In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie
Defendant: Boston Partners Global Investors Inc., Boston Partners Asset Management, LLC and Boston Partners, LLC.
Defendant / Appellee: John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, Rhumbline Advisers LP, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, Geode Diversified Fund, A segregated account of Geode Capital Master Fund Ltd., FKA GDF1, a segregated account of Geode Capital Master Fund Ltd., State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF, Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF, Longfellow Investment Management Co., LLC, Panagora Asset Management Inc., DWS Small Cap Index VIP, State Street Global Advisors, Brighthouse Funds Trust II, FKA Brighthouse Funds Trust Met-Series, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHT Small Cap Index Trust, FKA JHT Small Cap Index Trust, State Street Bank Maya Account Holder, Dianne Card, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A, State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund, DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., FKA Deutsche Asset Management (Scudder), JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, AKA JHT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD, FKA Manulife Asset Management North America LTD, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors Total ETF, Arbor Place LTD. Partnership, State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, FKA John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust Sea Small Cap, Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund, AKA U.S. Extended Market Fund SL, State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Wesley R Card, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, AKA John Hancock II Sea Small Cap, Manulife Financial and State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A
Plaintiff / Appellant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine West Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 20-3992
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 65 ATTORNEY, Emily Gildar Wagner for Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, in case 20-3941 Emily Gildar Wagner for Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, in case 20-3315 Emily Gildar Wagner for Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, in case 20-3257 Emily Gildar Wagner for Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, in case 20-3334 Emily Gildar Wagner for Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, in case 20-3335 Emily Gildar Wagner for Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, in case 20-3327 Emily Gildar Wagner for Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, in case 20-3992 , [ # 62 ], ADDED.[3008874] [20-3257, 20-3298, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 01/07/2021 06:01 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 64 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, FILED. Service date 01/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3008872] [20-3992] [Entered: 01/07/2021 06:00 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 63 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lincoln Institute of Land Policy, FILED. Service date 01/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3008871] [20-3992] [Entered: 01/07/2021 05:59 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lincoln Institute of Land Policy in 20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 01/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3008835] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 01/07/2021 05:27 PM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 60 NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[2999165] [20-3959, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/22/2020 02:18 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 57 NOTE: See lead case, 20-3257, containing complete set of docket entries.[2998349] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:28 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals and Case Management Order, [ # 2988739-2 ] filed by Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Marc S Kirschner, in 20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 37 ] filed by Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Marc S Kirschner in 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, by JON, FILED. [2998294][55] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:09 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 49 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3941, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3952, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, informing Court of proposed due date 03/05/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 12/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2996971] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/18/2020 03:39 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 47 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2996206] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/18/2020 08:37 AM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE, to Appellee American International Group Inc., Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd., Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund, Chi Operating Investment Program, LP, Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND, Dreman Contrarian Funds, EQ Advisors Trust, EQ Advisors Trust, JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund, KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels, KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism, KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites, Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust, Merrill Lynch Investment, Milton Partners, Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio, Odin Holdings LP, Panagora Asset Management Inc., Pillsbury, Pinebridge Investments LP, Quantitative Master Series LLC, RBB Fund, Inc., SEI Institutional Investments Trust, SEI Institutional Managed Trust, Securian Life Insurance Co., TFS Capital LLC, Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co., The Hartford Life Insurance Company, Tradition Securities and Derivatives Inc., Tudor Trading I, LP and Virtu Americas LLC in 20-3941, Appellee American International Group Inc., Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd., Chi Operating Investment Program, LP, Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND, Dreman Contrarian Funds, EQ Advisors Trust, EQ Advisors Trust, JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund, KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels, KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism, KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites, Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust, Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio, Odin Holdings LP, Pinebridge Investments LP, Quantitative Master Series LLC, RBB Fund, Inc., SEI Institutional Investments