Ricketts v. City of Niagara Falls
Plaintiff / Appellee: Adam Joseph Hamilton, Sr., Norman Clause, Michelle Hudson, Matthew Kreps, Domaniqua Ricketts, Willie Anderson, Jr., Carol Michele Sanders, Primus Hale, Christopher Harper Pippens, Angelique A. Weeden, Scott J. Mayes, Tisha Monequit Jordan, Jasmine C. Robinson, Nadine Marie Cianchetti, Angela C. Pippens, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of N.P., Infant, Arnie Carr, Barbara Jean Thomas, Jermaine Davis, Michael George Kreps, Sr., Mary Jo Hamilton and Lafayette Demel Lawrence
Defendant / Appellant: City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., CECOS International, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Hooker Chemicals and Plastics Corporation, Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Roy's Plumbing, Inc.
Case Number: 21-264
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, designating 21-249 as the lead appeal, holding appeals 21-237, 21-245, 21-247, 21-248, 21-250, 21-251, 21-252, 21-253, 21-255, 21-256, 21-257, 21-259, 21-260, 21-264, 21-265, 21-269, 21-281, and 21-285 in abeyance pending the Courts decision in the lead appeal, directing opening forms be filed within 7 days, and setting the briefing schedule for lead appeal, by JON, FILED. [ # 27 ] [3058308][34] [21-264] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:57 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 32 ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Bove for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-264 , [ # 30 ], ADDED.[3055595] [21-264] [Entered: 03/12/2021 07:22 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Andrew Patrick Devine for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-264 , [ # 29 ], ADDED.[3055593] [21-264] [Entered: 03/12/2021 07:21 PM]
March 11, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054477] [21-264] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:53 PM]
March 11, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054439] [21-264] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:15 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3053566] [21-264] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:47 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Kevin M. Hogan for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-264 , [ # 21 ], ADDED.[3053526] [21-264] [Entered: 03/10/2021 05:51 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Robert E Knoer for Roy's Plumbing, Inc., in case 21-264 , [ # 18 ], ADDED.[3053521] [21-264] [Entered: 03/10/2021 05:46 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 24 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 17 ], [ # 23 ], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053519] [21-264] [Entered: 03/10/2021 05:45 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053516] [21-264] [Entered: 03/10/2021 05:41 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF.[3052996] [21-264] [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:45 AM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/09/2021 by CM/ECF. [3052265] [21-264] [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:38 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 19 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED.[3050225] [21-264] [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:22 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [13], on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED.[3050218] [21-264] [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:15 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3050118] [21-264] [Entered: 03/05/2021 03:21 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF.[3050013] [21-264] [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:30 PM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, William G. Beck for CECOS International, Inc., in case 21-264 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[3048973] [21-264] [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:54 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF. [3048092] [21-264] [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:06 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3047959] [21-264] [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:32 AM]
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 02/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3045186] [21-264] [Entered: 02/26/2021 11:14 AM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044633] [21-264] [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:12 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044543] [21-264] [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:31 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Occidental Chemical Corporation, Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043625] [21-264] [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:54 PM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3041471] [21-264] [Entered: 02/22/2021 05:34 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT DECISION & ORDER, dated 01/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3035237] [21-264] [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:11 AM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc, OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., district court receipt # 02094143236, FILED.[3035236] [21-264] [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:09 AM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc, OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. [3035232] [21-264] [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ricketts v. City of Niagara Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Adam Joseph Hamilton, Sr.
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Norman Clause
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michelle Hudson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Matthew Kreps
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Domaniqua Ricketts
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Willie Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carol Michele Sanders
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Primus Hale
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Christopher Harper Pippens
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Angelique A. Weeden
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Scott J. Mayes
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tisha Monequit Jordan
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jasmine C. Robinson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nadine Marie Cianchetti
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Angela C. Pippens, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of N.P., Infant
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Arnie Carr
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Barbara Jean Thomas
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jermaine Davis
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael George Kreps, Sr.
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mary Jo Hamilton
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lafayette Demel Lawrence
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: City of Niagara Falls
Represented By: Thomas J. DeBoy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Conestoga-Rovers & Associates
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Stravino Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CECOS International, Inc.
Represented By: Zackary D. Knaub Esq.
Represented By: William G. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OP-Tech Environmental Services
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Schulman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Occidental Chemical Corporation, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Hooker Chemicals and Plastics Corporation
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Agnieszka Wilewicz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Scott Lawn Yard, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Roy's Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Jean Cunningham Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?