Walker v. Schult
Defendant: Steven Wagner, Associate Warden, FCI Ray Brook, Anne Mary Carter, Associate Warden, FCI Ray Brook, J. L. Norwood, Regional Director, David Salamy, Unit Manager, FCI Ray Brook, Russell Perdue, Warden, FCI Ray Brook, David Porter, Associate Warden, FCI Ray Brook and Harley Lappin, Director, Bureau of Prisons
Defendant / Appellant: Jackii Sepanek, Counselor, FCI Ray Brook and Deborah G. Schult, Warden, FCI Ray Brook
Plaintiff / Appellee: Ellis Walker
Case Number: 20-2415
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY, Sharon Casola for Ellis Walker, in case 20-2415, [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2909592] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:28 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ellis Walker, FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2909554] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:08 PM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 31 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek Brief due date as 11/04/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 11/04/2020, FILED.[2908786] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/14/2020 04:51 PM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 28 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, informing Court of proposed due date 11/04/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2908676] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/14/2020 03:59 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Megan Behrman for Ellis Walker, in case 20-2415, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2904675] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/10/2020 05:05 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, William O. Reckler for Ellis Walker, in case 20-2415, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2904668] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/10/2020 05:03 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 25 NEW CASE MANAGER, Patrick Finn, ASSIGNED.[2904654] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/10/2020 04:57 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ellis Walker, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2904507] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:52 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ellis Walker, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2904494] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:44 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ellis Walker, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2904471] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:34 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902521] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:26 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902518] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:24 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2901842] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:15 AM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Karen Folster Lesperance for Jackii Sepanek Deborah G. Schult, in case 20-2415, [ # 13 ], ADDED.[2900260] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/04/2020 02:48 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 11 ], [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, FILED.[2900254] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/04/2020 02:45 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, FILED. Service date 08/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2900216] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/04/2020 02:32 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, FILED. Service date 08/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2899233] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/03/2020 07:26 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [9], on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, FILED.[2898097] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:45 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Lowell Sturgill Jr. for Jackii Sepanek Deborah G. Schult, in case 20-2415 , [9], ADDED.[2898095] [20-2415] [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:44 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, FILED. Service date 07/31/2020 by CM/ECF. [2897469] [20-2415] [Entered: 07/31/2020 02:23 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2896343] [20-2415] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:25 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/29/2020, RECEIVED.[2896337] [20-2415] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:22 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT POST-TRIAL DECISION AND ORDER, dated 05/29/2020, RECEIVED.[2896332] [20-2415] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:21 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 08/09/2016, RECEIVED.[2896331] [20-2415] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:20 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Deborah G. Schult and Jackii Sepanek, FILED. [2896320] [20-2415] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Walker v. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wagner, Associate Warden, FCI Ray Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Mary Carter, Associate Warden, FCI Ray Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. L. Norwood, Regional Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Salamy, Unit Manager, FCI Ray Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Perdue, Warden, FCI Ray Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Porter, Associate Warden, FCI Ray Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Lappin, Director, Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Jackii Sepanek, Counselor, FCI Ray Brook
Represented By: Steven David Clymer
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Deborah G. Schult, Warden, FCI Ray Brook
Represented By: Steven David Clymer
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ellis Walker
Represented By: Blake Denton Esq.
Represented By: Megan Behrman Esq.
Represented By: Sharon Casola Esq.
Represented By: William O. Reckler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?