Energetic Tank, Inc. v. Unknown Defendant
Plaintiff: Energetic Tank, Inc., as Owner of the M/V Alnic MC, for exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Appellant: United States of America
Counter Claimant: Navin Ramdhun
Claimant: Brandon Tolley
Appellee: Haruka Ramdhun, Jason Luangco, Cheysserr Luangco, Nestor Cuevas Soto, Francesco Sanfilippo, Carmelo Castro, Philip Torio, Phillip Fields, James Andy Woods, John B. Ray, Rodrigo Owen Tionquiao, Jerrell Dean, Clember Miranda, Michael Collins, Kerrington Harvey, Jason Baldwin, Matthew Montgomery, Brandon York, Dedrick Walker, Jennifer Simon, Milton O. Lovelace, Donnel Robinson, Davion Reese, Joshua Bruce Hook, Mr. Doyle A Ebarb, Joseph K. Robbins, Andy Aceret, Gao Yong, Michael Wuest, Joshua Patat, Juan Romero, Ashanti Molton, Donnovan Lamarcus Jones, Akimwalle Winter, Vares Belony, Tracey Lovelace, Delando Beckford, Devin Mask, John Hoagland, Karen Doyon, Richard Lopez, Taylor Troy, Karen Bushell, Rachel Eckels, Theresa Palmer, Alan Aaron, Darryl Smith, Jacqueline Ingram, Victor Granados, Byron Jamal Johnson, Patrick Joseph, Ayaka Joseph, Mark Joseph Ligon, Malachi Shannon, Gilleon Gillis, Karen Tolley, as personal representative of the Estate of Brandon Tolley, Amy Winters and Xiomaro Cuevas Soto
Case Number: 22-1884
Filed: August 29, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: TORTS INJURY-Marine
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2022 Filing 57 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Energetic Tank, Inc. in 22-1765 Brief due date as 01/12/2023. Joint Appendix due date as 01/12/2023, FILED.[3407758] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/26/2022 08:37 AM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 52 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Energetic Tank, Inc. in 22-1765, informing Court of proposed due date 01/11/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 10/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3401692] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/17/2022 01:05 PM]
October 13, 2022 Filing 51 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dennisse Pizarro-Lebron, ASSIGNED.[3400071] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/13/2022 04:43 PM]
October 13, 2022 Filing 46 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 10/13/2022, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[3399425] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/13/2022 10:54 AM]
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER, reinstating appeal, FILED.[3399416] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/13/2022 10:52 AM]
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, to recall mandate, FILED.[3399413] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/13/2022 10:51 AM]
October 5, 2022 Filing 42 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 10/05/2022, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[3394087] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/05/2022 01:19 PM]
October 5, 2022 Filing 41 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 10/05/2022, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3394086] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/05/2022 01:17 PM]
October 5, 2022 Filing 39 APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 10/05/2022, REMANDED.[3394080] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/05/2022 01:13 PM]
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER, dated 10/05/2022, the case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with its letter. In accordance with United States v. Jacobson, the mandate shall issue forthwith and jurisdiction will be automatically restored to this Court, without the need for a new notice of appeal, upon entry of the district courts new decision, by JMW, RJS, C. MCMAHON, FILED.[3394076] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/05/2022 01:10 PM]
October 5, 2022 Filing 37 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[3394071] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 10/05/2022 01:00 PM]
September 21, 2022 Filing 34 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3386116] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 09/21/2022 01:45 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Energetic Tank, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384608] [22-1884] [Entered: 09/19/2022 02:56 PM]
September 15, 2022 Filing 30 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dennisse Pizarro-Lebron, ASSIGNED.[3382799] [22-1884, 22-1765] [Entered: 09/15/2022 12:25 PM]
September 15, 2022 Filing 24 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3382327] [22-1884] [Entered: 09/15/2022 01:18 AM]
September 15, 2022 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3382326] [22-1884] [Entered: 09/15/2022 01:16 AM]
September 14, 2022 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jennifer Simon, FILED. Service date 09/14/2022 by CM/ECF.[3381897] [22-1884] [Entered: 09/14/2022 12:02 PM]
September 12, 2022 Filing 18 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/12/2022 by CM/ECF.[3380661] [22-1884] [Entered: 09/12/2022 04:58 PM]
September 12, 2022 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Anne Murphy, [ # 16 ], in place of attorney Benjamin H. Torrance, SUBSTITUTED.[3380637] [22-1884] [Entered: 09/12/2022 04:46 PM]
September 12, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3380630] [22-1884] [Entered: 09/12/2022 04:39 PM]
September 8, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER, dated 09/08/2022, on behalf of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, requesting leave to make changes to the interlocutory decision, RECEIVED. [3378981] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 09/08/2022 04:24 PM]
September 6, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Alan M. Weigel for United States of America, in case 22-1884 , [ # 8 ], ADDED.[3377316] [22-1884] [Entered: 09/06/2022 09:29 PM]