Trust, SEI Institutional Managed Trust, Securian Life Insurance Co., TFS Capital LLC and Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co. in 20-3981, Appellee Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund and Panagora Asset Management Inc. in 20-3992, 20-3998, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2996191] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/18/2020 08:26 AM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Ross E. Firsenbaum for Susquehanna International Group LLP State Street Global Advisors Gardner Lewis Merger Arbitrage Fund II, L.P. State Street Bank Maya Account Holder Gardner Lewis Merger Arbitrage Fund, L.P. State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund State Street Global Advisors Total ETF State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF Gardner Lewis Event Driven Fund, L.P. Hartford Schroders US Small Cap Opportunities Fund of The Hartford Mutual Funds II, Inc. State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A State Street North America Confidential Client 1 FOF State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Ishares 405 State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Equities State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund, in case 20-3941 Ross E. Firsenbaum for State Street Global Advisors State Street Bank Maya Account Holder State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Total ETF State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF, in case 20-3998 Ross E. Firsenbaum for State Street Global Advisors State Street Bank Maya Account Holder State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund State Street Global Advisors Total ETF State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund, in case 20-3992 Ross E. Firsenbaum for Susquehanna International Group LLP, in case 20-3981 , [ # 41 ], ADDED.[2989367] [20-3941, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/09/2020 06:54 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, Andrew J. Entwistle for Joseph R. Gromek Gabelli Global Series Fund Inc., in case 20-3941, ADDED.[2989290] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:38 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 42 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ann Marie C Wilkins, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2989219] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:32 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Gardner Lewis Event Driven Fund, L.P., Gardner Lewis Merger Arbitrage Fund II, L.P., Gardner Lewis Merger Arbitrage Fund, L.P., Hartford Schroders US Small Cap Opportunities Fund of The Hartford Mutual Funds II, Inc., State Street Global Advisors, State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF, State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A, State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A, State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF and Susquehanna International Group LLP in 20-3941, Appellee Susquehanna International Group LLP in 20-3981, Appellee State Street Global Advisors, State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF, State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF, State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A, State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A, State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund and State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF in 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2989167] [20-3941, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:07 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 40 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Street Global Advisors, State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF, State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF, State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A, State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A, State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund, State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF and State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2989111] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:39 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 38 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2988763] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/08/2020 11:52 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3941, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3952, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2988743] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/08/2020 11:44 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Andrew G. Devore for Northern Small Cap Value Fund Defendant IL-2 Northern Small Cap Index Fund Northern Small Cap Core Fund, in case 20-3952 Andrew G. Devore for Royce Institutional, LLC Russell 2500 Index Fund Fidelity Monthly Income Fund Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund FIAM LLC Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio Vanguard Valley Forge Funds Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Extended Market Index Fund iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund iShares Europe Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust Fidelity Northstar Fund Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio Fidelity Income Allocation Fund Fidelity Total Market Index Fund Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund Russell 3000 Index Fund Diversified Alpha Group Trust Vanguard World Fund Vanguard Index Funds Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC DWS Small Cap Index VIP Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool Royce Fund Valued Advisers Trust iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool Extended Equity Market Master Fund B Russell 2000 Value Fund B Extended Equity Market Fund Quantitative Master Series LLC Russell 2000 Index Fund MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 Fidelity Balanced Private Pool iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF Ishares Russell 2000 ETF Vanguard Institutional Index Funds iShares Russell 3000 ETF Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. Principal Funds Inc. Fidelity Investments Vanguard Scottsdale Funds Vanguard International Equity Index Funds Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool Proshares Trust DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc. Northern Small Cap Value Fund Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool Pentwater Capital Management LP Defendant IL-2 Northern Small Cap Index Fund Northern Small Cap Core Fund, in case 20-3941 Andrew G. Devore for Diversified Alpha Group Trust Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, in case 20-3964 Andrew G. Devore for Pentwater Capital Management LP, in case 20-3961 Andrew G. Devore for Fidelity Northstar Fund Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool Fidelity Income Allocation Fund Fidelity Investments Fidelity Total Market Index Fund Brighthouse