Jones v. Goodrich Corporation
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation, L3 Communications Integrated Systems, LP, Allison Engine Company, Inc., Rolls-Royce North America, Inc., MD Helicopters, Inc., L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. and L-3 Communications Corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: Adalia Lee Redd, Individually and CoAdministrator for the Estate of Steven Burton Redd, Tristyn Redd, Individually, Jill Hortman Morris, as Co-Administrator of the Estate of John David Hortman, Dezaray Redd, Individually, Jazlyn Redd, Individually and Co-Administrator for the Estate of Steven Burton Redd and Brenda Jones, as CoAdministrator of the Estate of John David Hortman
Defendant / Appellee: Goodrich Pump & Engine Control Systems, Inc., Rolls-Royce Corp and Boeing Co
Case Number: 20-2951
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 62 ATTORNEY, Robert J. Williams for Rolls-Royce Corp, in case 20-2951 , [ # 58 ], ADDED.[2956601] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/20/2020 06:21 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 61 CAPTION, as to Defendant Allison Engine Company, Inc., AMENDED.[2955330] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:42 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend caption [ # 54 ] filed by Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED. [2955323][60] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:37 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2954803] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:43 AM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 55 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION TO AMEND CAPTION, [ # 53 ], on behalf of Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED.[2951874] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/14/2020 01:44 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED. Service date 10/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2951725] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/14/2020 12:18 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 53 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to amend caption, [52], on behalf of Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED.[2951682] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/14/2020 11:50 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED. Service date 10/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2950900] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:54 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 51 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION [50], on behalf of Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED.[2950816] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:19 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED. Service date 10/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2949818] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/12/2020 12:53 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE, to Appellee Allison Engine Company, Inc. , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2943696] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/02/2020 08:10 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 47 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Brenda Jones, Jill Hortman Morris, Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd Brief due date as 12/15/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 12/15/2020, FILED.[2943690] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/02/2020 08:03 AM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, John W. Cerreta for Goodrich Pump & Engine Control Systems, Inc., in case 20-2951 , [ # 42 ], ADDED.[2943301] [20-2951] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:32 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 43 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones, Jill Hortman Morris, Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd, informing Court of proposed due date 12/15/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 09/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2940177] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/28/2020 04:59 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Goodrich Pump & Engine Control Systems, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/28/2020 by CM/ECF. [2939538] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:51 AM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 41 LETTER, dated 09/25/2020 on behalf of Appellant Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd informing the court of the correct representation of the plaintiffs/appellants, RECEIVED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2939179] [20-2951]--[Edited 10/01/2020 by BM] [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:23 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 40 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2935992] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/22/2020 01:20 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 39 ATTORNEY, Steven Scott Bell for Boeing Co, in case 20-2951 , [ # 38 ], ADDED.[2935899] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:26 PM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Boeing Co, FILED. Service date 09/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2934046] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/18/2020 01:00 PM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 37 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2933850] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:57 AM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, James Denny Shupe for Rolls-Royce Corp, in case 20-2951, [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2933697] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/18/2020 09:21 AM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rolls-Royce Corp, FILED. Service date 09/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2933468] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:26 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Tejinder Singh for Adalia Lee Redd Brenda Jones Jazlyn Redd Jill Hortman Morris Tristyn Redd Dezaray Redd, in case 20-2951, [ # 29 ], ADDED.[2931777] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/16/2020 08:48 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd, FILED. Service date 09/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2931542] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:54 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 28 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones, Jill Hortman Morris, Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd, FILED. Service date 09/15/2020 by 3rd party, CM/ECF, email.[2931475] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:03 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 27 FORM C,on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones, Jill Hortman Morris, Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd, FILED. Service date 09/15/2020 by 3rd party, CM/ECF, email.[2931471] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:02 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Arthur Alan Wolk, John Gagliano for Adalia Lee Redd Brenda Jones Jazlyn Redd Jill Hortman Morris Tristyn Redd Dezaray Redd, in case 20-2951, [ # 23 ], [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2931264] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:49 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 25 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 22 ], [ # 23 ], [ # 24 ], on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones, Jill Hortman Morris, Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd, FILED.