Komatsu v. The City of New York
Defendant: John Doe, 1,
Defendant / Appellee: Christopher Fowler, NYPD Officer (badge #: 3185), sued in individual and official capacities, Keith Dietrich, NYPD Officer (shield #5779), John Doe, NYPD Officer, NYPD Officer John Doe, 6,, Jane Doe, 2, NYPD Officer, Raymond Gerola, NYPD Detective, Shield #6577, In their individual and official capacities, John Doe, 3, NYPD All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities, James Clynes, NYPD Officer John Doe, 1, sued in their individual and official capacities, John Doe, 8-30-17a NYPD Officer, sued in individual and official capacities, Ralph Nieves, former NYPD Lieutenant, sued in individual and official capacities, John Doe, 1, Tablet, Juanita Holmes, NYPD Officer, sued in individual and official capacities, Anthony Shorris, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer Lin, (shield #: 25714), All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities, John Doe, 3,, John Doe, 1, NYPD Officer, Shield #21250, In their individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer Jemaal Gungor, Eric Phillips, John Doe, 2,, John Doe, #2, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities, John Doe, #4, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer John Doe, 1,, John Doe, 2, sued in their individual and official capacities, Pinny Ringel, NYPD John Doe, 2,, Diana Ayala, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities, NYPD John Doe, 4,, Cruz, NYPD Officer (badge #: 751), sued in individual and official capacities, NYPD John Doe, 1,, John Doe, 6, NYPD In their individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer Jane Doe, 2,, NYPD Officer Barker, Shield #13845, Nick Gulotta, Gale Brewer, NYPD John Doe, 1, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities, Baez, NYPD Officer (shield #5984), NYPD Detective Stephen Halk, NYPD John Doe, 6,, Jane Doe, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities, Keck, NYPD Officer (shield #6313), Lance, NYPD Officer (badge #: 245), sued in individual and official capacities, Jane Doe, 1,, Keith Powers, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities, John Doe, 3, NYPD Officer, NYPD Sergeant Ryan Dwyer, Rachel Atcheson, In their individual and official capacities, NYPD Sergeant Jordan Mazur, NYPD Officer John Doe, 2,, NYPD Officer John Doe,, Dustin Ridener, NYPD John Doe, 5,, NYPD Officer Jane Doe, 3,, NYPD Officer Jerry Ioveno, NYPD Officer John Doe, 3,, Jerry Ioveno, NYPD Officer (shield #5560), Andrew Berkowitz, NYPD Officer (badge #: 7141), sued in individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer John Doe, 1, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities, Bill de Blasio, sued in individual and official capacities, Hansen, NYPD Officer (badge #: 4028), sued in individual and official capacities, Nicholas Mason, NYPD Detective, Shield #6995, In their individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer Suzuki, Shield # 7373, Richard Mantellino, NYPD Lieutenant, sued in his individual and official capacities, Jessica Ramos, In their individual and official capacities, Mitchell, NYPD Officer, Shield #5486, In their individual and official capacities, Letitia A. James, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities, John Doe, 7, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities, John Doe, 4,, Rafael Perez, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities, NYPD John Doe, 2, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities, Lawrence Byrne, Jr., sued in their individual and official capacities, James O'Neill, former NYPD Commissioner, sued in individual and official capacities, John Doe, 5,, Marco Carrion, Officer Jane Doe, 1,, NYPD Officer Jane Doe, 4,, Sergeant Bradley, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities, John Doe, 2, NYPD Officer, Ritchie Torres, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer Zappia, Shield #4152, John Doe, 8, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities, John Doe, 4, NYPD Officer, Karl Pfeffer, NYPD Officer (Officer ID #: 48458), sued in individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer Joe Ventri, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., sued in their individual and official capacities, NYPD Officer Ranieri, Shield # 24361, Satana, NYPD Officer (shield #7291), Jane Doe, 3, NYPD Officer, NYPD Officer John Doe, 2, sued in their individual and official capacities, Howard Miller, John Doe, #5, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities, Brad Lander, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities, John Doe, #3, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities, Galante, NYPD Detective All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities, John Doe, 1, NYPD All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities, Shauna Stribula, NYPD John Doe, 3,, Howard Redmond, NYPD Inspector, sued in individual and official capacities, Bronx District Attorney John Doe, Bodyguard, sued in their individual and official capacities, John Doe, 1, NYPD Officer, NYPD Officer Edward Klein, The City of New York, John Doe, 2, NYPD All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities, Kalman Yeger, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities and NYPD John Doe,
Plaintiff / Appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Case Number: 21-156
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 27 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [26], on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3060703] [21-156] [Entered: 03/22/2021 09:25 AM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 26 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. Service date 03/16/2021 by email.[3060693] [21-156] [Entered: 03/22/2021 09:23 AM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to extend time, [22], on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3050485] [21-156] [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:09 AM]
