Hyland v. Navient Corporation
Plaintiff: Eldon R. Gaede, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Plaintiff / Appellee: Elizabeth Kaplan, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Jennifer Guth, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Melissa Garcia, Kathryn Hyland, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Anthony Church, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Jessica Saint-Paul, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Elizabeth Taylor, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Megan Nocerino, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Michelle Means, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and Melissa Garcia, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Appellant: William Yeatman and Richard Estle Carson, III
Defendant / Appellee: Navient Corporation and Navient Solutions LLC
Case Number: 20-3765
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 65 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Richard Estle Carson, III and William Yeatman in 20-3765 Brief due date as 02/11/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 02/11/2021, FILED.[2990392] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 12/09/2020 04:21 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 61 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[2990006] [20-3766, 20-3765] [Entered: 12/09/2020 01:17 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 60 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[2989979] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 12/09/2020 01:04 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 57 CAPTION, party text for plaintiff-appellee Melissa Garcia added, AMENDED.[2988118] [20-3765] [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:34 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 54 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Richard Estle Carson, III in 20-3766, 20-3765, informing Court of proposed due date 02/11/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 11/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2983133] [20-3766, 20-3765] [Entered: 11/30/2020 01:39 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 53 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant William Yeatman in 20-3765, informing Court of proposed due date 02/11/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 11/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2982418] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/25/2020 04:03 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 50 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Richard Estle Carson, III, FILED. Service date 11/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2976752] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/17/2020 09:24 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 49 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Richard Estle Carson, III, FILED. Service date 11/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2976751] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/17/2020 09:22 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 48 ATTORNEY, Andrew A. Ruffino for Navient Solutions LLC Navient Corporation, in case 20-3765 Andrew A. Ruffino for Navient Solutions LLC Navient Corporation, in case 20-3766 , [ # 47 ], ADDED.[2976313] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 01:57 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Navient Solutions LLC and Navient Corporation in 20-3765, 20-3766, FILED. Service date 11/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2976207] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 01:10 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 46 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Navient Corporation and Navient Solutions LLC, FILED. Service date 11/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2976143] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/17/2020 12:24 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 45 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 26 ], [ # 37 ], on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3765, 20-3766, FILED.[2975709] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:57 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, David Coon for Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3765 David Coon for Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3766 , [ # 37 ], ADDED.[2975708] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:55 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 43 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 25 ], [ # 36 ], on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3765, Appellee Anthony Church, Eldon R. Gaede, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3766, FILED.[2975707] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:53 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, Ronald Krock II for Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3765 Ronald Krock II for Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3766 , [ # 36 ], ADDED.[2975706] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:51 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 41 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 24 ], [ # 35 ], on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3765, Appellee Anthony Church, Eldon R. Gaede, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3766, FILED.[2975705] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:48 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 40 ATTORNEY, Yelena Konanova for Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3765 Yelena Konanova for Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3766 , [ # 35 ], ADDED.[2975704] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:46 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 39 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 23 ], [ # 34 ], on behalf of Appellee Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3765 Caitlin Joan Halligan for Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3766, FILED.[2975703] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:43 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, Caitlin Joan Halligan for Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3765 Caitlin Joan Halligan for Jessica Saint-Paul Anthony Church Elizabeth Kaplan Megan Nocerino Melissa Garcia Jennifer Guth Elizabeth Taylor Kathryn Hyland Rebecca Spitler-Lawson Michelle Means, in case 20-3766 , [ # 34 ], ADDED.[2975702] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:39 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kathryn Hyland, Melissa Garcia, Elizabeth Taylor, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson, Michelle Means, Elizabeth Kaplan, Jennifer Guth, Megan Nocerino and Anthony Church in 20-3766, 20-3765, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2975639] [20-3766, 20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 06:30 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kathryn Hyland, Melissa Garcia, Elizabeth Taylor, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson, Michelle Means, Elizabeth Kaplan, Jennifer Guth, Megan Nocerino and Anthony Church in 20-3766, 20-3765, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2975638] [20-3766, 20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 06:27 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kathryn Hyland, Melissa Garcia, Elizabeth Taylor, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson, Michelle Means, Elizabeth Kaplan, Jennifer Guth, Megan Nocerino and Anthony Church in 20-3766, 20-3765, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2975637] [20-3766, 20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 06:25 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kathryn Hyland, Melissa Garcia, Elizabeth Taylor, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson, Michelle Means, Elizabeth Kaplan, Jennifer Guth, Megan Nocerino and Anthony Church in 20-3766, 20-3765, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2975632] [20-3766, 20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 06:19 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 31 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 29 ], [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellant William Yeatman, FILED.