Wieloszynski v. City of Niagara Falls
Plaintiff / Appellee: Linda Ann Joseph, Tony P. Kelly, Toni Yvonne Bonham, Tammy Dochstader, individually, and as a Parent and Natural Guardian of E.D. and H.J., Infants, Barbara Jean Walker Robinson, Dawn Marie Leone-Hahn, Charles Pryor, Elizabeth Ann Lumpkin, Marie Angela Schryver, David Mielke, John David Wieloszynski, individually, and as Parent and Natural Guardian of D.W., Infant, Christina Bell, Theodore Ted Winston Nehrenberg, Melinda William Epps, Sarah Francis Shipp, Melvin Pryor Smith, Jennifer Nicole Schwartzkopf, Gwendolyn A. Daniels, Gloria Jean Gates, Terri Soro, Ebony C. Martin, Wilfred John Dent Spillman, Charlie R. Rogers, Jr., Aaron Edwin Wieloszynski, Joan Howes, individually, and as a Parent and Natural Guardian of M.H., Infant, Ruthel Deloris Dumas, Russell Leonard McClain, II, Robert Dobson, Alfonzo Maye, Elizabeth T. Swift, Carmen Cianchetti, Camilla G. Moore, Sue M. Whatley Rivers, Melvin W. Spillman, Jennifer Brown-Reese, James Earl Daniels, Emily Mallory, Constance Elaine Mielke, Lemuel Mallory, Mickey Morease Harris, Donald Ray Daniels, Wanda Renee Gutzmore, Gloria Jean Lumpkin Bumpas, Deborah Owens-Williamson, Albert Brinson, Melody Annette Smith-Felts, Robert Darin Searight, Janice E. Maye, Rosemary Shaffer, Sandra Elizabeth Jackson, Robert Lewis Reed, Thomas Joseph, Jr., James G. Jackson, Renee Coates-Smith, Rick Dumas, Sr., Kathleen Paulette Price, Kimberly Jean Wieloszynski, Lori Charmaine Krull, Susan Lynn Gerow, Sandra J. Onofrio, William Louise Smith, Debra Jean Lester, Martha R. Seaberry, Laura Hope Wieloszynski, Tina Marie Perrier and Reginald Anthony Penn
Defendant / Appellant: City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., CECOS International, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, individually, and as Successor in Interest to Hooker Chemicals and Plastics Corporation, Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. and Roy's Plumbing, Inc.
Case Number: 21-255
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, designating 21-249 as the lead appeal, holding appeals 21-237, 21-245, 21-247, 21-248, 21-250, 21-251, 21-252, 21-253, 21-255, 21-256, 21-257, 21-259, 21-260, 21-264, 21-265, 21-269, 21-281, and 21-285 in abeyance pending the Courts decision in the lead appeal, directing opening forms be filed within 7 days, and setting the briefing schedule for lead appeal, by JON, FILED. [ # 27 ] [3058313][34] [21-255] [Entered: 03/17/2021 01:00 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 32 ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Bove for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-255 , [ # 30 ], ADDED.[3055604] [21-255] [Entered: 03/12/2021 07:35 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Andrew Patrick Devine for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-255 , [ # 29 ], ADDED.[3055602] [21-255] [Entered: 03/12/2021 07:33 PM]
March 11, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054483] [21-255] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:56 PM]
March 11, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054442] [21-255] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:19 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3053568] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:49 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Kevin M. Hogan for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-255 , [ # 21 ], ADDED.[3053543] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:08 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Robert E Knoer for Roy's Plumbing, Inc., in case 21-255 , [ # 18 ], ADDED.[3053540] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:06 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 24 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 17 ], [ # 23 ], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053539] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:05 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053535] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:01 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF.[3053000] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:47 AM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/09/2021 by CM/ECF. [3052272] [21-255] [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:41 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 14 ], [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED.[3050247] [21-255] [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:39 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [13], on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED.[3050241] [21-255] [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:34 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3050133] [21-255] [Entered: 03/05/2021 03:27 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF.[3050022] [21-255] [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:34 PM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, William G. Beck for CECOS International, Inc., in case 21-255 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[3048982] [21-255] [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:58 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF. [3048097] [21-255] [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:08 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3047964] [21-255] [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:33 AM]
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 02/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3045219] [21-255] [Entered: 02/26/2021 11:26 AM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044641] [21-255] [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:15 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044546] [21-255] [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:32 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Occidental Chemical Corporation, Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043628] [21-255] [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:56 PM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3041477] [21-255] [Entered: 02/22/2021 05:39 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., district court receipt # 0209-4143247, FILED.[3034700] [21-255] [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:30 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3034698] [21-255] [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:29 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. [3034697] [21-255] [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wieloszynski v. City of Niagara Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Linda Ann Joseph
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tony P. Kelly
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Toni Yvonne Bonham
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tammy Dochstader, individually, and as a Parent and Natural Guardian of E.D. and H.J., Infants
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Barbara Jean Walker Robinson
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dawn Marie Leone-Hahn
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charles Pryor
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elizabeth Ann Lumpkin
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Marie Angela Schryver
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Mielke
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John David Wieloszynski, individually, and as Parent and Natural Guardian of D.W., Infant
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Christina Bell
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Theodore Ted Winston Nehrenberg
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Melinda William Epps
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sarah Francis Shipp
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Melvin Pryor Smith
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jennifer Nicole Schwartzkopf
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gwendolyn A. Daniels
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gloria Jean Gates
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Terri Soro
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ebony C. Martin
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wilfred John Dent Spillman
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charlie R. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aaron Edwin Wieloszynski
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joan Howes, individually, and as a Parent and Natural Guardian of M.H., Infant
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ruthel Deloris Dumas
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Russell Leonard McClain, II
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Dobson
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alfonzo Maye
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elizabeth T. Swift
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carmen Cianchetti
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Camilla G. Moore
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sue M. Whatley Rivers
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Melvin W. Spillman
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jennifer Brown-Reese
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Earl Daniels
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Emily Mallory
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Constance Elaine Mielke
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lemuel Mallory
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mickey Morease Harris
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Donald Ray Daniels
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wanda Renee Gutzmore
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gloria Jean Lumpkin Bumpas
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Deborah Owens-Williamson
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Albert Brinson
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Melody Annette Smith-Felts
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Darin Searight
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Janice E. Maye
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rosemary Shaffer
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sandra Elizabeth Jackson
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Lewis Reed
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Thomas Joseph, Jr.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James G. Jackson
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Renee Coates-Smith
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rick Dumas, Sr.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kathleen Paulette Price
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kimberly Jean Wieloszynski
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lori Charmaine Krull
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Susan Lynn Gerow
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sandra J. Onofrio
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Louise Smith
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Debra Jean Lester
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Martha R. Seaberry
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Laura Hope Wieloszynski
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tina Marie Perrier
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Reginald Anthony Penn
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: City of Niagara Falls
Represented By: Thomas J. DeBoy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Conestoga-Rovers & Associates
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Stravino Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CECOS International, Inc.
Represented By: Zackary D. Knaub Esq.
Represented By: William G. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OP-Tech Environmental Services
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Schulman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Occidental Chemical Corporation, individually, and as Successor in Interest to Hooker Chemicals and Plastics Corporation
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Scott Lawn Yard, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Agnieszka Wilewicz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Roy's Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Jean Cunningham Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?