March 1, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. No service date.[3050479] [21-156] [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:05 AM]
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, dated 02/25/2021, dismissing appeal by 03/18/2021, unless Appellant Towaki Komatsu, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appelllant, FILED.[3044394] [21-156] [Entered: 02/25/2021 12:57 PM]
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, dated 02/10/2021, dismissing appeal by 02/10/2021, unless Appellant Towaki Komatsu, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3033683] [21-156] [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:48 AM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, James E. Johnson, for Howard Redmons, Karl Pfeffer, Andrew Berkowitz, Cruz, Hansen, Christopher Fowler, Lance, John Doe, Juanita Holmes, Nicholas Mason, Mitchell, John Doe, Raymond Gerola, Rachel Atcheson, Jessica Ramos, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, Howard Miller, Dustin Ridener, Santana, Pinny Ringel, Nick Gulotta, Eric Phillips, John Doe, Gale Brewer, James Clynes, Keck, Baez, Jerry Ioveno, John Doe, Keither Dietrich, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, NYPD Officer John Doe, NYPD Officer John Doe, John Doe, Ranieri, Suzuki, John Doe, John Doe, NYPD John Doe, Jane Doe, NYPD Officer John Doe, Berker, Joe Ventri, Marco Carrion, John Doe, Jemaal Gungor, John Doe, Lin, John Doe, John Doe, Eaward Klein, Zappia, John Doe, John Doe, TERMINATED.[3030626] [21-156] [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:03 AM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Barbara D. Underwood, for Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., Jordan Mazur, Stephen Halk, Ryan Dwyer, Galante, Ritchie Torres, and Bradley, TERMINATED.[3030568] [21-156] [Entered: 02/05/2021 10:33 AM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Amy McCamphill, [ # 14 ], in place of attorney James Edward Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[3030557] [21-156] [Entered: 02/05/2021 10:24 AM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER, dated 02/03/2021, on behalf of Appellees Richard Mantellino, Ralph Nieves, James O'Neill, The City of New York and Bill de Blasio, requesting that the New York City Law Department no longer be identified as counsel for any of the defendant-appelleees on the docket, except for the following five parties: the City of New York; Mayor Bill de Blasio; NYPD Lieutenant Richard Mantellino; former NYPD Commissioner James ONeill; and former NYPD Lieutenant Ralph Nieves, RECEIVED. Service date 02/03/2021 by US mail.[3030593] [21-156] [Entered: 02/05/2021 10:46 AM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio, Richard Mantellino, Ralph Nieves, James O'Neill and The City of New York, FILED. Service date 02/03/2021 by US mail. [3029394] [21-156] [Entered: 02/03/2021 09:39 PM]
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Letitia A. James, requesting that the New York State Office of the Attorney General be removed as counsel for Defendants Cyrus R. Vance, Jr. Jordan Mazur, Stephen Halk, Ryan Dwyer, Galante, Ritchie Torres, and Bradley, RECEIVED. Service date 01/28/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3024315] [21-156]--[Edited 02/05/2021 by VB] [Entered: 01/28/2021 12:32 PM]
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[3023235] [21-156] [Entered: 01/28/2021 06:41 AM]
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTE: See lead case, 21-73, containing complete set of docket entries.[3023231] [21-156, 21-73] [Entered: 01/28/2021 06:37 AM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3025595] [21-156] [Entered: 01/29/2021 01:09 PM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DUPLICATE APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. [3025592] [21-156] [Entered: 01/29/2021 01:06 PM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3023230] [21-156] [Entered: 01/28/2021 06:36 AM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 01/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3023229] [21-156] [Entered: 01/28/2021 06:35 AM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu in 21-156, FILED. [3023228] [21-156, 21-73] [Entered: 01/28/2021 06:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Komatsu v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christopher Fowler, NYPD Officer (badge #: 3185), sued in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith Dietrich, NYPD Officer (shield #5779)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, NYPD Officer
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer John Doe, 6,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe, 2, NYPD Officer
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Raymond Gerola, NYPD Detective, Shield #6577, In their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 3, NYPD All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Clynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer John Doe, 1, sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 8-30-17a NYPD Officer, sued in individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ralph Nieves, former NYPD Lieutenant, sued in individual and official capacities
Represented By: Amy McCamphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 1, Tablet
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Juanita Holmes, NYPD Officer, sued in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony Shorris, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Lin, (shield #: 25714), All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 3,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 1, NYPD Officer, Shield #21250, In their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Jemaal Gungor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 2,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, #2, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, #4, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer John Doe, 1,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 2, sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pinny Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 2,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Diana Ayala, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 4,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cruz, NYPD Officer (badge #: 751), sued in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 1,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 6, NYPD In their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Jane Doe, 2,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Barker, Shield #13845