Funds Trust II Fidelity Monthly Income Fund Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool FIAM LLC Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc. Fidelity Balanced Private Pool Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Extended Market Index Fund Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC DWS Small Cap Index VIP Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool Geode Diversified Fund, in case 20-3998 Andrew G. Devore for Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC DWS Small Cap Index VIP Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund Geode Diversified Fund DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., in case 20-3992 Andrew G. Devore for Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust Royce Institutional, LLC Vanguard Institutional Index Funds Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. Principal Funds Inc. Vanguard Scottsdale Funds Vanguard International Equity Index Funds Quantitative Master Series LLC Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund Proshares Trust Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust Vanguard Valley Forge Funds Vanguard World Fund Vanguard Index Funds Valued Advisers Trust, in case 20-3981 Andrew G. Devore for Ishares Russell 2000 ETF Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio Russell 2500 Index Fund iShares Russell 3000 ETF Extended Equity Market Master Fund B Russell 2000 Value Fund B Extended Equity Market Fund Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio Russell 2000 Index Fund Russell 3000 Index Fund Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 Diversified Alpha Group Trust Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund iShares Europe iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, in case 20-3980 , [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2988451] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/08/2020 08:26 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, Adam Michael Harris for Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund Northern Small Cap Value Fund Defendant IL-2 Northern Small Cap Index Fund Northern Small Cap Core Fund, in case 20-3952 Adam Michael Harris for Royce Institutional, LLC Russell 2500 Index Fund Allianz Global Investors of America LP Fidelity Monthly Income Fund Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund FIAM LLC Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust U.S. Equity Market Fund B Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio Vanguard Valley Forge Funds Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Extended Market Index Fund iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund iShares Europe Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust Fidelity Northstar Fund Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio Fidelity Income Allocation Fund Fidelity Total Market Index Fund Brighthouse Funds Trust II Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund Russell 3000 Index Fund Diversified Alpha Group Trust Vanguard World Fund Vanguard Index Funds Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC DWS Small Cap Index VIP Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool Royce Fund Geode Diversified Fund iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool Extended Equity Market Master Fund B Russell 2000 Value Fund B Extended Equity Market Fund Quantitative Master Series LLC Russell 2000 Index Fund MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 Fidelity Balanced Private Pool iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF U.S. Equity Market Fund Ishares Russell 2000 ETF Vanguard Institutional Index Funds iShares Russell 3000 ETF Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. Principal Funds Inc. Fidelity Investments Vanguard Scottsdale Funds Vanguard International Equity Index Funds Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund Calvert Variable Products, Inc. Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool Proshares Trust DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc. Northern Small Cap Value Fund Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool Defendant IL-2 Northern Small Cap Index Fund Northern Small Cap Core Fund, in case 20-3941 Adam Michael Harris for Diversified Alpha Group Trust Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, in case 20-3964 Adam Michael Harris for Fidelity Northstar Fund Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool Fidelity Income Allocation Fund Fidelity Investments Fidelity Total Market Index Fund Brighthouse Funds Trust II Fidelity Monthly Income Fund Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool FIAM LLC Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc. Fidelity Balanced Private Pool Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Extended Market Index Fund Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC DWS Small Cap Index VIP Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool Geode Diversified Fund, in case 20-3998 Adam Michael Harris for Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC DWS Small Cap Index VIP Brighthouse Funds Trust II Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund Geode Diversified Fund DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., in case 20-3992 Adam Michael Harris for Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust Royce Institutional, LLC Vanguard Institutional Index Funds Allianz Global Investors of America LP Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. Principal Funds Inc. Vanguard Scottsdale Funds Vanguard International Equity Index Funds Calvert Variable Products, Inc. Quantitative Master Series LLC Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund Proshares Trust Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust Vanguard Valley Forge Funds Vanguard World Fund Vanguard Index Funds, in case 20-3981 Adam Michael Harris for Ishares Russell 2000 ETF Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio Russell 2500 Index Fund iShares Russell 3000 ETF Extended Equity Market Master Fund B Russell 2000 Value Fund B Extended Equity Market Fund Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio Russell 2000 Index Fund Russell 3000 Index Fund Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 U.S. Equity Market Fund B Diversified Alpha Group Trust Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF U.S. Equity Market Fund BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund iShares Europe iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, in case 20-3980 , [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2988444] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/08/2020 08:03 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Andrew Gordon for John T McClain Ira M. Dansky Christopher R. Cade Tami Fersko Joseph T. Donnalley Aida Tejero-Decolli Richard L. Dickson Wesley R Card Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust Cynthia DiPietrantonio Dianne Card, in case 20-3941 Andrew Gordon for Richard L. Dickson, in case 20-3964 Andrew Gordon for Ira M. Dansky Christopher R. Cade Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust, in case 20-3961 Andrew Gordon for Wesley R Card Dianne Card, in case 20-3998 Andrew Gordon for John T McClain Tami Fersko Cynthia DiPietrantonio, in case 20-3969 Andrew Gordon for Ira M. Dansky Christopher R. Cade Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust, in case 20-3959 Andrew Gordon for Wesley R Card Dianne Card, in case 20-3992 Andrew Gordon for Joseph T. Donnalley Aida Tejero-Decolli, in case 20-3981 Andrew Gordon for Richard L. Dickson, in case 20-3980 , [ # 30 ], ADDED.