Payne v. de Blasio
Plaintiff: Michael Hernandez, Jonathan Peck, Christopher Husary, Keith Clingman, Corey Gilzean and Kayla Roland
Defendant: Eduard Lucero, Police Commissioner Dermot Shea, Officer Jacqueline Vargas, Lieutenant Michael Butler, Alfredo Jeff, in his individual capacity, NYPD Officer Doe Husband, Fausto Pichardo, Umid Karimov, in his individual capaicty, Sergeant Keith Cheng, City of New York, Officer Jane Doe 1, Officer Matthew L. Perry, Talha Ahmad, NYPD Officer, Shield No. 21358, NYPD Officer Doe Rivera, NYPD Officers John and Jane Does 1-40, Officer Damian Rivera, NYPD Sergeant Doe Manning, New York City Police Department, NYPD Sergeant Doe Caraballo, Officer Matthew Tarangelo, Debora Matias, in her individual capacity, Joseph Deck, Sergeant Gypsy Pichardo, Chief of Department Terence Monahan, Kevin Agro, NYPD Officer, Shield No. 8054, Edward Carrasco, NYPD Detective, Shield No. 1567, NYPD Officerrs John Doe 1-32, Officer Thomas E. Manning, Officer Aaron Husbands, NYPD Officers Jane Doe 1-2, Kenneth C. Lehr, in his individual capacity, Scott Haldeman, Richardo, 40th Precinct, Andre Jeanpierre, in his individual capacity, Officer Doe Esposito, John/Jane Does 1-10, Police Officer Wells, Police Officer Lars Frantzen, Mayor Bill de Blasio, Fierro, Shield No. 88189, Officers John Doe 1-26, Ismael Hernandez Carpio, NYPD Police Officer, Shield #19759 and Lieutenant Thomas R. Hardell
Petitioner: Jon Brodie
Plaintiff / Appellee: Cameron Yates, Julian Philips, Nicholas Mulder, Savitri Durkee, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, Ricardo Nigaglioni, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Charles Henry Wood, Amali Sierra, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Samira Sierra, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Camila Gini, Matthew Bredder, Alex Gutierrez, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Vidal Guzman, Colleen McCormack-Maitland, David Jakevic, on behalf of themselves and othes similarly situated, Barbara Ross, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, Oscar Rios, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, People of the State of New York, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, Jarrett Payne, Vivian Matthew King-Yarde, Micaela Martinez, Adama Sow, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, Charlie Monlouis-Anderle, Dara Pluchino, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, Jaime Fried, Andie Mali and Maria Salazar, on behalf of themselves and others simillarly situated
Defendant / Appellant: Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.
Case Number: 21-1316
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 86 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 10/04/2021, PROPOSED.[3137468] [21-1316] [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:44 AM]
July 1, 2021 Filing 80 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/01/2021 by CM/ECF.[3130621] [21-1316] [Entered: 07/01/2021 12:51 PM]
July 1, 2021 Filing 76 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3130229] [21-1316] [Entered: 07/01/2021 09:40 AM]
June 30, 2021 Filing 73 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/30/2021 by CM/ECF. [3129996] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/30/2021 04:48 PM]
June 30, 2021 Filing 72 APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 212-390), on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/30/2021 by CM/ECF.[3129994] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/30/2021 04:47 PM]
June 30, 2021 Filing 71 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-211), on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/30/2021 by CM/ECF.[3129992] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/30/2021 04:46 PM]
June 25, 2021 Filing 70 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 64 ], on behalf of Appellees Michael Butler, Keith Cheng, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Joseph Deck, Thomas R. Hardell, Aaron Husbands, Thomas E. Manning, Terence Monahan, Matthew L. Perry, Gypsy Pichardo, Damian Rivera, Dermot Shea, Matthew Tarangelo and Jacqueline Vargas, FILED.[3126741] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/25/2021 04:16 PM]
June 25, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION ORDER, granting in part motion to expedite appeal [ # 53 ] filed by Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Appellants opening brief shall be filed no later than June 30, 2021. Appellees response briefs shall be filed no later than August 31, 2021. Appellants reply brief shall be filed no later than September 7, 2021. The appeal shall be heard as early as the week of October 4, 2021, subject to the approval of the presiding judge, FILED. [3126682][69] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/25/2021 03:41 PM]
June 24, 2021 Filing 66 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 53 ], on behalf of Appellee People of the State of New York, FILED. Service date 06/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3125853] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/24/2021 04:26 PM]
June 24, 2021 Filing 65 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 53 ], on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3125729][65] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/24/2021 03:23 PM]
June 24, 2021 Filing 64 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Michael Butler, Keith Cheng, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Joseph Deck, Thomas R. Hardell, Aaron Husbands, Thomas E. Manning, Terence Monahan, Matthew L. Perry, Gypsy Pichardo, Damian Rivera, Dermot Shea, Matthew Tarangelo and Jacqueline Vargas, FILED. Service date 06/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3125533] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:56 PM]
June 24, 2021 Filing 63 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [58], on behalf of Appellees Michael Butler, Keith Cheng, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Joseph Deck, Thomas R. Hardell, Aaron Husbands, Thomas E. Manning, Terence Monahan, Matthew L. Perry, Gypsy Pichardo, Damian Rivera, Dermot Shea, Matthew Tarangelo and Jacqueline Vargas, FILED.[3125491] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:24 PM]
June 24, 2021 Filing 62 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, oppostion to motion to expedite appeal, [61], on behalf of Appellee Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jakevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar and Sabrina Zurkuhlenr, FILED.[3125480] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:17 PM]
June 23, 2021 Filing 61 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 53 ], on behalf of Appellee Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jakevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar and Sabrina Zurkuhlen, FILED. Service date 06/23/2021 by CM/ECF. [3125048] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/23/2021 04:49 PM]
June 23, 2021 Filing 59 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 53 ], on behalf of Appellee Michael Butler, Keith Cheng, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Joseph Deck, Thomas R. Hardell, Aaron Husbands, Thomas E. Manning, Terence Monahan, Matthew L. Perry, Gypsy Pichardo, Damian Rivera, Dermot Shea, Matthew Tarangelo and Jacqueline Vargas, FILED. Service date 06/23/2021 by CM/ECF. [3124638] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/23/2021 12:17 PM]