[2931261] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:48 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones and Jill Hortman Morris, FILED. Service date 09/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2931259] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:45 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones and Jill Hortman Morris, FILED. Service date 09/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2931258] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:43 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [20], [21], on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones and Jill Hortman Morris, FILED.[2931243] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:27 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones and Jill Hortman Morris, FILED. Service date 09/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2930726] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:21 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jill Hortman Morris and Brenda Jones, FILED. Service date 09/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2930667] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/15/2020 08:54 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY, Shawn Smith for Boeing Co, in case 20-2951, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2929662] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:00 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Ronald L.M. Goldman, Timothy A. Loranger for Adalia Lee Redd Jazlyn Redd Tristyn Redd Dezaray Redd, in case 20-2951, [ # 15 ], [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2929660] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/14/2020 08:59 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Boeing Co, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2928539] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:32 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Boeing Co, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2928518] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:23 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Adalia Lee Redd, FILED. Service date 09/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2925875] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:54 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Adalia Lee Redd, FILED. Service date 09/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2925826] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:42 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, Appellant Brenda Jones, Jill Hortman Morris, Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd, FILED. Service date 09/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2924770] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/04/2020 07:31 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, William Crawford Appleby for Adalia Lee Redd Brenda Jones Jazlyn Redd Jill Hortman Morris Tristyn Redd Dezaray Redd, in case 20-2951, [ # 11 ], ADDED.[2924601] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:36 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd, FILED. Service date 09/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2924382] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:49 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Goodrich Pump & Engine Control Systems, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2924227] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/04/2020 12:26 PM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2922494] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:42 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Steven E. Arnold, Esq. for Appellee Allison Engine Company, Inc. and Rolls-Royce Corp, informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2922200] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:50 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones, Jill Hortman Morris, Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd, district court receipt # ACTDC-6066595, FILED.[2922197] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:49 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 08/07/2020, RECEIVED.[2922194] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:48 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OF DECISION, dated 09/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2922191] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:47 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/23/2019, RECEIVED.[2922189] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:46 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Brenda Jones, Jill Hortman Morris, Adalia Lee Redd, Dezaray Redd, Jazlyn Redd and Tristyn Redd, FILED. [2922185] [20-2951] [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jones v. Goodrich Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L3 Communications Integrated Systems, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Engine Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Helicopters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L-3 Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Adalia Lee Redd, Individually and CoAdministrator for the Estate of Steven Burton Redd
Represented By: Jose Rojas Esq.
Represented By: Ronald L.M. Goldman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh Esq.
Represented By: William Crawford Appleby
Represented By: Timothy A. Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tristyn Redd, Individually
Represented By: Jose Rojas Esq.
Represented By: Ronald L.M. Goldman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh Esq.
Represented By: William Crawford Appleby
Represented By: Timothy A. Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jill Hortman Morris, as Co-Administrator of the Estate of John David Hortman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh Esq.
Represented By: Arthur Alan Wolk Esq.
Represented By: John Gagliano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dezaray Redd, Individually
Represented By: Jose Rojas Esq.
Represented By: Ronald L.M. Goldman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh Esq.
Represented By: William Crawford Appleby
Represented By: Timothy A. Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jazlyn Redd, Individually and Co-Administrator for the Estate of Steven Burton Redd
Represented By: Jose Rojas Esq.
Represented By: Ronald L.M. Goldman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh Esq.
Represented By: William Crawford Appleby
Represented By: Timothy A. Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brenda Jones, as CoAdministrator of the Estate of John David Hortman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh Esq.
Represented By: Arthur Alan Wolk Esq.
Represented By: John Gagliano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Goodrich Pump & Engine Control Systems, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Rotondo
Represented By: John W. Cerreta Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rolls-Royce Corp
Represented By: Steven E. Arnold Esq.
Represented By: James Denny Shupe Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Williams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Boeing Co
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomen Esq.
Represented By: Shawn Smith Esq.
Represented By: Steven Scott Bell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?