Marhone v. Cassel
Defendant: Captain Laporto, Captain at Sing Sing Correctional Facility
Plaintiff / Appellant: Conrad Marhone
Defendant / Appellee: Correction Officer J. Cassel, Correction Officer of Sing Sing Correctional Facility, Correction Officer Wright, Correction Officer at Sing Sing Correctional Facility, DSS Keysor, Deputy Superintendent at Sing Sing Correctional Facility, Ron Farah, Plant Superintendent at Shawangunk Correctional facility, Michael Capra, Superintendent of Sing Sing Correctional Facility, Albert Prack, Director of Special Housing & Inmate Discipline, David A. Rock, Superintendent of Upstae Correctional Facility and Joseph Smith, Superintendent of Shawangunk Correctional Facility
Case Number: 22-2912
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: PRISONER PET-Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Filing 18 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [15], on behalf of Appellant Conrad Marhone, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3444070] [22-2912] [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:42 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellant Conrad Marhone, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3444067] [22-2912] [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:37 PM]
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, dated 12/28/2022, stating this appeal may be subject to dismissal by 01/18/2023, unless Appellant Conrad Marhone, submits an Authorization form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3444066] [22-2912] [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:33 PM]
December 22, 2022 Filing 15 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Conrad Marhone, FILED. No service.[3444065] [22-2912] [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:31 PM]
December 22, 2022 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Conrad Marhone, FILED. No service.[3444060] [22-2912] [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:30 PM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE, to Appellee Michael Capra, J. Cassel, Ron Farah, Keysor, Albert Prack, David A. Rock, Joseph Smith and Wright , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3433288] [22-2912] [Entered: 12/08/2022 01:19 PM]
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 12/05/2022, stating this appeal may be subject to dismissal by 12/27/2022, unless Appellant Conrad Marhone, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3431340] [22-2912] [Entered: 12/05/2022 05:01 PM]
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 12/05/2022, stating this appeal may be subject to dismissal by 12/27/2022, unless Conrad Marhone, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3431334] [22-2912] [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:57 PM]
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3418073] [22-2912] [Entered: 11/10/2022 12:30 PM]
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[3418071] [22-2912] [Entered: 11/10/2022 12:28 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3418069] [22-2912] [Entered: 11/10/2022 12:26 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/27/2022, RECEIVED.[3418066] [22-2912] [Entered: 11/10/2022 12:25 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION & ORDER, dated 09/26/2022, RECEIVED.[3418061] [22-2912] [Entered: 11/10/2022 12:23 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Conrad Marhone, FILED. [3418055] [22-2912] [Entered: 11/10/2022 12:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marhone v. Cassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Conrad Marhone
Represented By: Conrad Marhone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Correction Officer J. Cassel, Correction Officer of Sing Sing Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Correction Officer Wright, Correction Officer at Sing Sing Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DSS Keysor, Deputy Superintendent at Sing Sing Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ron Farah, Plant Superintendent at Shawangunk Correctional facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Capra, Superintendent of Sing Sing Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Albert Prack, Director of Special Housing & Inmate Discipline
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David A. Rock, Superintendent of Upstae Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph Smith, Superintendent of Shawangunk Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Laporto, Captain at Sing Sing Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?