Strauch et al v. Computer Sciences Corporation
Plaintiff: Kevin Perry, Nash Jasmine, Marlon Haynes, Isaac Owusu, David L. Brunmeier, Pierre J. Wills, Stephen King, Chris Lamer, Dennis Farkas, Stephan A. Cheney, Chad W. Malone, Timothy J. Clark, Richard Conway, Anthony C. Fantetti, Angela Brown, Joseph H. Marshall, Anita Soule, Christian G. Rothrock, Rocky Burns, Raymond Pierce, Thomas W. Laughlin, Grover C. Boone, Sr., Jason M. Nice, Joe A. Williams, Scott Schneeberg, Brandon Kimas, Gigy S. Kunnath, Hassell D. Stacy, Shaun King, Samuel Fleming, Frank T. King and Cheri L. Johnson
Plaintiff / Appellant: Joseph Strauch, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated, Vernon Carre, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated, Charles Turner, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated and Timothy Colby, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: Computer Sciences Corporation
Case Number: 20-2814
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, staying the appeal and cross-appeal pending the Courts decision on the appeal of the underlying merits decision, Docket No. 18-3136, FILED.[2932052] [20-2814] [Entered: 09/16/2020 11:13 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM D, [ # 17 ], [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellants Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner in 20-2814, FILED.[2930630] [20-2814, 20-2812] [Entered: 09/15/2020 08:33 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM C, [ # 16 ], [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellants Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner in 20-2814, FILED.[2930629] [20-2814, 20-2812] [Entered: 09/15/2020 08:32 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner, FILED. Service date 09/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2930416] [20-2814] [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:49 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner, FILED. Service date 09/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2930386] [20-2814] [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:28 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Daniel M. Hutchinson for Charles Turner Timothy Colby Joseph Strauch Vernon Carre, in case 20-2814 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2928511] [20-2814] [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:21 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [ # 2928283-2 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner in 20-2812, Appellant Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner in 20-2814, FILED.[2928491] [20-2812, 20-2814] [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:13 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 2928277-2 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner in 20-2812, FILED.[2928478] [20-2812, 20-2814] [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:07 AM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner in 20-2812, FILED. Service date 09/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2928273] [20-2812, 20-2814] [Entered: 09/10/2020 06:48 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Computer Sciences Corporation in 20-2812, Appellee Computer Sciences Corporation in 20-2814, FILED. Service date 09/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2928055] [20-2812, 20-2814] [Entered: 09/10/2020 03:27 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Computer Sciences Corporation, FILED. Service date 09/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2924049] [20-2814] [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:49 AM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Mark David Harris, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney David R. Golder, SUBSTITUTED.[2923822] [20-2814] [Entered: 09/04/2020 08:24 AM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Computer Sciences Corporation, FILED. Service date 09/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2923701] [20-2814] [Entered: 09/03/2020 05:17 PM]
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTE: See lead case, 20-2812, containing complete set of docket entries.[2917318] [20-2814, 20-2812] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:15 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2917300] [20-2814] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:10 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner, district court receipt # ACTDC-6050144, FILED.[2917296] [20-2814] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:09 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 07/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2917292] [20-2814] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:08 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Vernon Carre, Timothy Colby, Joseph Strauch and Charles Turner, FILED. [2917283] [20-2814] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Strauch et al v. Computer Sciences Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nash Jasmine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Owusu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Brunmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre J. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan A. Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad W. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony C. Fantetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph H. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian G. Rothrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grover C. Boone, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason M. Nice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Schneeberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Kimas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gigy S. Kunnath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassell D. Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph Strauch, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Vernon Carre, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charles Turner, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timothy Colby, on behalf of himself and all those similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Computer Sciences Corporation
Represented By: David R. Golder Esq.
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?