[2988438] [20-3980, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/08/2020 07:09 AM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund, Defendant IL-2, Northern Small Cap Core Fund, Northern Small Cap Index Fund, Northern Small Cap Value Fund, Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, iShares Europe, iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, iShares Russell 3000 ETF, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund B, Allianz Global Investors of America LP, Calvert Variable Products, Inc., Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, Quantitative Master Series LLC, Principal Funds Inc., Principal Funds Inc., Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc., Royce Fund, Royce Institutional, LLC, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds, Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Brighthouse Funds Trust II, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, DWS Small Cap Index VIP, Geode Diversified Fund, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., FIAM LLC, Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Private Pool, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Extended Market Index Fund, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund, Fidelity Income Allocation Fund, Fidelity Investments, Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund, Fidelity Monthly Income Fund, Fidelity Northstar Fund, Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund and Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund in 20-3941, Appellee Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund, Defendant IL-2, Northern Small Cap Core Fund, Northern Small Cap Index Fund and Northern Small Cap Value Fund in 20-3952, Appellee Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio and Diversified Alpha Group Trust in 20-3964, Appellee Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, iShares Europe, iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, iShares Russell 3000 ETF, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund and U.S. Equity Market Fund B in 20-3980, Appellee Allianz Global Investors of America LP, Calvert Variable Products, Inc., Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, Quantitative Master Series LLC, Principal Funds Inc., Principal Funds Inc., Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc., Royce Institutional, LLC, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds, Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds and Vanguard World Fund in 20-3981, Appellee Brighthouse Funds Trust II, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, DWS Small Cap Index VIP, Geode Diversified Fund, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund and DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc. in 20-3992, Appellee Brighthouse Funds Trust II, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, DWS Small Cap Index VIP, Geode Diversified Fund, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., FIAM LLC, Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Private Pool, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Extended Market Index Fund, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund, Fidelity Income Allocation Fund, Fidelity Investments, Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund, Fidelity Monthly Income Fund, Fidelity Northstar Fund and Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund in 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2988384] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/07/2020 09:30 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund, Defendant IL-2, Northern Small Cap Core Fund, Northern Small Cap Index Fund, Northern Small Cap Value Fund, Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, iShares Europe, iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF, iShares Russell 3000 ETF, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund, Allianz Global Investors of America LP, Calvert Variable Products, Inc., Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, Principal Funds Inc., Principal Funds Inc., Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc., Proshares Trust, Quantitative Master Series LLC, Royce Institutional, LLC, Valued Advisers Trust, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds, Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Brighthouse Funds Trust II, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., DWS Small Cap Index VIP, Geode Diversified Fund, FIAM LLC, Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Private Pool, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Extended Market Index Fund, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund, Fidelity Income Allocation Fund, Fidelity Investments, Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund, Fidelity Monthly Income Fund, Fidelity Northstar Fund, Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund, Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund and Royce Fund in 20-3941, Appellee Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund, Defendant IL-2, Northern Small Cap Core Fund, Northern Small Cap Index Fund and Northern Small Cap Value Fund in 20-3952, Appellee Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio and Diversified Alpha Group Trust in 20-3964, Appellee Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, iShares Europe, iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF, iShares Russell 3000 ETF, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund and U.S. Equity Market Fund in 20-3980, Appellee Allianz Global Investors of America LP, Calvert Variable Products, Inc., Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, Principal Funds Inc., Principal Funds Inc., Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc., Proshares Trust, Quantitative Master Series LLC, Royce Institutional, LLC, Valued Advisers Trust, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds, Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds and Vanguard World Fund in 20-3981, Appellee Brighthouse Funds Trust II, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., DWS Small Cap Index VIP and Geode Diversified Fund in 20-3992, Appellee Brighthouse Funds Trust II, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., DWS Small Cap Index VIP, Geode Diversified Fund, FIAM LLC, Fidelity Asset Allocation Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Asset