Energetic Tank, Inc. v. Unknown Defendant
Plaintiff / Appellant: Energetic Tank, Inc., as Owner of the M/V Alnic MC, for exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Counter Claimant: Navin Ramdhun
Defendant / Appellee: Unknown Defendant
Appellee: Haruka Ramdhun, Jason Luangco, Cheysserr Luangco, Nestor Cuevas Soto, Francesco Sanfilippo, Carmelo Castro, Philip Torio, Phillip Fields, James Andy Woods, John B. Ray, Rodrigo Owen Tionquiao, Jerrell Dean, Clember Miranda, Michael Collins, Dedrick Walker, United States of America, Milton O. Lovelace, Donnel Robinson, Davion Reese, Joshua Bruce Hook, Doyle A Ebarb, Joseph K. Robbins, Andy Aceret, Gao Yong, Michael Wuest, Joshua Patat, Juan Romero, Ashanti Molton, Donnovan Lamarcus Jones, Akimwalle Winter, Vares Belony, Tracey Lovelace, Delando Beckford, Devin Mask, John Hoagland, Karen Doyon, Richard Lopez, Taylor Troy, Karen Bushell, Rachel Eckels, Theresa Palmer, Alan Aaron, Darryl Smith, Amy Winters, Jacqueline Ingram, Victor Granados, Byron Jamal Johnson, Patrick Joseph, Ayaka Joseph, Mark Joseph Ligon, Malachi Shannon, Gilleon Gillis, Karen Tolley, as personal representative of the Estate of Brandon Tolley, Xiomaro Cuevas Soto and Alexis Sanfilippo
Claimant: Kerrington Harvey, Jason Baldwin, Matthew Montgomery, Brandon York and Jennifer Simon
Case Number: 22-2774
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: TORTS INJURY-Marine
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Filing 29 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance, [ # 21 ], [ # 25 ], on behalf of Appellee Jennifer Simon, FILED.[3433191] [22-2774] [Entered: 12/08/2022 11:55 AM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [ # 24 ] filed by Appellant-Cross-Appellee Energetic Tank, Inc.,. The appeal is dismissed effective February 3, 2023 if the brief is not filed by that date, FILED. [3429592][28] [22-1765, 22-1884, 22-2774, 22-2871, 22-2881, 22-2883] [Entered: 12/01/2022 02:26 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jennifer Simon, FILED. Service date 12/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3429475] [22-2774] [Entered: 12/01/2022 12:43 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Energetic Tank, Inc. in 22-1765, FILED. Service date 12/01/2022 by CM/ECF. [3429471] [22-1765, 22-2774, 22-2871, 22-2881, 22-2883, 22-1884] [Entered: 12/01/2022 12:39 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Joshua Bruce Hook, Donnovan Lamarcus Jones, Ayaka Joseph, Patrick Joseph, Mark Joseph Ligon, Cheysserr Luangco, Jason Luangco, Devin Mask, Ashanti Molton, Haruka Ramdhun, Navin Ramdhun, Joseph K. Robbins, Malachi Shannon, Nestor Cuevas Soto and Xiomaro Cuevas Soto, FILED. Service date 12/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3429246] [22-2774] [Entered: 12/01/2022 10:23 AM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Andy Aceret, Jason Baldwin, Delando Beckford, Vares Belony, Carmelo Castro, Michael Collins, Phillip Fields, Kerrington Harvey, Byron Jamal Johnson, Milton O. Lovelace, Tracey Lovelace, Clember Miranda, Matthew Montgomery, Joshua Patat, John B. Ray, John B. Ray, Davion Reese, Donnel Robinson, Juan Romero, Philip Torio, Dedrick Walker, Akimwalle Winter, James Andy Woods, James Andy Woods, Michael Wuest, Gao Yong and Brandon York, FILED. Service date 12/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3429166] [22-2774] [Entered: 12/01/2022 09:38 AM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 21 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance, [18], on behalf of Appellee Jennifer Simon, FILED.[3429046] [22-2774] [Entered: 12/01/2022 08:02 AM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE, to Appellee Alan Aaron, Andy Aceret, Jason Baldwin, Delando Beckford, Vares Belony, Karen Bushell, Carmelo Castro, Michael Collins, Jerrell Dean, Karen Doyon, Doyle A Ebarb, Rachel Eckels, Phillip Fields, Gilleon Gillis, Victor Granados, Kerrington Harvey, John Hoagland, Joshua Bruce Hook, Jacqueline Ingram, Byron Jamal Johnson, Donnovan Lamarcus Jones, Ayaka Joseph, Patrick Joseph, Mark Joseph Ligon, Richard Lopez, Milton O. Lovelace, Tracey Lovelace, Cheysserr Luangco, Jason Luangco, Devin Mask, Clember Miranda, Ashanti Molton, Matthew Montgomery, Theresa Palmer, Joshua Patat, Haruka Ramdhun, Navin Ramdhun, John B. Ray, John B. Ray, Davion Reese, Joseph K. Robbins, Donnel Robinson, Juan Romero, Malachi Shannon, Darryl Smith, Nestor Cuevas Soto, Xiomaro Cuevas Soto, Rodrigo Owen Tionquiao, Karen Tolley, Philip Torio, Taylor Troy, Unknown Defendant, Dedrick Walker, Akimwalle Winter, Amy Winters, James Andy Woods, James Andy Woods, Michael Wuest, Gao Yong and Brandon York , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3429045] [22-2774] [Entered: 12/01/2022 07:55 AM]
November 16, 2022 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Alexis Sanfilippo and Francesco Sanfilippo, FILED. Service date 11/16/2022 by CM/ECF.[3421154] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/16/2022 05:06 PM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jennifer Simon, FILED. Service date 11/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3420039] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/15/2022 01:19 PM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 15 CAPTION, cross-appellants from 22-2871 added, AMENDED.[3415635] [22-1765, 22-1884, 22-2774, 22-2871] [Entered: 11/07/2022 04:46 PM]
November 4, 2022 Filing 14 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Energetic Tank, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/04/2022 by CM/ECF.[3414142] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/04/2022 10:00 AM]
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Energetic Tank, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/04/2022 by CM/ECF.[3414139] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/04/2022 09:59 AM]
