Schlosser v. Kwak
Defendant: Chevier, Ms., Individual, Official Capacity, William Krahe, LCSW, Maura Fisher, APRN, Dayna Djonne, Midwestern Connecticut Council on Alcoholism, (MCCA), Adam Scott, Individual, Official Capacity, Sara Greene, Individual, Official Capacity, Cornell Scott, Grant St Partnership, Board of Pardons and Paroles, Jane Doe, Individual, Official Capacity, Jason Spann, LCSW, Department of Corrections and CSSD, Adult Probation
Defendant / Appellee: David Carlucci, Prosecuting Atty, Individual Capacity, Doe, Director CSSD Adult Probation, Official Capacity, Doe, Dpty Chief Public Defender, Individual Capacity, Doe, States Atty, Individual Capacity, Doe, Dpty Director CSSD Adult Probation, Official Capacity, Adam B. Scott, Asst. Supervisory States Atty, Individual Capacity, Doe, Executive Director CSSD, Individual Capacity, Doe, Chief Public Defender, Individual Capacity, Ann Lynch, Judge, Individual Capacity, Sarah Greene, Prosecuting Atty, Individual Capacity, Pat Callahan, Chief Probation Officer, Individual Capacity, Jeffrey Mehias, Chief Probation Officer, Individual Capacity, Charity Hemingway, Assistant Public Defender, Individual Capacity, Kathleen McNamara, Judge, Individual Capacity, Milton Walsh, Asst Supervisory Public Defender, Individual Capacity, Doe, Dpty Chief States Atty, Individual Capacity, Doe, Regional Manager CSSD Adult Probation, Official Capacity, Omar Williams, Judge, Individual Capacity, Doe, Public Defender, Individual Capacity, Doe, Chief States Atty, Individual Capacity, Miriam Mendoza, Probation Officer, Individual Capacity, Channon Elzia, Probation Office, Individual Capacity and Hunchu Kwak, Judge, Individual Capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jeffrey Schlosser
Case Number: 20-2337
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFIED PRISONER AUTHORIZATION FORM, dated 09/10/2020, to Cheshire Correctional Institution, in care of Warden, ISSUED.[2927173] [20-2337] [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:46 AM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT AUTHORIZATION FORM, FILED. Service date 09/02/2020 by US mail.[2927172] [20-2337] [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:37 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE, Case Status, SENT.[2925067] [20-2337] [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:31 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 ADDRESS CHANGE REQUEST, dated September 8, 2020, COMPLETED.[2925066] [20-2337] [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:31 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER, dated 08/31/2020, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Schlosser, informing the Court of an address change as well as requesting any documents that are still necessary for the appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 08/31/2020 by US mail.[2925021] [20-2337] [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:12 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Clare E. Kindall, for David Carlucci, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Channon Elzia, Sarah Greene, Hunchu Kwak, Ann Lynch, Kathleen McNamara, Jeffrey Mehias, Miriam Mendoza, Adam B. Scott and Omar Williams, TERMINATED.[2913076] [20-2337] [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:35 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER, dated 08/20/2020, on behalf of Appellee David Carlucci, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Channon Elzia, Sarah Greene, Hunchu Kwak, Ann Lynch, Kathleen McNamara, Jeffrey Mehias, Miriam Mendoza, Adam B. Scott and Omar Williams, informing the Court that the Connecticut Attorney General's Office will not be representing the Defendants-Appellees in this case, RECEIVED. Service date 08/20/2020 by US mail.[2913073] [20-2337] [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:33 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE, to Appellees Pat Callahan, David Carlucci, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Doe, Channon Elzia, Sarah Greene, Charity Hemingway, Hunchu Kwak, Ann Lynch, Kathleen McNamara, Jeffrey Mehias, Miriam Mendoza, Adam B. Scott, Milton Walsh and Omar Williams, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2911080] [20-2337] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:53 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Schlosser, informing Court of proposed due date 08/12/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/12/2020 by US mail.[2911075] [20-2337] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:52 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Schlosser, FILED. Service date 08/12/2020 by US mail.[2911068] [20-2337] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:49 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Jeffrey Schlosser, FILED. Service date 08/12/2020 by US mail.[2911064] [20-2337] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:48 PM]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, dated 08/17/2020, dismissing appeal by 09/08/2020, unless Appellany Jeffrey Schlosser, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2909064] [20-2337] [Entered: 08/17/2020 08:20 AM]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, dated 08/17/2020, dismissing appeal by 09/08/2020, unless Appellant Jeffrey Schlosser, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2909061] [20-2337] [Entered: 08/17/2020 08:15 AM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2892930] [20-2337] [Entered: 07/27/2020 12:40 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2892926] [20-2337] [Entered: 07/27/2020 12:39 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2892913] [20-2337] [Entered: 07/27/2020 12:37 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/17/2020, RECEIVED.[2892884] [20-2337] [Entered: 07/27/2020 12:22 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Schlosser, FILED. [2892880] [20-2337] [Entered: 07/27/2020 12:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Schlosser v. Kwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Carlucci, Prosecuting Atty, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Director CSSD Adult Probation, Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Dpty Chief Public Defender, Individual Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, States Atty, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Dpty Director CSSD Adult Probation, Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Adam B. Scott, Asst. Supervisory States Atty, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Executive Director CSSD, Individual Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Chief Public Defender, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ann Lynch, Judge, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sarah Greene, Prosecuting Atty, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pat Callahan, Chief Probation Officer, Individual Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey Mehias, Chief Probation Officer, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charity Hemingway, Assistant Public Defender, Individual Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kathleen McNamara, Judge, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Milton Walsh, Asst Supervisory Public Defender, Individual Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Dpty Chief States Atty, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Regional Manager CSSD Adult Probation, Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Omar Williams, Judge, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Public Defender, Individual Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Chief States Atty, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Miriam Mendoza, Probation Officer, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Channon Elzia, Probation Office, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hunchu Kwak, Judge, Individual Capacity
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jeffrey Schlosser
Represented By: Jeffrey Schlosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevier, Ms., Individual, Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Krahe, LCSW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maura Fisher, APRN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayna Djonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwestern Connecticut Council on Alcoholism, (MCCA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Scott, Individual, Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Greene, Individual, Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Scott, Grant St Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, Individual, Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Spann, LCSW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSSD, Adult Probation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?