Palin v. The New York Times Company
Petitioner: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 52 Media Organizations
Plaintiff / Appellant: Sarah Palin, an individual
Defendant / Appellee: The New York Times Company and James Bennet, an individual
Case Number: 22-558
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: TORTS INJURY-Assault Slander
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Filing 119 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Kenneth Turkel, Esq. for Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 08/10/2023 by CM/ECF. [3554999] [22-558] [Entered: 08/10/2023 06:03 PM]
August 7, 2023 Filing 117 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 11/06/2023, PROPOSED.[3552281] [22-558] [Entered: 08/07/2023 09:34 AM]
June 22, 2023 Filing 115 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 06/22/2023, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, RECEIVED. Service date 06/22/2023 by CM/ECF.[3532389] [22-558] [Entered: 06/22/2023 10:26 AM]
March 2, 2023 Filing 112 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, revised availability for oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 03/02/2023 by CM/ECF.[3476861] [22-558]--[Edited 03/02/2023 by RW] [Entered: 03/02/2023 10:40 AM]
February 22, 2023 Filing 110 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 02/22/2023, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, RECEIVED. Service date 02/22/2023 by CM/ECF.[3472836] [22-558] [Entered: 02/22/2023 03:38 PM]
January 17, 2023 Filing 107 CURED DEFECTIVE REPLY BRIEF [ # 106 ], on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED.[3453402] [22-558] [Entered: 01/17/2023 02:38 PM]
January 17, 2023 Filing 106 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 01/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3453327] [22-558] [Entered: 01/17/2023 01:45 PM]
January 17, 2023 Filing 105 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply Brief, [ # 104 ], on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED.[3452880] [22-558] [Entered: 01/17/2023 09:04 AM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 104 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 01/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3452684] [22-558] [Entered: 01/13/2023 05:47 PM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 100 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file an amicus curiae brief to the merits panel [ # 94 ], FILED. [3438759][100] [22-558] [Entered: 12/16/2022 02:48 PM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 95 NEW PARTY, Movant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 52 Media Organizations, ADDED.[3438184] [22-558] [Entered: 12/16/2022 09:09 AM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 94 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 52 Media Organizations, FILED. Service date12/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3438101] [22-558]--[Edited 12/16/2022 by RW] [Entered: 12/15/2022 11:04 PM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 52 Media Organizations, FILED. Service date 12/15/2022 by CM/ECF. [3438097] [22-558]--[Edited 12/16/2022 by RW] [Entered: 12/15/2022 10:40 PM]
December 9, 2022 Filing 92 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, on behalf of Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 12/09/2022 by CM/ECF. [3434270] [22-558]--[Edited 12/09/2022 by RW] [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:40 PM]
December 9, 2022 Filing 91 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, on behalf of Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 12/09/2022 by CM/ECF. [3434267] [22-558]--[Edited 12/09/2022 by RW] [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:39 PM]
December 9, 2022 Filing 90 MOTION ORDER, granting Appellees' motion to file a supplemental appendix [ # 84 ], filed by Appellee The New York Times Company and James Bennet, FILED. [3434028][90] [22-558] [Entered: 12/09/2022 12:06 PM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 87 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Jay Ward Brown, Esq. for Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 12/08/2022 by CM/ECF. [3433671] [22-558] [Entered: 12/08/2022 05:41 PM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 86 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 12/08/2022 by CM/ECF. [3433661] [22-558] [Entered: 12/08/2022 05:33 PM]
December 7, 2022 Filing 84 MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 12/07/2022 by CM/ECF. [3432481] [22-558] [Entered: 12/07/2022 11:48 AM]
December 7, 2022 Filing 83 MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to 01/13/2023 to file the reply brief [ # 80 ] filed by Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. [3432438][83] [22-558] [Entered: 12/07/2022 11:07 AM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 80 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 12/06/2022 by CM/ECF. [3431961] [22-558] [Entered: 12/06/2022 01:51 PM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 71 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company Brief due date as 12/09/2022, FILED.[3385475] [22-558] [Entered: 09/20/2022 03:01 PM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 69 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, SPECIAL APPENDIX, JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1-11, [ # 47 ], [ # 48 ], [ # 49 ], [ # 50 ], [ # 67 ], [ # 52 ], [ # 53 ], [ # 54 ], [ # 55 ], [ # 56 ], [ # 68 ], [ # 58 ], [ # 59 ], on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED.[3385465] [22-558] [Entered: 09/20/2022 02:58 PM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 68 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 11, (pp. 1896-2177), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/20/2022 by CM/ECF.