Allocation Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Income Currency Neutral Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Income Private Pool, Fidelity Balanced Private Pool, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Extended Market Index Fund, Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund, Fidelity Income Allocation Fund, Fidelity Investments, Fidelity Investments Charitable Gift Fund, Fidelity Monthly Income Fund, Fidelity Northstar Fund and Fidelity Small Cap Index Fund in 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2988355] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/07/2020 08:50 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Brighthouse Funds Trust II, Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC, Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund, DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., DWS Small Cap Index VIP and Geode Diversified Fund, FILED. Service date 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2988349] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/07/2020 07:54 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Christopher R. Cade, Dianne Card, Wesley R Card, Ira M. Dansky, Richard L. Dickson, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Joseph T. Donnalley, Tami Fersko, Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust, John T McClain and Aida Tejero-Decolli in 20-3941, Appellee Christopher R. Cade, Ira M. Dansky and Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust in 20-3959, 20-3961, Appellee Richard L. Dickson in 20-3964, Appellee Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Tami Fersko and John T McClain in 20-3969, 20-3980, Appellee Joseph T. Donnalley and Aida Tejero-Decolli in 20-3981, Appellee Dianne Card and Wesley R Card in 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2988344] [20-3941, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/07/2020 07:41 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Dianne Card and Wesley R Card, FILED. Service date 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2988339] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/07/2020 07:30 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Priac Funds, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance and Annuity Co., QMA, LLC and Defendant NJ-3 in 20-3941, 20-3969, FILED. Service date 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2988067] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:04 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, Brian Raphel for Manulife Financial John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund Transamerica Asset Management, Inc. Bam Advisor Services JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund SA U.S. Small Company Fund John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, in case 20-3941 Brian Raphel for SA U.S. Small Company Fund Bam Advisor Services, in case 20-3964 Brian Raphel for Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., in case 20-3961 Brian Raphel for John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund Manulife Financial John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, in case 20-3998 Brian Raphel for Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., in case 20-3959 Brian Raphel for John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund Manulife Financial John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, in case 20-3992 Brian Raphel for Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, in case 20-3981 Brian Raphel for SA U.S. Small Company Fund Bam Advisor Services, in case 20-3980 , [ # 20 ], ADDED.[2987443] [20-3941, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/06/2020 09:54 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY, Michael S. Doluisio for Manulife Financial John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund Transamerica Asset Management, Inc. Bam Advisor Services JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund SA U.S. Small Company Fund John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, in case 20-3941 Michael S. Doluisio for SA U.S. Small Company Fund Bam Advisor Services, in case 20-3964 Michael S. Doluisio for Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., in case 20-3961 Michael S. Doluisio for John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund Manulife Financial John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, in case 20-3998 Michael S. Doluisio for Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., in case 20-3959 Michael S. Doluisio for John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund Manulife Financial John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, in case 20-3992 Michael S. Doluisio for Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, in case 20-3981 Michael S. Doluisio for SA U.S. Small Company Fund Bam Advisor Services, in case 20-3980 , [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2987440] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/06/2020 09:43 PM]
December 6, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3952 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3941 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3964 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3961 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3998 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3969 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3959 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3981 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3992 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3980 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2987424] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/06/2020 06:48 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., Bam Advisor Services, SA U.S. Small Company Fund, Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Financial and Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD in 20-3941, Appellee Transamerica Asset Management, Inc. in 20-3959, 20-3961, Appellee Bam Advisor Services and SA U.S. Small Company Fund in 20-3964, 20-3980, Appellee Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund in 20-3981, Appellee JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Financial and Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD in 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2987300] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/04/2020 05:47 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., Bam Advisor Services, SA U.S. Small Company Fund, Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD and Manulife Financial in 20-3941, Appellee Transamerica Asset Management, Inc. in 20-3959, 20-3961, Appellee Bam Advisor Services and SA U.S. Small Company Fund in 20-3964, 20-3980, Appellee Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund in 20-3981, Appellee JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD and Manulife Financial in 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2987280] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/04/2020 