Alaji v. City of Niagara Falls
Plaintiff / Appellee: Tammy L. Smeal-Jackson, Candice Renee Hill-Ridgeway, Terry Duane Spencer, Tony Anthony Blackmon, Kendra Louise Baldwin, Deborah Neal, Eric Mercilliott, Carrie Regina Everett, Latasha L. Price, Catherine Ann Wenske, Heather Ingram Ward, Lonnie Nix-Harden, Amir Young, Mandi Cipolla, Marcus K. Blackmon, Cynthia Hamilton, Donald M. Carter, Marybeth Ann Safee, Daniel F. Ishman, Isaiah Matthews, Holly Klein, Joe Ann McCall, Clarice Latrice Lockwood, Michael Krzemien, Robert Christopher Nix, Steven M. Morgan, Amelia Louise Carmichael, Jim L. Smith, Vincent James Licata, Jr., Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of L.L., Infant, Gilbert Bruce Myles, Jr., La'Keilah N. Dunbar, Jean Connell, Keisha Dowdell, Marilyn Annette Southern, Teon Rogers, Lester Mary, Gerald Thomas Mallory, Sr., Danny George, Caletta Gayle, Johnnie Mae McQueen, George C. Grant, Mary Ann Pasqualichio-Favaloro, Jennnie Eileen Mercilliott, Tony Blackmon, II, Barbara Haslip, Kevin John Kohnke, Clifford Tyrone Jackson, Shantel Knighton, Collett May-Kirkland, Lynette Elsberry, Linda Keller, Kathy Ann DeMartin, Keith Owen Moss, Jean D. McClain, Kamilah Nadirah Alaji, Annette Marcell Lawrence, Laronda Nicole Hill, Rebecca Annette Hamilton, Gwendolyn Mallory, Joyce Ann Betton and Natalie A. Holmes
Defendant / Appellant: City of Niagara Falls, CECOS International, Inc., Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, OP-Tech Environmental Services, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Hooker Chemicals and Plastics Corporation, Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc.
Case Number: 21-250
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, designating 21-249 as the lead appeal, holding appeals 21-237, 21-245, 21-247, 21-248, 21-250, 21-251, 21-252, 21-253, 21-255, 21-256, 21-257, 21-259, 21-260, 21-264, 21-265, 21-269, 21-281, and 21-285 in abeyance pending the Courts decision in the lead appeal, directing opening forms be filed within 7 days, and setting the briefing schedule for lead appeal, by JON, FILED. [ # 27 ] [3058245][34] [21-250] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:23 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 32 ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Bove for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-250 , [ # 30 ], ADDED.[3055133] [21-250] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:03 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Andrew Patrick Devine for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-250 , [ # 29 ], ADDED.[3055131] [21-250] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:01 PM]
March 11, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054459] [21-250] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:39 PM]
March 11, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054419] [21-250] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:01 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3053572] [21-250] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:54 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Kevin M. Hogan for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation, Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-250 , [ # 21 ], ADDED.[3053564] [21-250] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:43 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Robert E Knoer for Roy's Plumbing, Inc., in case 21-250 , [ # 20 ], ADDED.[3053253] [21-250] [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:43 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 24 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 19 ], [ # 23 ], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053250] [21-250] [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:42 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053245] [21-250] [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:38 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF.[3052948] [21-250] [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:33 AM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/09/2021 by CM/ECF. [3052219] [21-250] [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:16 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3050052] [21-250] [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:56 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF.[3049953] [21-250] [Entered: 03/05/2021 01:58 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 17 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED.[3049651] [21-250] [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:10 AM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [13], on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED.[3049645] [21-250] [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:05 AM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, William G. Beck for CECOS International, Inc., in case 21-250 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[3048923] [21-250] [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:12 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF. [3048067] [21-250] [Entered: 03/03/2021 12:49 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3047927] [21-250] [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:22 AM]
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 02/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3045187] [21-250] [Entered: 02/26/2021 11:15 AM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044576] [21-250] [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:51 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044486] [21-250] [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:51 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043589] [21-250] [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:36 PM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3041398] [21-250] [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:59 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT DECISION & ORDER, dated 01/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3034715] [21-250] [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:40 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc, OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., district court receipt # 02094143108, FILED.[3034713] [21-250] [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:38 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc, OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. [3034706] [21-250] [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alaji v. City of Niagara Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tammy L. Smeal-Jackson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Candice Renee Hill-Ridgeway
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Terry Duane Spencer
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tony Anthony Blackmon
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kendra Louise Baldwin
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Deborah Neal
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eric Mercilliott
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carrie Regina Everett
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Latasha L. Price
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Catherine Ann Wenske
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Heather Ingram Ward
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lonnie Nix-Harden
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Amir Young
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mandi Cipolla
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Marcus K. Blackmon
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cynthia Hamilton
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Donald M. Carter
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Marybeth Ann Safee
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Daniel F. Ishman
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Isaiah Matthews
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Holly Klein
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joe Ann McCall
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Clarice Latrice Lockwood
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Krzemien
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Christopher Nix
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Steven M. Morgan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Amelia Louise Carmichael
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jim L. Smith
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Vincent James Licata, Jr., Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of L.L., Infant
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gilbert Bruce Myles, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: La'Keilah N. Dunbar
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jean Connell
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Keisha Dowdell
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Marilyn Annette Southern
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Teon Rogers
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lester Mary
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gerald Thomas Mallory, Sr.
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Danny George
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Caletta Gayle
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Johnnie Mae McQueen
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: George C. Grant
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mary Ann Pasqualichio-Favaloro
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jennnie Eileen Mercilliott
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tony Blackmon, II
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Barbara Haslip
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kevin John Kohnke
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Clifford Tyrone Jackson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shantel Knighton
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Collett May-Kirkland
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lynette Elsberry
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Linda Keller
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kathy Ann DeMartin
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Keith Owen Moss
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jean D. McClain
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kamilah Nadirah Alaji
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Annette Marcell Lawrence
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Laronda Nicole Hill
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rebecca Annette Hamilton
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gwendolyn Mallory
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joyce Ann Betton
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Natalie A. Holmes
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: City of Niagara Falls
Represented By: Thomas J. DeBoy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CECOS International, Inc.
Represented By: Zackary D. Knaub Esq.
Represented By: William G. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Conestoga-Rovers & Associates
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Stravino Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OP-Tech Environmental Services
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Schulman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Occidental Chemical Corporation, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Hooker Chemicals and Plastics Corporation
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Agnieszka Wilewicz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Roy's Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Jean Cunningham Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Scott Lawn Yard, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?