Caballero v. Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionaria
Defendant: Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias De Colombia and Norte De Valle Cartel
Plaintiff / Appellee: Antonio Caballero
Appellant: Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V.
3Rd Party Defendant: Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Judith G. Janis, Christopher T. Janis, individually and as personal representative and sole heir of the estate of Greer C. Janis, Michael J. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Olivia PescatoreFr, Josh Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Carole Pescatore Harpster, individually and as the representative of the estate of Frank Pescatore Sr., Richard Pescatore, John Pescatore and Carolyn Pescatore
Counter Claimant: Interactive Brokers, LLC
Case Number: 22-317
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: STATUTES-Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 18, 2023 Summary In re ALBA PetrĂ³leos de El Salvador S.E.M. de C.V.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 95 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 09/16/2022 by CM/ECF. [3383773] [22-317] [Entered: 09/16/2022 02:12 PM]
September 16, 2022 Filing 94 ATTORNEY, Blair Trahan for Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., in case 22-317, [ # 92 ], ADDED.[3383583] [22-317] [Entered: 09/16/2022 11:33 AM]
September 16, 2022 Filing 93 ATTORNEY, Benedict S. Bernstein for Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., in case 22-317, [ # 91 ], ADDED.[3383581] [22-317] [Entered: 09/16/2022 11:31 AM]
September 16, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 09/16/2022 by CM/ECF. [3383576] [22-317] [Entered: 09/16/2022 11:25 AM]
September 16, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 09/16/2022 by CM/ECF. [3383573] [22-317] [Entered: 09/16/2022 11:23 AM]
September 9, 2022 Filing 88 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Marcos Daniel Jimenez, Esq. for Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 09/09/2022 by CM/ECF. [3379274] [22-317] [Entered: 09/09/2022 10:21 AM]
September 8, 2022 Filing 86 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero , WAIVED. [3378568] [22-317] [Entered: 09/08/2022 11:31 AM]
September 8, 2022 Filing 84 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Claire DeLelle, Esq. for Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 09/08/2022 by CM/ECF. [3378467] [22-317] [Entered: 09/08/2022 10:44 AM]
August 26, 2022 Filing 83 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 08/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3372711] [22-317] [Entered: 08/26/2022 04:55 PM]
July 22, 2022 Filing 81 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/22/2022, on behalf of Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., RECEIVED. Service date 07/22/2022 by CM/ECF.[3352982] [22-317] [Entered: 07/22/2022 04:54 PM]
June 29, 2022 Filing 79 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 06/29/2022, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., RECEIVED. Service date 06/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3340122] [22-317] [Entered: 06/29/2022 12:49 PM]
June 24, 2022 Filing 78 CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER, [ # 77 ], on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, FILED.[3337891] [22-317] [Entered: 06/24/2022 02:33 PM]
June 24, 2022 Filing 77 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, informing the Court that Antonio Caballero is a nominal party to the appeal, therefore, they will not be filing a brief, RECEIVED. Service date 06/24/2022 by CM/ECF.[3337885] [22-317]--[Edited 06/24/2022 by RW] [Entered: 06/24/2022 02:26 PM]
June 24, 2022 Filing 76 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [75], on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, FILED.[3337668] [22-317] [Entered: 06/24/2022 10:46 AM]
June 24, 2022 Filing 75 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, informing Court of proposed due date 08/26/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 06/24/2022 by CM/ECF.[3337647] [22-317] [Entered: 06/24/2022 10:27 AM]
June 9, 2022 Filing 72 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V. Brief due date as 08/26/2022, FILED.[3329528] [22-317] [Entered: 06/09/2022 10:44 AM]
June 9, 2022 Filing 69 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., informing Court of proposed due date 08/26/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 06/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3329387] [22-317] [Entered: 06/09/2022 09:01 AM]
May 27, 2022 Filing 63 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 05/27/2022 by CM/ECF. [3323060] [22-317] [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:56 PM]
May 27, 2022 Filing 62 APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 221-436), on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 05/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3323059] [22-317] [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:56 PM]
May 27, 2022 Filing 61 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-220), on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 05/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3323057] [22-317] [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:54 PM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 60 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 05/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3306759] [22-317] [Entered: 05/02/2022 09:12 AM]
April 21, 2022 Filing 57 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 48 ], on behalf of Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 04/21/2022 by CM/ECF.[3301525][57] [22-317] [Entered: 04/21/2022 05:02 PM]
April 21, 2022 Filing 56 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 47 ], on behalf of Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 04/21/2022 by CM/ECF.[3301523][56] [22-317] [Entered: 04/21/2022 05:00 PM]
April 21, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION ORDER, referring Appellee's motion to dismiss and the motion to amend the caption to the merits panel [ # 42 ], [ # 43 ], filed by Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., by JFB, FILED. [3301003][54] [22-317] [Entered: 04/21/2022 09:37 AM]
April 14, 2022 Filing 48 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to amend caption [ # 43 ], on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 04/14/2022 by CM/ECF. [3297392] [22-317] [Entered: 04/14/2022 10:43 PM]
April 14, 2022 Filing 47 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to dismiss [ # 42 ], on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 04/14/2022 by CM/ECF. [3297391] [22-317] [Entered: 04/14/2022 10:38 PM]
April 4, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 04/04/2022 by CM/ECF. [3290999] [22-317] [Entered: 04/04/2022 08:20 PM]
April 4, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 04/04/2022 by CM/ECF. [3290995] [22-317] [Entered: 04/04/2022 08:04 PM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 41 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V. and Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V. Brief due date as 05/27/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 05/27/2022, FILED.[3277701] [22-317] [Entered: 03/15/2022 08:51 AM]