05:30 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD and Manulife Financial, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2987259] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/04/2020 05:09 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2986688] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:15 AM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 16 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2986687] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:14 AM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3941, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3952, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2985483] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/03/2020 09:47 AM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3941 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3952 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3964 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3961 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3998 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3969 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3959 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3981 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3992 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3980 , [ # 13 ], ADDED.[2985330] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/03/2020 01:08 AM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3941, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3952, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/02/2020 by CM/ECF. [2985138] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/02/2020 04:17 PM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 12/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2985045] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:15 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTE: See lead case, 20-3941, containing complete set of docket entries.[2983786] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/01/2020 11:11 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2983773] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/01/2020 11:07 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, district court receipt # NYSDC-22678418, FILED.[2983765] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/01/2020 11:04 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/19/2020, RECEIVED.[2983759] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/01/2020 11:01 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2983745] [20-3992] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:55 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3992, FILED. [2983736] [20-3992, 20-3941] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Represented By: Brian Raphel Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rhumbline Advisers LP
Represented By: John A. Mangones Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Represented By: Brian Raphel Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Columbia Management Investment Advisers LLC
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Represented By: Adam Michael Harris Esq.
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Geode Diversified Fund, A segregated account of Geode Capital Master Fund Ltd., FKA GDF1, a segregated account of Geode Capital Master Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Represented By: Adam Michael Harris Esq.
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund
Represented By: Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Longfellow Investment Management Co., LLC
Represented By: Paul Niehaus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Panagora Asset Management Inc.
Represented By: Panagora Asset Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DWS Small Cap Index VIP
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Represented By: Adam Michael Harris Esq.
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brighthouse Funds Trust II, FKA Brighthouse Funds Trust Met-Series
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Represented By: Adam Michael Harris Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHT Small Cap Index Trust, FKA JHT Small Cap Index Trust
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Represented By: Brian Raphel Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Bank Maya Account Holder
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dianne Card
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Represented By: Brian Raphel Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DWS Investment Management Americas, Inc., FKA Deutsche Asset Management (Scudder)
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Represented By: Adam Michael Harris Esq.
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, AKA JHT Small Cap Opportunities Trust
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Represented By: Brian Raphel Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD, FKA Manulife Asset Management North America LTD
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Represented By: Brian Raphel Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Columbia Multi-Manager Alternative Strategies Fund
Represented By: Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.
Represented By: Adam Michael Harris Esq.
Represented By: Andrew G. Devore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Total ETF
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Arbor Place LTD. Partnership
Represented By: David L. Klebanoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, FKA John Hancock Variable Insurance Trust Sea Small Cap
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Represented By: Brian Raphel Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lincoln Institute of Land Policy
Represented By: Steven D. Jerome Esq.
Represented By: Emily Gildar Wagner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund, AKA U.S. Extended Market Fund SL
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ann Marie C Wilkins
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wesley R Card
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, AKA John Hancock II Sea Small Cap
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Represented By: Brian Raphel Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Manulife Financial
Represented By: Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.
Represented By: Brian Raphel Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A
Represented By: Philip D. Anker
Represented By: Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Partners Global Investors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Partners Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Partners, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine West Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman Esq.
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Represented By: Shenghao Stan Chiueh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?