In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie
Plaintiff: Marc S Kirschner, as Trustee for the NWHI Litigation Trust and ABC
Defendant: Prudential Financial, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Harvest Street Capital LLC, Stacey A. Harmon, Roy Chan, KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism, Investment Managers Series Trust, (Towle Deep Value Fund), The Hartford Life Insurance Company, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund, Defendant NJ-1, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, AKA BlackRock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, Wisdom Tree Asset Management Inc., Vincent Morales, Arlene Starr, iShares Russell 3000 ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund, Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Virtu Americas LLC, Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series), DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DWS Small Cap Index VIP, The Arbitrate Fund, TIAA-CREF Funds, Suzanne Karkus, Michael G. Demko, Gerald C. Crotty, Larissa Sygida, Jack Gross, John W. Deem, State Street Bank Maya Account Holder, Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool, Ira M. Dansky, Defendant NY-19, Joseph T. Donnalley, Mary E. Belle, AQR Delta Master Account, L.P., Two Greenwich Plaza 3rd Fl. Greenwich, CT 06830, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, Schwab Capital Trust, Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, Hallador Balanced Fund LLC, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, FKA JHT Small Cap Index Trust, James Capiola, Ira Margulies, Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust, Dimensional Funds plc U.S. Small Companies Fund,, AKA Irish U.S. Small Cap Fund, Janice Brown, WisdomTree U.S. SmallCap Fund, FKA WisdomTree SmallCap Earnings Fund, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Fidelity Monthly Income Fund, Blue Shield of California, U.S. Small Cap Subtrust, AKA Defendant TX-17, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund, BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Stuart Weitzman, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Micro Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 1 Portfolio, Mark DeZao, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, AKA Ishares Russell 2000 Small-Cap Index Fund, Christopher R. Cade, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Defendant NJ-2, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, EQ Advisors Trust, (ATM Small Cap Managed Volatility Portfolio), Bam Advisor Services, DBA Loring Ward, George Sharp, Vanguard Index Funds, (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund), Lori L. Grace, Vanguard Institutional Index Funds, (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund), AQR DELTA XN Master Account, L.P., Two Greenwich Plaza 3rd Fl. Greenwich, CT 06830, State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Equities, Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc., (Smallcap Value Account I), Geode Diversified Fund, A segregated account of Geode Capital Master Fund Ltd. formerly known as GDF1, a segregated account of Geode Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fidelity Balanced Private Pool, Arthur E. Lee, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc TA US Core Equity 2 Portfolio, AKA Defendant TX-2, Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P., FKA Enhanced Rafi US Large LP, Robyn Whitney Mills, Francis X Claps, Prudential Retirement Insurance and Annuity Co., Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool, Proshares Trust, (Proshares Merger ETF), Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc., (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund), Unified Series Trust, (Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund), Panagora Asset Management Inc., Gabelli Investor Funds Inc., (The Gabelli ABC Fund), Defendant NJ-4, Gardner Lewis Merger Arbitrage Fund II, L.P., Defendant NJ-3, WCFS Inc., Gregory Clark, SA U.S. Small Company Fund, Tudor Trading I, LP, Natixis SA, Valued Advisers Trust, (Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund), Federated Equity Funds, (Federated Clover Small Value Fund), EQ Advisors Trust, (EQ/2000 Managed Volatility Portfolio), Stephen C. Troy, DFA Investment Trust Company Tax-Managed US Marketwide Value Series, AKA Defendant TX-7, Community Insurance Company, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A, State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Ishares 405, Donna F. Zarcone, MFO Management Company, (Towle Fund), Metropolitan Life Insurance Co, Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., Fidelity Investments, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Targeted Value Portfolio, AKA Nationwide US Targeted Value Strategy, Suzanne Maloney, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, FKA JHT Small Cap Index Trust, Schwab Small-Cap Index Fund, Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool, USAA Extended Market Index Fund, Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool, Extended Equity Market Fund, AKA Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A., Russell 3000 Index Fund, AKA Ishares Total U.S. Stock Market Index Fund, Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund, iShares Europe, State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF, WisdomTree U.S. SmallCap Dividend Fund, FKA WisdomTree SmallCap Dividend Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund LP, AKA Defendant TX-12, Thomas M. Murray PO N. Murray Jt Ten, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, Dynamic Offshore Fund Ltd., Hartford Mutual Funds II Inc., (Hartford Schroders US Small Cap Opportunities Fund), DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Targeted Value Portfolio, Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool, James T. Ostrowski, Priac Funds, Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC, Bryan R. Gilligan, Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P., Fedex Corporation, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Nicola Guarna, DT DV Market Completion Fund, Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Joseph A. Rosato, Matthew H. Kamens, Securian Life Insurance Co., FKA Minnesota Life Insurance Co., Linda V. Kothe, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Social Core Equity 2 Portfolio, AKA Defendant TX-5, Cynthia Foy Rupp, Blue Cross of California, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund, Scott Bowman, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust, (LVIP SSGA Small-Cap Index Fund), iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, Gerald Hood, Susan Duffy, Russell 2500 Index Fund, AKA Ishares Russell Small/Mid-Cap Index Fund, Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company I- Small Cap Special Values Fund, Touchstone Funds Group Trust, (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund), State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund, AKA U.S. Extended Market Fund SL, Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A, Sidney Kimmel, Nationwide Mutual Funds, (Nationwide U.S. Small Cap Value Fund), James Chan, Pacific Select Fund - PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, American International Group Inc., College Retirement Equities Fund, (CREF Equity Index Account), Patricia Kenny, KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites, DAGT Small Cap Outliers, State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF, Norman R Veit, Jr., American Beacon Small Cap Value Fund, AKA Defendant TX-10, Vanguard World