Aaron Boring, et al v. Google Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: AARON C. BORING and CHRISTINE BORING, husband and wife respectively
Defendant - Appellee: GOOGLE INC
Case Number: 09-2350
Filed: May 13, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2010 NOTICE of U.S. Supreme Court disposition at No. 09-1475. Petition for Writ of Ceriorari filed by Aaron C. Boring denied on 10/04/2010. (CRG)
June 7, 2010 NOTICE from U.S. Supreme Court. Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed by Aaron C. Boring on 06/01/2010. Supreme Court Case No. 09-1475. (CRG)
March 11, 2010 42 Featured Case MANDATE ISSUED, filed. (ARL)
March 3, 2010 3010042884 Featured Case ORDER (SCIRICA, Chief Judge, SLOVITER, MCKEE, RENDELL, AMBRO, FUENTES, SMITH, FISHER, CHAGARES, JORDAN, Authoring Judge and HARDIMAN, Circuit Judges and *PADOVA, District Judge) denying for Panel Rehearing En Banc Rehearing filed by Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring, filed. *Honorable John R. Padova, United States District Court Senior Judge for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, sitting by designation, limited to panel vote. (PAR)
February 11, 2010 3010018281 Featured Case ECF FILER: Petition filed by Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring for Rehearing before original panel and the court en banc. Certificate of Service dated 02/11/2010. (GRZ)
January 28, 2010 3010000089 Featured Case JUDGMENT, Ordered and Adjudged by this Court that the order entered by the District Court on February 17, 2009 and April 6, 2009 is Affirmed In Part and Reversed In Part. Each party to bear its own costs.--[Edited 01/28/2010 by MGD] (MLR)
January 28, 2010 3010000077 Featured Case NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: RENDELL, JORDAN, Circuit Judges and *PADOVA, District Judge. *(Honorable John R. Padova, United States District Court Senior Judge for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, sitting by designation). Total Pages: 17. Judge: JORDAN Authoring. (MLR)
January 25, 2010 Featured Case SUBMITTED on Monday, January 25, 2010. Panel: RENDELL, JORDAN, Circuit Judges and *PADOVA, District Judge. *(Hon. John R. Padova, Senior District Judge for the U.S. District Court for Eastern District of Pennsylvania, sitting by designation) (PM)
January 12, 2010 309978708 Featured Case Submit Notification for Monday, 01/25/2010. (CMH)
December 30, 2009 309968317 Featured Case ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Esq. for Appellee Google Inc.. (PAR)
December 29, 2009 309962576 Featured Case ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Tonia O. Klausner, Esq. for Appellee Google Inc. Certificate of Service dated 12/29/2009. (TOK)
November 20, 2009 309913782 Featured Case ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Tonia O. Klausner, Esq. for Appellee Google Inc. Certificate of Service dated 11/20/2009. (TOK)
November 14, 2009 309903437 Featured Case ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Gregg R. Zegarelli, Esq. for Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring. Certificate of Service dated 11/14/2009. (GRZ)
November 13, 2009 309901636 Featured Case Calendared for Monday, 01/25/2010. (CMH)
November 3, 2009 309886719 Featured Case ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing Motion by Appellants for Leave to File Addendum attached to Reply Brief is granted with filing as of October 8, 2009, filed. It should be noted that in the event Appellants are awarded costs at the conclusion of the appeal, Appellants will not be entitled to recover the costs associated with the addendum. (EMA)
October 21, 2009 Featured Case COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Received motion for leave to file addendum attached to reply brief. (EMA)
October 21, 2009 309866855 Featured Case ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring for Leave to File Addendum attached to Reply Brief. Certificate of Service dated 10/21/2009.--[Edited 10/26/2009 by EMA] (GRZ)
October 20, 2009 309865404 Featured Case NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring regarding the reply brief filed on 10/08/2009. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 10/23/2009. (EMA)
October 13, 2009 Featured Case HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring - Reply Brief. Copies: 10. (KEL)
October 8, 2009 309847299 Featured Case ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring, filed. Certificate of Service dated 10/08/2009. [Entry edited by Clerk's Office to reflect the correct event]--[Edited 10/20/2009 by EMA] (GRZ)
September 30, 2009 309837242 Featured Case ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion by Appellee for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix with fiing as of September 29, 2009, filed. (MS)
September 29, 2009 309833988 Featured Case ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellee Google Inc, filed. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2009 by email. (TOK)
September 25, 2009 Featured Case HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Google Inc - Supplemental Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 1 (EAF)
September 25, 2009 Featured Case HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Google Inc - Brief with Addendum attached. Copies: 10. (KEL)
September 24, 2009 309828424 Featured Case ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Google Inc to supplement the appendix. Certificate of Service dated 09/24/2009. [Supplemental Appendix has been filed separately. Attachment has been deleted from this entry as duplicative]--[Edited 09/29/2009 by MS] (TOK)
September 24, 2009 309828326 Featured Case ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellee Google Inc, filed. Certificate of Service dated 09/24/2009 by email. (TOK)
September 17, 2009 309815901 Featured Case ECF FILER: LETTER on behalf of Attorney Brian P. Fagan, Esq. for Appellee Google Inc. Certificate of Service dated 09/17/2009. (BPF)
September 14, 2009 309810516 Featured Case ECF FILER: LETTER on behalf of Attorney Gregg R. Zegarelli, Esq. for Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring. Certificate of Service dated 09/14/2009. (GRZ)
August 27, 2009 Featured Case HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to Brief). (MS)
August 27, 2009 Featured Case HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 10. (RM)
August 25, 2009 309784057 Featured Case ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX (with volume 1 attached to Brief) on behalf of Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/25/2009 by US mail, 3rd party, email. (GRZ)
August 25, 2009 309784032 Featured Case ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/25/2009 by US mail, 3rd party, email. (GRZ)
July 16, 2009 309725213 Featured Case BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief and Appendix on behalf of Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring due on or before 08/25/2009. (ARL)
June 3, 2009 309646057 Featured Case ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tonia O. Klausner on behalf of Appellee(s) Google Inc.. (TOK)
May 27, 2009 309633175 Featured Case ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Google Inc, filed. (BPF)
May 26, 2009 309630689 Featured Case ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring, received. (DMM)
May 26, 2009 309630197 Featured Case ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring, filed. (DMM)
May 26, 2009 309630191 Featured Case ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring, filed. (DMM)
May 21, 2009 309623251 Featured Case ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian P. Fagan on behalf of Appellee(s) Google Inc.. (BPF)
May 14, 2009 309608806 Featured Case ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring advising this court that no transcripts are available. (DMM)
May 13, 2009 309606907 Featured Case ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dennis M. Moskal on behalf of Appellant(s) Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring. (DMM)
May 13, 2009 309606878 Featured Case ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gregg Zegarelli on behalf of Appellant(s) Aaron Boring and Christine Boring. (GRZ)
May 13, 2009 Featured Case RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARL)
May 13, 2009 309606811 Featured Case CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Aaron C. Boring and Christine Boring. (ARL)

Search for this case: Aaron Boring, et al v. Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: AARON C. BORING
Represented By: Dennis M. Moskal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: CHRISTINE BORING, husband and wife respectively
Represented By: Dennis M. Moskal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: GOOGLE INC
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?