[3385374] [22-558] [Entered: 09/20/2022 01:54 PM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 67 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 11, (pp. 416-594), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3385372] [22-558] [Entered: 09/20/2022 01:51 PM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 65 ATTORNEY, Kenneth Turkel for Sarah Palin, in case 22-558, [ # 63 ], ADDED.[3385225] [22-558] [Entered: 09/20/2022 12:31 PM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/20/2022 by CM/ECF. [3385139] [22-558] [Entered: 09/20/2022 11:28 AM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 62 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, informing Court of proposed due date 12/09/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 09/20/2022 by CM/ECF.[3385020] [22-558] [Entered: 09/20/2022 10:28 AM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 61 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Joint Appendix, volume 9 of 11, [ # 57 ], on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED.[3384925] [22-558] [Entered: 09/20/2022 09:32 AM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 60 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Joint Appendix, volume 3 of 11, [ # 51 ], on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED.[3384904] [22-558] [Entered: 09/20/2022 09:25 AM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 59 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 11 of 11, (pp. 2420-2526), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384742] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 05:02 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 58 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 10 of 11, (pp. 2178-2419), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384739] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 05:00 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 57 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 11, (pp. 1896-2177), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384736] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:58 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 56 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 11, (pp. 1726-1895), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384731] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:55 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 55 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 11, (pp. 1451-1725), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384727] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:53 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 54 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 11, (pp. 1158-1450), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384725] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:50 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 53 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 11, (pp. 888-1157), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384723] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:49 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 52 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 11, (pp. 595-887), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384719] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:47 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 51 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 11, (pp. 416-594), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384716] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:45 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 50 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 11, (pp. 215-415), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384715] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:42 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 49 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 11, (pp. 1-214), on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384713] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:40 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 48 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384711] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:37 PM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 47 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3384707] [22-558] [Entered: 09/19/2022 04:34 PM]
September 16, 2022 Filing 46 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief & Appendix, [45], on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED.[3383309] [22-558] [Entered: 09/16/2022 08:45 AM]
September 15, 2022 Filing 45 BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 09/15/2022 by CM/ECF. [3383259] [22-558] [Entered: 09/15/2022 06:43 PM]
June 30, 2022 Filing 44 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Sarah Palin Brief due date as 09/15/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 09/15/2022, FILED.[3340507] [22-558] [Entered: 06/30/2022 08:33 AM]
