In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie
Defendant: Wayne Kulkin, Gregg Marks, Mary E. Belle, Joseph Stafiniak, Francis X Claps and Nicoletta Palma
Defendant / Appellee: Katherine Butler, Chi Operating Investment Program, LP, Jamie Cygielman, The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds, Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund, Heather Roussel, Sharon Harger, Matthew H. Kamens, Joseph A. Rosato, American International Group Inc., Lowell W. Robinson, Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, (NVIT Multi-Manager Small Cap Value Fund), Barington Companies Investors, LLC, RBB Fund, Inc., Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co., Gerald Hood, Scott Bowman, EQ Advisors Trust, (EQ/2000 Managed Volatility Portfolio), Royce Institutional, LLC, (Opportunity Portfolio), Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund, Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Institutional Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund, Natixis SA, Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, Nationwide Mutual Funds, (Nationwide Small Cap Index Fund), The GDL Fund, Principal Funds Inc., (Smallcap Value Fund II), Aida Tejero-Decolli, Amy Rapawy, Odin Holdings LP, Janet Carr, Zine Mazouzi, Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd., Valued Advisers Trust, Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund, Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Stefani Greenfield, SEI Institutional Investments Trust, (SIIT Small Cap Fund), Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series), Pinebridge Investments LP, Federated Equity Funds, (Federated Clover Small Value Fund), Robyn Whitney Mills, TIAA-CREF Funds, KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism, Eileen Dunn, Frances Lukas, Jodi G. Wright, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Community Insurance Company, College Retirement Equities Fund, CREF Equity Index Account, KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels, Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc., (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund), Mitchel Levine, Lynne Bernstock, Dreman Contrarian Funds, (Dreman Contrarian Small Cap Value Fund), Gabelli Investor Funds Inc., (The Gabelli ABC Fund), Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio, Proshares Trust, (Proshares Merger ETF), Nationwide Mutual Funds, (Nationwide U.S. Small Cap Value Fund), The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, James Chan, Touchstone Funds Group Trust, Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund, FKA Touchstone Arbitrage Fund, FKA Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund, Larissa Sygida, Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, John D. Demsey, Suzanne Karkus, Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, (NVIT Small Cap Index Fund), Janice Brown, Donna F. Zarcone, Roy Chan, James Capiola, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co, Cref Equity Index Account, Susquehanna International Group LLP, Gregory Clark, KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites, Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc., (Smallcap Value Account I), EQ Advisors Trust, (ATM Small Cap Managed Volatility Portfolio), Stuart Weitzman, Susan Duffy, Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust, (LVIP SSGA Small-Cap Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds, (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund), Joseph T. Donnalley, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund, TIAA-CREF Funds, (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund, Rosa Genovesi, Stephen C. Troy, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Securian Life Insurance Co., AKA Minnesota Life Insurance Co., Daniel Fishman, Allianz Global Investors of America LP, FKA Allianz Global Investors of America LP, James T. Ostrowski, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund, Heather Harlan, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Sidney Kimmel, Barbara Kreger, Norman R. Veit, Jr., Eric Dauwalter, SEI Institutional Managed Trust, (SIMT Small Cap Value Fund), Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND, Calvert Variable Products, Inc., (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund, Principal Funds Inc., Global Multi-Strategy Fund, Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P., James A. Mitarotonda, Two Sigma Investments LP, American Family Mutual Insurance Co., Kimberly Thomas, Unified Series Trust, Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund, Vanguard World Fund, Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund, TFS Capital LLC, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund and George Sharp
Plaintiff / Appellant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine West Holdings, Inc and Marc S Kirschner, as Trustee for the NWHI Litigation Trust
Case Number: 20-3981
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., Bam Advisor Services, SA U.S. Small Company Fund, Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Financial and Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD in 20-3941, Appellee Transamerica Asset Management, Inc. in 20-3959, 20-3961, Appellee Bam Advisor Services and SA U.S. Small Company Fund in 20-3964, 20-3980, Appellee Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund in 20-3981, Appellee JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Financial and Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD in 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2987300] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/04/2020 05:47 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., Bam Advisor Services, SA U.S. Small Company Fund, Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD and Manulife Financial in 20-3941, Appellee Transamerica Asset Management, Inc. in 20-3959, 20-3961, Appellee Bam Advisor Services and SA U.S. Small Company Fund in 20-3964, 20-3980, Appellee Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund in 20-3981, Appellee JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD and Manulife Financial in 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2987280] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/04/2020 05:30 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2987203] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/04/2020 04:26 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Wayne Kulkin in 20-3981, 20-3941, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2987139] [20-3981, 20-3941] [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:57 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee American Family Mutual Insurance Co., FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2987111] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:43 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Lawrence G. Scarborough, [ # 25 ], in place of attorney Mary Stephanie Wickouski, SUBSTITUTED.[2987080] [20-3981, 20-3941] [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:29 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee American Family Mutual Insurance Co., FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2987067] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:21 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 24 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2986666] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:05 AM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 23 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2986663] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:04 AM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Valued Advisers Trust, FILED. Service date 12/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2986260] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/03/2020 05:16 PM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee George Sharp, FILED. Service date 12/03/2020 by CM/ECF.[2985798] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:29 PM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Heather Harlan, FILED. Service date 12/03/2020 by CM/ECF.[2985795] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:28 PM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Stefani Greenfield, FILED. Service date 12/03/2020 by CM/ECF.[2985576] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:33 AM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3941, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3952, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2985483] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/03/2020 09:47 AM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Joseph T. Kelleher for Nationwide Mutual Funds Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, in case 20-3981 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2985333] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/03/2020 01:19 AM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3941 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3952 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3964 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3961 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3998 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3969 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3959 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3981 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3992 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3980 , [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2985330] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/03/2020 01:08 AM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Nationwide Mutual Funds and Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, FILED. Service date 12/02/2020 by CM/ECF. [2985294] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/02/2020 08:32 PM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3941, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3952, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/02/2020 by CM/ECF. [2985138] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/02/2020 04:17 PM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 12/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2985043] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:14 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cref Equity Index Account, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds and TIAA-CREF Funds, FILED. Service date 12/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2984397] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/01/2020 05:27 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTE: See lead case, 20-3941, containing complete set of docket entries.[2983213] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:35 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2983189] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:12 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, district court receipt # NYSDC-22678570, FILED.[2983185] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:10 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/19/2020, RECEIVED.[2983181] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:08 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2983170] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:02 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3981, FILED. [2983154] [20-3981, 20-3941] [Entered: 11/30/2020 01:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Katherine Butler
