Murray v. UBS Securities, LLC
Defendant / Appellant: UBS Securities, LLC and UBS AG
Plaintiff / Appellee: Trevor Murray
Case Number: 20-4202
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 48 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: Notice of Appearance [ # 44 ], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC in 20-4202, Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC in 21-56, FILED.[3032047] [20-4202, 21-56] [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:37 PM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 47 ATTORNEY, Thomas G Hungar for UBS AG UBS Securities, LLC, in case 21-56 , [ # 46 ], ADDED.[3030694] [21-56] [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:39 AM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC in 20-4202, Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC in 21-56, FILED. Service date 02/04/2021 by CM/ECF. [3030298] [20-4202, 21-56] [Entered: 02/04/2021 05:17 PM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 45 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/04/2021 by CM/ECF.[3030288] [20-4202] [Entered: 02/04/2021 05:08 PM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 44 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 3029240-2 ], [ # 3029232-2 ], on behalf of Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC in 21-56, Appellant-Cross-Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC in 20-4202, FILED.[3030001] [21-56, 20-4202] [Entered: 02/04/2021 01:37 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 41 ATTORNEY, Patrick J. Walsh for Trevor Murray, in case 21-56 Patrick J. Walsh for Trevor Murray, in case 20-4202 , [ # 40 ], ADDED.[3028832] [20-4202, 21-56] [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:37 AM]
February 2, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Trevor Murray in 20-4202, Appellant Trevor Murray in 21-56, FILED. Service date 02/02/2021 by CM/ECF. [3028481] [20-4202, 21-56] [Entered: 02/02/2021 06:56 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 38 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3019690] [21-56, 20-4202] [Entered: 01/25/2021 10:10 AM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 35 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/03/2021, Start Time: 10:00 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Mediator: Theodore Cheng, ENTERED.[3017384] [21-56] [Entered: 01/20/2021 05:00 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 33 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC in 20-4202 Brief due date as 04/05/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 04/05/2021, FILED.[3014201] [20-4202, 21-56] [Entered: 01/15/2021 07:48 AM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3013899] [21-56] [Entered: 01/14/2021 03:35 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Scott A. Korenbaum for Trevor Murray, in case 21-56, [ # 3011837-2 ], ADDED.[3012008] [21-56] [Entered: 01/12/2021 05:52 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 26 CAPTION, edited the designation of parties to reflect the consolidated cross-appeal, AMENDED.[3011721] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/12/2021 02:46 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 25 NOTE: See lead case, 20-4202, containing complete set of docket entries.[3011714] [21-56] [Entered: 01/12/2021 02:41 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS-APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Trevor Murray in 21-56, FILED. [3011701] [21-56, 20-4202] [Entered: 01/12/2021 02:36 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 22 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 04/05/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 01/12/2021 by CM/ECF.[3011605] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/12/2021 01:48 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Trevor Murray, FILED. Service date 01/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3011460] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:04 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Trevor Murray, FILED. Service date 01/12/2021 by CM/ECF.[3011333] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/12/2021 10:57 AM]
January 11, 2021 Filing 19 CAMP ORDER (v), Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/03/2021, Start Time: 10:00 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Mediator: Theodore Cheng, ENTERED.[3010318] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/11/2021 10:46 AM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 18 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3006321] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/05/2021 01:23 PM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Thomas G Hungar for UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC, in case 20-4202, [ # 12 ], ADDED.[3005775] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/05/2021 09:06 AM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC, FILED. Service date 01/04/2021 by CM/ECF. [3005633] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/04/2021 05:53 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC, FILED. Service date 01/04/2021 by CM/ECF.[3005620] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/04/2021 05:26 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC, FILED. Service date 01/04/2021 by CM/ECF.[3005614] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/04/2021 05:21 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC, FILED. Service date 01/04/2021 by CM/ECF.[3005607] [20-4202] [Entered: 01/04/2021 05:11 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2998790] [20-4202] [Entered: 12/22/2020 10:10 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-23109802, FILED.[2998789] [20-4202] [Entered: 12/22/2020 10:10 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/16/2020, RECEIVED.[2998788] [20-4202] [Entered: 12/22/2020 10:09 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/25/2018, RECEIVED.[2998787] [20-4202] [Entered: 12/22/2020 10:08 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG and UBS Securities, LLC, FILED. [2998781] [20-4202] [Entered: 12/22/2020 10:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Murray v. UBS Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UBS Securities, LLC
Represented By: Gabrielle Levin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UBS AG
Represented By: Gabrielle Levin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Trevor Murray
Represented By: Robert B. Stulberg Esq.
Represented By: Robert Lloyd Herbst Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?