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nick Gulotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gale Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 1, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Baez, NYPD Officer (shield #5984)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Detective Stephen Halk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 6,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keck, NYPD Officer (shield #6313)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lance, NYPD Officer (badge #: 245), sued in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe, 1,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith Powers, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 3, NYPD Officer
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Sergeant Ryan Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rachel Atcheson, In their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Sergeant Jordan Mazur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer John Doe, 2,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer John Doe,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dustin Ridener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 5,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Jane Doe, 3,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Jerry Ioveno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer John Doe, 3,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jerry Ioveno, NYPD Officer (shield #5560)
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Berkowitz, NYPD Officer (badge #: 7141), sued in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer John Doe, 1, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bill de Blasio, sued in individual and official capacities
Represented By: Amy McCamphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hansen, NYPD Officer (badge #: 4028), sued in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nicholas Mason, NYPD Detective, Shield #6995, In their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Suzuki, Shield # 7373
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard Mantellino, NYPD Lieutenant, sued in his individual and official capacities
Represented By: Amy McCamphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jessica Ramos, In their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mitchell, NYPD Officer, Shield #5486, In their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Letitia A. James, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 7, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 4,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rafael Perez, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 2, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lawrence Byrne, Jr., sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James O'Neill, former NYPD Commissioner, sued in individual and official capacities
Represented By: Amy McCamphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 5,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marco Carrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Officer Jane Doe, 1,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Jane Doe, 4,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Bradley, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 2, NYPD Officer
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ritchie Torres, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Zappia, Shield #4152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 8, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 4, NYPD Officer
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Karl Pfeffer, NYPD Officer (Officer ID #: 48458), sued in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Joe Ventri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Patricia J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Ranieri, Shield # 24361
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Satana, NYPD Officer (shield #7291)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe, 3, NYPD Officer
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer John Doe, 2, sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Howard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, #5, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brad Lander, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, #3, NYPD, In their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Galante, NYPD Detective All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 1, NYPD All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shauna Stribula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 3,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Howard Redmond, NYPD Inspector, sued in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bronx District Attorney John Doe, Bodyguard, sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Nancy Darragh Killian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 1, NYPD Officer
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Edward Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The City of New York
Represented By: Amy McCamphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, 2, NYPD All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kalman Yeger, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe,
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Represented By: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?