In Re: Asbestos Prod Liab Lit
Defendant / Appellee: PHELPS DODGE COPPER PRODUCTS PHELPS DODGE CORP, ATLAS ASBESTOS, OWENS ILLINOIS INC, ALSO KNOWN AS OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS CO., AKA Owens Illinois Glass Co, KAISER CEMENT CORP, NATIONAL GYPSUM CO, WR GRACE & CO, MARMON HOLDINGS INC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ROCKBESTOS CO., PARKER HANNIFIN CORP, ASBESTOS CORP LTD, OKONITE CO, UNION CARBIDE CORP, ARMSTRONG CORK CO, GK TECHNOLOGIES INC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO GENERAL CABLE CO, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP, UNITED STATES GYPSUM CO, JACQUAYS, GARLOCK INC, ERICCSON NORTH AMERICAN INC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ANACONDA WIRE AND CABLE CO., AND SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CONTINENTAL CABLE CO, HAMILTON MATERIALS INC, GAF CORP, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO RUBEROID CO, GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC, USX, KAISER GYPSUM CO INC, KEENE CORPORATION, FIBREBOARD CORP, T&N PLC, F/K/A TURNER & NEWELL PLC, FKA Turner & Newell PLC, PFIZER INC, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP and RICHTEX INC
Plaintiff / Appellant: AUDREY B. COOK, on behalf of herself and decedent Louis A. Cook
Case Number: 13-2704
Filed: June 19, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER (AMBRO, CHAGARES and VANASKIE, Circuit Judges) the motion filed by Appellant Audrey B. Cook to withdraw the previous motion to reopen the case is granted, filed. Panel No.: BCO-013. VANASKIE, Authoring Judge. (TNH) [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:52 AM]
November 6, 2013 ECF FILER: Withdraw of Motion by Kristin Houser on behalf of Appellant Audrey B. Cook. Certificate of Service dated 11/06/2013. (KMH) [Entered: 11/06/2013 12:10 PM]
November 1, 2013 COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Case Opening Forms received from Appellant Audrey B. Cook. (JK) [Entered: 11/01/2013 11:54 AM]
October 31, 2013 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Audrey B. Cook advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (KMH) [Entered: 10/31/2013 06:06 PM]
October 31, 2013 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Audrey B. Cook, filed. (KMH) [Entered: 10/31/2013 06:03 PM]
October 31, 2013 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Audrey B. Cook, received. (KMH) [Entered: 10/31/2013 06:02 PM]
October 31, 2013 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kristin Houser on behalf of Appellant(s) Louis A. Cook and Audrey B. Cook. (KMH) [Entered: 10/31/2013 06:01 PM]
October 31, 2013 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Union Carbide Corp to Motion to reopen case. Certificate of Service dated 10/31/2013. (MBC) [Entered: 10/31/2013 04:21 PM]
October 25, 2013 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Audrey B. Cook requesting Appearance Form, Information Statement, Concise Summary and Transcript Purchase Order. Compliance due 11/04/2013. (JK) [Entered: 10/25/2013 09:38 AM]
October 21, 2013 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Audrey B. Cook to Reopen Case. Certificate of Service dated 10/21/2013. (KMH) [Entered: 10/21/2013 02:59 PM]
July 23, 2013 CLERK ORDER dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR Misc. 107.2, for failure to file case opening forms. Case terminated on 07/23/2013. (JK) [Entered: 07/23/2013 09:29 AM]
July 17, 2013 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Ericcson North American Inc, filed. (OMH) [Entered: 07/17/2013 12:19 PM]
July 17, 2013 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas B. High on behalf of Appellee(s) Ericsson North American, Inc.. (OMH) [Entered: 07/17/2013 12:19 PM]
July 12, 2013 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Union Carbide Corp, filed. (CGJ) [Entered: 07/12/2013 03:42 PM]
July 5, 2013 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kristin Houser, Esq. for Audrey B. Cook requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/19/2013. Information Statement on or before 07/19/2013. Concise Summary on or before 07/19/2013. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 07/19/2013. (JK) [Entered: 07/05/2013 12:03 PM]
