Komatsu v. The City of New York
Defendant: Officer Jane Doe 1, Rachel Atcheson, Joe Baccellieri, in his official capacity as Chief of the New York State Unified Court System's Court Officers Academy, New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities, Janet DiFiore, in her capacity as Chief Judge of the State of New York, Ostacio Negron, Bronx Supreme Court Major, Shawn Kerby, Shauna Stribula, Jeff Lynch, New York City Police Department, "NYPD", Marco Carrion, Jessica Ramos, John Doe 3, Monica Hanna, Paola Ruiz, NYPD CAU, Bronx Supreme Court Officer John Doe 1, Paul Briscoe, Lawrence K. Marks, in his official capacity as Chief Administrative Judge of the State of New York, Michael Magliano, in his official capacity as Chief of Public Safety for the New York State Unified Court System, Ricky Da Costa, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Nick Gulotta, Kenneth Monahan, John Doe 1 and Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of New York
Defendant / Appellee: NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577, NYPD Inspector Howard Redmond, Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141, NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves, NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326, Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer, NYPD Officer Yu Lie, Tax ID: #96083, Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478), Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508), Harold Miller, Pinny Ringel and City of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Case Number: 20-3093
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 10/09/2020, determining the appeal to SDNY, copy to pro se Appellant, ISSUED.[Mandate][2966110] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708, 20-3093] [Entered: 11/03/2020 07:46 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 26 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2949004] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708, 20-3093] [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:03 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 APPEALS, pursuant to court order, dated 10/09/2020, DISMISSED.[2949003] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708, 20-3093] [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:02 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION ORDER, dismissing these appeals, with the exception of 20-2261, for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant's motions with respect to these dismissed appeals are denied as moot. It is further ORDERED that Appellants motion to reverse the district court's order in appeal 20-2261 is denied as premature and appeal 20-2261 shall proceed in the ordinary course, by BDP, DC, T. STANCEU, copy to pro se Appellant, FILED. [2948994][24] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708, 20-3093] [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:57 AM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION, to compel, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708, 20-3093, FILED. Service date 09/29/2020 by email.[2942275] [20-1717, 20-1721, 20-1722, 20-1757, 20-1802, 20-2237, 20-2238, 20-2261, 20-2383, 20-2590, 20-2708, 20-3093] [Entered: 10/01/2020 01:37 AM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE, to Appellees Matthew Brunner, Ramon Dominguez and Anthony Manzi, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2940568] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:45 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Jonathan A. Popolow, [ # 16 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2934644] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/21/2020 10:23 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Jonathan A. Popolow, [ # 16 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2934638] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/21/2020 10:19 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rafael Beato, Howard Redmond, Ralph Nieves, Raymond Gerola, Harold Miller, Pinny Ringel, Andrew Berkowitz, Yu Lie, City of New York and Rachel Atcheson, FILED. Service date 09/21/2020 by US mail. [2934632] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/21/2020 10:15 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 09/16/2020 by US mail.[2932503] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:24 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 09/16/2020 by email.[2932500] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:24 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2929581] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/12/2020 08:22 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2929580] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/12/2020 08:19 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTE: See lead case, 20-1717, containing complete set of docket entries.[2929577] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/12/2020 08:15 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2929576] [20-3093] [Entered: 09/12/2020 08:14 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 20-1717, FILED. [2929575] [20-3093, 20-1717] [Entered: 09/12/2020 08:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Komatsu v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Detective Raymond Gerola, Shield No. 6577
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Inspector Howard Redmond
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Detective Andrew Berkowitz, Shield No. 7141
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Rafael Beato, Shield No. 13326
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Captain Anthony Manzi, Bronx Supreme Court Officer
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Yu Lie, Tax ID: #96083
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Matthew Brunner, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #478)
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ramon Dominguez, Bronx Supreme Court Officer (Shield #508)
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Harold Miller
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pinny Ringel
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Atcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Baccellieri, in his official capacity as Chief of the New York State Unified Court System's Court Officers Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office of Court Administration, in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet DiFiore, in her capacity as Chief Judge of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ostacio Negron, Bronx Supreme Court Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Kerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna Stribula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department, "NYPD"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Carrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paola Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD CAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronx Supreme Court Officer John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence K. Marks, in his official capacity as Chief Administrative Judge of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Magliano, in his official capacity as Chief of Public Safety for the New York State Unified Court System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Da Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Gulotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Represented By: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?