June 23, 2021 Filing 58 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Michael Butler, Keith Cheng, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Joseph Deck, Thomas R. Hardell, Aaron Husbands, Thomas E. Manning, Terence Monahan, Matthew L. Perry, Gypsy Pichardo, Damian Rivera, Dermot Shea, Matthew Tarangelo and Jacqueline Vargas, FILED. Service date 06/23/2021 by CM/ECF.[3124623] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/23/2021 12:09 PM]
June 23, 2021 Filing 57 CAPTION, Keith Cheng, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Michael Butler, Joseph Deck, Aaron Husbands, Thomas R. Hardell, Thomas E. Manning, Terence Monahan, Matthew L. Perry, Gypsy Pichardo, Damian Rivera, Dermot Shea, Matthew Tarangelo and Jacqueline Vargas designations changed from Defendants to Defendants-Appellees, AMENDED.[3124581] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/23/2021 11:44 AM]
June 22, 2021 Filing 55 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as additional counsel, [48], on behalf of Keith Cheng, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Michael Butler, Joseph Deck, Aaron Husbands, Thomas R. Hardell, Thomas E. Manning, Terence Monahan, Matthew L. Perry, Gypsy Pichardo, Damian Rivera, Dermot Shea, Matthew Tarangelo and Jacqueline Vargas, FILED.[3124142] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/22/2021 04:21 PM]
June 18, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/18/2021 by CM/ECF. [3122498] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/18/2021 08:57 PM]
June 16, 2021 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Letter, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/16/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3121716] [21-1316]--[Edited 06/22/2021 by TT]--[Edited 06/22/2021 by TT] [Entered: 06/16/2021 06:08 PM]
June 16, 2021 Filing 51 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., request that the PBA be permitted to file Appellants brief on appeal on or before June 30, 2021, RECEIVED. Service date 06/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3121668] [21-1316]--[Edited 06/22/2021 by TT] [Entered: 06/16/2021 05:10 PM]
June 16, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Keith Cheng, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Michael Butler, Joseph Deck, Aaron Husbands, Thomas R. Hardell, Thomas E. Manning, Terence Monahan, Matthew L. Perry, Gypsy Pichardo, Damian Rivera, Dermot Shea, Matthew Tarangelo and Jacqueline Vargas, FILED. Service date 06/16/2021 by CM/ECF. [3121193] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/16/2021 11:08 AM]
June 11, 2021 Filing 46 ATTORNEY, Thomas A. Kissane for Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., in case 21-1316 , [ # 45 ], ADDED.[3118435] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/11/2021 01:31 PM]
June 10, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3117728] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/10/2021 03:39 PM]
June 9, 2021 Filing 44 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jakevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar and Sabrina Zurkuhlen, FILED. Service date 06/09/2021 by CM/ECF.[3117095] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/09/2021 09:22 PM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 41 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 39 ], on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED.[3115270] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/07/2021 03:16 PM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 40 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [35], on behalf of Appellees Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jakevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen and Alexandra de Mucha Pin, FILED.[3115257] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/07/2021 03:08 PM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 39 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3115253] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/07/2021 03:04 PM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 38 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Forms C and D, [22], [23], on behalf of Appellee Cameron Yates, FILED.[3115233] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/07/2021 02:54 PM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Jonathan Moore, [ # 36 ], in place of attorney Luna Droubi, SUBSTITUTED.[3115224] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/07/2021 02:51 PM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jakevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen and Alexandra de Mucha Pino, FILED. Service date 06/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3115041] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:49 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 35 CORRECTED , on behalf of Appellee Matthew Bredder, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Savitri Durkee, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow and Sabrina Zurkuhlen, FILED. Service date 06/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3113682] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 08:29 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 34 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jaime Fried, Camila Gini, Vidal Guzman, Vivian Matthew King-Yarde, Andie Mali, Micaela Martinez, Colleen McCormack-Maitland, Charlie Monlouis-Anderle, Nicholas Mulder, Jarrett Payne and Julian Philips, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3113681] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 07:45 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Alex Gutierrez, Ricardo Nigaglioni, Amali Sierra and Samira Sierra, FILED. Service date 06/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3113558] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:56 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 32 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [21], on behalf of Appellees Adama Sow, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Barbara Ross, Oscar Rios, Matthew Bredder, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Maria Salazar, Dara Pluchino, Savitri Durkee and David Jakevic, FILED.[3113553] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:48 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 31 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [17], on behalf of Appellees Jaime Fried, Camila Gini, Vidal Guzman, Vivian Matthew King-Yarde, Andie Mali, Micaela Martinez, Colleen McCormack-Maitland, Charlie Monlouis-Anderle, Nicholas Mulder, Jarrett Payne and Julian Philips, FILED.[3113513] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:27 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Molly Biklen for Appellees Vivian Matthew King-Yarde, Vidal Guzman, Julian Philips, Camila Gini, Charlie Monlouis-Anderle, Jaime Fried, Jarrett Payne, in case 21-1316 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[3113505] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:23 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 29 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as additional counsel, [16], on behalf of Appellees David Jakevic, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow and Alexandra de Mucha Pino, FILED.[3113477] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:07 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 28 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [14], on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED.[3113449] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:49 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 26 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [12], on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED.[3113436] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:41 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Forms C and D, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3113382] [21-1316]--[Edited 06/07/2021 by TT] [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:05 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee David Jakevic, Savitri Durkee, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Matthew Bredder, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Dara Pluchino and Oscar Rios, FILED. Service date 06/03/2021 by CM/ECF. [3112948] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/03/2021 08:12 AM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 23 FORM D, on behalf of Appellee Cameron Yates, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3112901] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:56 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 22 FORM C, on behalf of Appellee Cameron Yates, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3112899] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:46 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adama Sow, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Barbara Ross, Oscar Rios, Matthew Bredder, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Maria Salazar, Dara Pluchino, Savitri Durkee and David Jakevic, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF. [3112898] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:45 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cameron Yates, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3112897] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:23 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Matthew Bredder, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Savitri Durkee, David Jakevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow and Sabrina Zurkuhlen, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF. [3112896] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:05 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Charles Henry Wood, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3112895] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:04 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jaime Fried, Camila Gini, Vidal Guzman, Vivian Matthew King-Yarde, Andie Mali, Micaela Martinez, Colleen McCormack-Maitland, Charlie Monlouis-Anderle, Nicholas Mulder, Jarrett Payne and Julian Philips, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3112893] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 08:50 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adama Sow, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Barbara Ross, Oscar Rios, Matthew Bredder, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Maria Salazar, Dara Pluchino, Savitri Durkee and David Jakevic, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF. [3112892] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 08:40 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jaime Fried, Camila Gini, Vidal Guzman, Vivian Matthew King-Yarde, Andie Mali, Micaela Martinez, Colleen McCormack-Maitland, Charlie Monlouis-Anderle, Nicholas Mulder, Jarrett Payne and Julian Philips, FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF. [3112891] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 08:19 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3112890] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 08:18 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3112850] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 05:13 PM]
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3112849] [21-1316] [Entered: 06/02/2021 05:12 PM]
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee People of the State of New York, FILED. Service date 05/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3106856] [21-1316] [Entered: 05/24/2021 03:03 PM]
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Philip J. Levitz, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Barbara Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[3106607] [21-1316] [Entered: 05/24/2021 12:04 PM]
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee People of the State of New York, FILED. Service date 05/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3106502] [21-1316] [Entered: 05/24/2021 10:50 AM]
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Lance A. Clarke, Esq. for Appellee Samira Sierra, Amali Sierra, Ricardo Nigaglioni and Alex Gutierrez, Masai I. Lord, Esq. for Appellee Maria Salazar, David Jakevic, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Matthew Bredder, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Dara Pluchino and Savitri Durkee and Jessica Massimi, Esq. for Appellee Maria Salazar, David Jakevic, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Matthew Bredder, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Dara Pluchino and Savitri Durkee, electronically informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3105800] [21-1316] [Entered: 05/21/2021 02:36 PM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., district court receipt # NYSDC-24562108, FILED.[3105673] [21-1316] [Entered: 05/21/2021 01:52 PM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 04/28/2021, RECEIVED.[3105668] [21-1316] [Entered: 05/21/2021 01:51 PM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., FILED. [3105657] [21-1316] [Entered: 05/21/2021 01:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Payne v. de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Husary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Clingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Gilzean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Roland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduard Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jacqueline Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Michael Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Jeff, in his individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Doe Husband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fausto Pichardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umid Karimov, in his individual capaicty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Keith Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Matthew L. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talha Ahmad, NYPD Officer, Shield No. 21358
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Doe Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officers John and Jane Does 1-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Damian Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Sergeant Doe Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Sergeant Doe Caraballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Matthew Tarangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debora Matias, in her individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Deck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Gypsy Pichardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Department Terence Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Agro, NYPD Officer, Shield No. 8054
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Carrasco, NYPD Detective, Shield No. 1567
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officerrs John Doe 1-32