July 5, 2013 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mary P. Birk, Esq. for Armstrong Cork Co, Union Carbide Corp, United States Gypsum Co and Pfizer Inc, Christopher C. Burke, Esq. for Westinghouse Electric Corp, Joshua S. Evett, Esq. for GAF Corp, Susan S. Henderson, Esq. for USX, Scott D. Hess, Esq. for Union Carbide Corp and Pfizer Inc, Thomas B. High, Esq. for Ericcson North American Inc, Michael G. Martin, Esq. for United States Gypsum Co and Pfizer Inc, Michael T. McCall, Esq. for Hamilton Materials Inc, Michael W. Moore, Esq. for Marmon Holdings Inc, Jennifer M. Studebaker, Esq. for Georgia Pacific LLC, Perrie M. Weiner, Esq. for Fibreboard Corp, James V. Weixel, Jr., Esq. for USX and Jeffrey R. Williams, Esq. for Owens Illinois Inc and Keene Corporation requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/19/2013. Disclosure Statement on or before 07/19/2013. (JK) [Entered: 07/05/2013 11:56 AM]
July 2, 2013 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Marcy B. Croft on behalf of Appellee(s) Union Carbide Corporation. (MBC) [Entered: 07/02/2013 04:21 PM]
July 2, 2013 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laura D. Goodson on behalf of Appellee(s) Union Carbide Corporation. (LDG) [Entered: 07/02/2013 04:18 PM]
July 2, 2013 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christi G. Jones on behalf of Appellee(s) Union Carbide Corporation. (CGJ) [Entered: 07/02/2013 04:16 PM]
June 19, 2013 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 06/19/2013 02:48 PM]
June 19, 2013 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Audrey B. Cook in District Court No. 2-09-cv-63409 and 2-01-md-00875. (JK) [Entered: 06/19/2013 02:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Asbestos Prod Liab Lit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHELPS DODGE COPPER PRODUCTS PHELPS DODGE CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATLAS ASBESTOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OWENS ILLINOIS INC, ALSO KNOWN AS OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS CO., AKA Owens Illinois Glass Co
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Williams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER CEMENT CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL GYPSUM CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WR GRACE & CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARMON HOLDINGS INC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ROCKBESTOS CO.
Represented By: Michael W. Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PARKER HANNIFIN CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASBESTOS CORP LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OKONITE CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNION CARBIDE CORP
Represented By: Laura D. Goodson Esq.
Represented By: Marcy B. Croft Esq.
Represented By: Mary P. Birk Esq.
Represented By: Christi G. Jones Esq.
Represented By: Scott D. Hess Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARMSTRONG CORK CO
Represented By: Mary P. Birk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GK TECHNOLOGIES INC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO GENERAL CABLE CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP
Represented By: Christopher C. Burke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES GYPSUM CO
Represented By: Michael G. Martin Esq.
Represented By: Mary P. Birk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUAYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARLOCK INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERICCSON NORTH AMERICAN INC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ANACONDA WIRE AND CABLE CO., AND SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CONTINENTAL CABLE CO
Represented By: Thomas B. High Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAMILTON MATERIALS INC
Represented By: Michael T. McCall Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GAF CORP, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO RUBEROID CO
Represented By: Joshua S. Evett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Studebaker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: USX
Represented By: James V. Weixel Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Susan S. Henderson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER GYPSUM CO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEENE CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Williams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIBREBOARD CORP
Represented By: Perrie M. Weiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T&N PLC, F/K/A TURNER & NEWELL PLC, FKA Turner & Newell PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PFIZER INC
Represented By: Michael G. Martin Esq.
Represented By: Mary P. Birk Esq.
Represented By: Scott D. Hess Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHTEX INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AUDREY B. COOK, on behalf of herself and decedent Louis A. Cook
Represented By: Kristin M. Houser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?