June 29, 2022 Filing 41 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, informing Court of proposed due date 09/15/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 06/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3340260] [22-558] [Entered: 06/29/2022 03:03 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 40 ATTORNEY, David L. Axelrod for James Bennet and The New York Times Company, in case 22-558, [ # 37 ], ADDED.[3336642] [22-558] [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:17 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 39 ATTORNEY, Jacquelyn Schell for James Bennet and The New York Times Company, in case 22-558, [ # 36 ], ADDED.[3336639] [22-558] [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:16 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, Thomas Byrne Sullivan for James Bennet and The New York Times Company, in case 22-558, [ # 35 ], ADDED.[3336638] [22-558] [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:15 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 06/22/2022 by CM/ECF. [3336611] [22-558] [Entered: 06/22/2022 03:56 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 06/22/2022 by CM/ECF. [3336538] [22-558] [Entered: 06/22/2022 03:07 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The New York Times Company and James Bennet, FILED. Service date 06/22/2022 by CM/ECF. [3336537] [22-558] [Entered: 06/22/2022 03:04 PM]
June 17, 2022 Filing 33 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3334839] [22-558] [Entered: 06/17/2022 03:43 PM]
June 17, 2022 Filing 32 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/28/2020, RECEIVED.[3334788] [22-558]--[Edited 06/17/2022 by WD] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:57 PM]
June 17, 2022 Filing 31 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, AND ORDER, dated 05/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3334785] [22-558] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:55 PM]
June 17, 2022 Filing 30 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED.[3334771] [22-558] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:42 PM]
June 17, 2022 Filing 28 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, , ASSIGNED.[3334243] [22-558] [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:30 AM]
June 16, 2022 Filing 24 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 06/16/2022 by CM/ECF.[3334140] [22-558] [Entered: 06/16/2022 07:28 PM]
June 16, 2022 Filing 23 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 06/16/2022 by CM/ECF.[3334138] [22-558] [Entered: 06/16/2022 07:22 PM]
June 15, 2022 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee James Bennet and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 06/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3332929] [22-558] [Entered: 06/15/2022 11:02 AM]
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, lifting the FRAP 4(a)4 stay of appeal(s) in 22-558, directing appellant to file Form C and Form D within 14 days, FILED.[3325462] [22-558] [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:47 AM]
June 1, 2022 Filing 18 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 06/01/2022, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, alerting court that an opinion and order on Appellants post-trial motions cited in FRAP 4(a)(4) was entered on May 31, 2022, (said order attached), RECEIVED. Service date 06/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3324702] [22-558]--[Edited 06/01/2022 by RD] [Entered: 06/01/2022 02:32 PM]
May 25, 2022 Filing 17 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 05/25/2022, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, alerting court that the Appellants post-trial motions are awaiting ruling by the District Court, RECEIVED. Service date 05/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3321259] [22-558]--[Edited 05/25/2022 by RD] [Entered: 05/25/2022 01:44 PM]
April 25, 2022 Filing 16 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 04/25/2022, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, alerting court that the post-trial motions cited in FRAP4(a)(4) remain pending in the district court, RECEIVED. Service date 04/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3303156] [22-558]--[Edited 04/26/2022 by RD] [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:51 PM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. Service date 04/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3289477] [22-558] [Entered: 04/01/2022 12:59 PM]
March 25, 2022 Filing 13 FRAP 4(a)4 NOTICE, to Appellant Sarah Palin, copy to District Court, SENT.[3285151] [22-558] [Entered: 03/25/2022 02:03 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, district court receipt # ANYSDC25876553, FILED.[3280504] [22-558] [Entered: 03/18/2022 12:19 PM]
March 17, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3280509] [22-558] [Entered: 03/18/2022 12:20 PM]
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/01/2022, RECEIVED.[3280501] [22-558] [Entered: 03/18/2022 12:19 PM]
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/15/2022, RECEIVED.[3280499] [22-558] [Entered: 03/18/2022 12:18 PM]
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/29/2020, RECEIVED.[3280495] [22-558] [Entered: 03/18/2022 12:16 PM]
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sarah Palin, FILED. [3280478] [22-558] [Entered: 03/18/2022 12:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Palin v. The New York Times Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sarah Palin, an individual
Represented By: Shane Vogt Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth Turkel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The New York Times Company
Represented By: David L. Axelrod Esq.
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown Esq.
Represented By: David A. Schulz
Represented By: Jacquelyn Schell Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Byrne Sullivan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Bennet, an individual
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Shawn Leatherbury Esq.
Represented By: David A. Schulz
Represented By: David L. Axelrod Esq.
Represented By: Jacquelyn Schell Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Byrne Sullivan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 52 Media Organizations
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?