November 4, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Energetic Tank, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/04/2022 by CM/ECF.[3414136] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/04/2022 09:57 AM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Anne Murphy, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Benjamin H. Torrance, SUBSTITUTED.[3413087] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/02/2022 07:49 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/02/2022 by CM/ECF. [3412834] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/02/2022 03:27 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 9 CAPTION, Appellee Alexis Sanfilippo added, AMENDED.[3412384] [22-1765] [Entered: 11/02/2022 10:37 AM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTE: See lead case, 22-1765, containing complete set of docket entries.[3412338] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/02/2022 10:15 AM]
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Energetic Tank, Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-26850156, FILED.[3412327] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/02/2022 10:11 AM]
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3412321] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/02/2022 10:09 AM]
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/12/2022, RECEIVED.[3412319] [22-2774] [Entered: 11/02/2022 10:08 AM]
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Energetic Tank, Inc. in 22-2774, FILED. [3412309] [22-2774, 22-1765] [Entered: 11/02/2022 10:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Energetic Tank, Inc. v. Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Energetic Tank, Inc., as Owner of the M/V Alnic MC, for exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Represented By: Thomas H. Belknap Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Navin Ramdhun
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Haruka Ramdhun
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jason Luangco
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cheysserr Luangco
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nestor Cuevas Soto
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Francesco Sanfilippo
Represented By: Roy C. Dripps Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carmelo Castro
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Philip Torio
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Phillip Fields
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James Andy Woods
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John B. Ray
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rodrigo Owen Tionquiao
Represented By: Dario Anthony Chinigo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jerrell Dean
Represented By: Dario Anthony Chinigo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clember Miranda
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Collins
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dedrick Walker
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Anne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Milton O. Lovelace
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Donnel Robinson
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Davion Reese
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joshua Bruce Hook
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Doyle A Ebarb
Represented By: Ralph Joseph Mellusi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph K. Robbins
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Andy Aceret
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gao Yong
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Wuest
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joshua Patat
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Juan Romero
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ashanti Molton
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Donnovan Lamarcus Jones
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Akimwalle Winter
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vares Belony
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tracey Lovelace
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Delando Beckford
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Devin Mask
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Hoagland
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen Doyon
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard Lopez
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Taylor Troy
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen Bushell
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rachel Eckels
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Theresa Palmer
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alan Aaron
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Darryl Smith
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Amy Winters
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jacqueline Ingram
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Victor Granados
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Byron Jamal Johnson
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patrick Joseph
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ayaka Joseph
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark Joseph Ligon
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Malachi Shannon
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gilleon Gillis
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen Tolley, as personal representative of the Estate of Brandon Tolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Xiomaro Cuevas Soto
Represented By: Jacob Shisha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alexis Sanfilippo
Represented By: Roy C. Dripps Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kerrington Harvey
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jason Baldwin
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Matthew Montgomery
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brandon York
Represented By: Paul Thomas Hofmann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jennifer Simon
Represented By: Kirk M.H. Lyons Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?