Fund, (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund), RBB Fund, Inc., (WPG Partners Small/Micro Cap Value Fund), Eric Dauwalter, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund), Gardner Lewis Event Driven Fund, L.P., John D'Souza, Wayne Kulkin, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Wells Fargo Disciplined Small Cap Fund, FKA Wells Fargo Small Cap Opportunities Fund, PG and E Co. Nuclear Facilities Qualified Cpuc Decommissioning Master Trust, Joseph Stafiniak, Lynne Bernstock, Ninive Giordano, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., State Street North America Confidential Client 1 FOF, Wolverine Asset Management LLC, Rhumbline Advisers LP, Defendant NY-18, U.S. Equity Market Fund B, Defendant NY-1, Tax-Managed US Equity Series, AKA Defendant TX-16, Tami Fersko, Barington Companies Investors, LLC, Beth B. Dorfsman, Pentwater Capital Management LP, Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund, Stefani Greenfield, DEF, Jamie Cygielman, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Value Portfolio, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF, Jodi G. Wright, Boston Partners Asset Management, LLC, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Portfolio, Pillsbury, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., Rosa Genovesi, Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund, Alison Hemming, Gregg Marks, Principal Funds Inc., (Global Multi-Strategy Fund), Laurie J. Gentile, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Janet Carr, Jeff Brisman, State Street Bank and Trust Co., Robert L. Mettler, Quantitative Management Associates LLC, Chi Operating Investment Program, LP, Brighthouse Funds Trust II, FKA Brighthouse Funds Trust Met-Series, Pamela M. Paul, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, Dynamic Capital Management, LLC, Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Sharon Harger, AQR Funds, (AQR Diversified Arbitrage Fund), Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co., FIAM LLC, AKA Fidelity Institutional Asset Management, FKA Pyramis Global Advisors, Barbara Kreger, Principal Funds Inc., (Smallcap Value Fund II), Zine Mazouzi, John D. Demsey, TFS Capital LLC, Kenny Allan Troutt Separate Trust Estate, AKA Defendant TX-13, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds, (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund), SEI Institutional Investments Trust, (SIIT Small Cap Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust, (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund), (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund), Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Fidelity Total Market Index Fund, Arbor Place LTD. Partnership, Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, (NVIT Multi-Manager Small Cap Value Fund), Nationwide Mutual Funds, (Nationwide Small Cap Index Fund), JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, AKA John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust Sea Small Cap, JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund, Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio, State Farm Varible Products Trust-Small Cap Equity Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors, Two Sigma Investments LP, John T McClain, Nancy L. Lee, Robert Rodriguez, Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd., The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, Towle Deep Value Fund, Allianz Global Investors of America L.P, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Vanguard Index Funds, (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund), HBK Master Fund L.P., AKA Defendant TX-11, U.S. Equity Market Fund, CNH Opportunistic Premium Offshore Fund, L.P., Two Greenwich Plaza 3rd Fl. Greenwich, CT 06830, Pinebridge Investments LP, Susan M. McCoy, Voya Russell Small Cap Index Portfolio, 230 Park Ave New York, NY 10169, Schwab Fundamental US Small Company Index Fund, Prelude Opportunity Fund, LP, Fidelity Income Allocation Fund, FKA Fidelity Monthly High Income Fund, American Family Mutual Insurance Co., Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Royce Fund, (Royce Opportunity Fund), DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Small Cap Portfolio, Defendant TX-3, Susquehanna International Group LLP, Pinnacle West Corp., Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND, US Small Company Fund, Boston Partners Global Investors Inc., DFA Australia Limited Global Core Equity Trust, AKA Defendant TX-1, Richard H. Hein, Trustee, Richard H. Hein Rev. Trust U/A, Robeco Capital Growth Funds-Robeco BP US Premium Equities, FKA Boston Partners US Premium Equity Fund, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD, FKA Manulife Asset Management North America LTD, Defendant IL-1, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Small Cap Value Subtrust, AKA Defendant TX-15, State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF, Manulife Financial, Calvert Variable Products, Inc., (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels, George M. Klabin, James A. Mitarotonda, GTE Investment Management Corp., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., FKA Allianz Global Investors of America LP, Defendant NY-8, Litman Gregory Masters Alternative Strategies Fund, The GDL Fund, Vanguard Index Funds, (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund), Towle Capital Partners LP, The Bank of New York Mellon, Trustee, AKA BNY Mellon MIDCAP SPDRS, Charles Joseph Pickett, Daniel Fishman, Mahmood Hassani-Sadi, AQR Delta Sapphire Fund, L.P., Two Greenwich Plaza 3rd Fl. Greenwich, CT 06830, Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, Emerson Electric Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner and Smith Incorporated, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, Hawaii DE LLC, SEI Institutional Managed Trust, (SIMT Small Cap Value Fund), Tradition Securities and Derivatives Inc., Whitney L. Smith, Longfellow Investment Management Co., LLC, Boston Partners, LLC., Lowell W. Robinson, Katherine Butler, Dimensional Funds PLC Global Targeted Value Fund, Micro Cap Subtrust, AKA Defendant TX-14, Odin Holdings LP, Defendant IL-2, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Vector Equity Portfolio, AKA Defendant TX-6, AQR Absolute Return Master Account, L.P., Two Greenwich Plaza 3rd Fl. Greenwich, CT 06830, DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., FKA Deutsche Asset Management (Scudder), Irene A. Koumendouros, George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Dreman Contrarian Funds, (Dreman Contrarian Small Cap Value Fund), DFA US Core Equity Fund, AKA Defendant TX-8, Brown Brothers Harriman and Co. Client No. 3, Aida Tejero-Decolli, Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund, Gotham Absolute Return Fund, California Physicians' Service, DBA Blue Shield of California, Heather Harlan, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, (Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund), The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Extended Market Index Fund, Wesley R Card, Royce Institutional, LLC, (Opportunity Portfolio), State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund, AQR Funds-AQR Multi-Strategy Alternative Fund, SPDR S&P MIDCAP 400 ETF Trust, The Bank of New York Mellon, Trustee, AKA BNY Mellon MIDCAP SPDRS, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, TIAA-CREF Funds, (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund), State Street Global Advisors Total ETF, Gardner Lewis Merger Arbitrage Fund, L.P., John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, AKA John Hancock II Sea Small