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Andy Aceret, Jason Baldwin, Delando Beckford, Vares Belony, Carmelo Castro, Michael Collins, Phillip Fields, Victor Granados, Kerrington Harvey, Byron Jamal Johnson, Milton O. Lovelace, Tracey Lovelace, Clember Miranda, Matthew Montgomery, Joshua Patat, John B. Ray, Davion Reese, Donnel Robinson, Juan Romero, Philip Torio, Dedrick Walker, Akimwalle Winter, James Andy Woods, Michael Wuest, Gao Yong and Brandon York, FILED. Service date 09/06/2022 by CM/ECF.[3377033] [22-1884] [Entered: 09/06/2022 02:59 PM]
September 2, 2022 Filing 9 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Energetic Tank, Inc. in 22-1765, informing Court of proposed due date 11/23/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 09/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3375898] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 09/02/2022 11:35 AM]
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Energetic Tank, Inc. in 22-1765, Appellee Energetic Tank, Inc. in 22-1884, FILED. Service date 08/31/2022 by CM/ECF. [3374801] [22-1765, 22-1884] [Entered: 08/31/2022 02:07 PM]
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTE: See lead case, 22-1765, containing complete set of docket entries.[3374197] [22-1884, 22-1765] [Entered: 08/30/2022 04:02 PM]
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3374184] [22-1884] [Entered: 08/30/2022 03:48 PM]
August 29, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/15/2022, RECEIVED.[3374118] [22-1884] [Entered: 08/30/2022 03:04 PM]
August 29, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER dated 01/10/2020, RECEIVED.[3374116] [22-1884] [Entered: 08/30/2022 03:03 PM]
August 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 22-1884, FILED. [3374085] [22-1884, 22-1765] [Entered: 08/30/2022 02:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Energetic Tank, Inc. v. Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energetic Tank, Inc., as Owner of the M/V Alnic MC, for exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Represented By: Thomas H. Belknap Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Alan M. Weigel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Anne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Navin Ramdhun
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brandon Tolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Haruka Ramdhun
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jason Luangco
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cheysserr Luangco
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nestor Cuevas Soto
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Francesco Sanfilippo
Represented By: Roy C. Dripps Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carmelo Castro
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Philip Torio
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Phillip Fields
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James Andy Woods
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John B. Ray
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rodrigo Owen Tionquiao
Represented By: Dario Anthony Chinigo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jerrell Dean
Represented By: Dario Anthony Chinigo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clember Miranda
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Collins
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kerrington Harvey
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jason Baldwin
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Matthew Montgomery
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brandon York
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dedrick Walker
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jennifer Simon
Represented By: Kirk M.H. Lyons Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Milton O. Lovelace
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Donnel Robinson
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Davion Reese
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joshua Bruce Hook
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mr. Doyle A Ebarb
Represented By: Ralph Joseph Mellusi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph K. Robbins
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Andy Aceret
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gao Yong
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Wuest
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joshua Patat
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Juan Romero
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ashanti Molton
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Donnovan Lamarcus Jones
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Akimwalle Winter
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vares Belony
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tracey Lovelace
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Delando Beckford
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Devin Mask
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Hoagland
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen Doyon
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard Lopez
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Taylor Troy
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen Bushell
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rachel Eckels
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Theresa Palmer
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alan Aaron
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Darryl Smith
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jacqueline Ingram
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Victor Granados
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Byron Jamal Johnson
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patrick Joseph
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ayaka Joseph
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark Joseph Ligon
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Malachi Shannon
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gilleon Gillis
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen Tolley, as personal representative of the Estate of Brandon Tolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Amy Winters
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Xiomaro Cuevas Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?