[2975445] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 04:09 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 30 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant William Yeatman, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2975418] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:54 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 29 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [28], on behalf of Appellant William Yeatman, FILED.[2975395] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:44 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 28 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant William Yeatman, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2975394] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:42 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 27 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant William Yeatman, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2975380] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:35 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 26 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [20], on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3765, Appellee Jessica Saint-Paul in 20-3766, FILED.[2975287] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:56 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 25 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [19], on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino and Jessica Saint-Paul in 20-3765, Appellee Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3766, FILED.[2975280] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:52 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [18], on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means and Rebecca Spitler-Lawson in 20-3765, Appellee Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul and Rebecca Spitler-Lawson in 20-3766, FILED.[2975270] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:48 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [17], on behalf of Appellee Michelle Means and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3765, Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul and Rebecca Spitler-Lawson in 20-3766, FILED.[2975261] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:43 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 21 CAPTION, designation for party Eldon R. Gaede, changed to plaintiff, AMENDED.[2975199] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:10 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3765, Appellee Jessica Saint-Paul in 20-3766, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2975155] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:31 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino and Jessica Saint-Paul in 20-3765, Appellee Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3766, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2975126] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:13 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means and Rebecca Spitler-Lawson in 20-3765, Appellee Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul and Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3766, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2975124] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:10 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Elizabeth Taylor in 20-3765, Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul and Rebecca Spitler-Lawson in 20-3766, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2975121] [20-3765, 20-3766] [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:04 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Anthony Church, Melissa Garcia, Jennifer Guth, Kathryn Hyland, Elizabeth Kaplan, Michelle Means, Megan Nocerino, Jessica Saint-Paul, Rebecca Spitler-Lawson and Elizabeth Taylor, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2975111] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:58 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William Yeatman, FILED. Service date 11/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2970913] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/09/2020 03:35 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Richard Estle Carson, III, FILED. Service date 11/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2968595] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/05/2020 12:40 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2968130] [20-3766] [Entered: 11/04/2020 07:19 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTE: See lead case, 20-3765, containing complete set of docket entries.[2968129] [20-3766] [Entered: 11/04/2020 07:18 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Richard Estle Carson, III in 20-3766, FILED. [2968125] [20-3766, 20-3765] [Entered: 11/04/2020 07:10 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2968123] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/04/2020 07:06 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant William Yeatman, district court receipt # ANYSDC-22423834, FILED.[2968121] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/04/2020 07:04 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/09/2020, RECEIVED.[2968120] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/04/2020 07:02 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant William Yeatman, FILED. [2968117] [20-3765] [Entered: 11/04/2020 06:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hyland v. Navient Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elizabeth Kaplan, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jennifer Guth, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Melissa Garcia
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kathryn Hyland, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Anthony Church, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jessica Saint-Paul, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elizabeth Taylor, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Megan Nocerino, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rebecca Spitler-Lawson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michelle Means, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Melissa Garcia, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Faith E. Gay Esq.
Represented By: Mark Richard Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: David Coon Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Krock Esq. II
Represented By: Yelena Konanova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: William Yeatman
Represented By: Anna St. John Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Estle Carson, III
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Navient Corporation
Represented By: Andrew A. Ruffino
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Navient Solutions LLC
Represented By: Andrew A. Ruffino
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon R. Gaede, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?