Cap, Thomas Nolan, Defendant NY-24, Eileen Dunn, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, (Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund), Russell 2000 Index Fund, DFA US Vector Equity Fund, AKA Defendant TX-9, Frances Lukas, Cref Equity Index Account, Heather Roussel, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Blackrock Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Advisors Series Trust, (Kellner Merger Fund), Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Towle Capital Partners II LP, Fidelity Northstar Fund, TIAA-CREF Funds, (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), Nicoletta Palma, Vericimetry US Small Cap Value Fund, Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company I- Small Cap Index Fund, Arundhati Kulkarni, Dianne Card, CNH Master Account, L.P., Two Greenwich Plaza 3rd Fl. Greenwich, CT 06830, Mitchel Levine, Vanguard Index Funds, (Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund), Richard Dickson, HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund L.P., AKA Defendant TX-12, Robeco Capital Growth Funds - Robeco BP US Premium Equities, FKA Boston Partners US Premium Equity Fund and AQR Funds-AQR Diversified Arbitrage Fund, (AQR Diversified Arbitrage Fund)
Defendant / Appellee: State Farm Variable Products Trust, Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Northern Small Cap Core Fund, Northern Small Cap Value Fund, Telendos, LLC, Northern Small Cap Index Fund, HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., State Farm Small Cap Index Fund, Mary Margaret Hastin Georgiades, Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund, Peak6 Investments LLC, FKA PEAK6 Investments, L.P., Nuveen Small Cap Index Fund and Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades
Plaintiff / Appellant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine West Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 20-3315
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 68 ATTORNEY, Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3326 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3315 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3327 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3290 , [ # 67 ], ADDED.[2979089] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:51 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, 20-3290, Marc S Kirschner and Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, FILED. Service date 11/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2979066] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:35 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 66 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3290, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335 Brief due date as 01/22/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/22/2021, FILED.[2967292] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 11/04/2020 09:57 AM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 65 NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[2967218] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 11/04/2020 09:05 AM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 61 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust, FILED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2958889] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:59 AM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 60 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, 20-3290, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, informing Court of proposed due date 01/22/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2958829] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:12 AM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice, Counsel is directed to register as a Filing User under Local Rule 25.1 to file documents electronically in this case within three (3) days of the date of this order. [ # 46 ] filed by Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust, by WJN, FILED. [2958555][59] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/22/2020 04:42 PM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 55 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 46 ], on behalf of Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust in 20-3257, 20-3315, FILED. Service date 10/20/2020 by email, CM/ECF.[2956717][55] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/21/2020 03:48 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 50 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 35 ], [ # 49 ], on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED.[2954892] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/19/2020 11:39 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 49 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954759] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:02 AM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw document [ # 2952483-2 ]; withdrawing motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 2948167-2 ] in 20-3257, 20-3290, FILED. [2953116][48] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:44 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Robert Scott Saunders for Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades Telendos, LLC, in case 20-3315 Robert Scott Saunders for Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades Telendos, LLC, in case 20-3257 , [ # 43 ], ADDED.[2952445] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/15/2020 06:21 AM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust in 20-3257, 20-3315, FILED. Service date 10/15/2020 by email, CM/ECF.[2953094] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:30 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades and Telendos, LLC in 20-3257, 20-3315, FILED. Service date 10/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2952377] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/14/2020 08:20 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 38 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Defendant IL-1, Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund, Northern Small Cap Core Fund, Northern Small Cap Index Fund and Northern Small Cap Value Fund, FILED. Service date 10/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2951988] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/14/2020 02:40 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Joshua Dunn for HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., in case 20-3315 Joshua Dunn for HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., in case 20-3257 , [ # 31 ], ADDED.[2951984] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/14/2020 02:37 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3326 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3315 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3257 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3327 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3290 , [ # 2949738-2 ], [ # 2949740-2 ], [ # 30 ], [ # 2949743-2 ], [ # 2949745-2 ], ADDED.[2951706] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 10/14/2020 12:06 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 35 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [27], on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED.[2951310] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/14/2020 08:09 AM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Allison B. Hudson for HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., in case 20-3315 Allison B. Hudson for HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., in case 20-3257 , [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2951307] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/14/2020 07:50 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY, Allison B. Hudson for HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., in case 20-3315 Allison B. Hudson for HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., in case 20-3257 , [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2950984] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:26 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 32 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mary Margaret Hastin Georgiades and Telendos, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2949869] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/12/2020 09:29 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HFR Asset Management, L.L.C. in 20-3257, 20-3315, FILED. Service date 10/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2949813] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/12/2020 11:11 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 10/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2949741] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 05:58 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 10/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2949718] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 05:19 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 28 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 10/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2949183] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:36 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 10/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2949177] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:35 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HFR Asset Management, L.L.C. in 20-3257, 20-3315, FILED. Service date 10/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2949164] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:27 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., FILED. Service date 10/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2949158] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:24 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, Brian J. Fischer, [ # 23 ], in place of attorney Louis Fogel, SUBSTITUTED.[2949124] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:00 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Peak6 Investments LLC in 20-3257, 20-3315, FILED. Service date 10/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2949113] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:52 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION ORDER, deferring motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 2948167-2 ] filed by Appellee DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 1 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Micro Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Value Portfolio, Dimensional Funds PLC Global Targeted Value Fund, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Targeted Value Portfolio, DFA Australia Limited Global Core Equity Trust, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc TA US Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Small Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Targeted Value Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Social Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Vector Equity Portfolio, DFA Investment Trust Company Tax-Managed US Marketwide Value Series, DFA US Core Equity Fund, DFA US Vector Equity Fund, Micro Cap Subtrust, Small Cap Value Subtrust, Tax-Managed US Equity Series, U.S. Small Cap Subtrust and Dimensional Funds plc U.S. Small Companies Fund, Within seven (7)days of the date of this order, Mr. Florence must submit a declaration in support of his motion that complies with Local Rule 46.1(d)(3), FILED. [2949076][22] [20-3257, 20-3290]--[Edited 10/09/2020 by RD] [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:30 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, William W. Thorsness for HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., in case 20-3315 William W. Thorsness for HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., in case 20-3257 , [ # 18 ], ADDED.[2948709] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 07:11 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY, Gregg Weiner, [ # 17 ], in place of attorney Timothy Farrell, SUBSTITUTED.[2948707] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/09/2020 06:51 AM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HFR Asset Management, L.L.C. in 20-3257, 20-3315, FILED. Service date 10/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2948552] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/08/2020 05:53 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund, Northern Small Cap Core Fund, Northern Small Cap Index Fund and Northern Small Cap Value Fund in 20-3257, 20-3315, FILED. Service date 10/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2948403] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:11 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Nuveen Small Cap Index Fund, FILED. Service date 10/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2948218] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:34 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Louis E. Fogel for Appellee Peak6 Investments LLC, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2943636] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 08:07 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Steven P. Mandell, Esq. for Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2943120] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:24 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Allison Hudson, Esq. for Appellee HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2943110] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:22 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Timothy Ryan Farrell, Esq. for Appellee Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund, Northern Small Cap Core Fund, Northern Small Cap Index Fund and Northern Small Cap Value Fund, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2943093] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:20 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTE: See lead case, 20-3257, containing complete set of docket entries.[2943084] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:18 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2942909] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 01:13 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, district court receipt # NYSDC-21843621, FILED.[2942870] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 01:00 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/28/2020, RECEIVED.[2942853] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:57 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2942848] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:56 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. [2942827] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Financial, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvest Street Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey A. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investment Managers Series Trust, (Towle Deep Value Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, AKA BlackRock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisdom Tree Asset Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iShares Russell 3000 ETF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arbitrage Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtu Americas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 2 Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWS Small Cap Index VIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arbitrate Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIAA-CREF Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Karkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Demko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald C. Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa Sygida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Deem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank Maya Account Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira M. Dansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NY-19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph T. Donnalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E. Belle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQR Delta Master Account, L.P., Two Greenwich Plaza 3rd Fl. Greenwich, CT 06830
