Bach v. City of Niagara Falls
Plaintiff / Appellee: Grace Goss, Individually and on behalf of the estate of Ronald B. Goss, deceased, Gregory Pea, Tina Muldoon, Shirley D. Chase, Michael Stanish, Debra Crews, Patti Ann Hernandez, Peter D Masur, Duane F Barry, Edward Redmond, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of A.R. and J.R., infants, Christine Stanish, David Cooper, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of J.C., infant, William Fleck, Jr., Michael Starks, Allen Douglas Woods, Derrick Hilson, Jessice Redmond, William Bos, Monica Wilson, Tonia K. Peri, on Behalf of the Estate of Vincent Peri, deceased, Janet Lynn Wilson, John Rivera, Stephen Frank Kutis, Earl B Spillman, David Marshanke, on behalf of estate of Lois Lynch, deceased, Kevin Lynch, on behalf of estate of Lois Lynch, deceased, Peter Scalzo, Brian M. O'Rourke, Richard M Spillman, Kevin Whitenight, Shelia Laverne Tomlinson, Michael Francis Smith, Brian L. Ray, Tina Elder, Willie F. Williams, Thomas I Dritschel, Yancey Bietz, Shawanna D Warren-Stephens, Elaine N. Kennedy, Michael Dave Wilson, Deborah Bryant, Mary Louise Lauer, Darryl Ridgeway, Michael Dennis Moriarty, John A. Lasut, Amanda Bach, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of T.K., infant, Scott Kew and Ivy Ann Wood
Defendant / Appellant: Occidental Chemical Corporation, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, City of Niagara Falls, Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., CECOS International, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., Roy's Plumbing, Inc. and Scott Lawn Yard, Inc.
Case Number: 21-265
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, designating 21-249 as the lead appeal, holding appeals 21-237, 21-245, 21-247, 21-248, 21-250, 21-251, 21-252, 21-253, 21-255, 21-256, 21-257, 21-259, 21-260, 21-264, 21-265, 21-269, 21-281, and 21-285 in abeyance pending the Courts decision in the lead appeal, directing opening forms be filed within 7 days, and setting the briefing schedule for lead appeal, by JON, FILED. [ # 29 ] [3058249][36] [21-265] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:25 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Bove for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-265 , [ # 32 ], ADDED.[3055172] [21-265] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:19 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 33 ATTORNEY, Andrew Patrick Devine for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-265 , [ # 31 ], ADDED.[3055150] [21-265] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:11 PM]
March 11, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054462] [21-265] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:40 PM]
March 11, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054420] [21-265] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:02 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3053575] [21-265] [Entered: 03/10/2021 07:07 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Kevin M. Hogan for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-265 , [ # 23 ], ADDED.[3053565] [21-265] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:46 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Robert E Knoer for Roy's Plumbing, Inc., in case 21-265 , [ # 22 ], ADDED.[3053263] [21-265] [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:52 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 26 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 21 ], [ # 25 ], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053260] [21-265] [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:51 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 25 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [13], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053254] [21-265] [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:46 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF.[3052951] [21-265] [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:34 AM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/09/2021 by CM/ECF. [3052221] [21-265] [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:17 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3050053] [21-265] [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:57 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF.[3049958] [21-265] [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:00 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 19 ], [ # 16 ], on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED.[3049662] [21-265] [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:17 AM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [15], on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED.[3049655] [21-265] [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:12 AM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, William G. Beck for CECOS International, Inc., in case 21-265 , [ # 17 ], ADDED.[3048929] [21-265] [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:16 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF. [3048070] [21-265] [Entered: 03/03/2021 12:50 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3047929] [21-265] [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:23 AM]
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 02/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3045202] [21-265] [Entered: 02/26/2021 11:19 AM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044583] [21-265] [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:53 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044492] [21-265] [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:02 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043592] [21-265] [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:38 PM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3041405] [21-265] [Entered: 02/22/2021 05:02 PM]
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Thomas J. DeBoy, Esq. for Appellant City of Niagara Falls, Zackary D. Knaub, Esq. for Appellant CECOS International, Inc., Jeffrey Charles Stravino, Esq. for Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Paul K. Barr, Esq. for Appellee John Rivera, Kevin Lynch, Edward Redmond, Amanda Bach, Yancey Bietz, William Bos, Deborah Bryant, Shirley D. Chase, David Cooper, Debra Crews, Grace Goss, Patti Ann Hernandez, Derrick Hilson, Elaine N. Kennedy, Stephen Frank Kutis, John A. Lasut, Michael Dennis Moriarty, Brian M. O'Rourke, Tonia K. Peri, Brian L. Ray, Jessice Redmond, Darryl Ridgeway, Peter Scalzo, Michael Starks, Kevin Whitenight, Willie F. Williams, Janet Lynn Wilson, Michael Dave Wilson, Allen Douglas Woods, Tina Elder, Michael Francis Smith, Earl B Spillman, Richard M Spillman, Shelia Laverne Tomlinson, Shawanna D Warren-Stephens, Monica Wilson, Duane F Barry, Thomas I Dritschel, William Fleck, Jr., Peter D Masur, Ivy Ann Wood, Scott Kew, Mary Louise Lauer, David Marshanke, Tina Muldoon, Gregory Pea, Christine Stanish and Michael