March 11, 2022 Filing 38 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., informing Court of proposed due date 05/27/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3276775] [22-317] [Entered: 03/11/2022 04:21 PM]
March 10, 2022 Filing 37 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3275326] [22-317] [Entered: 03/10/2022 10:09 AM]
March 8, 2022 Filing 32 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, FORM C, [ # 17 ], [ # 19 ], [ # 21 ], [ # 22 ], [ # 23 ], [ # 24 ], [ # 25 ], [ # 26 ], on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED.[3274049] [22-317] [Entered: 03/08/2022 03:43 PM]
March 8, 2022 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Susan Grace for Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., in case 22-317, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[3274027] [22-317] [Entered: 03/08/2022 03:32 PM]
March 8, 2022 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Nicole E. Erb for Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., in case 22-317, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[3274017] [22-317] [Entered: 03/08/2022 03:26 PM]
March 1, 2022 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 03/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3269771] [22-317] [Entered: 03/01/2022 04:38 PM]
February 28, 2022 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, FILED. Service date 02/28/2022 by CM/ECF.[3268403] [22-317] [Entered: 02/28/2022 11:31 AM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 26 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3268151] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 09:08 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF. [3268150] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 09:00 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF. [3268149] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 08:56 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3268146] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 08:44 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 22 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [18], on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED.[3268143] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:59 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 21 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [16], on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED.[3268142] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:54 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 20 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3268141] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:51 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [14], on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED.[3268140] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:50 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 18 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3268139] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:49 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [13], on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED.[3268138] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:44 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF. [3268137] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:43 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Joseph I. Zumpano for Antonio Caballero, in case 22-317, [ # 12 ], ADDED.[3268135] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:42 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF. [3268134] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:40 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3268133] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 07:36 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, FILED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF. [3268060] [22-317] [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:03 PM]
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 9 ], on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, FILED.[3266473] [22-317] [Entered: 02/23/2022 11:31 PM]
February 23, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Leon Patricios for Antonio Caballero, in case 22-317, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3266472] [22-317] [Entered: 02/23/2022 11:30 PM]
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, FILED. Service date 02/23/2022 by CM/ECF. [3266443] [22-317] [Entered: 02/23/2022 05:34 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [7], on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, FILED.[3265566] [22-317] [Entered: 02/22/2022 06:25 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Antonio Caballero, FILED. Service date 02/22/2022 by CM/ECF. [3265557] [22-317] [Entered: 02/22/2022 06:11 PM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3262921] [22-317] [Entered: 02/16/2022 07:27 PM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., district court receipt # ACTDC-6829117, FILED.[3262920] [22-317] [Entered: 02/16/2022 07:27 PM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/13/2022, RECEIVED.[3262919] [22-317] [Entered: 02/16/2022 07:26 PM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V., FILED. [3262911] [22-317] [Entered: 02/16/2022 06:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Caballero v. Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Antonio Caballero
Represented By: Houston Putnam Lowry Esq.
Represented By: Leon Patricios Esq.
Represented By: Joseph I. Zumpano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alba Petroleos De EL Salvador S.E.M. DE C.V.
Represented By: Claire DeLelle Esq.
Represented By: Nicole E. Erb Esq.
Represented By: Susan Grace Esq.
Represented By: Benedict S. Bernstein Esq.
Represented By: Blair Trahan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Keith Stansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Marc Gonsalves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Thomas Howes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Judith G. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Christopher T. Janis, individually and as personal representative and sole heir of the estate of Greer C. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Michael J. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jonathan N. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Olivia PescatoreFr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Josh Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jada Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jarrod Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jordan Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Carole Pescatore Harpster, individually and as the representative of the estate of Frank Pescatore Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Richard Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Carolyn Pescatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias De Colombia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norte De Valle Cartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Interactive Brokers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?