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ishares Russell 2000 ETF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwab Capital Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallador Balanced Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, FKA JHT Small Cap Index Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Capiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimensional Funds plc U.S. Small Companies Fund,, AKA Irish U.S. Small Cap Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WisdomTree U.S. SmallCap Fund, FKA WisdomTree SmallCap Earnings Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Alpha Group Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Monthly Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Small Cap Subtrust, AKA Defendant TX-17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Weitzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Micro Cap Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 1 Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark DeZao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, AKA Ishares Russell 2000 Small-Cap Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R. Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Equity Market Master Fund B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQ Advisors Trust, (ATM Small Cap Managed Volatility Portfolio)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bam Advisor Services, DBA Loring Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Index Funds, (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori L. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Institutional Index Funds, (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQR DELTA XN Master Account, L.P., Two Greenwich Plaza 3rd Fl. Greenwich, CT 06830
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Equities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc., (Smallcap Value Account I)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geode Diversified Fund, A segregated account of Geode Capital Master Fund Ltd. formerly known as GDF1, a segregated account of Geode Capital Master Fund Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Balanced Private Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur E. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc TA US Core Equity 2 Portfolio, AKA Defendant TX-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P., FKA Enhanced Rafi US Large LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Whitney Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis X Claps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Retirement Insurance and Annuity Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proshares Trust, (Proshares Merger ETF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc., (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Series Trust, (Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panagora Asset Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabelli Investor Funds Inc., (The Gabelli ABC Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Lewis Merger Arbitrage Fund II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCFS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA U.S. Small Company Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tudor Trading I, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natixis SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valued Advisers Trust, (Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Equity Funds, (Federated Clover Small Value Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQ Advisors Trust, (EQ/2000 Managed Volatility Portfolio)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Trust Company Tax-Managed US Marketwide Value Series, AKA Defendant TX-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Ishares 405
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna F. Zarcone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MFO Management Company, (Towle Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Asset Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Targeted Value Portfolio, AKA Nationwide US Targeted Value Strategy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, FKA JHT Small Cap Index Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwab Small-Cap Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Extended Market Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Equity Market Fund, AKA Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 3000 Index Fund, AKA Ishares Total U.S. Stock Market Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iShares Europe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WisdomTree U.S. SmallCap Dividend Fund, FKA WisdomTree SmallCap Dividend Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 2000 Value Fund B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund LP, AKA Defendant TX-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Murray PO N. Murray Jt Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic Offshore Fund Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Mutual Funds II Inc., (Hartford Schroders US Small Cap Opportunities Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Targeted Value Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priac Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan R. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicola Guarna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DT DV Market Completion Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew H. Kamens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securian Life Insurance Co., FKA Minnesota Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda V. Kothe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Social Core Equity 2 Portfolio, AKA Defendant TX-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Foy Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust, (LVIP SSGA Small-Cap Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 2500 Index Fund, AKA Ishares Russell Small/Mid-Cap Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company I- Small Cap Special Values Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touchstone Funds Group Trust, (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund, AKA U.S. Extended Market Fund SL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Kimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Funds, (Nationwide U.S. Small Cap Value Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Select Fund - PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College Retirement Equities Fund, (CREF Equity