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chi Operating Investment Program, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jamie Cygielman
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard International Equity Index Funds, Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Heather Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sharon Harger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Matthew H. Kamens
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph A. Rosato
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American International Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lowell W. Robinson
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, (NVIT Multi-Manager Small Cap Value Fund)
Represented By: Joseph T. Kelleher Esq.
Represented By: Marissa Rachel Parker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barington Companies Investors, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RBB Fund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gerald Hood
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Bowman
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EQ Advisors Trust, (EQ/2000 Managed Volatility Portfolio)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Royce Institutional, LLC, (Opportunity Portfolio)
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Institutional Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Natixis SA
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nationwide Mutual Funds, (Nationwide Small Cap Index Fund)
Represented By: Joseph T. Kelleher Esq.
Represented By: Marissa Rachel Parker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The GDL Fund
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Principal Funds Inc., (Smallcap Value Fund II)
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Aida Tejero-Decolli
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amy Rapawy
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Odin Holdings LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Janet Carr
Represented By: James P. Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Zine Mazouzi
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Valued Advisers Trust, Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund
Represented By: Marissa Rachel Parker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stefani Greenfield
Represented By: David A. Schrader Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEI Institutional Investments Trust, (SIIT Small Cap Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pinebridge Investments LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federated Equity Funds, (Federated Clover Small Value Fund)
Represented By: Brian D. Koosed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robyn Whitney Mills
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIAA-CREF Funds
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eileen Dunn
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Frances Lukas
Represented By: Harlan M. Lazarus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jodi G. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Valley Forge Funds
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Community Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: College Retirement Equities Fund, CREF Equity Index Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc., (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund)
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mitchel Levine
Represented By: Harlan M. Lazarus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lynne Bernstock
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dreman Contrarian Funds, (Dreman Contrarian Small Cap Value Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gabelli Investor Funds Inc., (The Gabelli ABC Fund)
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell
Represented By: Danielle C. Lesser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Proshares Trust, (Proshares Merger ETF)
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nationwide Mutual Funds, (Nationwide U.S. Small Cap Value Fund)
Represented By: Marissa Rachel Parker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Touchstone Funds Group Trust, Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund, FKA Touchstone Arbitrage Fund, FKA Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund
Represented By: Brian D. Koosed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Larissa Sygida
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John D. Demsey
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Suzanne Karkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, (NVIT Small Cap Index Fund)
Represented By: Marissa Rachel Parker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Janice Brown
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donna F. Zarcone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Roy Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Capiola
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co
Represented By: Brian D. Koosed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cref Equity Index Account
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susquehanna International Group LLP
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory Clark
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc., (Smallcap Value Account I)
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EQ Advisors Trust, (ATM Small Cap Managed Volatility Portfolio)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stuart Weitzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust, (LVIP SSGA Small-Cap Index Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIAA-CREF Funds, (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund)
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph T. Donnalley
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIAA-CREF Funds, (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund)
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rosa Genovesi
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen C. Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Securian Life Insurance Co., AKA Minnesota Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Fishman
Represented By: Harlan M. Lazarus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Allianz Global Investors of America LP, FKA Allianz Global Investors of America LP
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James T. Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Heather Harlan
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Connor Esq. Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sidney Kimmel
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barbara Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Norman R. Veit, Jr.
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric Dauwalter
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEI Institutional Managed Trust, (SIMT Small Cap Value Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Calvert Variable Products, Inc., (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio)
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Principal Funds Inc., Global Multi-Strategy Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew J. Entwistle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James A. Mitarotonda
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Two Sigma Investments LP
Represented By: Landon Raiford Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Family Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Scarborough Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kimberly Thomas
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Unified Series Trust, Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund
Represented By: Riccardo DeBari Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard World Fund, Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TFS Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: George Sharp
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Connor Esq. Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Kulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E. Belle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stafiniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis X Claps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicoletta Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine West Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Marc S Kirschner, as Trustee for the NWHI Litigation Trust
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?