres-Springer, FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2865222] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/18/2020 10:10 AM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Kevin Osowski for City of New York and Maria Torres-Springer, in case 20-1809, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[2864956] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/18/2020 12:32 AM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [ # 7 ], on behalf of Appellees City of New York and Maria Torres-Springer, FILED.[2864955] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/18/2020 12:27 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York and Maria Torres-Springer, FILED. Service date 06/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2864904] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/17/2020 07:32 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York and Maria Torres-Springer, FILED. Service date 06/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2864899] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/17/2020 06:22 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2861937] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:47 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants McConnell Dorce, Cecilia Jones and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, district court receipt # ANYSDC-20220369, FILED.[2861353] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/13/2020 02:49 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/19/2020, RECEIVED.[2861352] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/13/2020 02:47 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 05/16/2020, RECEIVED.[2861351] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/13/2020 02:46 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants McConnell Dorce, Cecilia Jones and Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, FILED. [2861350] [20-1809] [Entered: 06/13/2020 02:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Dorce v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cecilia Jones, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Robert John Valli Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Berman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sherlivia Thomas-Murchison, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Keith H. Wofford Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Berman Esq.
Represented By: Alexander B. Simkin Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: McConnell Dorce, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Keith H. Wofford Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Berman Esq.
Represented By: Alexander B. Simkin Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Neighborhood Restore Housing Development Fund Co. Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Markowitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Maria Torres-Springer, Commissioner of the New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development
Represented By: Kate Fletcher Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Kevin Osowski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Kate Fletcher Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Kevin Osowski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BSDC Kings Covenant Housing Development Fund Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Markowitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?