Civil Rights Corps. v. Pestana
Defendant: Andrea E. Bonina, Personal Capacity and in her official capacity Chair of State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial Districts, Diana Maxfield Kearse, Personal Capacity and in her official capacity Cheif Counsel of the State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial District and Hector D. Lasalle, In his official capacity Presiding Justice of the Second Judicial Department of the Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of the State of New York
Plaintiff / Appellee: Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Nicole Smith Futrell, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith and Steven Zeidman
Defendant / Appellant: Georgia Mary Pestana, Personal Capacity and in her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York and Melinda Katz, Personal Capacity and in her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County
Case Number: 22-1520
Filed: July 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: LOCAL QUESTION-Constitutional
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Filing 30 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Melinda Katz and Georgia Mary Pestana Brief due date as 10/25/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 10/25/2022, FILED.[3362392] [22-1520] [Entered: 08/09/2022 03:20 PM]
August 9, 2022 Filing 27 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3362148] [22-1520] [Entered: 08/09/2022 12:10 PM]
August 9, 2022 Filing 24 CAPTION, changed full caption to reflect Defendants-Appellants above Defendants, AMENDED.[3361935] [22-1520] [Entered: 08/09/2022 09:57 AM]
August 9, 2022 Filing 23 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Melinda Katz and Georgia Mary Pestana, informing Court of proposed due date 10/25/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 08/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3361886] [22-1520] [Entered: 08/09/2022 09:34 AM]
August 2, 2022 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Civil Rights Corps., Nicole Smith Futrell, Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith and Steven Zeidman, FILED. Service date 08/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3358477] [22-1520] [Entered: 08/02/2022 02:22 PM]
August 2, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE, to Appellee Civil Rights Corps., Nicole Smith Futrell, Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith and Steven Zeidman , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3357984] [22-1520] [Entered: 08/02/2022 09:13 AM]
July 26, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Devin Slack for Georgia Mary Pestana, Melinda Katz, in case 22-1520, [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3354373] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/26/2022 12:05 PM]
July 26, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Richard Paul Dearing for Georgia Mary Pestana, Melinda Katz, in case 22-1520, [ # 10 ], ADDED.[3354370] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/26/2022 12:03 PM]
July 26, 2022 Filing 14 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Melinda Katz and Georgia Mary Pestana, FILED. Service date 07/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3354347] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/26/2022 11:48 AM]
July 26, 2022 Filing 13 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Melinda Katz and Georgia Mary Pestana, FILED. Service date 07/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3354326] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/26/2022 11:38 AM]
July 26, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Melinda Katz and Georgia Mary Pestana, FILED. Service date 07/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3354069] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/26/2022 09:17 AM]
July 25, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Melinda Katz and Georgia Mary Pestana, FILED. Service date 07/25/2022 by CM/ECF. [3353519] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/25/2022 12:18 PM]
July 25, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Melinda Katz and Georgia Mary Pestana, FILED. Service date 07/25/2022 by CM/ECF. [3353446] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/25/2022 11:50 AM]
July 25, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Amy McCamphill, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney Sylvia Hinds-Radix, SUBSTITUTED.[3353325] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/25/2022 10:40 AM]
July 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Georgia Mary Pestana and Melinda Katz, FILED. Service date 07/21/2022 by CM/ECF. [3351758] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/21/2022 12:02 PM]
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Melinda Katz and Georgia Mary Pestana, district court receipt # 2846, FILED.[3348700] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:20 PM]
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Gregory L. Diskant, Esq. for Appellee Steven Zeidman, Cynthia Godsoe, Civil Rights Corps., Nicole Smith Futrell, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray and Abbe Smith, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3348582] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/15/2022 11:49 AM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3348576] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/15/2022 11:46 AM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 06/13/2022, RECEIVED.[3348573] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/15/2022 11:45 AM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Melinda Katz and Georgia Mary Pestana, FILED. [3348570] [22-1520] [Entered: 07/15/2022 11:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Civil Rights Corps. v. Pestana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Civil Rights Corps.
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cynthia Godsoe
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nicole Smith Futrell
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Daniel S. Medwed
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Justin Murray
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Abbe Smith
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Steven Zeidman
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea E. Bonina, Personal Capacity and in her official capacity Chair of State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial Districts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Maxfield Kearse, Personal Capacity and in her official capacity Cheif Counsel of the State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector D. Lasalle, In his official capacity Presiding Justice of the Second Judicial Department of the Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Georgia Mary Pestana, Personal Capacity and in her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Amy McCamphill
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Devin Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Melinda Katz, Personal Capacity and in her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Amy McCamphill
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Devin Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?