RHC Operating LLC v. City of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: RHC Operating LLC
Defendant / Appellee: City of New York, Eric Adams, in his official capacity as Mayor of New York City, Adrienne E. Adams, New York City Council Member, Alicka Ampry-Samuel, New York City Council Member, Diana Ayala, New York City Council Member, Justin L. Brannan, Selvena N. Brooks-Powers, New York City Council Member, Fernando Cabrera, New York City Council Member, Margaret S. Chin, New York City Council Member, Robert E. Cornegy, Jr., New York City Council Member, Laurie A. Cumbo, New York City Council Member, Ruben Diaz, Sr., New York City Council Member, Darma V. Diaz, New York City Council Member, Eric Dinowitz, New York City Council Member, Daniel Dromm, New York City Council Member, Mathieu Eugene, New York City Council Member, Oswald Feliz, New York City Council Member, James F. Gennaro, New York City Council Member, Vanessa L. Gibson, New York City Council Member, Mark Gjonaj, New York City Council Member, Barry S. Grodenchik, Robert F. Holden, New York City Council Member, Corey D. Johnson, New York City Council Member, Ben Kallos, New York City Council Member, Peter A. Koo, New York City Council Member, Karen Koslowitz, New York City Council Member, Brad S. Lander, New York City Council Member, Stephen T. Levin, New York City Council Member, Alan N. Maisel, New York City Council Member, Carlos Menchaca, New York City Council Member, Francisco P. Moya, New York City Council Member, Keith Powers, New York City Council Member, Kevin C. Riley, New York City Council Member, Carlina Rivera, New York City Council Member, Ydanis A. Rodriguez, New York City Council Member, Deborah L. Rose, New York City Council Member, Helen K. Rosenthal, New York City Council Member, Rafael Salamanca, Jr., New York City Council Member, Mark Treyger, New York City Council Member, Eric A. Ulrich, New York City Council Member, Paul A. Vallone, New York City Council Member and James G. Van Bramer, New York City Council Member
Case Number: 22-923
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: LOCAL QUESTION-Constitutional
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Jesse A. Townsend , [ # 30 ], in place of attorney Ingrid Gustafson,, SUBSTITUTED.[3334745] [22-923] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:19 PM]
June 17, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adrienne E. Adams, Eric Adams, Alicka Ampry-Samuel, Diana Ayala, Justin L. Brannan, Selvena N. Brooks-Powers, Fernando Cabrera, Margaret S. Chin, City of New York, Robert E. Cornegy, Jr., Laurie A. Cumbo, Darma V. Diaz, Ruben Diaz, Sr., Eric Dinowitz, Daniel Dromm, Mathieu Eugene, Oswald Feliz, James F. Gennaro, Vanessa L. Gibson, Mark Gjonaj, Barry S. Grodenchik, Robert F. Holden, Corey D. Johnson, Ben Kallos, Peter A. Koo, Karen Koslowitz, Brad S. Lander, Stephen T. Levin, Alan N. Maisel, Carlos Menchaca, Francisco P. Moya, Keith Powers, Kevin C. Riley, Carlina Rivera, Ydanis A. Rodriguez, Deborah L. Rose, Helen K. Rosenthal, Rafael Salamanca, Jr., Mark Treyger, Eric A. Ulrich, Paul A. Vallone and James G. Van Bramer, FILED. Service date 06/17/2022 by CM/ECF. [3334697] [22-923] [Entered: 06/17/2022 01:39 PM]
May 19, 2022 Filing 29 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant RHC Operating LLC Brief due date as 08/09/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 08/09/2022, FILED.[3317945] [22-923] [Entered: 05/19/2022 09:03 AM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 26 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 08/09/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317754] [22-923] [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:07 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 25 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3317091] [22-923] [Entered: 05/18/2022 09:24 AM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 20 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED. Service date 05/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3316221] [22-923] [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:07 AM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 19 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED. Service date 05/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3316216] [22-923] [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:07 AM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED. Service date 05/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3316210] [22-923] [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:06 AM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 17 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant RHC Operating LLC, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, Form C and Form D, [7], [8], [9], from the docket, FILED.[3316114] [22-923] [Entered: 05/17/2022 09:11 AM]
May 11, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Ingrid Gustafson, [ # 13 ], in place of attorney Sylvia Hinds-Radix, SUBSTITUTED.[3313151] [22-923] [Entered: 05/11/2022 01:09 PM]
May 11, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adrienne E. Adams, Eric Adams, Alicka Ampry-Samuel, Diana Ayala, Justin L. Brannan, Selvena N. Brooks-Powers, Fernando Cabrera, Margaret S. Chin, City of New York, Robert E. Cornegy, Jr., Laurie A. Cumbo, Darma V. Diaz, Ruben Diaz, Sr., Eric Dinowitz, Daniel Dromm, Mathieu Eugene, Oswald Feliz, James F. Gennaro, Vanessa L. Gibson, Mark Gjonaj, Barry S. Grodenchik, Robert F. Holden, Corey D. Johnson, Ben Kallos, Peter A. Koo, Karen Koslowitz, Brad S. Lander, Stephen T. Levin, Alan N. Maisel, Carlos Menchaca, Francisco P. Moya, Keith Powers, Kevin C. Riley, Carlina Rivera, Ydanis A. Rodriguez, Deborah L. Rose, Helen K. Rosenthal, Rafael Salamanca, Jr., Mark Treyger, Eric A. Ulrich, Paul A. Vallone and James G. Van Bramer, FILED. Service date 05/11/2022 by CM/ECF. [3313125] [22-923] [Entered: 05/11/2022 12:50 PM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 12 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [9], on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED.[3312038] [22-923] [Entered: 05/10/2022 11:02 AM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [8], on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED.[3312028] [22-923] [Entered: 05/10/2022 10:56 AM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 10 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [7], on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED.[3312019] [22-923] [Entered: 05/10/2022 10:51 AM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED. Service date 05/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3311960] [22-923] [Entered: 05/10/2022 10:14 AM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED. Service date 05/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3311957] [22-923] [Entered: 05/10/2022 10:12 AM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED. Service date 05/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3311951] [22-923] [Entered: 05/10/2022 10:09 AM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3304573] [22-923] [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:23 PM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26062079, FILED.[3304572] [22-923] [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:23 PM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/30/2022, RECEIVED.[3304570] [22-923] [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:22 PM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant RHC Operating LLC, FILED. [3304568] [22-923]--[Edited 05/17/2022 by RW] [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: RHC Operating LLC v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RHC Operating LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Volpe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric Adams, in his official capacity as Mayor of New York City
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Adrienne E. Adams, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alicka Ampry-Samuel, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Diana Ayala, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Justin L. Brannan
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Selvena N. Brooks-Powers, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fernando Cabrera, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Margaret S. Chin, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert E. Cornegy, Jr., New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Laurie A. Cumbo, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ruben Diaz, Sr., New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Darma V. Diaz, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric Dinowitz, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Dromm, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mathieu Eugene, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Oswald Feliz, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James F. Gennaro, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vanessa L. Gibson, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark Gjonaj, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barry S. Grodenchik
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert F. Holden, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Corey D. Johnson, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ben Kallos, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Peter A. Koo, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Karen Koslowitz, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brad S. Lander, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen T. Levin, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alan N. Maisel, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carlos Menchaca, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Francisco P. Moya, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith Powers, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin C. Riley, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carlina Rivera, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ydanis A. Rodriguez, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deborah L. Rose, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Helen K. Rosenthal, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rafael Salamanca, Jr., New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark Treyger, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric A. Ulrich, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul A. Vallone, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James G. Van Bramer, New York City Council Member
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?