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thomas E. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Aaron Husbands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officers Jane Doe 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth C. Lehr, in his individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Haldeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardo, 40th Precinct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Jeanpierre, in his individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Doe Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Lars Frantzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fierro, Shield No. 88189
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officers John Doe 1-26
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael Hernandez Carpio, NYPD Police Officer, Shield #19759
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Thomas R. Hardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cameron Yates
Represented By: Andrew B. Stoll Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Julian Philips
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Molly Biklen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nicholas Mulder
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Savitri Durkee, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow Esq.
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Masai I. Lord Esq.
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver Esq.
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Jessica Massimi Esq.
Represented By: Remy Green Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan Clifford Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ricardo Nigaglioni, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Lance A. Clarke Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Moskovitz Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Spiegel
Represented By: Lance Clarke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charles Henry Wood
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Amali Sierra, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Lance A. Clarke Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Moskovitz Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Spiegel
Represented By: Lance Clarke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Samira Sierra, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Lance A. Clarke Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Moskovitz Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Spiegel
Represented By: Lance Clarke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Camila Gini
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Molly Biklen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Matthew Bredder
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow Esq.
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Masai I. Lord Esq.
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver Esq.
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Jessica Massimi Esq.
Represented By: Remy Green Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan Clifford Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alex Gutierrez, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Lance A. Clarke Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Moskovitz Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Spiegel
Represented By: Lance Clarke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Vidal Guzman
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Molly Biklen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Colleen McCormack-Maitland
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Jakevic, on behalf of themselves and othes similarly situated
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow Esq.
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Masai I. Lord Esq.
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver Esq.
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Jessica Massimi Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan Clifford Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Barbara Ross, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow Esq.
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Masai I. Lord Esq.
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver Esq.
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Jessica Massimi Esq.
Represented By: Remy Green Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan Clifford Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Oscar Rios, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow Esq.
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Masai I. Lord Esq.
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver Esq.
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Jessica Massimi Esq.
Represented By: Remy Green Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan Clifford Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: People of the State of New York
Represented By: Philip Levitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sabrina Zurkuhlen
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow Esq.
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Masai I. Lord Esq.
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver Esq.
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Jessica Massimi Esq.
Represented By: Remy Green Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan Clifford Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alexandra de Mucha Pino, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow Esq.
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Masai I. Lord Esq.
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver Esq.
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Jessica Massimi Esq.
Represented By: Remy Green Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jarrett Payne
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Molly Biklen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Vivian Matthew King-Yarde
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Molly Biklen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Micaela Martinez
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Adama Sow, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Remy Green Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charlie Monlouis-Anderle
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Molly Biklen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dara Pluchino, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow Esq.
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Masai I. Lord Esq.
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver Esq.
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Jessica Massimi Esq.
Represented By: Remy Green Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan Clifford Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jaime Fried
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Molly Biklen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Andie Mali
Represented By: Corey Stoughton
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Maria Salazar, on behalf of themselves and others simillarly situated
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow Esq.
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Masai I. Lord Esq.
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver Esq.
Represented By: Luna Droubi Esq.
Represented By: Jessica Massimi Esq.
Represented By: Remy Green Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan Clifford Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jon Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Smith Esq.
Represented By: Richard H. Dolan
Represented By: Thomas A. Kissane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?