Index Account)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAGT Small Cap Outliers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman R Veit, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Beacon Small Cap Value Fund, AKA Defendant TX-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard World Fund, (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBB Fund, Inc., (WPG Partners Small/Micro Cap Value Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Dauwalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Lewis Event Driven Fund, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D'Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Kulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia DiPietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Disciplined Small Cap Fund, FKA Wells Fargo Small Cap Opportunities Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PG and E Co. Nuclear Facilities Qualified Cpuc Decommissioning Master Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stafiniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Bernstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninive Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street North America Confidential Client 1 FOF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolverine Asset Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhumbline Advisers LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NY-18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equity Market Fund B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NY-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax-Managed US Equity Series, AKA Defendant TX-16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami Fersko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barington Companies Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth B. Dorfsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentwater Capital Management LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefani Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Cygielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Value Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi G. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Partners Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pillsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Genovesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Hemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Funds Inc., (Global Multi-Strategy Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie J. Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Brisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank and Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantitative Management Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Operating Investment Program, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighthouse Funds Trust II, FKA Brighthouse Funds Trust Met-Series
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela M. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Institute of Land Policy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Harger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQR Funds, (AQR Diversified Arbitrage Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIAM LLC, AKA Fidelity Institutional Asset Management, FKA Pyramis Global Advisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Funds Inc., (Smallcap Value Fund II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zine Mazouzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Demsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TFS Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Allan Troutt Separate Trust Estate, AKA Defendant TX-13
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard International Equity Index Funds, (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Institutional Investments Trust, (SIIT Small Cap Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touchstone Funds Group Trust, (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund), (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Total Market Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Place LTD. Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, (NVIT Multi-Manager Small Cap Value Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Funds, (Nationwide Small Cap Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, AKA John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust Sea Small Cap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Varible Products Trust-Small Cap Equity Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Sigma Investments LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towle Deep Value Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Investors of America L.P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie C Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Index Funds, (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBK Master Fund L.P., AKA Defendant TX-11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equity Market Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Opportunistic Premium Offshore Fund, L.P., Two Greenwich Plaza 3rd Fl. Greenwich, CT 06830
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinebridge Investments LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voya Russell Small Cap Index Portfolio, 230 Park Ave New York, NY 10169
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwab Fundamental US Small Company Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prelude Opportunity Fund, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Income Allocation Fund, FKA Fidelity Monthly High Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royce Fund, (Royce Opportunity Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Small Cap Portfolio, Defendant TX-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susquehanna International Group LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle West Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Small Company Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Partners Global Investors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFA Australia Limited Global Core Equity Trust, AKA Defendant TX-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Hein, Trustee, Richard H. Hein Rev. Trust U/A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robeco Capital Growth Funds-Robeco BP US Premium Equities, FKA Boston Partners US Premium Equity Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD, FKA Manulife Asset Management North America LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant IL-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Cap Value Subtrust, AKA Defendant TX-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manulife Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvert Variable Products, Inc., (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Klabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Mitarotonda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE Investment Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., FKA Allianz Global Investors of America LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NY-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litman Gregory Masters Alternative Strategies Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The GDL Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Index Funds, (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towle Capital Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, Trustee, AKA BNY Mellon MIDCAP SPDRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web |