Castro v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant / Appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon, As trustee for the certificate holders of CWalt Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2006-0A11 mortgage pass through certificates, series 2006-OA11, FKA The Bank of New York, All co-defendants that are known and unknown and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Plaintiff / Appellant: Mario E. Castro
Case Number: 20-567
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/05/2020, determining the appeal to EDNY, copy sent to pro se, ISSUED.[Mandate][2793903] [20-567] [Entered: 03/05/2020 09:35 AM]
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 APPEAL, pursuant to Clerk order, dated 03/05/2020, WITHDRAWN.[2793898] [20-567] [Entered: 03/05/2020 09:34 AM]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, dated 03/05/2020, that this appeal is administratively closed, copy sent to pro se, FILED.[2793896] [20-567] [Entered: 03/05/2020 09:32 AM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2792692] [20-567] [Entered: 03/04/2020 10:39 AM]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, dated 02/28/2020, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2020, unless Appellant Mario E. Castro, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2789823] [20-567] [Entered: 02/28/2020 02:42 PM]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, dated 02/28/2020, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2020 unless Appellant Mario E. Castro, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2789799] [20-567] [Entered: 02/28/2020 02:26 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, Jordan M. Smith, [ # 11 ], in place of attorney Jason D. St. John, SUBSTITUTED.[2786336] [20-567] [Entered: 02/25/2020 12:11 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and The Bank of New York Mellon, FILED. Service date 02/25/2020 by US mail. [2786290] [20-567] [Entered: 02/25/2020 11:38 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2778101] [20-567] [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:14 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Jason David St. John for Appellee The Bank of New York Mellon and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2778092] [20-567] [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:13 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2778082] [20-567] [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:12 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Mario E. Castro, district court receipt # 29329, FILED.[2778079] [20-567] [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:11 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ELECTRONIC ORDER, entered in the district court docket dated 01/17/2020, RECEIVED.[2778076] [20-567] [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:10 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mario E. Castro, FILED. [2778065] [20-567] [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Castro v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon, As trustee for the certificate holders of CWalt Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2006-0A11 mortgage pass through certificates, series 2006-OA11, FKA The Bank of New York
Represented By: Jason David St. John
Represented By: Jordan M. Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: All co-defendants that are known and unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Jason David St. John
Represented By: Jordan M. Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mario E. Castro
Represented By: Mario E. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?