Castro v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant / Appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon, As trustee for the certificate holders of CWalt Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2006-0A11 mortgage pass through certificates, series 2006-OA11, FKA The Bank of New York, All co-defendants that are known and unknown and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Plaintiff / Appellant: Mario E. Castro
Case Number: 20-1928
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND FORM D-P [ # 16 ], [ # 15 ], [ # 14 ], [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellant Mario E. Castro, FILED.[2899597] [20-1928] [Entered: 08/04/2020 10:43 AM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Mario E. Castro, FILED. Service date 07/27/2020 by US mail.[2899592] [20-1928] [Entered: 08/04/2020 10:42 AM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Mario E. Castro, FILED. Service date 07/23/2020 by US mail.[2899582] [20-1928] [Entered: 08/04/2020 10:38 AM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [12], on behalf of Appellant Mario E. Castro, FILED.[2884044] [20-1928] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:57 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellant Mario E. Castro, FILED.[2884024] [20-1928] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:47 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 CURED DEFECTIVE,Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 9 ], on behalf of Appellee Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED.[2880878] [20-1928] [Entered: 07/09/2020 03:40 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by US mail.[2880547] [20-1928] [Entered: 07/09/2020 12:56 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [7], on behalf of Appellee Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED.[2880520] [20-1928]--[Edited 07/09/2020 by KR] [Entered: 07/09/2020 12:34 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by US mail.[2879521] [20-1928] [Entered: 07/08/2020 02:19 PM]
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Mario E. Castro, FILED. No Service.[2884009] [20-1928] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:42 PM]
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Mario E. Castro, FILED. No Service.[2884005] [20-1928] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:40 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2875246] [20-1928] [Entered: 07/01/2020 10:06 AM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2867346] [20-1928] [Entered: 06/22/2020 12:11 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2867338] [20-1928] [Entered: 06/22/2020 12:07 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER ORDER, dated 06/18/2020, RECEIVED.[2867336] [20-1928] [Entered: 06/22/2020 12:06 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mario E. Castro, FILED. [2867329] [20-1928] [Entered: 06/22/2020 11:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Castro v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon, As trustee for the certificate holders of CWalt Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2006-0A11 mortgage pass through certificates, series 2006-OA11, FKA The Bank of New York
Represented By: Jordan M. Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: All co-defendants that are known and unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Jordan M. Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mario E. Castro
Represented By: Mario E. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?