Komatsu v. The City of New York
Defendant: Harold Miller, New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer Yu Lie, Tax ID: #96083, Pinny Ringel, NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326, Deputy Inspector Howard Redmond, New York City Police Department (NYPD) and John Doe 1
Defendant / Appellee: Jessica Ramos, John Doe 3, Shawn Kerby, NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577, Kenneth Monahan, Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141, NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves, Nick Gulotta, Monica Hanna, Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer, Shauna Stribula, Janet DiFiore, in her capacity as Chief Judge of the State of New York, Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of New York, Rachel Atcheson, Ricky Da Costa, New York City Police Department, Ostacio Negron, Bronx Supreme Court Major, Michael Magliano, in his official capacity as Chief of Public Safety for the New York State Unified Court System, Paul Briscoe, Joe Baccellieri, in his official capacity as Chief of the New York State Unified Court System's Court Officers Academy, John Doe 2, Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478), Marco Carrion, Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508), Jeff Lynch, Paola Ruiz, NYPD CAU, Bronx Supreme Court Officer John Doe 1, Officer Jane Doe 1, City of New York, Lawrence K. Marks, in his official capacity as Chief Administrative Judge of the State of New York and Jane Doe 2
Plaintiff / Appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Case Number: 20-2237
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellees Matthew Brunner, Ramon Dominguez and Anthony Manzi in 20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708, Notice of Apperance as Substitute Counsel, [23] from the docket, FILED.[2916183] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708] [Entered: 08/25/2020 01:15 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [23], on behalf of Appellees Matthew Brunner, Ramon Dominguez and Anthony Manzi in 20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708, FILED.[2911830] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708] [Entered: 08/19/2020 11:47 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Matthew Brunner, Ramon Dominguez and Anthony Manzi in 20-2383, 20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2590, 20-2708, FILED. Service date 08/19/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2911800] [20-2383, 20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2590, 20-2708] [Entered: 08/19/2020 11:22 AM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to file oversized brief [ # 19 ] filed by Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2904645][22] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, 20-2590] [Entered: 08/10/2020 04:54 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, FILED. Service date 08/04/2020 by US mail.[2900970] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383] [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:04 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 07/28/2020 by email.[2894606] [20-2237] [Entered: 07/28/2020 05:33 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 07/28/2020 by email.[2894604] [20-2237] [Entered: 07/28/2020 05:32 PM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Jonathan A. Popolow, [ # 13 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2887210] [20-2237] [Entered: 07/17/2020 01:34 PM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rachel Atcheson, Andrew Berkowitz, City of New York, Raymond Gerola and Ralph Nieves, FILED. Service date 07/17/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2887120] [20-2237] [Entered: 07/17/2020 12:40 PM]
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to consolidate appeals [ # 2884494-2 ] filed by Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2886398][12] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238] [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:58 PM]
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2885623] [20-2237] [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:18 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2885622] [20-2237] [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:17 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTE: See lead case, 20-1717, containing complete set of docket entries.[2885618] [20-2237] [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:13 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 07/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2885617] [20-2237] [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:12 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 20-2237, FILED. [2885616] [20-2237, 20-1717] [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Komatsu v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jessica Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shawn Kerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kenneth Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nick Gulotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Monica Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shauna Stribula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Janet DiFiore, in her capacity as Chief Judge of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rachel Atcheson
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ricky Da Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ostacio Negron, Bronx Supreme Court Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Magliano, in his official capacity as Chief of Public Safety for the New York State Unified Court System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joe Baccellieri, in his official capacity as Chief of the New York State Unified Court System's Court Officers Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marco Carrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeff Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paola Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD CAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bronx Supreme Court Officer John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Officer Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lawrence K. Marks, in his official capacity as Chief Administrative Judge of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Represented By: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Yu Lie, Tax ID: #96083
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinny Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Inspector Howard Redmond, New York City Police Department (NYPD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?