Stanish, Christen Civiletto, Esq. for Appellee John Rivera, Kevin Lynch, Edward Redmond, Amanda Bach, Yancey Bietz, William Bos, Deborah Bryant, Shirley D. Chase, David Cooper, Debra Crews, Grace Goss, Patti Ann Hernandez, Derrick Hilson, Elaine N. Kennedy, Stephen Frank Kutis, John A. Lasut, Michael Dennis Moriarty, Brian M. O'Rourke, Tonia K. Peri, Brian L. Ray, Jessice Redmond, Darryl Ridgeway, Peter Scalzo, Michael Starks, Kevin Whitenight, Willie F. Williams, Janet Lynn Wilson, Michael Dave Wilson, Allen Douglas Woods, Tina Elder, Michael Francis Smith, Earl B Spillman, Richard M Spillman, Shelia Laverne Tomlinson, Shawanna D Warren-Stephens, Monica Wilson, Duane F Barry, Thomas I Dritschel, William Fleck, Jr., Peter D Masur, Ivy Ann Wood, Scott Kew, Mary Louise Lauer, David Marshanke, Tina Muldoon, Gregory Pea, Christine Stanish and Michael Stanish and Charles S. Siegel, Esq. for Appellee John Rivera, Kevin Lynch, Edward Redmond, Amanda Bach, Yancey Bietz, William Bos, Deborah Bryant, Shirley D. Chase, David Cooper, Debra Crews, Grace Goss, Patti Ann Hernandez, Derrick Hilson, Elaine N. Kennedy, Stephen Frank Kutis, John A. Lasut, Michael Dennis Moriarty, Brian M. O'Rourke, Tonia K. Peri, Brian L. Ray, Jessice Redmond, Darryl Ridgeway, Peter Scalzo, Michael Starks, Kevin Whitenight, Willie F. Williams, Janet Lynn Wilson, Michael Dave Wilson, Allen Douglas Woods, Tina Elder, Michael Francis Smith, Earl B Spillman, Richard M Spillman, Shelia Laverne Tomlinson, Shawanna D Warren-Stephens, Monica Wilson, Duane F Barry, Thomas I Dritschel, William Fleck, Jr., Peter D Masur, Ivy Ann Wood, Scott Kew, Mary Louise Lauer, David Marshanke, Tina Muldoon, Gregory Pea, Christine Stanish and Michael Stanish, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3035508] [21-265] [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:36 AM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., district court receipt # 0209-4143123, FILED.[3035460] [21-265] [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:09 AM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3035458] [21-265] [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:07 AM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. [3035454] [21-265] [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bach v. City of Niagara Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Grace Goss, Individually and on behalf of the estate of Ronald B. Goss, deceased
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gregory Pea
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tina Muldoon
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shirley D. Chase
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Stanish
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Debra Crews
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Patti Ann Hernandez
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Peter D Masur
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Duane F Barry
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Edward Redmond, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of A.R. and J.R., infants
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Christine Stanish
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Cooper, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of J.C., infant
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Fleck, Jr.
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Starks
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Allen Douglas Woods
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Derrick Hilson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jessice Redmond
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Bos
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Monica Wilson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tonia K. Peri, on Behalf of the Estate of Vincent Peri, deceased
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Janet Lynn Wilson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Rivera
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stephen Frank Kutis
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Earl B Spillman
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Marshanke, on behalf of estate of Lois Lynch, deceased
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kevin Lynch, on behalf of estate of Lois Lynch, deceased
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Peter Scalzo
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Brian M. O'Rourke
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard M Spillman
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kevin Whitenight
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shelia Laverne Tomlinson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Francis Smith
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Brian L. Ray
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tina Elder
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Willie F. Williams
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Thomas I Dritschel
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Yancey Bietz
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shawanna D Warren-Stephens
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elaine N. Kennedy
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Dave Wilson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Deborah Bryant
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mary Louise Lauer
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Darryl Ridgeway
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Dennis Moriarty
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John A. Lasut
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Amanda Bach, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of T.K., infant
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Scott Kew
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ivy Ann Wood
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel Esq.
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Esq.
Represented By: Paul K. Barr Esq.
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Conestoga-Rovers & Associates
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Stravino Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: City of Niagara Falls
Represented By: Thomas J. DeBoy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CECOS International, Inc.
Represented By: Zackary D. Knaub Esq.
Represented By: William G. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OP-Tech Environmental Services
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Schulman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bove Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Agnieszka Wilewicz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Roy's Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Jean Cunningham Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Scott Lawn Yard, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?